EP3103437 - SKIN LIGHTENING COMPOSITIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.11.2018 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 17.11.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 31.08.2017 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.02.2017 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 11.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ELC Management LLC 767 Fifth Avenue New York, NY 10153 / US | [2016/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NIKI, Yoko. 1192-374 Shinzaike Hiraoka-Cho Kakogawa, Hyogo 675-0101 / JP | 02 /
YAROSH, Daniel B. 2915 Shore Drive Merrick, NY New York 11566 / US | 03 /
MATSUI, Mary S. 483 Standish Road Teaneck, NJ New Jersey 07666-2605 / US | 04 /
YOSHIDA, Masaki. Room 504, Superior Kuwana, Ichiban-Kan Fukujima 969-1 Kuwana, Mie 511-0002 / JP | 05 /
ICHIHASHI, Masamitsu. 19-8, 2-Chome Naruko Kita-ku Kobe, Hyogo 651-1133 / JP | [2016/50] | Representative(s) | Hirsch & Associés 154 Boulevard Haussmann 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2016/50] | Hirsch & Associés 137, rue de l'Université 75007 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 16175081.5 | 05.01.2011 | [2016/50] | Priority number, date | US20100292577P | 06.01.2010 Original published format: US 292577 P | [2016/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3103437 | Date: | 14.12.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3103437 | Date: | 20.12.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.10.2016 | Classification | IPC: | A61K8/49, A61Q19/02, A61Q19/00 | [2016/50] | CPC: |
A61K8/49 (EP,KR,US);
A61K8/4946 (US);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P17/16 (EP);
A61Q17/04 (US);
A61Q19/00 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/10] |
Former [2016/50] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN ZUR HAUTAUFHELLUNG | [2016/50] | English: | SKIN LIGHTENING COMPOSITIONS | [2016/50] | French: | COMPOSITIONS POUR ÉCLAIRCIR LA PEAU | [2016/50] | Examination procedure | 17.06.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 24.01.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.01.2017 | Examination requested [2017/10] | 01.09.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.11.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 09.11.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.11.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP11732094.5 / EP2521531 | Opposition(s) | 21.09.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 05.01.2011 | AL | 20.12.2017 | AT | 20.12.2017 | CY | 20.12.2017 | CZ | 20.12.2017 | DK | 20.12.2017 | EE | 20.12.2017 | FI | 20.12.2017 | HR | 20.12.2017 | LT | 20.12.2017 | LV | 20.12.2017 | MC | 20.12.2017 | MK | 20.12.2017 | NL | 20.12.2017 | PL | 20.12.2017 | PT | 20.12.2017 | RO | 20.12.2017 | RS | 20.12.2017 | SE | 20.12.2017 | SI | 20.12.2017 | SK | 20.12.2017 | SM | 20.12.2017 | TR | 20.12.2017 | IE | 05.01.2018 | LU | 05.01.2018 | MT | 05.01.2018 | BE | 31.01.2018 | CH | 31.01.2018 | LI | 31.01.2018 | BG | 20.03.2018 | NO | 20.03.2018 | GR | 21.03.2018 | IS | 20.04.2018 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 05.01.2011 | |
AT | 20.12.2017 | ||
CY | 20.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 20.12.2017 | ||
DK | 20.12.2017 | ||
EE | 20.12.2017 | ||
FI | 20.12.2017 | ||
HR | 20.12.2017 | ||
LT | 20.12.2017 | ||
LV | 20.12.2017 | ||
MC | 20.12.2017 | ||
MK | 20.12.2017 | ||
NL | 20.12.2017 | ||
PL | 20.12.2017 | ||
PT | 20.12.2017 | ||
RO | 20.12.2017 | ||
RS | 20.12.2017 | ||
SE | 20.12.2017 | ||
SI | 20.12.2017 | ||
SK | 20.12.2017 | ||
SM | 20.12.2017 | ||
TR | 20.12.2017 | ||
IE | 05.01.2018 | ||
LU | 05.01.2018 | ||
MT | 05.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
CH | 31.01.2018 | ||
LI | 31.01.2018 | ||
BG | 20.03.2018 | ||
NO | 20.03.2018 | ||
GR | 21.03.2018 | ||
IS | 20.04.2018 | ||
Former [2020/30] | HU | 05.01.2011 | |
AT | 20.12.2017 | ||
CY | 20.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 20.12.2017 | ||
DK | 20.12.2017 | ||
EE | 20.12.2017 | ||
FI | 20.12.2017 | ||
HR | 20.12.2017 | ||
LT | 20.12.2017 | ||
LV | 20.12.2017 | ||
MC | 20.12.2017 | ||
NL | 20.12.2017 | ||
PL | 20.12.2017 | ||
PT | 20.12.2017 | ||
RO | 20.12.2017 | ||
RS | 20.12.2017 | ||
SE | 20.12.2017 | ||
SI | 20.12.2017 | ||
SK | 20.12.2017 | ||
SM | 20.12.2017 | ||
TR | 20.12.2017 | ||
IE | 05.01.2018 | ||
LU | 05.01.2018 | ||
MT | 05.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
CH | 31.01.2018 | ||
LI | 31.01.2018 | ||
BG | 20.03.2018 | ||
NO | 20.03.2018 | ||
GR | 21.03.2018 | ||
IS | 20.04.2018 | ||
Former [2020/28] | AT | 20.12.2017 | |
CY | 20.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 20.12.2017 | ||
DK | 20.12.2017 | ||
EE | 20.12.2017 | ||
FI | 20.12.2017 | ||
HR | 20.12.2017 | ||
LT | 20.12.2017 | ||
LV | 20.12.2017 | ||
MC | 20.12.2017 | ||
NL | 20.12.2017 | ||
PL | 20.12.2017 | ||
PT | 20.12.2017 | ||
RO | 20.12.2017 | ||
RS | 20.12.2017 | ||
SE | 20.12.2017 | ||
SI | 20.12.2017 | ||
SK | 20.12.2017 | ||
SM | 20.12.2017 | ||
TR | 20.12.2017 | ||
IE | 05.01.2018 | ||
LU | 05.01.2018 | ||
MT | 05.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
CH | 31.01.2018 | ||
LI | 31.01.2018 | ||
BG | 20.03.2018 | ||
NO | 20.03.2018 | ||
GR | 21.03.2018 | ||
IS | 20.04.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AT | 20.12.2017 | |
CY | 20.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 20.12.2017 | ||
DK | 20.12.2017 | ||
EE | 20.12.2017 | ||
FI | 20.12.2017 | ||
HR | 20.12.2017 | ||
LT | 20.12.2017 | ||
LV | 20.12.2017 | ||
MC | 20.12.2017 | ||
NL | 20.12.2017 | ||
PL | 20.12.2017 | ||
RO | 20.12.2017 | ||
RS | 20.12.2017 | ||
SE | 20.12.2017 | ||
SI | 20.12.2017 | ||
SK | 20.12.2017 | ||
SM | 20.12.2017 | ||
TR | 20.12.2017 | ||
IE | 05.01.2018 | ||
LU | 05.01.2018 | ||
MT | 05.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
CH | 31.01.2018 | ||
LI | 31.01.2018 | ||
BG | 20.03.2018 | ||
NO | 20.03.2018 | ||
GR | 21.03.2018 | ||
IS | 20.04.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AT | 20.12.2017 | |
CY | 20.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 20.12.2017 | ||
DK | 20.12.2017 | ||
EE | 20.12.2017 | ||
FI | 20.12.2017 | ||
HR | 20.12.2017 | ||
LT | 20.12.2017 | ||
LV | 20.12.2017 | ||
MC | 20.12.2017 | ||
NL | 20.12.2017 | ||
PL | 20.12.2017 | ||
RO | 20.12.2017 | ||
RS | 20.12.2017 | ||
SE | 20.12.2017 | ||
SI | 20.12.2017 | ||
SK | 20.12.2017 | ||
SM | 20.12.2017 | ||
IE | 05.01.2018 | ||
LU | 05.01.2018 | ||
MT | 05.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
CH | 31.01.2018 | ||
LI | 31.01.2018 | ||
BG | 20.03.2018 | ||
NO | 20.03.2018 | ||
GR | 21.03.2018 | ||
IS | 20.04.2018 | ||
Former [2019/13] | AT | 20.12.2017 | |
CY | 20.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 20.12.2017 | ||
DK | 20.12.2017 | ||
EE | 20.12.2017 | ||
FI | 20.12.2017 | ||
HR | 20.12.2017 | ||
LT | 20.12.2017 | ||
LV | 20.12.2017 | ||
MC | 20.12.2017 | ||
NL | 20.12.2017 | ||
PL | 20.12.2017 | ||
RO | 20.12.2017 | ||
RS | 20.12.2017 | ||
SE | 20.12.2017 | ||
SI | 20.12.2017 | ||
SK | 20.12.2017 | ||
SM | 20.12.2017 | ||
IE | 05.01.2018 | ||
LU | 05.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
CH | 31.01.2018 | ||
LI | 31.01.2018 | ||
BG | 20.03.2018 | ||
NO | 20.03.2018 | ||
GR | 21.03.2018 | ||
IS | 20.04.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | AT | 20.12.2017 | |
CY | 20.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 20.12.2017 | ||
DK | 20.12.2017 | ||
EE | 20.12.2017 | ||
FI | 20.12.2017 | ||
HR | 20.12.2017 | ||
LT | 20.12.2017 | ||
LV | 20.12.2017 | ||
MC | 20.12.2017 | ||
NL | 20.12.2017 | ||
PL | 20.12.2017 | ||
RO | 20.12.2017 | ||
RS | 20.12.2017 | ||
SE | 20.12.2017 | ||
SK | 20.12.2017 | ||
SM | 20.12.2017 | ||
IE | 05.01.2018 | ||
LU | 05.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
CH | 31.01.2018 | ||
LI | 31.01.2018 | ||
BG | 20.03.2018 | ||
NO | 20.03.2018 | ||
GR | 21.03.2018 | ||
IS | 20.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | AT | 20.12.2017 | |
CY | 20.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 20.12.2017 | ||
DK | 20.12.2017 | ||
EE | 20.12.2017 | ||
FI | 20.12.2017 | ||
HR | 20.12.2017 | ||
LT | 20.12.2017 | ||
LV | 20.12.2017 | ||
MC | 20.12.2017 | ||
NL | 20.12.2017 | ||
PL | 20.12.2017 | ||
RO | 20.12.2017 | ||
RS | 20.12.2017 | ||
SE | 20.12.2017 | ||
SK | 20.12.2017 | ||
SM | 20.12.2017 | ||
LU | 05.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
CH | 31.01.2018 | ||
LI | 31.01.2018 | ||
BG | 20.03.2018 | ||
NO | 20.03.2018 | ||
GR | 21.03.2018 | ||
IS | 20.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | AT | 20.12.2017 | |
CY | 20.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 20.12.2017 | ||
EE | 20.12.2017 | ||
FI | 20.12.2017 | ||
HR | 20.12.2017 | ||
LT | 20.12.2017 | ||
LV | 20.12.2017 | ||
MC | 20.12.2017 | ||
NL | 20.12.2017 | ||
PL | 20.12.2017 | ||
RO | 20.12.2017 | ||
RS | 20.12.2017 | ||
SE | 20.12.2017 | ||
SK | 20.12.2017 | ||
SM | 20.12.2017 | ||
LU | 05.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
BG | 20.03.2018 | ||
NO | 20.03.2018 | ||
GR | 21.03.2018 | ||
IS | 20.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | AT | 20.12.2017 | |
CY | 20.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 20.12.2017 | ||
EE | 20.12.2017 | ||
FI | 20.12.2017 | ||
HR | 20.12.2017 | ||
LT | 20.12.2017 | ||
LV | 20.12.2017 | ||
MC | 20.12.2017 | ||
NL | 20.12.2017 | ||
PL | 20.12.2017 | ||
RO | 20.12.2017 | ||
RS | 20.12.2017 | ||
SE | 20.12.2017 | ||
SK | 20.12.2017 | ||
SM | 20.12.2017 | ||
LU | 05.01.2018 | ||
BG | 20.03.2018 | ||
NO | 20.03.2018 | ||
GR | 21.03.2018 | ||
IS | 20.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/44] | AT | 20.12.2017 | |
CY | 20.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 20.12.2017 | ||
EE | 20.12.2017 | ||
FI | 20.12.2017 | ||
HR | 20.12.2017 | ||
LT | 20.12.2017 | ||
LV | 20.12.2017 | ||
MC | 20.12.2017 | ||
NL | 20.12.2017 | ||
PL | 20.12.2017 | ||
RO | 20.12.2017 | ||
RS | 20.12.2017 | ||
SE | 20.12.2017 | ||
SK | 20.12.2017 | ||
SM | 20.12.2017 | ||
BG | 20.03.2018 | ||
NO | 20.03.2018 | ||
GR | 21.03.2018 | ||
IS | 20.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | AT | 20.12.2017 | |
CY | 20.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 20.12.2017 | ||
EE | 20.12.2017 | ||
FI | 20.12.2017 | ||
HR | 20.12.2017 | ||
LT | 20.12.2017 | ||
LV | 20.12.2017 | ||
NL | 20.12.2017 | ||
PL | 20.12.2017 | ||
RO | 20.12.2017 | ||
RS | 20.12.2017 | ||
SE | 20.12.2017 | ||
SK | 20.12.2017 | ||
SM | 20.12.2017 | ||
BG | 20.03.2018 | ||
NO | 20.03.2018 | ||
GR | 21.03.2018 | ||
IS | 20.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/38] | AT | 20.12.2017 | |
CY | 20.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 20.12.2017 | ||
EE | 20.12.2017 | ||
FI | 20.12.2017 | ||
HR | 20.12.2017 | ||
LT | 20.12.2017 | ||
LV | 20.12.2017 | ||
NL | 20.12.2017 | ||
PL | 20.12.2017 | ||
RS | 20.12.2017 | ||
SE | 20.12.2017 | ||
SK | 20.12.2017 | ||
SM | 20.12.2017 | ||
BG | 20.03.2018 | ||
NO | 20.03.2018 | ||
GR | 21.03.2018 | ||
IS | 20.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | CY | 20.12.2017 | |
CZ | 20.12.2017 | ||
EE | 20.12.2017 | ||
FI | 20.12.2017 | ||
HR | 20.12.2017 | ||
LT | 20.12.2017 | ||
LV | 20.12.2017 | ||
NL | 20.12.2017 | ||
PL | 20.12.2017 | ||
RS | 20.12.2017 | ||
SE | 20.12.2017 | ||
SK | 20.12.2017 | ||
SM | 20.12.2017 | ||
BG | 20.03.2018 | ||
NO | 20.03.2018 | ||
GR | 21.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/34] | FI | 20.12.2017 | |
HR | 20.12.2017 | ||
LT | 20.12.2017 | ||
LV | 20.12.2017 | ||
NL | 20.12.2017 | ||
RS | 20.12.2017 | ||
SE | 20.12.2017 | ||
BG | 20.03.2018 | ||
NO | 20.03.2018 | ||
GR | 21.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/24] | FI | 20.12.2017 | |
HR | 20.12.2017 | ||
LT | 20.12.2017 | ||
LV | 20.12.2017 | ||
RS | 20.12.2017 | ||
SE | 20.12.2017 | ||
BG | 20.03.2018 | ||
NO | 20.03.2018 | ||
GR | 21.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/23] | FI | 20.12.2017 | |
HR | 20.12.2017 | ||
LT | 20.12.2017 | ||
RS | 20.12.2017 | ||
SE | 20.12.2017 | ||
NO | 20.03.2018 | ||
GR | 21.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/22] | FI | 20.12.2017 | |
LT | 20.12.2017 | ||
NO | 20.03.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO2004080430 (3M INNOVATIVE PROPERTIES CO [US]) [Y] 1-6 * claims 1-11 * * page 5, line 12 - page 7, line 7 * * page 9, line 8 - page 10, line 8 *; | [Y]EP1657242 (BANYU PHARMA CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 1-6 * paragraph [0298]; claim 18 *; | [A]EP0068378 (SCHERING CORP [US]) [A] 1-6 * the whole document *; | [A]WO9815276 (THERASYS INC [US], et al) [A] 1-6 * claims 1-12 * | [A] - SCOTT C K ET AL, "Inhibition of H<+>K<+> ATPase by SCH 28080 and SCH 32651", EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF PHARMACOLOGY, ELSEVIER SCIENCE, NL, vol. 112, no. 2, doi:10.1016/0014-2999(85)90508-4, ISSN 0014-2999, (19850607), pages 268 - 270, (19850607), XP025547300 [A] 1-6 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0014-2999(85)90508-4 | by applicant | US4677152 | US4702844 | US3439088 | US3818105 | US5118496 | US5183589 | US4803067 | US5183588 | US4970252 | US5760116 | US5654362 | JPS6118708 | US5236986 | US5412004 | US5837793 | US5811487 | WO2004024798 | US5843193 | US3215724 | US3781417 | US5077211 | US5190762 | US5272079 | US5296231 | - OLBE, L.; CARLSSON E.; LINDBERG P., "A Proton-Pump Inhibitor Expedition: The Case Histories of Omeprazole and Esomeprazole", NATURE REVIEWS DRUG DISCOVERY, (2003), vol. 2, pages 132 - 9 | - BRILLIANT, M.; GARDNER, J., "Melanosomal pH, Pink Locus Protein and their Roles in Melanogenesis", J. OF INVEST. DERMATOL., (2001), vol. 117, no. 2 | - MOELLMANN, G.; SLOMINSKI, A.; KUKLINSKA, E.; LERNER A. B., "Regulation of Melanogensis in Melanocytes", PIGMENT CELL RES., (1988), vol. 1, pages 79 - 87 | - BHATNAGAR, V.; ANJAIAH, S. PURI; N, ARUDHRA; DARSHANAM, B. N.; RAMAIA, A., "pH of Melanosomes of B16 Murine Melanoma is Acidic: Its Physiological Importance in the Regulation of Melanin Biosynthesis", ARCH. BIOCHEM. BIOPHYS., (1993), vol. 307, doi:doi:10.1006/abbi.1993.1577, pages 183 - 192, XP024753524 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/abbi.1993.1577 | - RAMAIAH, A., "Lag Kinetics of Tyrosinase: Its Physiologic Implications", INDIAN J. BIOCHEM. AND BIOPHYS, (1996), vol. 33, pages 349 - 356 | - VAN DYKE, R.W., "Acidification of Lysosomes and Endosomes", SUB-CELLULAR BIOCHEM., (1996), vol. 27, pages 331 - 360 | - GRABE, M.; OSTER, G., "Regulation of Organelle Acidity", J. GENERAL PHYSIOL., (2001), vol. 117, pages 329 - 344 | - DEVI, C.C.; TRIPATHI R. K.; RAMAIA, A, "pH-dependent Interconvertible Allosteric Forms of Murine Melanoma Tyrosinase: Physiological Implications", EUR. J. BIOCHEM., (1987), vol. 166, pages 705 - 711 | - GUNATHILIAKE R.; SCHURER N.; SHOO B.; CELLI, A.; HACHEM J. P; CURMRINE D.; SIRIMANNA, G.; FEINGOLD K.; MAURO T.; ELIAS P., "pH-regulated Mechanism Accounts for Pigment-Type Differences in Epidermal Barrier Function", J. INVEST. DERMATOL,, (2009), vol. 129, pages 1719 - 1729 | - HEARING, V. J.; EKEL, T. M., "Mammalian Tyrosinase. A Comparison of Tyrosine Hydroxylation and Melanin Formation", J. BIOCHEM., (1976), vol. 157, pages 549 - 557 | - SAEKI, H.; OIKAWA, A., "Stimulation of Ionophores of Tyrosinase Activity of Mouse Melanoma Cells in Culture", J. INVESTIG. DERMATOL., (1985), vol. 85, pages 423 - 425 | - TOWNSEND, D.; GUILLERY, P.; KING. R. A., "Optimized Assay for Mammalian Tyrosinase (Polyphenol Phenyloxidase", ANAL. BIOCHEM., (1984), vol. 139, doi:doi:10.1016/0003-2697(84)90015-0, pages 345 - 352, XP024824306 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0003-2697(84)90015-0 | - ANCANS, J, D.; TOBIN, J.; HOOGDUJIN, J. J.; SMIT, N. P.; WAKAMATSU, K.; THODY, A. J., "Melanosomal pH Controls Rate of Melanogenesis, Eumelanin/Phaeomelanin Ratio and Melanosome Maturation in Melanocytes and Melanoma Cells", EXPERIMENTAL CELL RESEARCH, (2001), vol. 268, doi:doi:10.1006/excr.2001.5251, pages 26 - 35, XP055095348 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/excr.2001.5251 | - SMITH ET AL., "The Relationship Between Na+/H+ Exchanger Expression and Tyrosinase Activity in Human Melanocytes", EXPTL. CELL RES., (2004), vol. 298, doi:doi:10.1016/j.yexcr.2004.04.033, pages 521 - 534, XP009145771 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.yexcr.2004.04.033 | - PURI, N.; GARDNER, J. M.; BRILLIANT, M.H., "Aberrant pH of Melanosomes in Pink-eyed Dilution (p) Mutant Melanocytes", SOC. INVEST. DERMATOL., (2000), vol. 115, doi:doi:10.1046/j.1523-1747.2000.00108.x, pages 607 - 613, XP002438616 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1046/j.1523-1747.2000.00108.x | - ANCANS, J.; HOODUIJN, J.; THODY, A. J., "Melanosomal pH, Pink Locus Protein and their Roles in Melanogenesis", J. INVEST. DERMATOL., (2001), vol. 117, no. 1, pages 158 - 159 | - HALABAN, R.; PATTON, R. S.; CHENG, E.; SVEDINE, S.; TROMBETTA, E. S.; WAHL, M. L.; ARUJAN, S.; HEBERT, D. N., "Abnormal Acidification of Melanoma Cells Induces Tyrosinase Retention in the Early Secretory Pathways", J. BIOL. CHEM., (2002), vol. 277, no. 17, doi:doi:10.1074/jbc.M111497200, pages 14821 - 14828, XP002441622 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.M111497200 | - CHANG, H.; SACCOMANI G.; RABON, E.; SCHACKMANN R.; SACHS, G., "Proton Transport by Gastric Membrane Vesicles", BIOCHIM ET BIOPHYSICA ACTA, (1977), vol. 464, no. 2, doi:doi:10.1016/0005-2736(77)90006-2, pages 313 - 327, XP023351494 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0005-2736(77)90006-2 | - SACHS G.; WALLMARK, B., "The Gastric H+K+ ATPase: The Site of Action of Omeprazole", SCAND. J. OF GASTROENTEROL, (1989), vol. 24, no. S166, pages 3 - 11 | - ROBINSON, M.; HOME, J., "Clinical Pharmacology of Proton Pump Inhibitors: What the Practicing Physician Needs to Know", DRUGS, (2003), vol. 63, pages 2739 - 2754 | - ROCHE, V. F., "The Chemically Elegant Proton Pump Inhibitors", AMER. J. PHAR. EDUC, (2006), vol. 70, no. 5 | - QAISI, A. M.; TUTUNJI, J. F.; TUTUNJI, L. F., "Acid Decomposition of Omeprazole in the Absence of Thiol: a Differential Pulse Polarographic Study at the Static Mercury Drop Electrode (SMDE", J. PHARM. SCI., (2006), vol. 95, no. 2, pages 384 - 391 | - BESANCON, M.; SHIN, J. M.; MERCIER, F.; MUNSON, K.; MILLER, M.; HERSEY, S.; SACHS, G., "Membrane Topology and Omeprazole Labelling of the Gastric H+, K(+) Adenosinetriphosphatase", BIOCHEM, (1993), vol. 32, no. 9, pages 2345 - 2355 | - BESANCON, M.; SIMON, A.; SACHS, G.; SHIN, J. M., "Sites of Reaction of the Gastric H, K-ATPase with Extracytoplasmic Thiol Reagents", J. OF BIOL. CHEM., (1997), vol. 272, doi:doi:10.1074/jbc.272.36.22438, pages 22438 - 446, XP003013211 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.272.36.22438 | - CHELI, Y.; LUCIANI, F.; KHALED, M.; BEURET, L.; BILLIE, K.; GOUNON, PI; ORTONNE, J. P; BERTOLOTTO, C.; BALLOTTI, R., "Alpha-MSH and cyclic-AMP elevating agents control melanosome pH through a PKA-independent mechanism", J. BIOL. CHEM., (2009), vol. 284, pages 18699 - 18706 | - WALLMARK B.; C. BRIVING; J. FRYKLUND; K. MUNSON; R. JACKSON; J. MENDLEIN; E. RABON; G. SACHS, "Inhibition of Gastric H+,K+-ATPase and Acid Secretion by SCH28080, a Substituted Pyridyl 1(1,2 a)imidazole", J. BIOL. CHEM., (1987), vol. 262, pages 2077 - 2084 | - BEIL; HATCHBARTH, I; SEWING, K. F. ET AL., "Mechanism of Gastric Antisecretory Effect of SCH 28080", BR. J. PHARMAC, (1986), vol. 88, pages 19 - 23 | - ASANO S.; S. MATSUDA; Y. TEGA; K. SHIMIZU; S. SAKAMOTO; N. TAKEGUCHI, "Mutational Analysis of Putative SCH28080 Binding Sites of the Gastric H+,K+- ATPase", J. BIOL. CHEM., (1997), vol. 272, pages 17668 - 17674 | - CTFA Cosmetic Ingredient Handbook, vol. 2, pages 1646 - 1660 | - FITZPATRICK, T.B., "Ultraviolet-induced Pigmentary Changes: benefits and hazards", CURR. PROBL. DERMATOL., (1986), vol. 15, pages 25 - 38 |