EP3267358 - FINGERPRINT SENSING SYSTEM AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.08.2022 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 10.09.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.07.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.05.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.07.2018 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 08.12.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NXP B.V. High Tech Campus 60 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [2018/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SUWALD, Thomas c/o NXP B.V., Intellectual Property Group High Tech Campus 60 Eindhoven 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [2018/02] | Representative(s) | Krott, Michel NXP Semiconductors Intellectual Property & Licensing High Tech Campus 60 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [2018/02] | Application number, filing date | 16177943.4 | 05.07.2016 | [2018/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3267358 | Date: | 10.01.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3267358 | Date: | 13.10.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.04.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G06K9/00 | [2018/02] | CPC: |
G06V40/1306 (EP,US);
G06V40/1365 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/33] |
Former [2018/02] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | FINGERABDRUCKERFASSUNGSSYSTEM UND -VERFAHREN | [2018/02] | English: | FINGERPRINT SENSING SYSTEM AND METHOD | [2018/02] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE DÉTECTION D'EMPREINTES | [2018/02] | Examination procedure | 05.07.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 21.08.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.07.2018 | Examination requested [2018/33] | 24.05.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.09.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.05.2021 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 11.06.2021 | 11.06.2021 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 07.07.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.08.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 31.08.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 31.08.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 14.07.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 05.07.2016 | AL | 13.10.2021 | AT | 13.10.2021 | CY | 13.10.2021 | CZ | 13.10.2021 | DK | 13.10.2021 | EE | 13.10.2021 | ES | 13.10.2021 | FI | 13.10.2021 | HR | 13.10.2021 | IT | 13.10.2021 | LT | 13.10.2021 | LV | 13.10.2021 | MC | 13.10.2021 | MK | 13.10.2021 | NL | 13.10.2021 | PL | 13.10.2021 | RO | 13.10.2021 | RS | 13.10.2021 | SE | 13.10.2021 | SI | 13.10.2021 | SK | 13.10.2021 | SM | 13.10.2021 | BG | 13.01.2022 | NO | 13.01.2022 | GR | 14.01.2022 | IS | 13.02.2022 | PT | 14.02.2022 | GB | 05.07.2022 | IE | 05.07.2022 | LU | 05.07.2022 | [2024/22] |
Former [2024/20] | HU | 05.07.2016 | |
AL | 13.10.2021 | ||
AT | 13.10.2021 | ||
CY | 13.10.2021 | ||
CZ | 13.10.2021 | ||
DK | 13.10.2021 | ||
EE | 13.10.2021 | ||
ES | 13.10.2021 | ||
FI | 13.10.2021 | ||
HR | 13.10.2021 | ||
IT | 13.10.2021 | ||
LT | 13.10.2021 | ||
LV | 13.10.2021 | ||
MC | 13.10.2021 | ||
NL | 13.10.2021 | ||
PL | 13.10.2021 | ||
RO | 13.10.2021 | ||
RS | 13.10.2021 | ||
SE | 13.10.2021 | ||
SI | 13.10.2021 | ||
SK | 13.10.2021 | ||
SM | 13.10.2021 | ||
BG | 13.01.2022 | ||
NO | 13.01.2022 | ||
GR | 14.01.2022 | ||
IS | 13.02.2022 | ||
PT | 14.02.2022 | ||
GB | 05.07.2022 | ||
IE | 05.07.2022 | ||
LU | 05.07.2022 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 05.07.2016 | |
AL | 13.10.2021 | ||
AT | 13.10.2021 | ||
CZ | 13.10.2021 | ||
DK | 13.10.2021 | ||
EE | 13.10.2021 | ||
ES | 13.10.2021 | ||
FI | 13.10.2021 | ||
HR | 13.10.2021 | ||
IT | 13.10.2021 | ||
LT | 13.10.2021 | ||
LV | 13.10.2021 | ||
MC | 13.10.2021 | ||
NL | 13.10.2021 | ||
PL | 13.10.2021 | ||
RO | 13.10.2021 | ||
RS | 13.10.2021 | ||
SE | 13.10.2021 | ||
SI | 13.10.2021 | ||
SK | 13.10.2021 | ||
SM | 13.10.2021 | ||
BG | 13.01.2022 | ||
NO | 13.01.2022 | ||
GR | 14.01.2022 | ||
IS | 13.02.2022 | ||
PT | 14.02.2022 | ||
GB | 05.07.2022 | ||
IE | 05.07.2022 | ||
LU | 05.07.2022 | ||
Former [2023/33] | AL | 13.10.2021 | |
AT | 13.10.2021 | ||
CZ | 13.10.2021 | ||
DK | 13.10.2021 | ||
EE | 13.10.2021 | ||
ES | 13.10.2021 | ||
FI | 13.10.2021 | ||
HR | 13.10.2021 | ||
IT | 13.10.2021 | ||
LT | 13.10.2021 | ||
LV | 13.10.2021 | ||
MC | 13.10.2021 | ||
NL | 13.10.2021 | ||
PL | 13.10.2021 | ||
RO | 13.10.2021 | ||
RS | 13.10.2021 | ||
SE | 13.10.2021 | ||
SI | 13.10.2021 | ||
SK | 13.10.2021 | ||
SM | 13.10.2021 | ||
BG | 13.01.2022 | ||
NO | 13.01.2022 | ||
GR | 14.01.2022 | ||
IS | 13.02.2022 | ||
PT | 14.02.2022 | ||
GB | 05.07.2022 | ||
IE | 05.07.2022 | ||
LU | 05.07.2022 | ||
Former [2023/27] | AL | 13.10.2021 | |
AT | 13.10.2021 | ||
CZ | 13.10.2021 | ||
DK | 13.10.2021 | ||
EE | 13.10.2021 | ||
ES | 13.10.2021 | ||
FI | 13.10.2021 | ||
HR | 13.10.2021 | ||
IT | 13.10.2021 | ||
LT | 13.10.2021 | ||
LV | 13.10.2021 | ||
MC | 13.10.2021 | ||
NL | 13.10.2021 | ||
PL | 13.10.2021 | ||
RO | 13.10.2021 | ||
RS | 13.10.2021 | ||
SE | 13.10.2021 | ||
SI | 13.10.2021 | ||
SK | 13.10.2021 | ||
SM | 13.10.2021 | ||
BG | 13.01.2022 | ||
NO | 13.01.2022 | ||
GR | 14.01.2022 | ||
IS | 13.02.2022 | ||
PT | 14.02.2022 | ||
GB | 05.07.2022 | ||
LU | 05.07.2022 | ||
Former [2023/21] | AL | 13.10.2021 | |
AT | 13.10.2021 | ||
CZ | 13.10.2021 | ||
DK | 13.10.2021 | ||
EE | 13.10.2021 | ||
ES | 13.10.2021 | ||
FI | 13.10.2021 | ||
HR | 13.10.2021 | ||
LT | 13.10.2021 | ||
LV | 13.10.2021 | ||
MC | 13.10.2021 | ||
NL | 13.10.2021 | ||
PL | 13.10.2021 | ||
RO | 13.10.2021 | ||
RS | 13.10.2021 | ||
SE | 13.10.2021 | ||
SI | 13.10.2021 | ||
SK | 13.10.2021 | ||
SM | 13.10.2021 | ||
BG | 13.01.2022 | ||
NO | 13.01.2022 | ||
GR | 14.01.2022 | ||
IS | 13.02.2022 | ||
PT | 14.02.2022 | ||
LU | 05.07.2022 | ||
Former [2023/11] | AL | 13.10.2021 | |
AT | 13.10.2021 | ||
CZ | 13.10.2021 | ||
DK | 13.10.2021 | ||
EE | 13.10.2021 | ||
ES | 13.10.2021 | ||
FI | 13.10.2021 | ||
HR | 13.10.2021 | ||
LT | 13.10.2021 | ||
LV | 13.10.2021 | ||
MC | 13.10.2021 | ||
NL | 13.10.2021 | ||
PL | 13.10.2021 | ||
RO | 13.10.2021 | ||
RS | 13.10.2021 | ||
SE | 13.10.2021 | ||
SI | 13.10.2021 | ||
SK | 13.10.2021 | ||
SM | 13.10.2021 | ||
BG | 13.01.2022 | ||
NO | 13.01.2022 | ||
GR | 14.01.2022 | ||
IS | 13.02.2022 | ||
PT | 14.02.2022 | ||
Former [2023/01] | AL | 13.10.2021 | |
AT | 13.10.2021 | ||
CZ | 13.10.2021 | ||
DK | 13.10.2021 | ||
EE | 13.10.2021 | ||
ES | 13.10.2021 | ||
FI | 13.10.2021 | ||
HR | 13.10.2021 | ||
LT | 13.10.2021 | ||
LV | 13.10.2021 | ||
NL | 13.10.2021 | ||
PL | 13.10.2021 | ||
RO | 13.10.2021 | ||
RS | 13.10.2021 | ||
SE | 13.10.2021 | ||
SI | 13.10.2021 | ||
SK | 13.10.2021 | ||
SM | 13.10.2021 | ||
BG | 13.01.2022 | ||
NO | 13.01.2022 | ||
GR | 14.01.2022 | ||
IS | 13.02.2022 | ||
PT | 14.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | AL | 13.10.2021 | |
AT | 13.10.2021 | ||
CZ | 13.10.2021 | ||
DK | 13.10.2021 | ||
EE | 13.10.2021 | ||
ES | 13.10.2021 | ||
FI | 13.10.2021 | ||
HR | 13.10.2021 | ||
LT | 13.10.2021 | ||
LV | 13.10.2021 | ||
NL | 13.10.2021 | ||
PL | 13.10.2021 | ||
RO | 13.10.2021 | ||
RS | 13.10.2021 | ||
SE | 13.10.2021 | ||
SK | 13.10.2021 | ||
SM | 13.10.2021 | ||
BG | 13.01.2022 | ||
NO | 13.01.2022 | ||
GR | 14.01.2022 | ||
IS | 13.02.2022 | ||
PT | 14.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/35] | AT | 13.10.2021 | |
CZ | 13.10.2021 | ||
DK | 13.10.2021 | ||
EE | 13.10.2021 | ||
ES | 13.10.2021 | ||
FI | 13.10.2021 | ||
HR | 13.10.2021 | ||
LT | 13.10.2021 | ||
LV | 13.10.2021 | ||
NL | 13.10.2021 | ||
PL | 13.10.2021 | ||
RO | 13.10.2021 | ||
RS | 13.10.2021 | ||
SE | 13.10.2021 | ||
SK | 13.10.2021 | ||
SM | 13.10.2021 | ||
BG | 13.01.2022 | ||
NO | 13.01.2022 | ||
GR | 14.01.2022 | ||
IS | 13.02.2022 | ||
PT | 14.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AT | 13.10.2021 | |
EE | 13.10.2021 | ||
ES | 13.10.2021 | ||
FI | 13.10.2021 | ||
HR | 13.10.2021 | ||
LT | 13.10.2021 | ||
LV | 13.10.2021 | ||
NL | 13.10.2021 | ||
PL | 13.10.2021 | ||
RO | 13.10.2021 | ||
RS | 13.10.2021 | ||
SE | 13.10.2021 | ||
SM | 13.10.2021 | ||
BG | 13.01.2022 | ||
NO | 13.01.2022 | ||
GR | 14.01.2022 | ||
IS | 13.02.2022 | ||
PT | 14.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/33] | AT | 13.10.2021 | |
ES | 13.10.2021 | ||
FI | 13.10.2021 | ||
HR | 13.10.2021 | ||
LT | 13.10.2021 | ||
LV | 13.10.2021 | ||
NL | 13.10.2021 | ||
PL | 13.10.2021 | ||
RS | 13.10.2021 | ||
SE | 13.10.2021 | ||
SM | 13.10.2021 | ||
BG | 13.01.2022 | ||
NO | 13.01.2022 | ||
GR | 14.01.2022 | ||
IS | 13.02.2022 | ||
PT | 14.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/25] | AT | 13.10.2021 | |
ES | 13.10.2021 | ||
FI | 13.10.2021 | ||
HR | 13.10.2021 | ||
LT | 13.10.2021 | ||
LV | 13.10.2021 | ||
NL | 13.10.2021 | ||
PL | 13.10.2021 | ||
RS | 13.10.2021 | ||
SE | 13.10.2021 | ||
BG | 13.01.2022 | ||
NO | 13.01.2022 | ||
GR | 14.01.2022 | ||
IS | 13.02.2022 | ||
PT | 14.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/24] | AT | 13.10.2021 | |
ES | 13.10.2021 | ||
FI | 13.10.2021 | ||
HR | 13.10.2021 | ||
LT | 13.10.2021 | ||
LV | 13.10.2021 | ||
NL | 13.10.2021 | ||
PL | 13.10.2021 | ||
RS | 13.10.2021 | ||
SE | 13.10.2021 | ||
BG | 13.01.2022 | ||
GR | 14.01.2022 | ||
IS | 13.02.2022 | ||
PT | 14.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AT | 13.10.2021 | |
ES | 13.10.2021 | ||
FI | 13.10.2021 | ||
HR | 13.10.2021 | ||
LT | 13.10.2021 | ||
LV | 13.10.2021 | ||
PL | 13.10.2021 | ||
RS | 13.10.2021 | ||
BG | 13.01.2022 | ||
PT | 14.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/22] | AT | 13.10.2021 | |
FI | 13.10.2021 | ||
LT | 13.10.2021 | ||
RS | 13.10.2021 | ||
BG | 13.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AT | 13.10.2021 | |
RS | 13.10.2021 | ||
BG | 13.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/19] | BG | 13.01.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP2403146 (UNIV LIMERICK [IE]) [A] 1-3 * abstract *; | [XYI] - MORIMURA H ET AL, "An advanced fingerprint sensor LSI and its application to a fingerprint identification system", 2002 SYMPOSIUM ON VLSI CIRCUITS. DIGEST OF TECHNICAL PAPERS. HONOLULU, JUNE 13 - 15, 2002; [SYMPOSIUM ON VLSI CIRCUITS], NEW YORK, NY : IEEE, US, (20020613), doi:10.1109/VLSIC.2002.1015103, ISBN 978-0-7803-7310-5, pages 272 - 275, XP032408905 [X] 1,8,9,12,14,15 * abstract * * Section "Advanced Fingerprint Sensor LSI" * [Y] 4,5 [I] 2,3,10,11,13 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/VLSIC.2002.1015103 | [I] - NOBUHIRO SHIMOYAMA ET AL, "Evaluation of ESD hardness for fingerprint sensor LSIs", ELECTRICAL OVERSTRESS/ELECTROSTATIC DISCHARGE SYMPOSIUM, 2004. EOS/ESD '04, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20040919), ISBN 978-1-58537-063-4, pages 1 - 7, XP031534209 [I] 1-3,8-15 * figure 1 * | [A] - FRANCESCONI F ET AL, "A LOW POWER LOGARITHMIC A/D CONVERTER", 1996 IEEE INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON CIRCUITS AND SYSTEMS (ISCAS). CIRCUITS AND SYSTEMS CONNECTING THE WORLD. ATLANTA, MAY 12 - 15, 1996; [IEEE INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON CIRCUITS AND SYSTEMS (ISCAS)], NEW YORK, IEEE, US, (19960512), doi:10.1109/ISCAS.1996.539987, ISBN 978-0-7803-3074-0, pages 473 - 476, XP000825616 [A] 1-3 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ISCAS.1996.539987 | [A] - Jorge Guilherme ET AL, "LOGARITHMIC A NALOGUE-TO-DIGITAL CONVERTERS Logarithmic Analogue-to-Digital Converters", CMOS Telecom Data Converters, Springer, (20030101), pages 241 - 275, XP055330319 [A] 1-3,10-12 * the whole document * | [XI] - SHIH-FANG CHEN ET AL, "Logarithmic CMOS image sensor through multi-resolution analog-to-digital conversion", VLSI TECHNOLOGY, SYSTEMS, AND APPLICATIONS, 2003 INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSI UM ON OCT. 6-8, 2003, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, (20031006), ISBN 978-0-7803-7765-3, pages 231 - 234, XP010675875 [X] 1-5 * abstract * * sections 3 and 4 * [I] 6,7 | [I] - MITSUHIRO YAMADA, "A SWITCHED-CAPACITOR INTERFACE FOR CAPACITIVE PRESSURE SENSORS", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON INSTRUMENTATION AND MEASUREMENT, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, US, (19920201), vol. 41, no. 1, doi:10.1109/19.126637, ISSN 0018-9456, pages 81 - 86, XP000296748 [I] 1-7 * Section I and IV * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/19.126637 | [Y] - Gert Van Der Horn ET AL, "Linearization based on look-up table", Integrated Smart Sensors, Springer, (19981231), pages 60 - 63, ISBN 978-1-4757-2890-3, XP055361539 [Y] 4,5 * Section 3.2.2;; figures 3-6 * |