EP3121155 - OPTICAL FIBER WITH LOW LOSS AND NANOSCALE STRUCTURALLY HOMOGENEOUS CORE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.11.2019 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.01.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.07.2017 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 23.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.11.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.12.2019 [2019/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ofs Fitel Llc, A Delaware Limited Liability Company 2000 Northeast Expressway Norcross, GA 30071 / US | [2017/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yan, Man F. 75 Highland Circle Berkeley Heights, NJ 07922 / US | 02 /
Borel, Peter I. Godthaabsvej 24A 3 2000 Frederiksberg / DK | 03 /
Geisler, Tommy Hojstensbakken 5 2605 Brondby / DK | 04 /
Jensen, Rasmus V. Borups Alle 126 B 4.tv 2000 Frederiksberg / DK | 05 /
Levring, Ole A. Skolebakken 69 2830 Virum / DK | 06 /
Olsen, Jorgen Ostgaard Strandgade 85.2.2 1401 Copenhagen / DK | 07 /
Peckham, David W. 632 Hilton Avenue Lawrenceville, GA 30044 / US | 08 /
Trevor, Dennis J. 26 Hillside Drive Clinton, NJ 08809 / US | 09 /
Wisk, Patrick W. 19 Gold Street Greenbrook, NJ 08812 / US | 10 /
Zhu, Benyuan 76 Harvard Circle Princeton, NJ 08540 / US | [2017/04] | Representative(s) | Zimmermann, Tankred Klaus, et al Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler Zinkler, Schenk & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Radlkoferstrasse 2 81373 München / DE | [2017/04] | Application number, filing date | 16180670.8 | 22.07.2016 | [2017/04] | Priority number, date | US201562196465P | 24.07.2015 Original published format: US 201562196465 P | US201615086169 | 31.03.2016 Original published format: US201615086169 | [2017/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3121155 | Date: | 25.01.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.01.2017 | Classification | IPC: | C03C3/06, C03C4/10, C03C13/04, C03B37/012 | [2017/04] | CPC: |
C03C3/06 (EP,US);
G02B6/0229 (CN);
C03C13/046 (US);
C03B37/01208 (US);
C03B37/01853 (EP,US);
C03B37/027 (US);
C03C13/045 (EP,US);
C03C4/10 (EP,US);
G02B6/03627 (US);
G02B6/0365 (US);
C03B2201/07 (US);
C03B2201/08 (US);
C03B2201/12 (EP,US);
C03B2201/20 (EP,US);
C03B2201/28 (EP,US);
C03B2201/50 (EP,US);
C03B2203/223 (EP,US);
C03B2203/23 (EP,US);
C03C2201/11 (EP,US);
C03C2201/12 (EP,US);
C03C2201/28 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/35] |
Former [2017/04] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GLASFASER MIT GERINGEM VERLUST UND NANOSKALIGER STRUKTURELL HOMOGENER KERN | [2017/04] | English: | OPTICAL FIBER WITH LOW LOSS AND NANOSCALE STRUCTURALLY HOMOGENEOUS CORE | [2017/04] | French: | FIBRE OPTIQUE À FAIBLE PERTE ET NOYAU HOMOGÈNE À STRUCTURE NANOMÉTRIQUE | [2017/04] | Examination procedure | 22.07.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 25.07.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.07.2017 | Examination requested [2017/35] | 11.01.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.07.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/52] | 21.08.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2019/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2006130530 (ANDERSON JAMES G [US], et al) [A] 1-13 * abstract ** paragraphs [0002] , [0008] - [0009] - [0020] - [0022] - [0027] *; | [XI]US2007297735 (KHRAPKO ROSTISLAV RADIEVICH [US], et al) [X] 1 * abstract * * figure 1 * * paragraphs [0006] - [0012] - [0021] - [0040] * [I] 2-5; | [XI]US2008050086 (BICKHAM SCOTT ROBERTSON [US], et al) [X] 1 * abstract * * paragraphs [0006] - [0011] - [0028] - [0034] - [0046] * [I] 2-5; | [XI]US2014370287 (TAMURA YOSHIAKI [JP], et al) [X] 1 * abstract * * paragraphs [0002] , [0014] - [0015] - [0018] , [0020] , [0032] * * example 1 * [I] 2-5; | [XI]US2015027170 (HARUNA TETSUYA [JP], et al) [X] 1 * paragraphs [0003] - [0006] - [0034] , [0043] * * pages 1-6 * [I] 2-5; | [XI]US2015098682 (TAMURA YOSHIAKI [JP], et al) [X] 1,6,10,11 * abstract * * paragraphs [0002] , [0005] - [0010] - [0021] - [0040]; example 1 * * table 1 * [I] 2-5,7-9,12,13 | by applicant | - A. E. GEISSBERGER; F. L. GALEENER, "Raman studies of vitreous Si0 versus fictive temperature", PHYS. REV. B, (1983), vol. 28, no. 6, doi:doi:10.1103/PhysRevB.28.3266, pages 3266 - 3271, XP001146429 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1103/PhysRevB.28.3266 | - VUKELIC ET AL., "Structural Modification of Amorphous Fused Silica Under Femtosecond Laser Irradiation", ASME 2008 INTERNATIONAL MANUFACTURING SCIENCE AND ENGINEERING CONFERENCE, (20081007), vol. 1 |