EP3101274 - WIND ENERGY SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.06.2019 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 29.06.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 05.03.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.03.2017 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 04.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, HU, MK | published on 05.08.2020 [2020/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states innogy SE Opernplatz 1 45128 Essen / DE | [2018/29] |
Former [2016/49] | For all designated states RWE Innogy GmbH Gildehof 1 45127 Essen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KOCH, Dr. Friedrich Am Alten Wasserwerk 3a 47623 Kevelaer / DE | 02 /
SCHIERENBECK, Olaf Wilde Heide 10 21220 Seevetal / DE | 03 /
SCHÖPPENTHAU, Kai Alter Postweg 119b 21220 Seevetal / DE | [2016/49] | Representative(s) | Cohausz & Florack Patent- & Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Bleichstraße 14 40211 Düsseldorf / DE | [2016/49] | Application number, filing date | 16176669.6 | 29.11.2012 | [2016/49] | Priority number, date | DE20121004225 | 06.03.2012 Original published format: DE102012004225 | [2016/49] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3101274 | Date: | 07.12.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3101274 | Date: | 01.08.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.10.2016 | Classification | IPC: | F03D7/02, F03D7/04, F03D80/00, F03D9/00, H02J3/38, F03D17/00 | [2016/49] | CPC: |
F03D7/0284 (EP,US);
F03D17/00 (EP);
F03D7/048 (EP);
F03D9/255 (EP);
H02J3/0012 (EP,US);
H02J3/381 (EP,US);
H02J3/46 (EP,US);
F05B2240/95 (EP);
F05B2260/80 (EP);
F05B2260/84 (EP);
H02J2300/28 (EP,US);
Y02E10/72 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/17] |
Former [2016/49] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | WINDENERGIESYSTEM | [2016/49] | English: | WIND ENERGY SYSTEM | [2016/49] | French: | SYSTEME D'EOLIENNE | [2016/49] | Examination procedure | 28.06.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 21.03.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.03.2017 | Examination requested [2017/17] | 06.03.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.06.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 12.06.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.06.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP12194731.1 / EP2636894 | Opposition(s) | 03.05.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 29.11.2012 | AL | 01.08.2018 | CY | 01.08.2018 | CZ | 01.08.2018 | EE | 01.08.2018 | ES | 01.08.2018 | FI | 01.08.2018 | HR | 01.08.2018 | IT | 01.08.2018 | LT | 01.08.2018 | LV | 01.08.2018 | MC | 01.08.2018 | MK | 01.08.2018 | MT | 01.08.2018 | PT | 01.08.2018 | RO | 01.08.2018 | RS | 01.08.2018 | SE | 01.08.2018 | SI | 01.08.2018 | SK | 01.08.2018 | SM | 01.08.2018 | TR | 01.08.2018 | BG | 01.11.2018 | GR | 02.11.2018 | AT | 29.11.2018 | LU | 29.11.2018 | CH | 30.11.2018 | LI | 30.11.2018 | IS | 01.12.2018 | [2020/31] |
Former [2020/28] | AL | 01.08.2018 | |
CZ | 01.08.2018 | ||
EE | 01.08.2018 | ||
ES | 01.08.2018 | ||
FI | 01.08.2018 | ||
HR | 01.08.2018 | ||
IT | 01.08.2018 | ||
LT | 01.08.2018 | ||
LV | 01.08.2018 | ||
MC | 01.08.2018 | ||
MT | 01.08.2018 | ||
PT | 01.08.2018 | ||
RO | 01.08.2018 | ||
RS | 01.08.2018 | ||
SE | 01.08.2018 | ||
SI | 01.08.2018 | ||
SK | 01.08.2018 | ||
SM | 01.08.2018 | ||
TR | 01.08.2018 | ||
BG | 01.11.2018 | ||
GR | 02.11.2018 | ||
AT | 29.11.2018 | ||
LU | 29.11.2018 | ||
CH | 30.11.2018 | ||
LI | 30.11.2018 | ||
IS | 01.12.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AL | 01.08.2018 | |
CZ | 01.08.2018 | ||
EE | 01.08.2018 | ||
ES | 01.08.2018 | ||
FI | 01.08.2018 | ||
HR | 01.08.2018 | ||
IT | 01.08.2018 | ||
LT | 01.08.2018 | ||
LV | 01.08.2018 | ||
MC | 01.08.2018 | ||
MT | 01.08.2018 | ||
RO | 01.08.2018 | ||
RS | 01.08.2018 | ||
SE | 01.08.2018 | ||
SI | 01.08.2018 | ||
SK | 01.08.2018 | ||
SM | 01.08.2018 | ||
TR | 01.08.2018 | ||
BG | 01.11.2018 | ||
GR | 02.11.2018 | ||
AT | 29.11.2018 | ||
LU | 29.11.2018 | ||
CH | 30.11.2018 | ||
LI | 30.11.2018 | ||
IS | 01.12.2018 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AL | 01.08.2018 | |
CZ | 01.08.2018 | ||
EE | 01.08.2018 | ||
ES | 01.08.2018 | ||
FI | 01.08.2018 | ||
HR | 01.08.2018 | ||
IT | 01.08.2018 | ||
LT | 01.08.2018 | ||
LV | 01.08.2018 | ||
MC | 01.08.2018 | ||
MT | 01.08.2018 | ||
RO | 01.08.2018 | ||
RS | 01.08.2018 | ||
SE | 01.08.2018 | ||
SI | 01.08.2018 | ||
SK | 01.08.2018 | ||
SM | 01.08.2018 | ||
BG | 01.11.2018 | ||
GR | 02.11.2018 | ||
AT | 29.11.2018 | ||
LU | 29.11.2018 | ||
CH | 30.11.2018 | ||
LI | 30.11.2018 | ||
IS | 01.12.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AL | 01.08.2018 | |
CZ | 01.08.2018 | ||
EE | 01.08.2018 | ||
ES | 01.08.2018 | ||
FI | 01.08.2018 | ||
HR | 01.08.2018 | ||
IT | 01.08.2018 | ||
LT | 01.08.2018 | ||
LV | 01.08.2018 | ||
MC | 01.08.2018 | ||
MT | 01.08.2018 | ||
RO | 01.08.2018 | ||
RS | 01.08.2018 | ||
SE | 01.08.2018 | ||
SI | 01.08.2018 | ||
SK | 01.08.2018 | ||
SM | 01.08.2018 | ||
BG | 01.11.2018 | ||
GR | 02.11.2018 | ||
LU | 29.11.2018 | ||
CH | 30.11.2018 | ||
LI | 30.11.2018 | ||
IS | 01.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AL | 01.08.2018 | |
CZ | 01.08.2018 | ||
EE | 01.08.2018 | ||
ES | 01.08.2018 | ||
FI | 01.08.2018 | ||
HR | 01.08.2018 | ||
IT | 01.08.2018 | ||
LT | 01.08.2018 | ||
LV | 01.08.2018 | ||
MC | 01.08.2018 | ||
RO | 01.08.2018 | ||
RS | 01.08.2018 | ||
SE | 01.08.2018 | ||
SI | 01.08.2018 | ||
SK | 01.08.2018 | ||
SM | 01.08.2018 | ||
BG | 01.11.2018 | ||
GR | 02.11.2018 | ||
LU | 29.11.2018 | ||
CH | 30.11.2018 | ||
LI | 30.11.2018 | ||
IS | 01.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AL | 01.08.2018 | |
CZ | 01.08.2018 | ||
EE | 01.08.2018 | ||
ES | 01.08.2018 | ||
FI | 01.08.2018 | ||
HR | 01.08.2018 | ||
IT | 01.08.2018 | ||
LT | 01.08.2018 | ||
LV | 01.08.2018 | ||
MC | 01.08.2018 | ||
RO | 01.08.2018 | ||
RS | 01.08.2018 | ||
SE | 01.08.2018 | ||
SI | 01.08.2018 | ||
SK | 01.08.2018 | ||
SM | 01.08.2018 | ||
BG | 01.11.2018 | ||
GR | 02.11.2018 | ||
LU | 29.11.2018 | ||
IS | 01.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/34] | AL | 01.08.2018 | |
CZ | 01.08.2018 | ||
EE | 01.08.2018 | ||
ES | 01.08.2018 | ||
FI | 01.08.2018 | ||
HR | 01.08.2018 | ||
IT | 01.08.2018 | ||
LT | 01.08.2018 | ||
LV | 01.08.2018 | ||
MC | 01.08.2018 | ||
RO | 01.08.2018 | ||
RS | 01.08.2018 | ||
SE | 01.08.2018 | ||
SK | 01.08.2018 | ||
SM | 01.08.2018 | ||
BG | 01.11.2018 | ||
GR | 02.11.2018 | ||
LU | 29.11.2018 | ||
IS | 01.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/33] | AL | 01.08.2018 | |
CZ | 01.08.2018 | ||
EE | 01.08.2018 | ||
ES | 01.08.2018 | ||
FI | 01.08.2018 | ||
HR | 01.08.2018 | ||
IT | 01.08.2018 | ||
LT | 01.08.2018 | ||
LV | 01.08.2018 | ||
MC | 01.08.2018 | ||
RO | 01.08.2018 | ||
RS | 01.08.2018 | ||
SE | 01.08.2018 | ||
SK | 01.08.2018 | ||
SM | 01.08.2018 | ||
BG | 01.11.2018 | ||
GR | 02.11.2018 | ||
IS | 01.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 01.08.2018 | |
CZ | 01.08.2018 | ||
EE | 01.08.2018 | ||
ES | 01.08.2018 | ||
FI | 01.08.2018 | ||
HR | 01.08.2018 | ||
IT | 01.08.2018 | ||
LT | 01.08.2018 | ||
LV | 01.08.2018 | ||
RO | 01.08.2018 | ||
RS | 01.08.2018 | ||
SE | 01.08.2018 | ||
SK | 01.08.2018 | ||
SM | 01.08.2018 | ||
BG | 01.11.2018 | ||
GR | 02.11.2018 | ||
IS | 01.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/23] | AL | 01.08.2018 | |
CZ | 01.08.2018 | ||
EE | 01.08.2018 | ||
ES | 01.08.2018 | ||
FI | 01.08.2018 | ||
HR | 01.08.2018 | ||
IT | 01.08.2018 | ||
LT | 01.08.2018 | ||
LV | 01.08.2018 | ||
RO | 01.08.2018 | ||
RS | 01.08.2018 | ||
SE | 01.08.2018 | ||
SK | 01.08.2018 | ||
BG | 01.11.2018 | ||
GR | 02.11.2018 | ||
IS | 01.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/22] | AL | 01.08.2018 | |
CZ | 01.08.2018 | ||
FI | 01.08.2018 | ||
HR | 01.08.2018 | ||
IT | 01.08.2018 | ||
LT | 01.08.2018 | ||
LV | 01.08.2018 | ||
RO | 01.08.2018 | ||
RS | 01.08.2018 | ||
SE | 01.08.2018 | ||
BG | 01.11.2018 | ||
GR | 02.11.2018 | ||
IS | 01.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/21] | AL | 01.08.2018 | |
FI | 01.08.2018 | ||
HR | 01.08.2018 | ||
IT | 01.08.2018 | ||
LT | 01.08.2018 | ||
LV | 01.08.2018 | ||
RS | 01.08.2018 | ||
SE | 01.08.2018 | ||
BG | 01.11.2018 | ||
GR | 02.11.2018 | ||
IS | 01.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AL | 01.08.2018 | |
FI | 01.08.2018 | ||
HR | 01.08.2018 | ||
LT | 01.08.2018 | ||
LV | 01.08.2018 | ||
RS | 01.08.2018 | ||
SE | 01.08.2018 | ||
BG | 01.11.2018 | ||
GR | 02.11.2018 | ||
IS | 01.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | FI | 01.08.2018 | |
HR | 01.08.2018 | ||
LT | 01.08.2018 | ||
RS | 01.08.2018 | ||
SE | 01.08.2018 | ||
BG | 01.11.2018 | ||
GR | 02.11.2018 | ||
IS | 01.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | FI | 01.08.2018 | |
LT | 01.08.2018 | ||
RS | 01.08.2018 | ||
SE | 01.08.2018 | ||
BG | 01.11.2018 | ||
GR | 02.11.2018 | ||
IS | 01.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | FI | 01.08.2018 | |
LT | 01.08.2018 | ||
IS | 01.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/07] | LT | 01.08.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2008061698 (REPOWER SYSTEMS AG [DE], et al) [A] 1,9 * page 14, line 19 - page 15, line 9 *; | [A]EP2182207 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [A] 1,9 * claim 1 *; | [A]WO2010060903 (VESTAS WIND SYS AS [DK], et al) [A] 3 * page 2, line 27 - page 3, line 3 * * page 4, line 1 - line 5 * * page 5, line 5 - line 20 ** page 11, line 28 - line 30; figures 4,5 *; | [XY]EP2236820 (ACCIONA WINDPOWER SA [ES]) [X] 1,9 * figure 5; claims 1,7 * [Y] 2; | [YA]WO2011050807 (VESTAS WIND SYS AS [DK], et al) [Y] 2 * line 12 - page 9, line 14; figure 2; claims 5,12 * * page 10, line 14 - line 31 * * page 12, line 1 - line 10 * [A] 3; | [A]EP2397688 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1,9 * paragraphs [0048] , [0074] * |