EP3120733 - EXERCISE CHAIR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.01.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 11.02.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.01.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.01.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.06.2017 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 23.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kinetic Furniture of Vermont Inc. 789 Orchard Shore Road Colchester, VT 05446-7442 / US | [2019/35] |
Former [2017/04] | For all designated states Osler, Turner 789 Orchard Shore Road Colchester, VT 05446 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Osler, Turner 789 Orchard Shore Road Colchester, VT 05446 / US | [2019/35] |
Former [2017/04] | 01 /
see applicant ... | Representative(s) | Schiffer, Axel Martin, et al Rundfunkplatz 2 80335 München / DE | [2022/11] |
Former [2017/04] | Schiffer, Axel Martin, et al Weber & Heim Patentanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Irmgardstrasse 3 81479 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 16180094.1 | 19.07.2016 | [2017/04] | Priority number, date | US201562194317P | 20.07.2015 Original published format: US 201562194317 P | US201514947675 | 20.11.2015 Original published format: US201514947675 | [2017/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3120733 | Date: | 25.01.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3120733 | Date: | 16.03.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.12.2016 | Classification | IPC: | A47C9/00 | [2017/04] | CPC: |
A47C9/002 (EP,US);
A63B26/003 (US);
A47C9/02 (US);
A63B21/0004 (US);
A63B23/02 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/28] |
Former [2017/04] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | ÜBUNGSSTUHL | [2017/04] | English: | EXERCISE CHAIR | [2017/04] | French: | CHAISE D'EXERCICE | [2017/04] | Examination procedure | 19.07.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 24.05.2017 | Examination requested [2017/28] | 25.07.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.01.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.07.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.06.2019 | Date of oral proceedings | 02.07.2019 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 04.07.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1} | 26.01.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.02.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 08.02.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.02.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Appeal following examination | 22.08.2019 | Appeal received No. T3111/19 | 14.11.2019 | Statement of grounds filed | 03.01.2022 | Result of appeal procedure: remittal for grant | 10.01.2022 | Despatch of the decision of the Board of Appeal | Opposition(s) | 19.12.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 19.07.2016 | AL | 16.03.2022 | AT | 16.03.2022 | CY | 16.03.2022 | CZ | 16.03.2022 | DK | 16.03.2022 | EE | 16.03.2022 | ES | 16.03.2022 | FI | 16.03.2022 | HR | 16.03.2022 | IT | 16.03.2022 | LT | 16.03.2022 | LV | 16.03.2022 | MC | 16.03.2022 | MK | 16.03.2022 | MT | 16.03.2022 | NL | 16.03.2022 | PL | 16.03.2022 | RO | 16.03.2022 | RS | 16.03.2022 | SE | 16.03.2022 | SI | 16.03.2022 | SK | 16.03.2022 | SM | 16.03.2022 | TR | 16.03.2022 | BG | 16.06.2022 | NO | 16.06.2022 | GR | 17.06.2022 | IS | 16.07.2022 | PT | 18.07.2022 | IE | 19.07.2022 | LU | 19.07.2022 | BE | 31.07.2022 | CH | 31.07.2022 | LI | 31.07.2022 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/29] | HU | 19.07.2016 | |
AL | 16.03.2022 | ||
AT | 16.03.2022 | ||
CY | 16.03.2022 | ||
CZ | 16.03.2022 | ||
DK | 16.03.2022 | ||
EE | 16.03.2022 | ||
ES | 16.03.2022 | ||
FI | 16.03.2022 | ||
HR | 16.03.2022 | ||
IT | 16.03.2022 | ||
LT | 16.03.2022 | ||
LV | 16.03.2022 | ||
MC | 16.03.2022 | ||
MK | 16.03.2022 | ||
NL | 16.03.2022 | ||
PL | 16.03.2022 | ||
RO | 16.03.2022 | ||
RS | 16.03.2022 | ||
SE | 16.03.2022 | ||
SI | 16.03.2022 | ||
SK | 16.03.2022 | ||
SM | 16.03.2022 | ||
TR | 16.03.2022 | ||
BG | 16.06.2022 | ||
NO | 16.06.2022 | ||
GR | 17.06.2022 | ||
IS | 16.07.2022 | ||
PT | 18.07.2022 | ||
IE | 19.07.2022 | ||
LU | 19.07.2022 | ||
BE | 31.07.2022 | ||
CH | 31.07.2022 | ||
LI | 31.07.2022 | ||
Former [2024/22] | HU | 19.07.2016 | |
AL | 16.03.2022 | ||
AT | 16.03.2022 | ||
CY | 16.03.2022 | ||
CZ | 16.03.2022 | ||
DK | 16.03.2022 | ||
EE | 16.03.2022 | ||
ES | 16.03.2022 | ||
FI | 16.03.2022 | ||
HR | 16.03.2022 | ||
IT | 16.03.2022 | ||
LT | 16.03.2022 | ||
LV | 16.03.2022 | ||
MC | 16.03.2022 | ||
MK | 16.03.2022 | ||
NL | 16.03.2022 | ||
PL | 16.03.2022 | ||
RO | 16.03.2022 | ||
RS | 16.03.2022 | ||
SE | 16.03.2022 | ||
SI | 16.03.2022 | ||
SK | 16.03.2022 | ||
SM | 16.03.2022 | ||
BG | 16.06.2022 | ||
NO | 16.06.2022 | ||
GR | 17.06.2022 | ||
IS | 16.07.2022 | ||
PT | 18.07.2022 | ||
IE | 19.07.2022 | ||
LU | 19.07.2022 | ||
BE | 31.07.2022 | ||
CH | 31.07.2022 | ||
LI | 31.07.2022 | ||
Former [2024/20] | HU | 19.07.2016 | |
AL | 16.03.2022 | ||
AT | 16.03.2022 | ||
CY | 16.03.2022 | ||
CZ | 16.03.2022 | ||
DK | 16.03.2022 | ||
EE | 16.03.2022 | ||
ES | 16.03.2022 | ||
FI | 16.03.2022 | ||
HR | 16.03.2022 | ||
IT | 16.03.2022 | ||
LT | 16.03.2022 | ||
LV | 16.03.2022 | ||
MC | 16.03.2022 | ||
NL | 16.03.2022 | ||
PL | 16.03.2022 | ||
RO | 16.03.2022 | ||
RS | 16.03.2022 | ||
SE | 16.03.2022 | ||
SI | 16.03.2022 | ||
SK | 16.03.2022 | ||
SM | 16.03.2022 | ||
BG | 16.06.2022 | ||
NO | 16.06.2022 | ||
GR | 17.06.2022 | ||
IS | 16.07.2022 | ||
PT | 18.07.2022 | ||
IE | 19.07.2022 | ||
LU | 19.07.2022 | ||
BE | 31.07.2022 | ||
CH | 31.07.2022 | ||
LI | 31.07.2022 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 19.07.2016 | |
AL | 16.03.2022 | ||
AT | 16.03.2022 | ||
CZ | 16.03.2022 | ||
DK | 16.03.2022 | ||
EE | 16.03.2022 | ||
ES | 16.03.2022 | ||
FI | 16.03.2022 | ||
HR | 16.03.2022 | ||
IT | 16.03.2022 | ||
LT | 16.03.2022 | ||
LV | 16.03.2022 | ||
MC | 16.03.2022 | ||
NL | 16.03.2022 | ||
PL | 16.03.2022 | ||
RO | 16.03.2022 | ||
RS | 16.03.2022 | ||
SE | 16.03.2022 | ||
SI | 16.03.2022 | ||
SK | 16.03.2022 | ||
SM | 16.03.2022 | ||
BG | 16.06.2022 | ||
NO | 16.06.2022 | ||
GR | 17.06.2022 | ||
IS | 16.07.2022 | ||
PT | 18.07.2022 | ||
IE | 19.07.2022 | ||
LU | 19.07.2022 | ||
BE | 31.07.2022 | ||
CH | 31.07.2022 | ||
LI | 31.07.2022 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AL | 16.03.2022 | |
AT | 16.03.2022 | ||
CZ | 16.03.2022 | ||
DK | 16.03.2022 | ||
EE | 16.03.2022 | ||
ES | 16.03.2022 | ||
FI | 16.03.2022 | ||
HR | 16.03.2022 | ||
IT | 16.03.2022 | ||
LT | 16.03.2022 | ||
LV | 16.03.2022 | ||
MC | 16.03.2022 | ||
NL | 16.03.2022 | ||
PL | 16.03.2022 | ||
RO | 16.03.2022 | ||
RS | 16.03.2022 | ||
SE | 16.03.2022 | ||
SI | 16.03.2022 | ||
SK | 16.03.2022 | ||
SM | 16.03.2022 | ||
BG | 16.06.2022 | ||
NO | 16.06.2022 | ||
GR | 17.06.2022 | ||
IS | 16.07.2022 | ||
PT | 18.07.2022 | ||
IE | 19.07.2022 | ||
LU | 19.07.2022 | ||
BE | 31.07.2022 | ||
CH | 31.07.2022 | ||
LI | 31.07.2022 | ||
Former [2023/33] | AL | 16.03.2022 | |
AT | 16.03.2022 | ||
CZ | 16.03.2022 | ||
DK | 16.03.2022 | ||
EE | 16.03.2022 | ||
ES | 16.03.2022 | ||
FI | 16.03.2022 | ||
HR | 16.03.2022 | ||
LT | 16.03.2022 | ||
LV | 16.03.2022 | ||
MC | 16.03.2022 | ||
NL | 16.03.2022 | ||
PL | 16.03.2022 | ||
RO | 16.03.2022 | ||
RS | 16.03.2022 | ||
SE | 16.03.2022 | ||
SI | 16.03.2022 | ||
SK | 16.03.2022 | ||
SM | 16.03.2022 | ||
BG | 16.06.2022 | ||
NO | 16.06.2022 | ||
GR | 17.06.2022 | ||
IS | 16.07.2022 | ||
PT | 18.07.2022 | ||
IE | 19.07.2022 | ||
LU | 19.07.2022 | ||
BE | 31.07.2022 | ||
CH | 31.07.2022 | ||
LI | 31.07.2022 | ||
Former [2023/25] | AL | 16.03.2022 | |
AT | 16.03.2022 | ||
CZ | 16.03.2022 | ||
DK | 16.03.2022 | ||
EE | 16.03.2022 | ||
ES | 16.03.2022 | ||
FI | 16.03.2022 | ||
HR | 16.03.2022 | ||
LT | 16.03.2022 | ||
LV | 16.03.2022 | ||
MC | 16.03.2022 | ||
NL | 16.03.2022 | ||
PL | 16.03.2022 | ||
RO | 16.03.2022 | ||
RS | 16.03.2022 | ||
SE | 16.03.2022 | ||
SI | 16.03.2022 | ||
SK | 16.03.2022 | ||
SM | 16.03.2022 | ||
BG | 16.06.2022 | ||
NO | 16.06.2022 | ||
GR | 17.06.2022 | ||
IS | 16.07.2022 | ||
PT | 18.07.2022 | ||
LU | 19.07.2022 | ||
BE | 31.07.2022 | ||
CH | 31.07.2022 | ||
LI | 31.07.2022 | ||
Former [2023/21] | AL | 16.03.2022 | |
AT | 16.03.2022 | ||
CZ | 16.03.2022 | ||
DK | 16.03.2022 | ||
EE | 16.03.2022 | ||
ES | 16.03.2022 | ||
FI | 16.03.2022 | ||
HR | 16.03.2022 | ||
LT | 16.03.2022 | ||
LV | 16.03.2022 | ||
MC | 16.03.2022 | ||
NL | 16.03.2022 | ||
PL | 16.03.2022 | ||
RO | 16.03.2022 | ||
RS | 16.03.2022 | ||
SE | 16.03.2022 | ||
SI | 16.03.2022 | ||
SK | 16.03.2022 | ||
SM | 16.03.2022 | ||
BG | 16.06.2022 | ||
NO | 16.06.2022 | ||
GR | 17.06.2022 | ||
IS | 16.07.2022 | ||
PT | 18.07.2022 | ||
LU | 19.07.2022 | ||
CH | 31.07.2022 | ||
LI | 31.07.2022 | ||
Former [2023/11] | AL | 16.03.2022 | |
AT | 16.03.2022 | ||
CZ | 16.03.2022 | ||
DK | 16.03.2022 | ||
EE | 16.03.2022 | ||
ES | 16.03.2022 | ||
FI | 16.03.2022 | ||
HR | 16.03.2022 | ||
LT | 16.03.2022 | ||
LV | 16.03.2022 | ||
MC | 16.03.2022 | ||
NL | 16.03.2022 | ||
PL | 16.03.2022 | ||
RO | 16.03.2022 | ||
RS | 16.03.2022 | ||
SE | 16.03.2022 | ||
SI | 16.03.2022 | ||
SK | 16.03.2022 | ||
SM | 16.03.2022 | ||
BG | 16.06.2022 | ||
NO | 16.06.2022 | ||
GR | 17.06.2022 | ||
IS | 16.07.2022 | ||
PT | 18.07.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | AL | 16.03.2022 | |
AT | 16.03.2022 | ||
CZ | 16.03.2022 | ||
DK | 16.03.2022 | ||
EE | 16.03.2022 | ||
ES | 16.03.2022 | ||
FI | 16.03.2022 | ||
HR | 16.03.2022 | ||
LT | 16.03.2022 | ||
LV | 16.03.2022 | ||
NL | 16.03.2022 | ||
PL | 16.03.2022 | ||
RO | 16.03.2022 | ||
RS | 16.03.2022 | ||
SE | 16.03.2022 | ||
SI | 16.03.2022 | ||
SK | 16.03.2022 | ||
SM | 16.03.2022 | ||
BG | 16.06.2022 | ||
NO | 16.06.2022 | ||
GR | 17.06.2022 | ||
IS | 16.07.2022 | ||
PT | 18.07.2022 | ||
Former [2023/07] | AL | 16.03.2022 | |
AT | 16.03.2022 | ||
CZ | 16.03.2022 | ||
DK | 16.03.2022 | ||
EE | 16.03.2022 | ||
ES | 16.03.2022 | ||
FI | 16.03.2022 | ||
HR | 16.03.2022 | ||
LT | 16.03.2022 | ||
LV | 16.03.2022 | ||
NL | 16.03.2022 | ||
PL | 16.03.2022 | ||
RO | 16.03.2022 | ||
RS | 16.03.2022 | ||
SE | 16.03.2022 | ||
SK | 16.03.2022 | ||
SM | 16.03.2022 | ||
BG | 16.06.2022 | ||
NO | 16.06.2022 | ||
GR | 17.06.2022 | ||
IS | 16.07.2022 | ||
PT | 18.07.2022 | ||
Former [2023/01] | AL | 16.03.2022 | |
AT | 16.03.2022 | ||
CZ | 16.03.2022 | ||
EE | 16.03.2022 | ||
ES | 16.03.2022 | ||
FI | 16.03.2022 | ||
HR | 16.03.2022 | ||
LT | 16.03.2022 | ||
LV | 16.03.2022 | ||
NL | 16.03.2022 | ||
PL | 16.03.2022 | ||
RO | 16.03.2022 | ||
RS | 16.03.2022 | ||
SE | 16.03.2022 | ||
SK | 16.03.2022 | ||
SM | 16.03.2022 | ||
BG | 16.06.2022 | ||
NO | 16.06.2022 | ||
GR | 17.06.2022 | ||
IS | 16.07.2022 | ||
PT | 18.07.2022 | ||
Former [2022/51] | AT | 16.03.2022 | |
CZ | 16.03.2022 | ||
EE | 16.03.2022 | ||
ES | 16.03.2022 | ||
FI | 16.03.2022 | ||
HR | 16.03.2022 | ||
LT | 16.03.2022 | ||
LV | 16.03.2022 | ||
NL | 16.03.2022 | ||
PL | 16.03.2022 | ||
RO | 16.03.2022 | ||
RS | 16.03.2022 | ||
SE | 16.03.2022 | ||
SK | 16.03.2022 | ||
SM | 16.03.2022 | ||
BG | 16.06.2022 | ||
NO | 16.06.2022 | ||
GR | 17.06.2022 | ||
IS | 16.07.2022 | ||
PT | 18.07.2022 | ||
Former [2022/50] | AT | 16.03.2022 | |
CZ | 16.03.2022 | ||
EE | 16.03.2022 | ||
ES | 16.03.2022 | ||
FI | 16.03.2022 | ||
HR | 16.03.2022 | ||
LT | 16.03.2022 | ||
LV | 16.03.2022 | ||
NL | 16.03.2022 | ||
PL | 16.03.2022 | ||
RO | 16.03.2022 | ||
RS | 16.03.2022 | ||
SE | 16.03.2022 | ||
SK | 16.03.2022 | ||
SM | 16.03.2022 | ||
BG | 16.06.2022 | ||
NO | 16.06.2022 | ||
GR | 17.06.2022 | ||
PT | 18.07.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | AT | 16.03.2022 | |
CZ | 16.03.2022 | ||
EE | 16.03.2022 | ||
ES | 16.03.2022 | ||
FI | 16.03.2022 | ||
HR | 16.03.2022 | ||
LT | 16.03.2022 | ||
LV | 16.03.2022 | ||
NL | 16.03.2022 | ||
RO | 16.03.2022 | ||
RS | 16.03.2022 | ||
SE | 16.03.2022 | ||
SK | 16.03.2022 | ||
SM | 16.03.2022 | ||
BG | 16.06.2022 | ||
NO | 16.06.2022 | ||
GR | 17.06.2022 | ||
PT | 18.07.2022 | ||
Former [2022/48] | AT | 16.03.2022 | |
CZ | 16.03.2022 | ||
EE | 16.03.2022 | ||
ES | 16.03.2022 | ||
FI | 16.03.2022 | ||
HR | 16.03.2022 | ||
LT | 16.03.2022 | ||
LV | 16.03.2022 | ||
NL | 16.03.2022 | ||
RO | 16.03.2022 | ||
RS | 16.03.2022 | ||
SE | 16.03.2022 | ||
SM | 16.03.2022 | ||
BG | 16.06.2022 | ||
NO | 16.06.2022 | ||
GR | 17.06.2022 | ||
PT | 18.07.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | AT | 16.03.2022 | |
ES | 16.03.2022 | ||
FI | 16.03.2022 | ||
HR | 16.03.2022 | ||
LT | 16.03.2022 | ||
LV | 16.03.2022 | ||
NL | 16.03.2022 | ||
RO | 16.03.2022 | ||
RS | 16.03.2022 | ||
SE | 16.03.2022 | ||
SM | 16.03.2022 | ||
BG | 16.06.2022 | ||
NO | 16.06.2022 | ||
GR | 17.06.2022 | ||
PT | 18.07.2022 | ||
Former [2022/44] | FI | 16.03.2022 | |
HR | 16.03.2022 | ||
LT | 16.03.2022 | ||
LV | 16.03.2022 | ||
NL | 16.03.2022 | ||
RS | 16.03.2022 | ||
SE | 16.03.2022 | ||
BG | 16.06.2022 | ||
NO | 16.06.2022 | ||
GR | 17.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/39] | FI | 16.03.2022 | |
HR | 16.03.2022 | ||
LT | 16.03.2022 | ||
LV | 16.03.2022 | ||
RS | 16.03.2022 | ||
SE | 16.03.2022 | ||
BG | 16.06.2022 | ||
NO | 16.06.2022 | ||
GR | 17.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/36] | HR | 16.03.2022 | |
LT | 16.03.2022 | ||
LV | 16.03.2022 | ||
RS | 16.03.2022 | ||
SE | 16.03.2022 | ||
BG | 16.06.2022 | ||
NO | 16.06.2022 | ||
GR | 17.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/35] | HR | 16.03.2022 | |
LT | 16.03.2022 | ||
RS | 16.03.2022 | ||
SE | 16.03.2022 | ||
BG | 16.06.2022 | ||
NO | 16.06.2022 | ||
Former [2022/33] | LT | 16.03.2022 | |
NO | 16.06.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE29607150U (WANDER GABRIELE [DE]) [X] 1* the whole document *; | [X]DE29704664U (BAJIC JURE DIPL ING [DE]) [X] 1,2,5 * page 2 - page 3; figures 1-4 *; | [XA]DE20110832U (WANDER GABRIELE [DE]) [X] 1-7,9-15 * page 2, line 9 - page 6, line 8; figures 1-3 * [A] 8; | [X]DE202009004382U (STAUDER ULRICH [DE]) [X] 1 * the whole document * |