EP3117764 - A MAGNET-BASED MONITORING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.07.2020 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 31.05.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.01.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.07.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.07.2017 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 16.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Getchell Technologies LLC 877 Cedar Street, Suite 150 Santa Cruz, CA 95060 / US | [2017/43] |
Former [2017/03] | For all designated states Readdie, Mark A. P.O.Box 320 Santa Cruz, CA 95061-0320 / US | ||
For all designated states Chatwin, Jeremy G. 131 Getchell Street Santa Cruz, CA 95060 / US | |||
For all designated states Nyong'o, Omondi L. 272 Page Street San Francisco, CA 94102 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Readdie, Mark A. P.O. Box 320 Santa Cruz, CA 95061-0320 / US | 02 /
Chatwin, Jeremy G. 131 Getchell Street Santa Cruz, CA 95060 / US | 03 /
Nyong'o, Omondi L. 272 Page Street San Francisco, CA 94102 / US | [2017/34] |
Former [2017/03] | 01 /
see applicant ... | Representative(s) | Derry, Paul Stefan, et al Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | [2017/03] | Application number, filing date | 16179579.4 | 14.07.2016 | [2017/03] | Priority number, date | US201562192062P | 14.07.2015 Original published format: US 201562192062 P | US201615207879 | 12.07.2016 Original published format: US201615207879 | [2017/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3117764 | Date: | 18.01.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3117764 | Date: | 03.07.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.12.2016 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/00, A61B5/06, A61F13/12 | [2017/03] | CPC: |
A61B5/4833 (EP,US);
A61B5/6803 (EP,US);
A61F9/04 (EP,US);
A61B2562/0223 (EP,US);
A61B5/6821 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/34] |
Former [2017/03] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | MAGNETBASIERTES ÜBERWACHUNGSSYSTEM | [2017/03] | English: | A MAGNET-BASED MONITORING SYSTEM | [2017/03] | French: | SYSTÈME DE SURVEILLANCE UTILISANT DES AIMANTS | [2017/03] | Examination procedure | 14.07.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 14.07.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.07.2017 | Examination requested [2017/34] | 24.07.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.12.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.01.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.05.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 23.05.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.05.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 03.06.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 14.07.2016 | AL | 03.07.2019 | AT | 03.07.2019 | CY | 03.07.2019 | CZ | 03.07.2019 | DK | 03.07.2019 | EE | 03.07.2019 | ES | 03.07.2019 | FI | 03.07.2019 | HR | 03.07.2019 | IT | 03.07.2019 | LT | 03.07.2019 | LV | 03.07.2019 | MC | 03.07.2019 | MK | 03.07.2019 | MT | 03.07.2019 | NL | 03.07.2019 | PL | 03.07.2019 | RO | 03.07.2019 | RS | 03.07.2019 | SE | 03.07.2019 | SI | 03.07.2019 | SK | 03.07.2019 | SM | 03.07.2019 | TR | 03.07.2019 | IE | 14.07.2019 | LU | 14.07.2019 | BE | 31.07.2019 | CH | 31.07.2019 | LI | 31.07.2019 | BG | 03.10.2019 | NO | 03.10.2019 | GR | 04.10.2019 | IS | 03.11.2019 | PT | 04.11.2019 | [2022/32] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 14.07.2016 | |
AL | 03.07.2019 | ||
AT | 03.07.2019 | ||
CY | 03.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 03.07.2019 | ||
DK | 03.07.2019 | ||
EE | 03.07.2019 | ||
ES | 03.07.2019 | ||
FI | 03.07.2019 | ||
HR | 03.07.2019 | ||
IT | 03.07.2019 | ||
LT | 03.07.2019 | ||
LV | 03.07.2019 | ||
MC | 03.07.2019 | ||
MT | 03.07.2019 | ||
NL | 03.07.2019 | ||
PL | 03.07.2019 | ||
RO | 03.07.2019 | ||
RS | 03.07.2019 | ||
SE | 03.07.2019 | ||
SI | 03.07.2019 | ||
SK | 03.07.2019 | ||
SM | 03.07.2019 | ||
TR | 03.07.2019 | ||
IE | 14.07.2019 | ||
LU | 14.07.2019 | ||
BE | 31.07.2019 | ||
CH | 31.07.2019 | ||
LI | 31.07.2019 | ||
BG | 03.10.2019 | ||
NO | 03.10.2019 | ||
GR | 04.10.2019 | ||
IS | 03.11.2019 | ||
PT | 04.11.2019 | ||
Former [2021/33] | HU | 14.07.2016 | |
AL | 03.07.2019 | ||
AT | 03.07.2019 | ||
CY | 03.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 03.07.2019 | ||
DK | 03.07.2019 | ||
EE | 03.07.2019 | ||
ES | 03.07.2019 | ||
FI | 03.07.2019 | ||
HR | 03.07.2019 | ||
IT | 03.07.2019 | ||
LT | 03.07.2019 | ||
LV | 03.07.2019 | ||
MC | 03.07.2019 | ||
NL | 03.07.2019 | ||
PL | 03.07.2019 | ||
RO | 03.07.2019 | ||
RS | 03.07.2019 | ||
SE | 03.07.2019 | ||
SI | 03.07.2019 | ||
SK | 03.07.2019 | ||
SM | 03.07.2019 | ||
TR | 03.07.2019 | ||
IE | 14.07.2019 | ||
LU | 14.07.2019 | ||
BE | 31.07.2019 | ||
CH | 31.07.2019 | ||
LI | 31.07.2019 | ||
BG | 03.10.2019 | ||
NO | 03.10.2019 | ||
GR | 04.10.2019 | ||
IS | 03.11.2019 | ||
PT | 04.11.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 03.07.2019 | |
AT | 03.07.2019 | ||
CY | 03.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 03.07.2019 | ||
DK | 03.07.2019 | ||
EE | 03.07.2019 | ||
ES | 03.07.2019 | ||
FI | 03.07.2019 | ||
HR | 03.07.2019 | ||
IT | 03.07.2019 | ||
LT | 03.07.2019 | ||
LV | 03.07.2019 | ||
MC | 03.07.2019 | ||
NL | 03.07.2019 | ||
PL | 03.07.2019 | ||
RO | 03.07.2019 | ||
RS | 03.07.2019 | ||
SE | 03.07.2019 | ||
SI | 03.07.2019 | ||
SK | 03.07.2019 | ||
SM | 03.07.2019 | ||
TR | 03.07.2019 | ||
IE | 14.07.2019 | ||
LU | 14.07.2019 | ||
BE | 31.07.2019 | ||
CH | 31.07.2019 | ||
LI | 31.07.2019 | ||
BG | 03.10.2019 | ||
NO | 03.10.2019 | ||
GR | 04.10.2019 | ||
IS | 03.11.2019 | ||
PT | 04.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 03.07.2019 | |
AT | 03.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 03.07.2019 | ||
DK | 03.07.2019 | ||
EE | 03.07.2019 | ||
ES | 03.07.2019 | ||
FI | 03.07.2019 | ||
HR | 03.07.2019 | ||
IT | 03.07.2019 | ||
LT | 03.07.2019 | ||
LV | 03.07.2019 | ||
MC | 03.07.2019 | ||
NL | 03.07.2019 | ||
PL | 03.07.2019 | ||
RO | 03.07.2019 | ||
RS | 03.07.2019 | ||
SE | 03.07.2019 | ||
SI | 03.07.2019 | ||
SK | 03.07.2019 | ||
SM | 03.07.2019 | ||
TR | 03.07.2019 | ||
IE | 14.07.2019 | ||
LU | 14.07.2019 | ||
BE | 31.07.2019 | ||
CH | 31.07.2019 | ||
LI | 31.07.2019 | ||
BG | 03.10.2019 | ||
NO | 03.10.2019 | ||
GR | 04.10.2019 | ||
IS | 03.11.2019 | ||
PT | 04.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 03.07.2019 | |
AT | 03.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 03.07.2019 | ||
DK | 03.07.2019 | ||
EE | 03.07.2019 | ||
ES | 03.07.2019 | ||
FI | 03.07.2019 | ||
HR | 03.07.2019 | ||
IT | 03.07.2019 | ||
LT | 03.07.2019 | ||
LV | 03.07.2019 | ||
MC | 03.07.2019 | ||
NL | 03.07.2019 | ||
PL | 03.07.2019 | ||
RO | 03.07.2019 | ||
RS | 03.07.2019 | ||
SE | 03.07.2019 | ||
SK | 03.07.2019 | ||
SM | 03.07.2019 | ||
TR | 03.07.2019 | ||
IE | 14.07.2019 | ||
LU | 14.07.2019 | ||
BE | 31.07.2019 | ||
CH | 31.07.2019 | ||
LI | 31.07.2019 | ||
BG | 03.10.2019 | ||
NO | 03.10.2019 | ||
GR | 04.10.2019 | ||
IS | 03.11.2019 | ||
PT | 04.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/27] | AL | 03.07.2019 | |
AT | 03.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 03.07.2019 | ||
DK | 03.07.2019 | ||
EE | 03.07.2019 | ||
ES | 03.07.2019 | ||
FI | 03.07.2019 | ||
HR | 03.07.2019 | ||
IT | 03.07.2019 | ||
LT | 03.07.2019 | ||
LV | 03.07.2019 | ||
MC | 03.07.2019 | ||
NL | 03.07.2019 | ||
PL | 03.07.2019 | ||
RO | 03.07.2019 | ||
RS | 03.07.2019 | ||
SE | 03.07.2019 | ||
SK | 03.07.2019 | ||
SM | 03.07.2019 | ||
TR | 03.07.2019 | ||
LU | 14.07.2019 | ||
BE | 31.07.2019 | ||
CH | 31.07.2019 | ||
LI | 31.07.2019 | ||
BG | 03.10.2019 | ||
NO | 03.10.2019 | ||
GR | 04.10.2019 | ||
PT | 04.11.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AL | 03.07.2019 | |
AT | 03.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 03.07.2019 | ||
DK | 03.07.2019 | ||
EE | 03.07.2019 | ||
ES | 03.07.2019 | ||
FI | 03.07.2019 | ||
HR | 03.07.2019 | ||
IT | 03.07.2019 | ||
LT | 03.07.2019 | ||
LV | 03.07.2019 | ||
MC | 03.07.2019 | ||
NL | 03.07.2019 | ||
PL | 03.07.2019 | ||
RO | 03.07.2019 | ||
RS | 03.07.2019 | ||
SE | 03.07.2019 | ||
SK | 03.07.2019 | ||
TR | 03.07.2019 | ||
LU | 14.07.2019 | ||
BE | 31.07.2019 | ||
CH | 31.07.2019 | ||
LI | 31.07.2019 | ||
BG | 03.10.2019 | ||
NO | 03.10.2019 | ||
GR | 04.10.2019 | ||
PT | 04.11.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | AL | 03.07.2019 | |
AT | 03.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 03.07.2019 | ||
DK | 03.07.2019 | ||
EE | 03.07.2019 | ||
ES | 03.07.2019 | ||
FI | 03.07.2019 | ||
HR | 03.07.2019 | ||
IT | 03.07.2019 | ||
LT | 03.07.2019 | ||
LV | 03.07.2019 | ||
MC | 03.07.2019 | ||
NL | 03.07.2019 | ||
PL | 03.07.2019 | ||
RO | 03.07.2019 | ||
RS | 03.07.2019 | ||
SE | 03.07.2019 | ||
TR | 03.07.2019 | ||
BE | 31.07.2019 | ||
CH | 31.07.2019 | ||
LI | 31.07.2019 | ||
BG | 03.10.2019 | ||
NO | 03.10.2019 | ||
GR | 04.10.2019 | ||
PT | 04.11.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | AL | 03.07.2019 | |
AT | 03.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 03.07.2019 | ||
DK | 03.07.2019 | ||
EE | 03.07.2019 | ||
ES | 03.07.2019 | ||
FI | 03.07.2019 | ||
HR | 03.07.2019 | ||
IT | 03.07.2019 | ||
LT | 03.07.2019 | ||
LV | 03.07.2019 | ||
NL | 03.07.2019 | ||
PL | 03.07.2019 | ||
RO | 03.07.2019 | ||
RS | 03.07.2019 | ||
SE | 03.07.2019 | ||
TR | 03.07.2019 | ||
BG | 03.10.2019 | ||
NO | 03.10.2019 | ||
GR | 04.10.2019 | ||
IS | 03.11.2019 | ||
PT | 04.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/22] | AL | 03.07.2019 | |
AT | 03.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 03.07.2019 | ||
DK | 03.07.2019 | ||
EE | 03.07.2019 | ||
ES | 03.07.2019 | ||
FI | 03.07.2019 | ||
HR | 03.07.2019 | ||
LT | 03.07.2019 | ||
LV | 03.07.2019 | ||
NL | 03.07.2019 | ||
RS | 03.07.2019 | ||
SE | 03.07.2019 | ||
TR | 03.07.2019 | ||
BG | 03.10.2019 | ||
NO | 03.10.2019 | ||
GR | 04.10.2019 | ||
IS | 03.11.2019 | ||
PT | 04.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 03.07.2019 | |
AT | 03.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 03.07.2019 | ||
ES | 03.07.2019 | ||
FI | 03.07.2019 | ||
HR | 03.07.2019 | ||
LT | 03.07.2019 | ||
LV | 03.07.2019 | ||
NL | 03.07.2019 | ||
RS | 03.07.2019 | ||
SE | 03.07.2019 | ||
TR | 03.07.2019 | ||
BG | 03.10.2019 | ||
NO | 03.10.2019 | ||
GR | 04.10.2019 | ||
IS | 03.11.2019 | ||
PT | 04.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/15] | AL | 03.07.2019 | |
AT | 03.07.2019 | ||
CZ | 03.07.2019 | ||
ES | 03.07.2019 | ||
FI | 03.07.2019 | ||
HR | 03.07.2019 | ||
LT | 03.07.2019 | ||
LV | 03.07.2019 | ||
NL | 03.07.2019 | ||
RS | 03.07.2019 | ||
SE | 03.07.2019 | ||
BG | 03.10.2019 | ||
NO | 03.10.2019 | ||
GR | 04.10.2019 | ||
IS | 03.11.2019 | ||
PT | 04.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | AT | 03.07.2019 | |
CZ | 03.07.2019 | ||
ES | 03.07.2019 | ||
FI | 03.07.2019 | ||
HR | 03.07.2019 | ||
LT | 03.07.2019 | ||
LV | 03.07.2019 | ||
NL | 03.07.2019 | ||
RS | 03.07.2019 | ||
SE | 03.07.2019 | ||
BG | 03.10.2019 | ||
NO | 03.10.2019 | ||
GR | 04.10.2019 | ||
IS | 03.11.2019 | ||
PT | 04.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AT | 03.07.2019 | |
CZ | 03.07.2019 | ||
ES | 03.07.2019 | ||
FI | 03.07.2019 | ||
HR | 03.07.2019 | ||
LT | 03.07.2019 | ||
LV | 03.07.2019 | ||
NL | 03.07.2019 | ||
RS | 03.07.2019 | ||
SE | 03.07.2019 | ||
BG | 03.10.2019 | ||
NO | 03.10.2019 | ||
GR | 04.10.2019 | ||
PT | 04.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | AT | 03.07.2019 | |
CZ | 03.07.2019 | ||
FI | 03.07.2019 | ||
LT | 03.07.2019 | ||
NL | 03.07.2019 | ||
SE | 03.07.2019 | ||
BG | 03.10.2019 | ||
NO | 03.10.2019 | ||
PT | 04.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | CZ | 03.07.2019 | |
FI | 03.07.2019 | ||
LT | 03.07.2019 | ||
NL | 03.07.2019 | ||
NO | 03.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/08] | LT | 03.07.2019 | |
NL | 03.07.2019 | ||
NO | 03.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/07] | NL | 03.07.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5879292 (STERNBERG EDWARD A [US], et al) [A] 1-16 * column 3, line 38 - column 7, line 22; figure - *; | [XI]US2008177170 (ROBERTS CYNTHIA J [US], et al) [X] 1,9,10,13 * paragraph [0012] * * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0038]; figure - * [I] 14-16; | [X]US2010322859 (JONES CHRISTOPHER M [US], et al) [X] 1,9,10 * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0041]; figure - *; | [A]WO2013050735 (UNIV LEICESTER [GB]) [A] 1-16 * page 2, line 11 - page 8, line 4; figure 1 *; | [A] - KAI JANUSCHOWSKI ET AL, "Measuring wearing times of glasses and ocular patches using a thermosensor device from orthodontics", ACTA OPHTHALMOLOGICA: THE OPHTHALMOLOGICAL JOURNAL OF THE NORDIC COUNTRIES, Denmark, (20131201), vol. 91, no. 8, doi:10.1111/aos.12171, ISSN 1755-375X, pages e635 - e640, XP055246470 [A] 1-16 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/aos.12171 | [A] - YAROSLAVA CHOPOVSKA ET AL, "Electronic recording of occlusion treatment for amblyopia: potential of the new technology", GRAEFE'S ARCHIVE FOR CLINICAL AND EXPERIMENTAL OPHTHALMOLOGY ; INCORPORATING GERMAN JOURNAL OF OPHTHALMOLOGY, SPRINGER, BERLIN, DE, (20050601), vol. 243, no. 6, doi:10.1007/S00417-004-1067-8, ISSN 1435-702X, pages 539 - 544, XP019342798 [A] 1-16 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s00417-004-1067-8 |