EP3269838 - HIGH TEMPERATURE RESISTANT TIAL ALLOY, METHOD FOR PRODUCTION OF A COMPOSENT FROM A CORRESPONDING TIAL ALLOY, COMPONENT FROM A CORRESPONDING TIAL ALLOY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2018/03] | HIGH TEMPERATURE RESISTANT TIAL ALLOY AND METHOD FOR PRODUCTION THEREOF, AND COMPONENT FROM A CORRESPONDING TIAL ALLOY | ||
[2021/11] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.07.2022 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 30.07.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.03.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.10.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.07.2018 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 15.12.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MTU Aero Engines AG Dachauer Strasse 665 80995 München / DE | [2018/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dr. Smarsly, Wilfried Rablstraße 16 81669 München / DE | 02 /
Dr. Schloffer, Martin Betzenweg 78b 81247 München / DE | 03 /
Dr. Clemens, Helmut Salzlände 15/15 8700 Leoben / AT | 04 /
Klein, Thomas Matthäus Krenauerstraße 2/18 8700 Leoben / AT | [2018/03] | Application number, filing date | 16178936.7 | 12.07.2016 | [2018/03] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3269838 | Date: | 17.01.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3269838 | Date: | 01.09.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.01.2017 | Classification | IPC: | C22F1/18, C22C14/00, C22C30/00 | [2018/03] | CPC: |
C22F1/183 (EP,US);
C22C14/00 (EP,US);
C22C30/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/34] |
Former [2018/03] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | HOCHWARMFESTE TIAL-LEGIERUNG, HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN EINES BAUTEILS AUS EINER ENTSPRECHENDEN TIAL-LEGIERUNG UND BAUTEIL AUS EINER ENTSPRECHENDEN TIAL-LEGIERUNG | [2021/11] | English: | HIGH TEMPERATURE RESISTANT TIAL ALLOY, METHOD FOR PRODUCTION OF A COMPOSENT FROM A CORRESPONDING TIAL ALLOY, COMPONENT FROM A CORRESPONDING TIAL ALLOY | [2021/11] | French: | ALLIAGE TIAL THERMOSTABLE, PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION D'UN COMPOSANT CONSTITUÉ D'UN ALLIAGE TIAL CORRESPONDANT, COMPOSANT CONSTITUÉ D'UN ALLIAGE TIAL CORRESPONDANT | [2021/11] |
Former [2018/03] | HOCHWARMFESTE TIAL-LEGIERUNG UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN HIERFÜR SOWIE BAUTEIL AUS EINER ENTSPRECHENDEN TIAL-LEGIERUNG | ||
Former [2018/03] | HIGH TEMPERATURE RESISTANT TIAL ALLOY AND METHOD FOR PRODUCTION THEREOF, AND COMPONENT FROM A CORRESPONDING TIAL ALLOY | ||
Former [2018/03] | ALLIAGE TIAL THERMOSTABLE ET PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION ASSOCIÉ ET COMPOSANT CONSTITUÉ D'UN ALLIAGE TIAL CORRESPONDANT | Examination procedure | 12.07.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.07.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.07.2018 | Examination requested [2018/34] | 24.10.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M10) | 28.08.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.03.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.07.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 13.07.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.07.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 02.06.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 12.07.2016 | AL | 01.09.2021 | CY | 01.09.2021 | CZ | 01.09.2021 | DK | 01.09.2021 | EE | 01.09.2021 | FI | 01.09.2021 | HR | 01.09.2021 | IT | 01.09.2021 | LT | 01.09.2021 | LV | 01.09.2021 | MC | 01.09.2021 | MK | 01.09.2021 | MT | 01.09.2021 | NL | 01.09.2021 | PL | 01.09.2021 | RO | 01.09.2021 | RS | 01.09.2021 | SE | 01.09.2021 | SI | 01.09.2021 | SK | 01.09.2021 | SM | 01.09.2021 | TR | 01.09.2021 | BG | 01.12.2021 | NO | 01.12.2021 | GR | 02.12.2021 | IS | 01.01.2022 | PT | 03.01.2022 | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/29] | HU | 12.07.2016 | |
AL | 01.09.2021 | ||
CY | 01.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 01.09.2021 | ||
DK | 01.09.2021 | ||
EE | 01.09.2021 | ||
FI | 01.09.2021 | ||
HR | 01.09.2021 | ||
IT | 01.09.2021 | ||
LT | 01.09.2021 | ||
LV | 01.09.2021 | ||
MC | 01.09.2021 | ||
MK | 01.09.2021 | ||
NL | 01.09.2021 | ||
PL | 01.09.2021 | ||
RO | 01.09.2021 | ||
RS | 01.09.2021 | ||
SE | 01.09.2021 | ||
SI | 01.09.2021 | ||
SK | 01.09.2021 | ||
SM | 01.09.2021 | ||
TR | 01.09.2021 | ||
BG | 01.12.2021 | ||
NO | 01.12.2021 | ||
GR | 02.12.2021 | ||
IS | 01.01.2022 | ||
PT | 03.01.2022 | ||
Former [2024/22] | HU | 12.07.2016 | |
AL | 01.09.2021 | ||
CY | 01.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 01.09.2021 | ||
DK | 01.09.2021 | ||
EE | 01.09.2021 | ||
FI | 01.09.2021 | ||
HR | 01.09.2021 | ||
IT | 01.09.2021 | ||
LT | 01.09.2021 | ||
LV | 01.09.2021 | ||
MC | 01.09.2021 | ||
MK | 01.09.2021 | ||
NL | 01.09.2021 | ||
PL | 01.09.2021 | ||
RO | 01.09.2021 | ||
RS | 01.09.2021 | ||
SE | 01.09.2021 | ||
SI | 01.09.2021 | ||
SK | 01.09.2021 | ||
SM | 01.09.2021 | ||
BG | 01.12.2021 | ||
NO | 01.12.2021 | ||
GR | 02.12.2021 | ||
IS | 01.01.2022 | ||
PT | 03.01.2022 | ||
Former [2024/20] | HU | 12.07.2016 | |
AL | 01.09.2021 | ||
CY | 01.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 01.09.2021 | ||
DK | 01.09.2021 | ||
EE | 01.09.2021 | ||
FI | 01.09.2021 | ||
HR | 01.09.2021 | ||
IT | 01.09.2021 | ||
LT | 01.09.2021 | ||
LV | 01.09.2021 | ||
MC | 01.09.2021 | ||
NL | 01.09.2021 | ||
PL | 01.09.2021 | ||
RO | 01.09.2021 | ||
RS | 01.09.2021 | ||
SE | 01.09.2021 | ||
SI | 01.09.2021 | ||
SK | 01.09.2021 | ||
SM | 01.09.2021 | ||
BG | 01.12.2021 | ||
NO | 01.12.2021 | ||
GR | 02.12.2021 | ||
IS | 01.01.2022 | ||
PT | 03.01.2022 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 12.07.2016 | |
AL | 01.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 01.09.2021 | ||
DK | 01.09.2021 | ||
EE | 01.09.2021 | ||
FI | 01.09.2021 | ||
HR | 01.09.2021 | ||
IT | 01.09.2021 | ||
LT | 01.09.2021 | ||
LV | 01.09.2021 | ||
MC | 01.09.2021 | ||
NL | 01.09.2021 | ||
PL | 01.09.2021 | ||
RO | 01.09.2021 | ||
RS | 01.09.2021 | ||
SE | 01.09.2021 | ||
SI | 01.09.2021 | ||
SK | 01.09.2021 | ||
SM | 01.09.2021 | ||
BG | 01.12.2021 | ||
NO | 01.12.2021 | ||
GR | 02.12.2021 | ||
IS | 01.01.2022 | ||
PT | 03.01.2022 | ||
Former [2023/11] | AL | 01.09.2021 | |
CZ | 01.09.2021 | ||
DK | 01.09.2021 | ||
EE | 01.09.2021 | ||
FI | 01.09.2021 | ||
HR | 01.09.2021 | ||
IT | 01.09.2021 | ||
LT | 01.09.2021 | ||
LV | 01.09.2021 | ||
MC | 01.09.2021 | ||
NL | 01.09.2021 | ||
PL | 01.09.2021 | ||
RO | 01.09.2021 | ||
RS | 01.09.2021 | ||
SE | 01.09.2021 | ||
SI | 01.09.2021 | ||
SK | 01.09.2021 | ||
SM | 01.09.2021 | ||
BG | 01.12.2021 | ||
NO | 01.12.2021 | ||
GR | 02.12.2021 | ||
IS | 01.01.2022 | ||
PT | 03.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AL | 01.09.2021 | |
CZ | 01.09.2021 | ||
DK | 01.09.2021 | ||
EE | 01.09.2021 | ||
FI | 01.09.2021 | ||
HR | 01.09.2021 | ||
IT | 01.09.2021 | ||
LT | 01.09.2021 | ||
LV | 01.09.2021 | ||
NL | 01.09.2021 | ||
PL | 01.09.2021 | ||
RO | 01.09.2021 | ||
RS | 01.09.2021 | ||
SE | 01.09.2021 | ||
SI | 01.09.2021 | ||
SK | 01.09.2021 | ||
SM | 01.09.2021 | ||
BG | 01.12.2021 | ||
NO | 01.12.2021 | ||
GR | 02.12.2021 | ||
IS | 01.01.2022 | ||
PT | 03.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 01.09.2021 | |
CZ | 01.09.2021 | ||
EE | 01.09.2021 | ||
FI | 01.09.2021 | ||
HR | 01.09.2021 | ||
LT | 01.09.2021 | ||
LV | 01.09.2021 | ||
NL | 01.09.2021 | ||
PL | 01.09.2021 | ||
RO | 01.09.2021 | ||
RS | 01.09.2021 | ||
SE | 01.09.2021 | ||
SK | 01.09.2021 | ||
SM | 01.09.2021 | ||
BG | 01.12.2021 | ||
NO | 01.12.2021 | ||
GR | 02.12.2021 | ||
IS | 01.01.2022 | ||
PT | 03.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/25] | CZ | 01.09.2021 | |
EE | 01.09.2021 | ||
FI | 01.09.2021 | ||
HR | 01.09.2021 | ||
LT | 01.09.2021 | ||
LV | 01.09.2021 | ||
NL | 01.09.2021 | ||
PL | 01.09.2021 | ||
RO | 01.09.2021 | ||
RS | 01.09.2021 | ||
SE | 01.09.2021 | ||
SK | 01.09.2021 | ||
SM | 01.09.2021 | ||
BG | 01.12.2021 | ||
NO | 01.12.2021 | ||
GR | 02.12.2021 | ||
IS | 01.01.2022 | ||
PT | 03.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/24] | CZ | 01.09.2021 | |
EE | 01.09.2021 | ||
FI | 01.09.2021 | ||
HR | 01.09.2021 | ||
LT | 01.09.2021 | ||
LV | 01.09.2021 | ||
NL | 01.09.2021 | ||
PL | 01.09.2021 | ||
RO | 01.09.2021 | ||
RS | 01.09.2021 | ||
SE | 01.09.2021 | ||
SK | 01.09.2021 | ||
BG | 01.12.2021 | ||
NO | 01.12.2021 | ||
GR | 02.12.2021 | ||
IS | 01.01.2022 | ||
PT | 03.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/10] | FI | 01.09.2021 | |
HR | 01.09.2021 | ||
LT | 01.09.2021 | ||
LV | 01.09.2021 | ||
PL | 01.09.2021 | ||
RS | 01.09.2021 | ||
SE | 01.09.2021 | ||
BG | 01.12.2021 | ||
NO | 01.12.2021 | ||
GR | 02.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | FI | 01.09.2021 | |
LT | 01.09.2021 | ||
RS | 01.09.2021 | ||
SE | 01.09.2021 | ||
BG | 01.12.2021 | ||
NO | 01.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | FI | 01.09.2021 | |
LT | 01.09.2021 | ||
SE | 01.09.2021 | ||
BG | 01.12.2021 | ||
NO | 01.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | LT | 01.09.2021 | |
NO | 01.12.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]EP2851445 (MTU AERO ENGINES AG [DE]) [X] 1,2,6-8,10-18 * the whole document * [A] 3-5 [I] 9; | [A]WO2012041276 (MTU AERO ENGINES GMBH [DE], et al) [A] 1-18 * the whole document *; | [A]US2016010184 (SMARSLY WILFRIED [DE], et al) [A] 1-18 * the whole document * | [XA] - KLEIN THOMAS ET AL, "Silicon distribution and silicide precipitation during annealing in an advanced multi-phase[gamma]-TiAl based alloy", ACTA MATERIALIA, ELSEVIER, OXFORD, GB, (20160323), vol. 110, doi:10.1016/J.ACTAMAT.2016.03.050, ISSN 1359-6454, pages 236 - 245, XP029497149 [X] 1,2,13-18 * the whole document * [A] 3-12 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.actamat.2016.03.050 | by applicant | WO2009052792 |