EP3115045 - DETECTION AND USE OF LOW MOLECULAR WEIGHT MODULATORS OF THE COLD MENTHOL RECEPTOR TRPM8 [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.06.2021 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 10.07.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 05.03.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.02.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.10.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.07.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.09.2017 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 09.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK, PT | published on 17.08.2022 [2022/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF SE Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67056 Ludwigshafen am Rhein / DE | [2020/33] |
Former [2017/02] | For all designated states BASF SE Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67056 Ludwigshafen am Rhein / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SUBKOWSKI, Thomas Wichernstr. 13 68526 Ladenburg / DE | 02 /
BOLLSCHWEILER, Claus Karl-Christ-Str. 13 69118 Heidelberg / DE | 03 /
WITTENBERG, Jens Mainstr. 6 67117 Limburgerhof / DE | 04 /
KROHN, Michael Alexanderstr. 8 64653 Lorsch / DE | 05 /
ZINKE, Holger Darmstädter Str. 36 64673 Zwingenberg / DE | [2017/02] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2020/33] |
Former [2017/02] | Reitstötter Kinzebach Patentanwälte Sternwartstrasse 4 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 16175305.8 | 26.08.2009 | [2017/02] | Priority number, date | EP20080162997 | 26.08.2008 Original published format: EP 08162997 | [2017/02] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3115045 | Date: | 11.01.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/02] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP3115045 | Date: | 17.05.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3115045 | Date: | 12.08.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.04.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/135, A61K31/155, A61K31/357, A61K31/381, A61K31/4164, A61K31/443, A61K31/445, A61K31/4743, A61K31/496, A61K31/506, A61P13/02, A61P35/00, A61P29/00, A61G9/00, A61K6/00, A61K8/00, A61Q11/02, A61Q17/02, A23G9/00 | [2017/02] | CPC: |
C07D495/22 (EP,US);
A61K31/451 (CN);
A23C13/125 (CN);
A23G9/32 (CN);
A23L2/52 (CN);
A23L27/88 (EP,US);
A23L29/035 (CN);
A23L29/045 (CN);
A23L29/055 (CN);
A61K31/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/137 (CN);
A61K31/165 (CN);
A61K31/17 (CN);
A61K31/381 (CN);
A61K31/403 (CN);
A61K31/4174 (CN);
A61K31/4439 (CN);
A61K31/445 (CN);
A61K31/495 (CN);
A61K31/498 (CN);
A61K8/42 (EP,CN,US);
A61K8/49 (EP,CN,US);
A61K8/4926 (EP,CN,US);
A61K8/494 (CN);
A61K8/4946 (EP,CN,US);
A61K8/4953 (EP,US);
A61K8/4973 (EP,CN,US);
A61K8/4986 (CN);
A61K8/69 (EP,CN,US);
A61P13/02 (EP);
A61P13/08 (EP);
A61P13/10 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/04 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P33/00 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61Q11/00 (EP,CN,US);
A61Q17/02 (EP,US);
A61Q17/04 (EP,US);
A61Q19/00 (CN);
A61Q19/004 (EP,US);
A61Q5/02 (EP,US);
A61Q5/12 (CN);
C07C275/28 (US);
C07D211/14 (EP,US);
C07D233/84 (EP,US);
C07D241/44 (EP,US);
C07D317/64 (EP,US);
C07D401/04 (EP,US);
C07D401/12 (EP,US);
C07D409/12 (EP,US);
C07D495/20 (EP,US);
C08K5/20 (CN);
C08K5/3432 (CN);
C08K5/3462 (CN);
C08K5/45 (CN);
D06M13/355 (CN);
D06M13/402 (CN);
D06M13/408 (CN);
D06M13/418 (CN);
D06M13/432 (CN);
D21H17/07 (CN);
D21H17/09 (CN);
A61K2800/244 (EP,CN,US);
A61K2800/78 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/44] |
Former [2017/02] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | NACHWEIS UND VERWENDUNG NIEDERMOLEKULARER MODULATOREN DES KÄLTE-MENTHOL-REZEPTORS TRPM8 | [2017/02] | English: | DETECTION AND USE OF LOW MOLECULAR WEIGHT MODULATORS OF THE COLD MENTHOL RECEPTOR TRPM8 | [2017/02] | French: | VERIFICATION ET UTILISATION DE MODULATEURS SOUS-MOLECULAIRES DU RECEPTEUR DE FROID ET DE MENTHOL TRPM8 | [2017/02] | Examination procedure | 20.06.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 26.09.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.09.2017 | Examination requested [2017/44] | 19.07.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.12.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.10.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.02.2020 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 06.03.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.07.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 01.07.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 01.07.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP09782234.0 / EP2349239 | Divisional application(s) | EP19214768.4 / EP3698779 | Opposition(s) | 14.05.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 20.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 02.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 26.08.2009 | CY | 12.08.2020 | CZ | 12.08.2020 | DK | 12.08.2020 | EE | 12.08.2020 | FI | 12.08.2020 | HR | 12.08.2020 | IT | 12.08.2020 | LT | 12.08.2020 | LV | 12.08.2020 | MC | 12.08.2020 | MK | 12.08.2020 | MT | 12.08.2020 | PL | 12.08.2020 | PT | 12.08.2020 | RO | 12.08.2020 | SE | 12.08.2020 | SI | 12.08.2020 | SK | 12.08.2020 | SM | 12.08.2020 | TR | 12.08.2020 | AT | 26.08.2020 | IE | 26.08.2020 | LU | 26.08.2020 | BE | 31.08.2020 | BG | 12.11.2020 | NO | 12.11.2020 | GR | 13.11.2020 | IS | 12.12.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 26.08.2009 | |
CY | 12.08.2020 | ||
CZ | 12.08.2020 | ||
DK | 12.08.2020 | ||
EE | 12.08.2020 | ||
FI | 12.08.2020 | ||
HR | 12.08.2020 | ||
IT | 12.08.2020 | ||
LT | 12.08.2020 | ||
LV | 12.08.2020 | ||
MC | 12.08.2020 | ||
MT | 12.08.2020 | ||
PL | 12.08.2020 | ||
RO | 12.08.2020 | ||
SE | 12.08.2020 | ||
SI | 12.08.2020 | ||
SK | 12.08.2020 | ||
SM | 12.08.2020 | ||
TR | 12.08.2020 | ||
AT | 26.08.2020 | ||
IE | 26.08.2020 | ||
LU | 26.08.2020 | ||
BE | 31.08.2020 | ||
BG | 12.11.2020 | ||
NO | 12.11.2020 | ||
GR | 13.11.2020 | ||
IS | 12.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/47] | CZ | 12.08.2020 | |
DK | 12.08.2020 | ||
EE | 12.08.2020 | ||
FI | 12.08.2020 | ||
HR | 12.08.2020 | ||
IT | 12.08.2020 | ||
LT | 12.08.2020 | ||
LV | 12.08.2020 | ||
MC | 12.08.2020 | ||
PL | 12.08.2020 | ||
RO | 12.08.2020 | ||
SE | 12.08.2020 | ||
SI | 12.08.2020 | ||
SK | 12.08.2020 | ||
SM | 12.08.2020 | ||
AT | 26.08.2020 | ||
IE | 26.08.2020 | ||
LU | 26.08.2020 | ||
BE | 31.08.2020 | ||
BG | 12.11.2020 | ||
NO | 12.11.2020 | ||
GR | 13.11.2020 | ||
IS | 12.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/37] | CZ | 12.08.2020 | |
DK | 12.08.2020 | ||
EE | 12.08.2020 | ||
FI | 12.08.2020 | ||
HR | 12.08.2020 | ||
IT | 12.08.2020 | ||
LT | 12.08.2020 | ||
LV | 12.08.2020 | ||
MC | 12.08.2020 | ||
PL | 12.08.2020 | ||
RO | 12.08.2020 | ||
SE | 12.08.2020 | ||
SI | 12.08.2020 | ||
SK | 12.08.2020 | ||
SM | 12.08.2020 | ||
IE | 26.08.2020 | ||
LU | 26.08.2020 | ||
BE | 31.08.2020 | ||
BG | 12.11.2020 | ||
NO | 12.11.2020 | ||
GR | 13.11.2020 | ||
IS | 12.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/36] | CZ | 12.08.2020 | |
DK | 12.08.2020 | ||
EE | 12.08.2020 | ||
FI | 12.08.2020 | ||
HR | 12.08.2020 | ||
IT | 12.08.2020 | ||
LT | 12.08.2020 | ||
LV | 12.08.2020 | ||
MC | 12.08.2020 | ||
PL | 12.08.2020 | ||
RO | 12.08.2020 | ||
SE | 12.08.2020 | ||
SI | 12.08.2020 | ||
SK | 12.08.2020 | ||
SM | 12.08.2020 | ||
LU | 26.08.2020 | ||
BE | 31.08.2020 | ||
BG | 12.11.2020 | ||
NO | 12.11.2020 | ||
GR | 13.11.2020 | ||
IS | 12.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/34] | CZ | 12.08.2020 | |
DK | 12.08.2020 | ||
EE | 12.08.2020 | ||
FI | 12.08.2020 | ||
HR | 12.08.2020 | ||
IT | 12.08.2020 | ||
LT | 12.08.2020 | ||
LV | 12.08.2020 | ||
MC | 12.08.2020 | ||
PL | 12.08.2020 | ||
RO | 12.08.2020 | ||
SE | 12.08.2020 | ||
SK | 12.08.2020 | ||
SM | 12.08.2020 | ||
LU | 26.08.2020 | ||
BG | 12.11.2020 | ||
NO | 12.11.2020 | ||
GR | 13.11.2020 | ||
IS | 12.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/28] | CZ | 12.08.2020 | |
DK | 12.08.2020 | ||
EE | 12.08.2020 | ||
FI | 12.08.2020 | ||
HR | 12.08.2020 | ||
LT | 12.08.2020 | ||
LV | 12.08.2020 | ||
MC | 12.08.2020 | ||
PL | 12.08.2020 | ||
RO | 12.08.2020 | ||
SE | 12.08.2020 | ||
SK | 12.08.2020 | ||
SM | 12.08.2020 | ||
LU | 26.08.2020 | ||
BG | 12.11.2020 | ||
NO | 12.11.2020 | ||
GR | 13.11.2020 | ||
IS | 12.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/27] | CZ | 12.08.2020 | |
DK | 12.08.2020 | ||
EE | 12.08.2020 | ||
FI | 12.08.2020 | ||
HR | 12.08.2020 | ||
LT | 12.08.2020 | ||
LV | 12.08.2020 | ||
MC | 12.08.2020 | ||
PL | 12.08.2020 | ||
RO | 12.08.2020 | ||
SE | 12.08.2020 | ||
SM | 12.08.2020 | ||
LU | 26.08.2020 | ||
BG | 12.11.2020 | ||
NO | 12.11.2020 | ||
GR | 13.11.2020 | ||
IS | 12.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/22] | CZ | 12.08.2020 | |
DK | 12.08.2020 | ||
EE | 12.08.2020 | ||
FI | 12.08.2020 | ||
HR | 12.08.2020 | ||
LT | 12.08.2020 | ||
LV | 12.08.2020 | ||
PL | 12.08.2020 | ||
RO | 12.08.2020 | ||
SE | 12.08.2020 | ||
SM | 12.08.2020 | ||
LU | 26.08.2020 | ||
BG | 12.11.2020 | ||
NO | 12.11.2020 | ||
GR | 13.11.2020 | ||
IS | 12.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | DK | 12.08.2020 | |
FI | 12.08.2020 | ||
HR | 12.08.2020 | ||
LT | 12.08.2020 | ||
LV | 12.08.2020 | ||
PL | 12.08.2020 | ||
SE | 12.08.2020 | ||
LU | 26.08.2020 | ||
BG | 12.11.2020 | ||
NO | 12.11.2020 | ||
GR | 13.11.2020 | ||
IS | 12.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | FI | 12.08.2020 | |
HR | 12.08.2020 | ||
LT | 12.08.2020 | ||
LV | 12.08.2020 | ||
PL | 12.08.2020 | ||
SE | 12.08.2020 | ||
BG | 12.11.2020 | ||
NO | 12.11.2020 | ||
GR | 13.11.2020 | ||
IS | 12.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | FI | 12.08.2020 | |
LT | 12.08.2020 | ||
SE | 12.08.2020 | ||
BG | 12.11.2020 | ||
NO | 12.11.2020 | ||
GR | 13.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | FI | 12.08.2020 | |
LT | 12.08.2020 | ||
SE | 12.08.2020 | ||
BG | 12.11.2020 | ||
NO | 12.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/07] | FI | 12.08.2020 | |
LT | 12.08.2020 | ||
NO | 12.11.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9858905 (YAMANOUCHI PHARMA CO LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1-12 * claim - *; | [A]JP2000302760 (HOKURIKU PHARMACEUTICAL) [A] 1-12 * abstract * * paragraph [0031] *; | [A]DE10234876 (BAYER CROPSCIENCE GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-12 * tables 4,5 *; | [AD]WO2004026840 (UNILEVER PLC [GB], et al) [AD] 1-12 * page 7, line 24 - line 25 * * compound - *; | [A]US2005084447 (WEI EDWARD T [US]) [A] 1-12 * page 2, column 2 *; | [A]US2005203159 (ZELLE ROBERT [US], et al) [A] 1-12 * claim - *; | [A]WO2005099711 (ICAGEN INC [US], et al) [A] 1-12 * table 1 *; | [A]US2005250836 (BOOTH RICHARD J [US], et al) [A] 1-12 * example 114 *; | [A]WO2006097337 (BIONETWORKS GMBH [DE], et al) [A] 1-12* compound 7 *; | [A]WO2007017093 (BAYER HEALTHCARE AG [DE], et al) [A] 1-12 * example - * * page 1 *; | [A]WO2007080109 (BAYER HEALTHCARE AG [DE], et al) [A] 1-12 * claim - *; | [A]WO2008015403 (UNIV EDINBURGH [GB], et al) [A] 1-12 * page 6, paragraph 1 *; | [AP]WO2009064388 (LIU JUN O [US], et al) [AP] 1-12 * figure 1; compound 36 *; | [IA] - INGALE SANJAY J ET AL, "Synthesis and biological evaluation of some 4-substituted quinoxalinones", ASIAN JOURNAL OF CHEMISTRY, CHEMIC PUBLISHING, SAHIBADAD, IN, (20071031), vol. 19, no. 5, ISSN 0970-7077, pages 3797 - 3802, XP009193906 [I] 5,8-12 * tables 4,5 * [A] 1-4,6,7 | [A] - DEMIRAYAK SEREF ET AL, "SYNTHESIS AND ANALGESIC ACTIVITIES OF SOME 2-(BENZAZOLYLACETYL)AMINO-3-ETHOXYCARBONYLTHIOPHENE DERIVATIVES", PHOSPHORUS, SULFUR AND SILICON AND THE RELATED ELEMENTS, TAYLOR & FRANCIS INC, US, (20050101), vol. 180, doi:10.1080/104265090889503, ISSN 1042-6507, pages 1841 - 1848, XP009072026 [A] 1-12 * table 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1080/104265090889503 | [A] - PATCH R J ET AL, "Identification of 2-acylaminothiophene-3-carboxamides as potent inhibitors of FLT3", BIOORGANIC & MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY LETTERS, PERGAMON, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 16, no. 12, ISSN 0960-894X, (20060615), pages 3282 - 3286, (20060615), XP027965597 [A] 1-12 * table 2 * | [XA] - COOKE A ET AL, "Water-soluble propofol analogues with intravenous anaesthetic activity", BIOORGANIC & MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY LETTERS, PERGAMON, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20010409), vol. 11, no. 7, doi:10.1016/S0960-894X(01)00088-9, ISSN 0960-894X, pages 927 - 930, XP004232526 [X] 5,8-12 * compound 3 * [A] 1-4,6,7 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0960-894X(01)00088-9 | by applicant | WO0215692 | US2003207904 | WO2004000023 | US2004028714 | WO2004026840 | US6893626 | WO2007019719 | - PEIER AM ET AL., "A TRP channel that senses cold stimuli and menthol", CELL, (20020308), vol. 108, no. 5, doi:doi:10.1016/S0092-8674(02)00652-9, pages 705 - 15, XP002246274 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0092-8674(02)00652-9 | - MCKEMY DD ET AL., "Identification of a cold receptor reveals a general role for TRP channels in thermosensation", NATURE, (20020307), vol. 416, no. 6876, doi:doi:10.1038/nature719, pages 52 - 8, XP002250383 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nature719 | - ZUKER CS, "Neurobiology: a cool ion channel", NATURE, (20020307), vol. 416, no. 6876, pages 27 - 8 | - MCKEMY D.D., MOLECULAR PAIN, (2005), vol. 1, page 16 | - MCKEMY D.D., NATURE, (2002), vol. 416, pages 52 - 58 | - PEIER A.M., CELL, (2002), vol. 108, pages 705 - 715 | - DHAKA A., ANNU. REV. NEUROSCI., (2006), vol. 29, pages 135 - 161 | - WATSON H.R., J. SOC. COSMET. CHEM., (1978), vol. 29, pages 185 - 200 | - FURRER S.M., CHEM. PERCEPT., (2008), vol. 1, pages 119 - 126 | - WEI E.T., J. PHARM. PHARMACOL., (1983), vol. 35, pages 110 - 112 | - BECK B., CELL CALCIUM, (2007), vol. 41, pages 285 - 294 | - LEVINE J.D., BIOCHIM. BIOPHYS. ACTA, MOL. BASIS DIS., (2007), vol. 1772, pages 989 - 1003 | - MUKERJI G., BMC UROLOGY, (2006), vol. 6, page 6 | - BEHRENDT H.J. ET AL., BR. J. PHARMACOL., (2004), vol. 141, pages 737 - 745 |