EP3121184 - BENZENE-BASED DIPHOSPHINE LIGANDS FOR ALKOXYCARBONYLATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.07.2019 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 10.08.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.04.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.10.2017 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.05.2017 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 23.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Evonik Degussa GmbH Rellinghauser Straße 1-11 45128 Essen / DE | [2018/37] |
Former [2017/04] | For all designated states Evonik Degussa GmbH Rellinghauser Straße 1- 11 45128 Essen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DONG, Kaiwu 11 Dong 1 Dan Yuan 1002 Shi He Huan Yuan Xiao Qu 236800 Bo Zhou / CN | 02 /
NEUMANN, Helfried Amberg 4A 18055 Rostock / DE | 03 /
JACKSTELL, Ralf Hummelweg 4 27478 Cuxhaven Altenwalde / DE | 04 /
BELLER, Matthias Kliffstr. 11 18211 Ostseebad Nienhagen / DE | 05 /
FRANKE, Robert Uerdinger Str. 3 45772 Marl / DE | 06 /
HESS, Dieter Langehegge 145 45770 Marl / DE | 07 /
DYBALLA, Katrin Marie Börster Weg 83 45657 Recklinghausen / DE | 08 /
FRIDAG, Dirk Augustusstr. 12 45721 Haltern am See / DE | 09 /
GEILEN, Frank Weseler Str. 55A 45721 Haltern am See / DE | [2017/04] | Application number, filing date | 16180045.3 | 19.07.2016 | [2017/04] | Priority number, date | DE201510213918 | 23.07.2015 Original published format: DE102015213918 | [2017/04] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3121184 | Date: | 25.01.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/04] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP3121184 | Date: | 08.02.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3121184 | Date: | 12.09.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.01.2017 | Classification | IPC: | B01J31/22, B01J31/24, C07C67/38, C07F17/02, C07F9/572, C07F9/655, C07F9/6553, C07F15/00, C07F9/58, C07F9/6506 | [2018/16] | CPC: |
C07C67/38 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C07F9/5022 (BR,KR);
C07F9/58 (EP,CN,US);
B01J31/12 (KR);
B01J31/2295 (US);
B01J31/24 (US);
B01J31/2404 (US);
B01J31/2409 (CN,US);
C07F15/006 (EP,KR,US);
C07F17/02 (US);
C07F9/5027 (BR);
C07F9/5045 (BR);
C07F9/505 (BR);
C07F9/572 (EP,US);
C07F9/6506 (EP,US);
C07F9/65515 (US);
C07F9/655345 (US);
C08G63/826 (BR);
B01J2231/321 (US);
B01J2231/49 (CN,US);
B01J2531/0208 (US);
B01J2531/0213 (CN);
B01J2531/0241 (CN);
B01J2531/824 (CN,US);
B01J2531/842 (US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C07C67/38, C07C69/24 (CN,EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2017/04] | C07F15/00, C07F9/58, C07F9/6506 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/24] |
Former [2017/04] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | BENZOLBASIERTE DIPHOSPHINLIGANDEN FÜR DIE ALKOXYCARBONYLIERUNG | [2017/04] | English: | BENZENE-BASED DIPHOSPHINE LIGANDS FOR ALKOXYCARBONYLATION | [2017/04] | French: | LIGANDS DE DISPHOSPHINE À BASE DE BENZOL POUR L'ALKOXY-CARBONYLATION | [2017/04] | Examination procedure | 19.07.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 13.01.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.05.2017 | Examination requested [2017/24] | 26.10.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.11.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.04.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.07.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 20.07.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.07.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 13.06.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 19.07.2016 | AL | 12.09.2018 | CY | 12.09.2018 | CZ | 12.09.2018 | DK | 12.09.2018 | EE | 12.09.2018 | FI | 12.09.2018 | HR | 12.09.2018 | LT | 12.09.2018 | LV | 12.09.2018 | MC | 12.09.2018 | MK | 12.09.2018 | MT | 12.09.2018 | RO | 12.09.2018 | RS | 12.09.2018 | SI | 12.09.2018 | SK | 12.09.2018 | SM | 12.09.2018 | TR | 12.09.2018 | BG | 12.12.2018 | NO | 12.12.2018 | GR | 13.12.2018 | IS | 12.01.2019 | PT | 12.01.2019 | [2022/32] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 19.07.2016 | |
AL | 12.09.2018 | ||
CY | 12.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 12.09.2018 | ||
DK | 12.09.2018 | ||
EE | 12.09.2018 | ||
FI | 12.09.2018 | ||
HR | 12.09.2018 | ||
LT | 12.09.2018 | ||
LV | 12.09.2018 | ||
MC | 12.09.2018 | ||
MT | 12.09.2018 | ||
RO | 12.09.2018 | ||
RS | 12.09.2018 | ||
SI | 12.09.2018 | ||
SK | 12.09.2018 | ||
SM | 12.09.2018 | ||
TR | 12.09.2018 | ||
BG | 12.12.2018 | ||
NO | 12.12.2018 | ||
GR | 13.12.2018 | ||
IS | 12.01.2019 | ||
PT | 12.01.2019 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 19.07.2016 | |
AL | 12.09.2018 | ||
CY | 12.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 12.09.2018 | ||
DK | 12.09.2018 | ||
EE | 12.09.2018 | ||
FI | 12.09.2018 | ||
HR | 12.09.2018 | ||
LT | 12.09.2018 | ||
LV | 12.09.2018 | ||
MC | 12.09.2018 | ||
RO | 12.09.2018 | ||
RS | 12.09.2018 | ||
SI | 12.09.2018 | ||
SK | 12.09.2018 | ||
SM | 12.09.2018 | ||
TR | 12.09.2018 | ||
BG | 12.12.2018 | ||
NO | 12.12.2018 | ||
GR | 13.12.2018 | ||
IS | 12.01.2019 | ||
PT | 12.01.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 12.09.2018 | |
CY | 12.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 12.09.2018 | ||
DK | 12.09.2018 | ||
EE | 12.09.2018 | ||
FI | 12.09.2018 | ||
HR | 12.09.2018 | ||
LT | 12.09.2018 | ||
LV | 12.09.2018 | ||
MC | 12.09.2018 | ||
RO | 12.09.2018 | ||
RS | 12.09.2018 | ||
SI | 12.09.2018 | ||
SK | 12.09.2018 | ||
SM | 12.09.2018 | ||
TR | 12.09.2018 | ||
BG | 12.12.2018 | ||
NO | 12.12.2018 | ||
GR | 13.12.2018 | ||
IS | 12.01.2019 | ||
PT | 12.01.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 12.09.2018 | |
CZ | 12.09.2018 | ||
DK | 12.09.2018 | ||
EE | 12.09.2018 | ||
FI | 12.09.2018 | ||
HR | 12.09.2018 | ||
LT | 12.09.2018 | ||
LV | 12.09.2018 | ||
MC | 12.09.2018 | ||
RO | 12.09.2018 | ||
RS | 12.09.2018 | ||
SI | 12.09.2018 | ||
SK | 12.09.2018 | ||
SM | 12.09.2018 | ||
TR | 12.09.2018 | ||
BG | 12.12.2018 | ||
NO | 12.12.2018 | ||
GR | 13.12.2018 | ||
IS | 12.01.2019 | ||
PT | 12.01.2019 | ||
Former [2020/14] | AL | 12.09.2018 | |
CZ | 12.09.2018 | ||
DK | 12.09.2018 | ||
EE | 12.09.2018 | ||
FI | 12.09.2018 | ||
HR | 12.09.2018 | ||
LT | 12.09.2018 | ||
LV | 12.09.2018 | ||
MC | 12.09.2018 | ||
RO | 12.09.2018 | ||
RS | 12.09.2018 | ||
SI | 12.09.2018 | ||
SK | 12.09.2018 | ||
SM | 12.09.2018 | ||
BG | 12.12.2018 | ||
NO | 12.12.2018 | ||
GR | 13.12.2018 | ||
IS | 12.01.2019 | ||
PT | 12.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AL | 12.09.2018 | |
CZ | 12.09.2018 | ||
DK | 12.09.2018 | ||
EE | 12.09.2018 | ||
FI | 12.09.2018 | ||
HR | 12.09.2018 | ||
LT | 12.09.2018 | ||
LV | 12.09.2018 | ||
RO | 12.09.2018 | ||
RS | 12.09.2018 | ||
SI | 12.09.2018 | ||
SK | 12.09.2018 | ||
SM | 12.09.2018 | ||
BG | 12.12.2018 | ||
NO | 12.12.2018 | ||
GR | 13.12.2018 | ||
IS | 12.01.2019 | ||
PT | 12.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | AL | 12.09.2018 | |
CZ | 12.09.2018 | ||
DK | 12.09.2018 | ||
EE | 12.09.2018 | ||
FI | 12.09.2018 | ||
HR | 12.09.2018 | ||
LT | 12.09.2018 | ||
LV | 12.09.2018 | ||
RO | 12.09.2018 | ||
RS | 12.09.2018 | ||
SK | 12.09.2018 | ||
SM | 12.09.2018 | ||
BG | 12.12.2018 | ||
NO | 12.12.2018 | ||
GR | 13.12.2018 | ||
IS | 12.01.2019 | ||
PT | 12.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 12.09.2018 | |
CZ | 12.09.2018 | ||
EE | 12.09.2018 | ||
FI | 12.09.2018 | ||
HR | 12.09.2018 | ||
LT | 12.09.2018 | ||
LV | 12.09.2018 | ||
RO | 12.09.2018 | ||
RS | 12.09.2018 | ||
SK | 12.09.2018 | ||
SM | 12.09.2018 | ||
BG | 12.12.2018 | ||
NO | 12.12.2018 | ||
GR | 13.12.2018 | ||
IS | 12.01.2019 | ||
PT | 12.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/24] | AL | 12.09.2018 | |
CZ | 12.09.2018 | ||
EE | 12.09.2018 | ||
FI | 12.09.2018 | ||
HR | 12.09.2018 | ||
LT | 12.09.2018 | ||
LV | 12.09.2018 | ||
RO | 12.09.2018 | ||
RS | 12.09.2018 | ||
SK | 12.09.2018 | ||
BG | 12.12.2018 | ||
NO | 12.12.2018 | ||
GR | 13.12.2018 | ||
IS | 12.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/22] | AL | 12.09.2018 | |
CZ | 12.09.2018 | ||
FI | 12.09.2018 | ||
HR | 12.09.2018 | ||
LT | 12.09.2018 | ||
LV | 12.09.2018 | ||
RO | 12.09.2018 | ||
RS | 12.09.2018 | ||
BG | 12.12.2018 | ||
NO | 12.12.2018 | ||
GR | 13.12.2018 | ||
IS | 12.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/21] | AL | 12.09.2018 | |
FI | 12.09.2018 | ||
HR | 12.09.2018 | ||
LT | 12.09.2018 | ||
LV | 12.09.2018 | ||
RS | 12.09.2018 | ||
BG | 12.12.2018 | ||
NO | 12.12.2018 | ||
GR | 13.12.2018 | ||
IS | 12.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AL | 12.09.2018 | |
FI | 12.09.2018 | ||
HR | 12.09.2018 | ||
LT | 12.09.2018 | ||
LV | 12.09.2018 | ||
RS | 12.09.2018 | ||
BG | 12.12.2018 | ||
NO | 12.12.2018 | ||
GR | 13.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | FI | 12.09.2018 | |
HR | 12.09.2018 | ||
LT | 12.09.2018 | ||
RS | 12.09.2018 | ||
BG | 12.12.2018 | ||
NO | 12.12.2018 | ||
GR | 13.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | FI | 12.09.2018 | |
LT | 12.09.2018 | ||
NO | 12.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/07] | LT | 12.09.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2011083305 (LUCITE INT UK LTD [GB], et al) [X] 1-3,7,10-15 * the whole document *; | [X]WO2011152358 (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL CO [JP], et al) [X] 1,3-5,7 * paragraph [0475] - paragraph [0475] * * paragraph [0415] - paragraph [0415] *; | [X] - H. BRUNNER ET AL, "Enantioselective catalyses 10. New chiral phosphanes derived from substituted quinolines", SYNTHESIS, (19971101), pages 1309 - 1314, XP055321856 [X] 1,3-5,7 * Verbindung 16 * | by applicant | EP1029839 | US6335471 | DE102008007081 | - S. G. KHOKARALE; E. J. GARCIA-SUAREZ; J. XIONG; U. V. MENTZEL; R. FEHRMANN; A. RIISAGER, CATALYSIS COMMUNICATIONS, (2014), vol. 44, pages 73 - 75 | - W. CLEGG; G. R. EASTHAM; M. R. J. ELSEGOOD; R. P. TOOZE; X. L. WANG; K. WHISTON, CHEM. COMMUN, (1999), pages 1877 - 1878 | - ROBIN K. HARRIS; EDWIN D. BECKER; SONIA M. CABRAL DE MENEZES; ROBIN GOODFELLOW; PIERRE GRANGER, PURE APPL. CHEM., (2001), vol. 73, pages 1795 - 1818 | - ROBIN K. HARRIS; EDWIN D. BECKER; SONIA M. CABRAL DE MENEZES; PIERRE GRANGER; ROY E. HOFFMAN; KURT W. ZILM, PURE APPL. CHEM., (2008), vol. 80, pages 59 - 84 | - ANGEW. CHEM., (2004), vol. 43, pages 2222 - 2226 | - ORGANOMETALLICS, (1990), vol. 9, pages 1222 - 1227 |