EP3257574 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING A PARTICLE-SHAPED MATERIAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been published Status updated on 17.11.2017 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.01.2018 | New entry: Despatch of communication that application is refused | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Clariant International Ltd Rothausstrasse 61 4132 Muttenz / CH | [2017/51] | Representative(s) | Holmes, Rosalind Clariant Produkte (Deutschland) GmbH Patent & License Management Chemicals Industriepark Höchst, G 860 65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [2017/51] | Application number, filing date | 16174634.2 | 15.06.2016 | [2017/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3257574 | Date: | 20.12.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.11.2016 | Classification | IPC: | B01J2/04, A61K9/20 | [2017/51] | CPC: |
B01J2/04 (EP,KR,US);
A61J3/07 (US);
A61K9/1641 (EP,KR);
A61K9/2031 (EP,KR);
A61K9/5031 (US);
A61P1/10 (EP,KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/51] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES PARTIKELFÖRMIGEN MATERIALS | [2017/51] | English: | METHOD FOR PRODUCING A PARTICLE-SHAPED MATERIAL | [2017/51] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION D'UN MATÉRIAU PARTICULAIRE | [2017/51] | Examination procedure | 19.01.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: Examination on filing A.90(5) {1} |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2003108602 (CHU JAMES SHUNNAN [US], et al) [X] 14,16 * examples 6,7 *; | [XD]DE102004004968 (BASF AG [DE]) [XD] 1-13* paragraphs [0017] , [0018] , [0007] , [0005]; figure 1; claims 1,7 *; | [X]EP1865925 (OZPHARMA PTY LTD [AU]) [X] 14,16 * example 2 *; | [X]US8361452 (HALOW GEORGE M [US]) [X] 15 * column 2, line 32 - line 47 *; | [X]US2013164354 (SEU-SALERNO MARTINE [FR], et al) [X] 14 * example 1 * | by applicant | EP0945173 | DE102004004968 | - SCHUBERT, H., Handbuch der mechanischen Verfahrenstechnik, WILEY VCH, (2002), vol. 2, page 883 | - PERRY R. H.; GREEN D., Perry's Chemical Engineers' Handbook, MCGRAW-HILL BOOK CO., (1984), pages 20 - 57 | - MARSHALL W. R., "Atomization and Spray Drying", CHEM. ENG. PROG. MONOGR. SERIES, (1954), vol. 2, page 50 | - HORIBA Scientific, A Guidebook to Particle Size Analysis, (2014), page 6 |