EP3118709 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR PERFORMING AUTOMATED OPERATIONS ON A WORKPIECE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.02.2022 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 19.03.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.11.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.04.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Boeing Company 100 North Riverside Plaza Chicago, IL 60606-1596 / US | [2017/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SKAGGS, Kirk Douglas c/o The Boeing Company 100 North Riverside Plaza Chicago, IL Illinois 60606-2016 / US | 02 /
LEPPER, Lee Dwayne c/o The Boeing Company 100 North Riverside Plaza Chicago, IL Illinois 60606-2016 / US | [2017/03] | Representative(s) | Boult Wade Tennant LLP Salisbury Square House 8 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8AP / GB | [2021/16] |
Former [2017/03] | Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | Application number, filing date | 16178601.7 | 08.07.2016 | [2017/03] | Priority number, date | US201514801312 | 16.07.2015 Original published format: US201514801312 | [2017/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3118709 | Date: | 18.01.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3118709 | Date: | 21.04.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.12.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G05D1/02 | [2017/03] | CPC: |
G05D1/0234 (EP,US);
G05B19/402 (BR);
B64F5/10 (KR);
G05B19/19 (CN,US);
B23P15/00 (KR);
B64C1/00 (BR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/03] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR DURCHFÜHRUNG VON AUTOMATISIERTEN VORGÄNGEN AN EINEM WERKSTÜCK | [2017/03] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR PERFORMING AUTOMATED OPERATIONS ON A WORKPIECE | [2017/03] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF POUR RÉALISER DES OPÉRATIONS AUTOMATISÉES SUR UNE PIÈCE À USINER | [2017/03] | Examination procedure | 08.07.2016 | Examination requested [2017/03] | 08.07.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 25.07.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.04.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.08.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.10.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.02.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.11.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.03.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 11.03.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.03.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 24.01.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/13] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 25.07.2017 | Request for further processing filed | 25.07.2017 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 07.08.2017 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 08.07.2016 | AL | 21.04.2021 | AT | 21.04.2021 | CY | 21.04.2021 | CZ | 21.04.2021 | DK | 21.04.2021 | EE | 21.04.2021 | ES | 21.04.2021 | FI | 21.04.2021 | HR | 21.04.2021 | IT | 21.04.2021 | LT | 21.04.2021 | LV | 21.04.2021 | MC | 21.04.2021 | MK | 21.04.2021 | MT | 21.04.2021 | NL | 21.04.2021 | PL | 21.04.2021 | RO | 21.04.2021 | RS | 21.04.2021 | SE | 21.04.2021 | SI | 21.04.2021 | SK | 21.04.2021 | SM | 21.04.2021 | TR | 21.04.2021 | IE | 08.07.2021 | LU | 08.07.2021 | BG | 21.07.2021 | NO | 21.07.2021 | GR | 22.07.2021 | BE | 31.07.2021 | CH | 31.07.2021 | LI | 31.07.2021 | IS | 21.08.2021 | PT | 23.08.2021 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/29] | HU | 08.07.2016 | |
AL | 21.04.2021 | ||
AT | 21.04.2021 | ||
CY | 21.04.2021 | ||
CZ | 21.04.2021 | ||
DK | 21.04.2021 | ||
EE | 21.04.2021 | ||
ES | 21.04.2021 | ||
FI | 21.04.2021 | ||
HR | 21.04.2021 | ||
IT | 21.04.2021 | ||
LT | 21.04.2021 | ||
LV | 21.04.2021 | ||
MC | 21.04.2021 | ||
MK | 21.04.2021 | ||
NL | 21.04.2021 | ||
PL | 21.04.2021 | ||
RO | 21.04.2021 | ||
RS | 21.04.2021 | ||
SE | 21.04.2021 | ||
SI | 21.04.2021 | ||
SK | 21.04.2021 | ||
SM | 21.04.2021 | ||
TR | 21.04.2021 | ||
IE | 08.07.2021 | ||
LU | 08.07.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
NO | 21.07.2021 | ||
GR | 22.07.2021 | ||
BE | 31.07.2021 | ||
CH | 31.07.2021 | ||
LI | 31.07.2021 | ||
IS | 21.08.2021 | ||
PT | 23.08.2021 | ||
Former [2024/22] | HU | 08.07.2016 | |
AL | 21.04.2021 | ||
AT | 21.04.2021 | ||
CY | 21.04.2021 | ||
CZ | 21.04.2021 | ||
DK | 21.04.2021 | ||
EE | 21.04.2021 | ||
ES | 21.04.2021 | ||
FI | 21.04.2021 | ||
HR | 21.04.2021 | ||
IT | 21.04.2021 | ||
LT | 21.04.2021 | ||
LV | 21.04.2021 | ||
MC | 21.04.2021 | ||
MK | 21.04.2021 | ||
NL | 21.04.2021 | ||
PL | 21.04.2021 | ||
RO | 21.04.2021 | ||
RS | 21.04.2021 | ||
SE | 21.04.2021 | ||
SI | 21.04.2021 | ||
SK | 21.04.2021 | ||
SM | 21.04.2021 | ||
IE | 08.07.2021 | ||
LU | 08.07.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
NO | 21.07.2021 | ||
GR | 22.07.2021 | ||
BE | 31.07.2021 | ||
CH | 31.07.2021 | ||
LI | 31.07.2021 | ||
IS | 21.08.2021 | ||
PT | 23.08.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | HU | 08.07.2016 | |
AL | 21.04.2021 | ||
AT | 21.04.2021 | ||
CY | 21.04.2021 | ||
CZ | 21.04.2021 | ||
DK | 21.04.2021 | ||
EE | 21.04.2021 | ||
ES | 21.04.2021 | ||
FI | 21.04.2021 | ||
HR | 21.04.2021 | ||
IT | 21.04.2021 | ||
LT | 21.04.2021 | ||
LV | 21.04.2021 | ||
MC | 21.04.2021 | ||
NL | 21.04.2021 | ||
PL | 21.04.2021 | ||
RO | 21.04.2021 | ||
RS | 21.04.2021 | ||
SE | 21.04.2021 | ||
SI | 21.04.2021 | ||
SK | 21.04.2021 | ||
SM | 21.04.2021 | ||
IE | 08.07.2021 | ||
LU | 08.07.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
NO | 21.07.2021 | ||
GR | 22.07.2021 | ||
BE | 31.07.2021 | ||
CH | 31.07.2021 | ||
LI | 31.07.2021 | ||
IS | 21.08.2021 | ||
PT | 23.08.2021 | ||
Former [2023/29] | HU | 08.07.2016 | |
AL | 21.04.2021 | ||
AT | 21.04.2021 | ||
CZ | 21.04.2021 | ||
DK | 21.04.2021 | ||
EE | 21.04.2021 | ||
ES | 21.04.2021 | ||
FI | 21.04.2021 | ||
HR | 21.04.2021 | ||
IT | 21.04.2021 | ||
LT | 21.04.2021 | ||
LV | 21.04.2021 | ||
MC | 21.04.2021 | ||
NL | 21.04.2021 | ||
PL | 21.04.2021 | ||
RO | 21.04.2021 | ||
RS | 21.04.2021 | ||
SE | 21.04.2021 | ||
SI | 21.04.2021 | ||
SK | 21.04.2021 | ||
SM | 21.04.2021 | ||
IE | 08.07.2021 | ||
LU | 08.07.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
NO | 21.07.2021 | ||
GR | 22.07.2021 | ||
BE | 31.07.2021 | ||
CH | 31.07.2021 | ||
LI | 31.07.2021 | ||
IS | 21.08.2021 | ||
PT | 23.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AL | 21.04.2021 | |
AT | 21.04.2021 | ||
CZ | 21.04.2021 | ||
DK | 21.04.2021 | ||
EE | 21.04.2021 | ||
ES | 21.04.2021 | ||
FI | 21.04.2021 | ||
HR | 21.04.2021 | ||
IT | 21.04.2021 | ||
LT | 21.04.2021 | ||
LV | 21.04.2021 | ||
MC | 21.04.2021 | ||
NL | 21.04.2021 | ||
PL | 21.04.2021 | ||
RO | 21.04.2021 | ||
RS | 21.04.2021 | ||
SE | 21.04.2021 | ||
SI | 21.04.2021 | ||
SK | 21.04.2021 | ||
SM | 21.04.2021 | ||
IE | 08.07.2021 | ||
LU | 08.07.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
NO | 21.07.2021 | ||
GR | 22.07.2021 | ||
BE | 31.07.2021 | ||
CH | 31.07.2021 | ||
LI | 31.07.2021 | ||
IS | 21.08.2021 | ||
PT | 23.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/35] | AL | 21.04.2021 | |
AT | 21.04.2021 | ||
CZ | 21.04.2021 | ||
DK | 21.04.2021 | ||
EE | 21.04.2021 | ||
ES | 21.04.2021 | ||
FI | 21.04.2021 | ||
HR | 21.04.2021 | ||
LT | 21.04.2021 | ||
LV | 21.04.2021 | ||
MC | 21.04.2021 | ||
NL | 21.04.2021 | ||
PL | 21.04.2021 | ||
RO | 21.04.2021 | ||
RS | 21.04.2021 | ||
SE | 21.04.2021 | ||
SI | 21.04.2021 | ||
SK | 21.04.2021 | ||
SM | 21.04.2021 | ||
IE | 08.07.2021 | ||
LU | 08.07.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
NO | 21.07.2021 | ||
GR | 22.07.2021 | ||
BE | 31.07.2021 | ||
CH | 31.07.2021 | ||
LI | 31.07.2021 | ||
IS | 21.08.2021 | ||
PT | 23.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AL | 21.04.2021 | |
AT | 21.04.2021 | ||
CZ | 21.04.2021 | ||
DK | 21.04.2021 | ||
EE | 21.04.2021 | ||
ES | 21.04.2021 | ||
FI | 21.04.2021 | ||
HR | 21.04.2021 | ||
LT | 21.04.2021 | ||
LV | 21.04.2021 | ||
MC | 21.04.2021 | ||
NL | 21.04.2021 | ||
PL | 21.04.2021 | ||
RO | 21.04.2021 | ||
RS | 21.04.2021 | ||
SE | 21.04.2021 | ||
SI | 21.04.2021 | ||
SK | 21.04.2021 | ||
SM | 21.04.2021 | ||
LU | 08.07.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
NO | 21.07.2021 | ||
GR | 22.07.2021 | ||
BE | 31.07.2021 | ||
CH | 31.07.2021 | ||
LI | 31.07.2021 | ||
IS | 21.08.2021 | ||
PT | 23.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 21.04.2021 | |
AT | 21.04.2021 | ||
CZ | 21.04.2021 | ||
DK | 21.04.2021 | ||
EE | 21.04.2021 | ||
ES | 21.04.2021 | ||
FI | 21.04.2021 | ||
HR | 21.04.2021 | ||
LT | 21.04.2021 | ||
LV | 21.04.2021 | ||
MC | 21.04.2021 | ||
NL | 21.04.2021 | ||
PL | 21.04.2021 | ||
RO | 21.04.2021 | ||
RS | 21.04.2021 | ||
SE | 21.04.2021 | ||
SI | 21.04.2021 | ||
SK | 21.04.2021 | ||
SM | 21.04.2021 | ||
LU | 08.07.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
NO | 21.07.2021 | ||
GR | 22.07.2021 | ||
CH | 31.07.2021 | ||
LI | 31.07.2021 | ||
IS | 21.08.2021 | ||
PT | 23.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/26] | AL | 21.04.2021 | |
AT | 21.04.2021 | ||
CZ | 21.04.2021 | ||
DK | 21.04.2021 | ||
EE | 21.04.2021 | ||
ES | 21.04.2021 | ||
FI | 21.04.2021 | ||
HR | 21.04.2021 | ||
LT | 21.04.2021 | ||
LV | 21.04.2021 | ||
MC | 21.04.2021 | ||
NL | 21.04.2021 | ||
PL | 21.04.2021 | ||
RO | 21.04.2021 | ||
RS | 21.04.2021 | ||
SE | 21.04.2021 | ||
SK | 21.04.2021 | ||
SM | 21.04.2021 | ||
LU | 08.07.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
NO | 21.07.2021 | ||
GR | 22.07.2021 | ||
CH | 31.07.2021 | ||
LI | 31.07.2021 | ||
IS | 21.08.2021 | ||
PT | 23.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AT | 21.04.2021 | |
CZ | 21.04.2021 | ||
DK | 21.04.2021 | ||
EE | 21.04.2021 | ||
ES | 21.04.2021 | ||
FI | 21.04.2021 | ||
HR | 21.04.2021 | ||
LT | 21.04.2021 | ||
LV | 21.04.2021 | ||
MC | 21.04.2021 | ||
NL | 21.04.2021 | ||
PL | 21.04.2021 | ||
RO | 21.04.2021 | ||
RS | 21.04.2021 | ||
SE | 21.04.2021 | ||
SK | 21.04.2021 | ||
SM | 21.04.2021 | ||
LU | 08.07.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
NO | 21.07.2021 | ||
GR | 22.07.2021 | ||
CH | 31.07.2021 | ||
LI | 31.07.2021 | ||
IS | 21.08.2021 | ||
PT | 23.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AT | 21.04.2021 | |
CZ | 21.04.2021 | ||
DK | 21.04.2021 | ||
EE | 21.04.2021 | ||
ES | 21.04.2021 | ||
FI | 21.04.2021 | ||
HR | 21.04.2021 | ||
LT | 21.04.2021 | ||
LV | 21.04.2021 | ||
MC | 21.04.2021 | ||
NL | 21.04.2021 | ||
PL | 21.04.2021 | ||
RO | 21.04.2021 | ||
RS | 21.04.2021 | ||
SE | 21.04.2021 | ||
SK | 21.04.2021 | ||
SM | 21.04.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
NO | 21.07.2021 | ||
GR | 22.07.2021 | ||
CH | 31.07.2021 | ||
LI | 31.07.2021 | ||
PT | 23.08.2021 | ||
IS | 22.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/18] | AT | 21.04.2021 | |
CZ | 21.04.2021 | ||
DK | 21.04.2021 | ||
EE | 21.04.2021 | ||
ES | 21.04.2021 | ||
FI | 21.04.2021 | ||
HR | 21.04.2021 | ||
LT | 21.04.2021 | ||
LV | 21.04.2021 | ||
MC | 21.04.2021 | ||
NL | 21.04.2021 | ||
PL | 21.04.2021 | ||
RO | 21.04.2021 | ||
RS | 21.04.2021 | ||
SE | 21.04.2021 | ||
SK | 21.04.2021 | ||
SM | 21.04.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
NO | 21.07.2021 | ||
GR | 22.07.2021 | ||
PT | 23.08.2021 | ||
IS | 22.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AT | 21.04.2021 | |
CZ | 21.04.2021 | ||
DK | 21.04.2021 | ||
EE | 21.04.2021 | ||
ES | 21.04.2021 | ||
FI | 21.04.2021 | ||
HR | 21.04.2021 | ||
LT | 21.04.2021 | ||
LV | 21.04.2021 | ||
NL | 21.04.2021 | ||
PL | 21.04.2021 | ||
RO | 21.04.2021 | ||
RS | 21.04.2021 | ||
SE | 21.04.2021 | ||
SK | 21.04.2021 | ||
SM | 21.04.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
NO | 21.07.2021 | ||
GR | 22.07.2021 | ||
PT | 23.08.2021 | ||
IS | 22.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | AT | 21.04.2021 | |
CZ | 21.04.2021 | ||
DK | 21.04.2021 | ||
ES | 21.04.2021 | ||
FI | 21.04.2021 | ||
HR | 21.04.2021 | ||
LT | 21.04.2021 | ||
LV | 21.04.2021 | ||
NL | 21.04.2021 | ||
PL | 21.04.2021 | ||
RO | 21.04.2021 | ||
RS | 21.04.2021 | ||
SE | 21.04.2021 | ||
SK | 21.04.2021 | ||
SM | 21.04.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
NO | 21.07.2021 | ||
GR | 22.07.2021 | ||
IS | 21.08.2021 | ||
PT | 23.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AT | 21.04.2021 | |
CZ | 21.04.2021 | ||
DK | 21.04.2021 | ||
ES | 21.04.2021 | ||
FI | 21.04.2021 | ||
HR | 21.04.2021 | ||
LT | 21.04.2021 | ||
LV | 21.04.2021 | ||
NL | 21.04.2021 | ||
PL | 21.04.2021 | ||
RS | 21.04.2021 | ||
SE | 21.04.2021 | ||
SM | 21.04.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
NO | 21.07.2021 | ||
GR | 22.07.2021 | ||
IS | 21.08.2021 | ||
PT | 23.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AT | 21.04.2021 | |
ES | 21.04.2021 | ||
FI | 21.04.2021 | ||
HR | 21.04.2021 | ||
LT | 21.04.2021 | ||
LV | 21.04.2021 | ||
NL | 21.04.2021 | ||
PL | 21.04.2021 | ||
RS | 21.04.2021 | ||
SE | 21.04.2021 | ||
SM | 21.04.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
NO | 21.07.2021 | ||
GR | 22.07.2021 | ||
IS | 21.08.2021 | ||
PT | 23.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/52] | AT | 21.04.2021 | |
ES | 21.04.2021 | ||
FI | 21.04.2021 | ||
HR | 21.04.2021 | ||
LT | 21.04.2021 | ||
LV | 21.04.2021 | ||
NL | 21.04.2021 | ||
PL | 21.04.2021 | ||
RS | 21.04.2021 | ||
SE | 21.04.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
NO | 21.07.2021 | ||
GR | 22.07.2021 | ||
IS | 21.08.2021 | ||
PT | 23.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/51] | AT | 21.04.2021 | |
ES | 21.04.2021 | ||
FI | 21.04.2021 | ||
HR | 21.04.2021 | ||
LT | 21.04.2021 | ||
LV | 21.04.2021 | ||
NL | 21.04.2021 | ||
RS | 21.04.2021 | ||
SE | 21.04.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
NO | 21.07.2021 | ||
GR | 22.07.2021 | ||
IS | 21.08.2021 | ||
PT | 23.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | AT | 21.04.2021 | |
FI | 21.04.2021 | ||
HR | 21.04.2021 | ||
LT | 21.04.2021 | ||
LV | 21.04.2021 | ||
NL | 21.04.2021 | ||
SE | 21.04.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
NO | 21.07.2021 | ||
GR | 22.07.2021 | ||
PT | 23.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/49] | AT | 21.04.2021 | |
FI | 21.04.2021 | ||
HR | 21.04.2021 | ||
LT | 21.04.2021 | ||
LV | 21.04.2021 | ||
NL | 21.04.2021 | ||
SE | 21.04.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
NO | 21.07.2021 | ||
GR | 22.07.2021 | ||
Former [2021/47] | AT | 21.04.2021 | |
FI | 21.04.2021 | ||
LT | 21.04.2021 | ||
NL | 21.04.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AT | 21.04.2021 | |
FI | 21.04.2021 | ||
LT | 21.04.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2009118890 (LIN YEN-CHUN [TW], et al) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [XY]US2011160949 (KONDO JUN [JP]) [X] 1-3,10-13 * the whole document * [Y] 4-9,14,15; | [A]WO2015094052 (HUSQVARNA AB [SE]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [Y] - GRUVER W A, "INTELLIGENT ROBOTICS IN MANUFACTURING, SERVICE, AND REHABILITATION:AN OVERVIEW", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON INDUSTRIAL ELECTRONICS, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (19940228), vol. 41, no. 1, doi:10.1109/41.281602, ISSN 0278-0046, pages 4 - 11, XP000452258 [Y] 4-9,14,15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/41.281602 | Examination | EP1301310 | EP2287694 | US2015003927 |