EP3167752 - DRIVING MECHANISM FOR FURNITURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.02.2019 Database last updated on 03.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 09.03.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.11.2017 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.06.2017 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 18.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states King Slide Works Co., Ltd. No. 299, Shun An Road Lu Chu District Kaohsiung City 821 / TW | For all designated states King Slide Technology Co., Ltd. No. 6, Luke 9th Road Kaohsiung Science Park Lu Zhu District 82151 Kaohsiung City / TW | [2017/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Chen, Ken-Ching c/o King Slide Works Co., Ltd. No. 299, Shun An Rd. Lu Chu District 821 Kaohsiung City / TW | 02 /
Liang, Hsiu-Chiang c/o King Slide Works Co., Ltd. No. 299, Shun An Rd. Lu Chu District 821 Kaohsiung City / TW | 03 /
Huang, Ci-Bin c/o King Slide Works Co., Ltd. No. 299, Shun An Rd. Lu Chu District 821 Kaohsiung City / TW | 04 /
Wang, Chun-Chiang c/o King Slide Works Co., Ltd. No. 299, Shun An Rd. Lu Chu District 821 Kaohsiung City / TW | [2017/20] | Representative(s) | Straus, Alexander Patentanwälte Becker, Kurig, Straus Bavariastrasse 7 80336 München / DE | [2017/20] | Application number, filing date | 16174532.8 | 15.06.2016 | [2017/20] | Priority number, date | TW20150137447 | 12.11.2015 Original published format: TW 104137447 | [2017/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3167752 | Date: | 17.05.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3167752 | Date: | 11.04.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.11.2016 | Classification | IPC: | A47B88/00 | [2017/20] | CPC: |
A47B88/463 (EP,US);
A47B88/46 (US);
A47B88/467 (US);
A47B88/49 (EP,US);
A47B2210/0091 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/27] |
Former [2017/20] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | ANTRIEBSVORRICHTUNG FÜR MÖBEL | [2017/20] | English: | DRIVING MECHANISM FOR FURNITURE | [2017/20] | French: | MECHANISME D'ENTRAINEMENT POUR MEUBLE | [2017/20] | Examination procedure | 15.06.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 24.05.2017 | Examination requested [2017/27] | 29.11.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.02.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 19.02.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.02.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 14.01.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/12] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 15.06.2016 | AL | 11.04.2018 | AT | 11.04.2018 | CY | 11.04.2018 | CZ | 11.04.2018 | DK | 11.04.2018 | EE | 11.04.2018 | ES | 11.04.2018 | FI | 11.04.2018 | HR | 11.04.2018 | IT | 11.04.2018 | LT | 11.04.2018 | LV | 11.04.2018 | MC | 11.04.2018 | MK | 11.04.2018 | NL | 11.04.2018 | PL | 11.04.2018 | RO | 11.04.2018 | RS | 11.04.2018 | SE | 11.04.2018 | SI | 11.04.2018 | SK | 11.04.2018 | SM | 11.04.2018 | TR | 11.04.2018 | IE | 15.06.2018 | LU | 15.06.2018 | MT | 15.06.2018 | BE | 30.06.2018 | FR | 30.06.2018 | BG | 11.07.2018 | NO | 11.07.2018 | GR | 12.07.2018 | IS | 11.08.2018 | PT | 13.08.2018 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 15.06.2016 | |
AL | 11.04.2018 | ||
AT | 11.04.2018 | ||
CY | 11.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 11.04.2018 | ||
DK | 11.04.2018 | ||
EE | 11.04.2018 | ||
ES | 11.04.2018 | ||
FI | 11.04.2018 | ||
HR | 11.04.2018 | ||
IT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LV | 11.04.2018 | ||
MC | 11.04.2018 | ||
MK | 11.04.2018 | ||
NL | 11.04.2018 | ||
PL | 11.04.2018 | ||
RO | 11.04.2018 | ||
RS | 11.04.2018 | ||
SE | 11.04.2018 | ||
SI | 11.04.2018 | ||
SK | 11.04.2018 | ||
SM | 11.04.2018 | ||
TR | 11.04.2018 | ||
IE | 15.06.2018 | ||
LU | 15.06.2018 | ||
MT | 15.06.2018 | ||
BE | 30.06.2018 | ||
FR | 30.06.2018 | ||
BG | 11.07.2018 | ||
NO | 11.07.2018 | ||
GR | 12.07.2018 | ||
PT | 13.08.2018 | ||
Former [2020/30] | HU | 15.06.2016 | |
AL | 11.04.2018 | ||
AT | 11.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 11.04.2018 | ||
DK | 11.04.2018 | ||
EE | 11.04.2018 | ||
ES | 11.04.2018 | ||
FI | 11.04.2018 | ||
HR | 11.04.2018 | ||
IT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LV | 11.04.2018 | ||
MC | 11.04.2018 | ||
NL | 11.04.2018 | ||
PL | 11.04.2018 | ||
RO | 11.04.2018 | ||
RS | 11.04.2018 | ||
SE | 11.04.2018 | ||
SI | 11.04.2018 | ||
SK | 11.04.2018 | ||
SM | 11.04.2018 | ||
TR | 11.04.2018 | ||
IE | 15.06.2018 | ||
LU | 15.06.2018 | ||
MT | 15.06.2018 | ||
BE | 30.06.2018 | ||
FR | 30.06.2018 | ||
BG | 11.07.2018 | ||
NO | 11.07.2018 | ||
GR | 12.07.2018 | ||
PT | 13.08.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AL | 11.04.2018 | |
AT | 11.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 11.04.2018 | ||
DK | 11.04.2018 | ||
EE | 11.04.2018 | ||
ES | 11.04.2018 | ||
FI | 11.04.2018 | ||
HR | 11.04.2018 | ||
IT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LV | 11.04.2018 | ||
MC | 11.04.2018 | ||
NL | 11.04.2018 | ||
PL | 11.04.2018 | ||
RO | 11.04.2018 | ||
RS | 11.04.2018 | ||
SE | 11.04.2018 | ||
SI | 11.04.2018 | ||
SK | 11.04.2018 | ||
SM | 11.04.2018 | ||
TR | 11.04.2018 | ||
IE | 15.06.2018 | ||
LU | 15.06.2018 | ||
MT | 15.06.2018 | ||
BE | 30.06.2018 | ||
FR | 30.06.2018 | ||
BG | 11.07.2018 | ||
NO | 11.07.2018 | ||
GR | 12.07.2018 | ||
PT | 13.08.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AL | 11.04.2018 | |
AT | 11.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 11.04.2018 | ||
DK | 11.04.2018 | ||
EE | 11.04.2018 | ||
ES | 11.04.2018 | ||
FI | 11.04.2018 | ||
HR | 11.04.2018 | ||
IT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LV | 11.04.2018 | ||
MC | 11.04.2018 | ||
NL | 11.04.2018 | ||
PL | 11.04.2018 | ||
RO | 11.04.2018 | ||
RS | 11.04.2018 | ||
SE | 11.04.2018 | ||
SI | 11.04.2018 | ||
SK | 11.04.2018 | ||
SM | 11.04.2018 | ||
IE | 15.06.2018 | ||
LU | 15.06.2018 | ||
MT | 15.06.2018 | ||
BE | 30.06.2018 | ||
FR | 30.06.2018 | ||
BG | 11.07.2018 | ||
NO | 11.07.2018 | ||
GR | 12.07.2018 | ||
PT | 13.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 11.04.2018 | |
AT | 11.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 11.04.2018 | ||
DK | 11.04.2018 | ||
EE | 11.04.2018 | ||
ES | 11.04.2018 | ||
FI | 11.04.2018 | ||
HR | 11.04.2018 | ||
IT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LV | 11.04.2018 | ||
MC | 11.04.2018 | ||
NL | 11.04.2018 | ||
PL | 11.04.2018 | ||
RO | 11.04.2018 | ||
RS | 11.04.2018 | ||
SE | 11.04.2018 | ||
SI | 11.04.2018 | ||
SK | 11.04.2018 | ||
SM | 11.04.2018 | ||
IE | 15.06.2018 | ||
LU | 15.06.2018 | ||
BE | 30.06.2018 | ||
FR | 30.06.2018 | ||
BG | 11.07.2018 | ||
NO | 11.07.2018 | ||
GR | 12.07.2018 | ||
PT | 13.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/23] | AL | 11.04.2018 | |
AT | 11.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 11.04.2018 | ||
DK | 11.04.2018 | ||
EE | 11.04.2018 | ||
ES | 11.04.2018 | ||
FI | 11.04.2018 | ||
HR | 11.04.2018 | ||
IT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LV | 11.04.2018 | ||
MC | 11.04.2018 | ||
NL | 11.04.2018 | ||
PL | 11.04.2018 | ||
RO | 11.04.2018 | ||
RS | 11.04.2018 | ||
SE | 11.04.2018 | ||
SK | 11.04.2018 | ||
SM | 11.04.2018 | ||
IE | 15.06.2018 | ||
LU | 15.06.2018 | ||
BE | 30.06.2018 | ||
FR | 30.06.2018 | ||
BG | 11.07.2018 | ||
NO | 11.07.2018 | ||
GR | 12.07.2018 | ||
PT | 13.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/19] | AL | 11.04.2018 | |
AT | 11.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 11.04.2018 | ||
DK | 11.04.2018 | ||
EE | 11.04.2018 | ||
ES | 11.04.2018 | ||
FI | 11.04.2018 | ||
HR | 11.04.2018 | ||
IT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LV | 11.04.2018 | ||
MC | 11.04.2018 | ||
NL | 11.04.2018 | ||
PL | 11.04.2018 | ||
RO | 11.04.2018 | ||
RS | 11.04.2018 | ||
SE | 11.04.2018 | ||
SK | 11.04.2018 | ||
SM | 11.04.2018 | ||
IE | 15.06.2018 | ||
LU | 15.06.2018 | ||
BG | 11.07.2018 | ||
NO | 11.07.2018 | ||
GR | 12.07.2018 | ||
PT | 13.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/17] | AL | 11.04.2018 | |
AT | 11.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 11.04.2018 | ||
DK | 11.04.2018 | ||
EE | 11.04.2018 | ||
ES | 11.04.2018 | ||
FI | 11.04.2018 | ||
HR | 11.04.2018 | ||
IT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LV | 11.04.2018 | ||
MC | 11.04.2018 | ||
NL | 11.04.2018 | ||
PL | 11.04.2018 | ||
RO | 11.04.2018 | ||
RS | 11.04.2018 | ||
SE | 11.04.2018 | ||
SK | 11.04.2018 | ||
SM | 11.04.2018 | ||
LU | 15.06.2018 | ||
BG | 11.07.2018 | ||
NO | 11.07.2018 | ||
GR | 12.07.2018 | ||
PT | 13.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/15] | AL | 11.04.2018 | |
AT | 11.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 11.04.2018 | ||
DK | 11.04.2018 | ||
EE | 11.04.2018 | ||
ES | 11.04.2018 | ||
FI | 11.04.2018 | ||
HR | 11.04.2018 | ||
IT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LV | 11.04.2018 | ||
MC | 11.04.2018 | ||
NL | 11.04.2018 | ||
PL | 11.04.2018 | ||
RO | 11.04.2018 | ||
RS | 11.04.2018 | ||
SE | 11.04.2018 | ||
SK | 11.04.2018 | ||
SM | 11.04.2018 | ||
BG | 11.07.2018 | ||
NO | 11.07.2018 | ||
GR | 12.07.2018 | ||
PT | 13.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | AL | 11.04.2018 | |
AT | 11.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 11.04.2018 | ||
DK | 11.04.2018 | ||
EE | 11.04.2018 | ||
ES | 11.04.2018 | ||
FI | 11.04.2018 | ||
HR | 11.04.2018 | ||
IT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LV | 11.04.2018 | ||
NL | 11.04.2018 | ||
PL | 11.04.2018 | ||
RO | 11.04.2018 | ||
RS | 11.04.2018 | ||
SE | 11.04.2018 | ||
SK | 11.04.2018 | ||
SM | 11.04.2018 | ||
BG | 11.07.2018 | ||
NO | 11.07.2018 | ||
GR | 12.07.2018 | ||
PT | 13.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | AL | 11.04.2018 | |
AT | 11.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 11.04.2018 | ||
DK | 11.04.2018 | ||
EE | 11.04.2018 | ||
ES | 11.04.2018 | ||
FI | 11.04.2018 | ||
HR | 11.04.2018 | ||
LT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LV | 11.04.2018 | ||
NL | 11.04.2018 | ||
PL | 11.04.2018 | ||
RO | 11.04.2018 | ||
RS | 11.04.2018 | ||
SE | 11.04.2018 | ||
SK | 11.04.2018 | ||
BG | 11.07.2018 | ||
NO | 11.07.2018 | ||
GR | 12.07.2018 | ||
PT | 13.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | AL | 11.04.2018 | |
DK | 11.04.2018 | ||
EE | 11.04.2018 | ||
ES | 11.04.2018 | ||
FI | 11.04.2018 | ||
HR | 11.04.2018 | ||
LT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LV | 11.04.2018 | ||
NL | 11.04.2018 | ||
PL | 11.04.2018 | ||
RS | 11.04.2018 | ||
SE | 11.04.2018 | ||
BG | 11.07.2018 | ||
NO | 11.07.2018 | ||
GR | 12.07.2018 | ||
PT | 13.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | AL | 11.04.2018 | |
DK | 11.04.2018 | ||
ES | 11.04.2018 | ||
FI | 11.04.2018 | ||
HR | 11.04.2018 | ||
LT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LV | 11.04.2018 | ||
NL | 11.04.2018 | ||
PL | 11.04.2018 | ||
RS | 11.04.2018 | ||
SE | 11.04.2018 | ||
BG | 11.07.2018 | ||
NO | 11.07.2018 | ||
GR | 12.07.2018 | ||
PT | 13.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/03] | AL | 11.04.2018 | |
ES | 11.04.2018 | ||
FI | 11.04.2018 | ||
HR | 11.04.2018 | ||
LT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LV | 11.04.2018 | ||
NL | 11.04.2018 | ||
PL | 11.04.2018 | ||
RS | 11.04.2018 | ||
SE | 11.04.2018 | ||
BG | 11.07.2018 | ||
NO | 11.07.2018 | ||
GR | 12.07.2018 | ||
PT | 13.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AL | 11.04.2018 | |
ES | 11.04.2018 | ||
FI | 11.04.2018 | ||
HR | 11.04.2018 | ||
LT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LV | 11.04.2018 | ||
NL | 11.04.2018 | ||
PL | 11.04.2018 | ||
RS | 11.04.2018 | ||
SE | 11.04.2018 | ||
BG | 11.07.2018 | ||
NO | 11.07.2018 | ||
GR | 12.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | AL | 11.04.2018 | |
ES | 11.04.2018 | ||
FI | 11.04.2018 | ||
HR | 11.04.2018 | ||
LT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LV | 11.04.2018 | ||
NL | 11.04.2018 | ||
PL | 11.04.2018 | ||
RS | 11.04.2018 | ||
SE | 11.04.2018 | ||
BG | 11.07.2018 | ||
NO | 11.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | AL | 11.04.2018 | |
ES | 11.04.2018 | ||
FI | 11.04.2018 | ||
HR | 11.04.2018 | ||
LT | 11.04.2018 | ||
NL | 11.04.2018 | ||
PL | 11.04.2018 | ||
SE | 11.04.2018 | ||
BG | 11.07.2018 | ||
NO | 11.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/49] | AL | 11.04.2018 | |
ES | 11.04.2018 | ||
FI | 11.04.2018 | ||
LT | 11.04.2018 | ||
NL | 11.04.2018 | ||
PL | 11.04.2018 | ||
SE | 11.04.2018 | ||
BG | 11.07.2018 | ||
NO | 11.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | AL | 11.04.2018 | |
ES | 11.04.2018 | ||
FI | 11.04.2018 | ||
LT | 11.04.2018 | ||
NL | 11.04.2018 | ||
NO | 11.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/46] | AL | 11.04.2018 | |
LT | 11.04.2018 | ||
NL | 11.04.2018 | ||
NO | 11.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/43] | NL | 11.04.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE102011002212 (HETTICH PAUL GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [A] 1-13 * paragraph [0012] - paragraph [0031]; figures 1-7 * | by applicant | US8172345 |