EP3263104 - USE OF BGP15 TO STIMULATE MITOCHONDRIAL FUSION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.11.2018 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 01.12.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.01.2019 [2019/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states N-Gene Research Laboratories Inc. 575 Madison Avenue, 10th floor New York, NY 10022 / US | [2018/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SUMEGI, Balazs Homokko utca 7 7634 Pecs / HU | 02 /
MANDL, Jozsef Victor Hugo utca 45 1132 Budapest / HU | [2018/01] | Representative(s) | Bianchetti & Minoja with Trevisan & Cuonzo IPS SRL Via Plinio, 63 20129 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2018/01] | Bianchetti Bracco Minoja S.r.l. Via Plinio, 63 20129 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 16177514.3 | 01.07.2016 | [2018/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3263104 | Date: | 03.01.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.12.2016 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/4545, A61P9/04, A61P11/00, A61P27/02, A61P25/00, A61P25/02, A61P43/00 | [2018/01] | CPC: |
A61K31/4545 (EP);
A61P11/00 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/02 (EP);
A61P27/02 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P9/04 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/01] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERWENDUNG VON BGP15 ZUR STIMULIERUNG DER MITOCHONDRIALEN FUSION | [2018/01] | English: | USE OF BGP15 TO STIMULATE MITOCHONDRIAL FUSION | [2018/01] | French: | UTILISATION DE BGP15 POUR STIMULER LA FUSION MITOCHONDRIALE | [2018/01] | Examination procedure | 04.07.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/01] | 09.08.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2019/01] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2018 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US6306878 (SUMEGI BALAZS [HU], et al) [X] 1,6-9 * column 3, line 26 - line 42 * * column 6, line 40 - line 44 * [Y] 1,6-11; | [Y]WO9911624 (GUILFORD PHARM INC [US]) [Y] 1,3 * page 1, line 15 - line 17 *; | [Y] - TANAKA K I ET AL, "Heat shock protein 70 protects against bleomycin-induced pulmonary fibrosis in mice", BIOCHEMICAL PHARMACOLOGY, ELSEVIER, US, vol. 80, no. 6, ISSN 0006-2952, (20100915), pages 920 - 931, (20100601), XP027143956 [Y] 1,2 * abstract * | [Y] - SAHABOGLU AYSE ET AL, "PARP inhibition: Could a target for cancer therapy also be a target for the treatment of Retinitis Pigmentosa?", INVESTIGATIVE OPHTHALMOLOGY & VISUAL SCIENCE - IOVS, ASSOCIATION FOR RESEARCH IN VISION AND OPHTHALMOLOGY, US, (20150601), vol. 56, no. 7, ISSN 0146-0404, page 5461, XP009192593 [Y] 1,4 * the whole document * | [I] - GEETA SAPRA ET AL, "The small-molecule BGP-15 protects against heart failure and atrial fibrillation in mice", NATURE COMMUNICATIONS, (20141209), vol. 5, doi:10.1038/ncomms6705, page 5705, XP055243051 [I] 1,5 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/ncomms6705 | [Y] - YOUNG MATTHEW J ET AL, "Human mitochondrial DNA replication machinery and disease", CURRENT OPINION IN GENETICS & DEVELOPMENT, (20160409), vol. 38, doi:10.1016/J.GDE.2016.03.005, ISSN 0959-437X, pages 52 - 62, XP029767524 [Y] 1,6-11 * abstract * * page 52, column right, line 5 - line 16 * * page 56, line 6, paragraph right - line 7 * * page 57, column left, lines 3-5, 45,-46 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.gde.2016.03.005 | [Y] - WORKER C, "A NOVEL PARP INHIBITOR, ION CHANNEL MODULATION AND AD THERAPIES", IDRUGS,, (19990101), vol. 2, no. 9, ISSN 1369-7056, page 859/860, XP000865947 [Y] 1,3,4 * page 859, column left, lines 1-24 * | [Y] - EROGLU BINNUR ET AL, "Therapeutic inducers of the HSP70/HSP110 protect mice against traumatic brain injury", JOURNAL OF NEUROCHEMISTRY, (201409), vol. 130, no. 5, pages 626 - 641, XP002764703 [Y] 1,2 * abstract * * page 635, column right, line 17 * | by applicant | WO2005123049 | - ADAMSON IY ET AL., AM J PATHOL, (1974), vol. 77, pages 185 - 197 | - AL-MERJAN JI ET AL., OPHTHALMIC EPIDEMIOL, (2005), vol. 12, pages 251 - 257 | - ANDREUX PA ET AL., NAT REV DRUG DISCOV., (201306), vol. 12, no. 6, pages 465 - 83 | - ARDUINI ET AL., J. AM J PHYSIOL GASTROINTEST LIVER PHYSIOL., (201107), vol. 301, no. L, pages G119 - 27 | - ASHCROFT ET AL., J CLIN PATHOL, (1988), vol. 41, pages 467 - 470 | - BOSTAN A ET AL., AUTON NEUROSCI., (20120925), vol. 170, no. 1-2, pages 70 - 2 | - BOWEN ET AL., EUR J HEART FAIL., (201503), vol. 17, no. 3, pages 263 - 72 | - BUCH H ET AL., OPHTHALMOLOGY, (2004), vol. 111, pages 53 - 61 | - CHANG ET AL., J BIOL CHEM., (20140321), vol. 289, no. 12, pages 8337 - 52 | - CHENG ET AL., ACTA PHARMACOL SIN., (201307), vol. 34, no. 7, pages 951 - 9 | - DARIN ET AL., ANN NEUROL., (200103), vol. 49, no. 3, pages 377 - 83 | - ELACHOURI ET AL., GENOME RES., (201101), vol. 21, no. 1, pages 12 - 20 | - FARKAS ET AL., BIOCHEMICAL PHARMACOLOGY, (2002), vol. 63, pages 921 - 932 | - FLEISCHMAN RW ET AL., THORAX, (1971), vol. 26, pages 675 - 682 | - FRICK KD ET AL., ARCH. OPHTHALMOL, (2012), vol. 130, pages 629 - 634 | - GIACOMOTTO ET AL., HUM MOL GENET, (20131115), vol. 22, no. 22, pages 4562 - 78 | - HALMOSI ET AL., MOLECULAR PHARMACOLOGY, (2001), vol. 59, no. 6, pages 1497 - 1505 | - HATA H ET AL., JPN. J. OPHTHALMOL, (2003), vol. 57, pages 259 - 262 | - HORI ET AL., GENES CELLS., (201105), vol. 16, no. 5, pages 527 - 44 | - KIJAS JW ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. U.S.A., (2002), vol. 99, pages 6328 - 6333 | - KUNDU S ET AL., INT MED J, (2013), vol. 20, page 34 | - LESTIENNE ET AL., BIOMED PHARMACOTHER., (1994), vol. 48, no. 5-6, pages 199 - 214 | - LOVY ET AL., J VIS EXP., (20120720), page E3991 | - MAARSINGH H ET AL., "Naunyn Schmiedebergs", ARCH PHARMACOL., (200808), vol. 378, no. 2, pages 171 - 84 | - MARC RE ET AL., MOL. VIS., (2008), vol. 14, pages 782 - 806 | - MEERSSEMAN ET AL., GENE, (20140301), vol. 537, no. 1, pages 154 - 63 | - MIHAYLOVA V ET AL., J NEUROGENET., (201306), vol. 27, no. 1-2, pages 19 - 22 | - MISHRA ET AL., NAT REV MOL CELL BIOL., (201410), vol. 15, no. 10, pages 634 - 46 | - NAASH ML ET AL., INVEST. OPHTHALMOL. VIS. SCI., (1996), vol. 37, pages 775 - 782 | - NAGY ET AL., TOXICOLOGY AND APPLIED PHARMACOLOGY, (2010), vol. 243, pages 96 - 103 | - NASRALLAH CM ET AL., NAT REV ENDOCRINOL., (201411), vol. 10, no. 1 1, pages 650 - 8 | - OZAKI ET AL., BIOCHIM BIOPHYS ACTA, (201211), vol. 1822, no. 11, pages 1783 - 95 | - PAPANICOLAOU ET AL., AM J PHYSIOL HEART CIRC PHYSIOL., (20120801), vol. 303, no. 3, pages H243 - 55 | - PARAMASIVAM A ET AL., MITOCHONDRION, (201601), vol. 26, pages 81 - 5 | - PASKOWITZ ET AL., BR. J. OPHTHALMOL, (2006), vol. 90, pages 1060 - 1066 | - PLAFKER ET AL., INT REV CELL MOL BIOL, (2012), vol. 298, pages 135 - 77 | - REDMANN ET AL., INT J BIOCHEM CELL BIOL., (201408), vol. 53, pages 127 - 33 | - ROSSI L ET AL., BLOOD CELLS MOL DIS, (2004), vol. 33, pages 57 - 63 | - RUTAR M ET AL., CURR. EYE RES., (2010), vol. 35, pages 631 - 643 | - RUTAR M ET AL., INVEST. OPHTHALMOL. VIS. SCI., (2011), vol. 52, pages 5347 - 5358 | - SCHWARZER ET AL., J PHYSIOL., (20140901), vol. 592, no. 17, pages 3767 - 82 | - SHARMA ET AL., CIRC HEART FAIL., (201604), vol. 9, no. 4, page E002639 | - SZABADOS ET AL., BIOCHEMICAL PHARMACOLOGY, (2000), vol. 59, pages 937 - 945 | - SZCZEPANOWSKA ET AL., BIOCHIM BIOPHYS ACTA, (201210), vol. 1817, no. 10, pages 1740 - 6 | - WANG ET AL., J BIOL CHEM., (20150102), vol. 290, no. 1, pages 168 - 82 | - WENZEL A ET AL., PROG. RETIN. EYE RES., (2005), vol. 24, pages 275 - 306 | - WERT ET AL., Cell-Based Therapy for Retinal Degenerative Disease. Dev Ophthalmol, (2014), vol. 53, pages 33 - 43 | - WU ET AL., DEVELOPMENT, (2015), vol. 142, pages 681 - 691 | - YOUNG ET AL., CURR OPIN GENET DEV., (20160408), vol. 38, pages 52 - 62 | - ZANONI I ET AL., NATURE, (20090709), vol. 460, no. 7252, pages 264 - 8 | - ZORZANO ET AL., FRONT AGING NEUROSCI, (20150610), vol. 7, page 101 |