EP3202392 - ORAL DOSAGE FORMS COMPRISING LICARBAZEPINE ACETATE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.07.2022 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 23.07.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.03.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.04.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.02.2018 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 07.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BIAL - Portela & Ca., S.A. À Av. da Siderurgia Nacional 4745-457 S. Mamede do Coronado / PT | [2017/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VASCONCELOS, Téofilo Cardoso de À Av. da Siderurgia Nacional 4745-457 S. Mamede do Coronado / PT | 02 /
SANTOS LIMA, Ricardo Jorge dos À Av. da Siderurgia Nacional 4745-457 S. Mamede do Coronado / PT | 03 /
CAMPOS COSTA, Rui Cerdeira À Av. da Siderurgia Nacional 4745-457 S. Mamede do Coronado / PT | [2017/32] | Representative(s) | King, Lawrence Simmons & Simmons LLP CityPoint 1 Ropemaker Street London EC2Y 9SS / GB | [2021/34] |
Former [2017/32] | King, Lawrence A.A. Thornton & Co. 10 Old Bailey London EC4M 7NG / GB | Application number, filing date | 16180687.2 | 24.10.2008 | [2017/32] | Priority number, date | US20070982790P | 26.10.2007 Original published format: US 982790 P | [2017/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3202392 | Date: | 09.08.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3202392 | Date: | 25.08.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.06.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/00, A61K9/20, A61K9/16, A61K31/55 | [2017/32] | CPC: |
A61K31/55 (EP,BR,KR,US);
A61K9/2054 (EP,BR,KR,US);
A61K47/50 (KR);
A61K9/0053 (EP,BR,US);
A61K9/0056 (EP,BR,KR,US);
A61K9/14 (KR);
A61K9/16 (BR,US);
A61K9/1635 (EP,BR,US);
A61K9/1652 (EP,BR,US);
A61K9/1682 (BR,KR,US);
A61K9/1694 (EP,BR,US);
A61K9/20 (BR,US);
A61K9/2027 (EP,BR,KR,US);
A61K9/2077 (KR);
A61K9/2095 (EP,BR,KR,US);
A61K9/48 (BR,US);
A61K9/4866 (BR,US);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/04 (EP);
A61P25/08 (EP);
A61P25/18 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2018/11] |
Former [2017/32] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | 26.09.2016 | BA | 26.09.2016 | MK | 26.09.2016 | RS | 26.09.2016 | Title | German: | ORALE DOSIERFORMEN MIT LICARBAZEPIN-ACETAT | [2017/32] | English: | ORAL DOSAGE FORMS COMPRISING LICARBAZEPINE ACETATE | [2017/32] | French: | FORMES GALÉNIQUES ORALES RENFERMANT DE L'ACÉTATE DE LICARBAZÉPINE | [2017/32] | Examination procedure | 22.07.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 24.11.2016 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: Claims | 13.01.2017 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1} | 01.02.2018 | Examination requested [2018/11] | 29.05.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.04.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.12.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 11.02.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.03.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.08.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.02.2021 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 18.02.2021 | 18.02.2021 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 16.03.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.07.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 16.07.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.07.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP08842368.6 / EP2214636 | Opposition(s) | 27.05.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/31] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 11.02.2020 | Request for further processing filed | 11.02.2020 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 21.02.2020 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 29.05.2018 | Request for further processing filed | 29.05.2018 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 11.06.2018 | Decision despatched | Loss of rights: Claims | 10.03.2017 | Request for further processing filed | 10.03.2017 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 13.04.2017 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 17.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 11.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 10.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 09.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 24.10.2008 | AT | 25.08.2021 | CY | 25.08.2021 | CZ | 25.08.2021 | DK | 25.08.2021 | EE | 25.08.2021 | FI | 25.08.2021 | HR | 25.08.2021 | LT | 25.08.2021 | LV | 25.08.2021 | MC | 25.08.2021 | NL | 25.08.2021 | PL | 25.08.2021 | RO | 25.08.2021 | SE | 25.08.2021 | SI | 25.08.2021 | SK | 25.08.2021 | TR | 25.08.2021 | IE | 24.10.2021 | LU | 24.10.2021 | BE | 31.10.2021 | BG | 25.11.2021 | NO | 25.11.2021 | GR | 26.11.2021 | IS | 25.12.2021 | [2024/29] |
Former [2023/29] | HU | 24.10.2008 | |
AT | 25.08.2021 | ||
CY | 25.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 25.08.2021 | ||
DK | 25.08.2021 | ||
EE | 25.08.2021 | ||
FI | 25.08.2021 | ||
HR | 25.08.2021 | ||
LT | 25.08.2021 | ||
LV | 25.08.2021 | ||
MC | 25.08.2021 | ||
NL | 25.08.2021 | ||
PL | 25.08.2021 | ||
RO | 25.08.2021 | ||
SE | 25.08.2021 | ||
SI | 25.08.2021 | ||
SK | 25.08.2021 | ||
IE | 24.10.2021 | ||
LU | 24.10.2021 | ||
BE | 31.10.2021 | ||
BG | 25.11.2021 | ||
NO | 25.11.2021 | ||
GR | 26.11.2021 | ||
IS | 25.12.2021 | ||
Former [2023/24] | AT | 25.08.2021 | |
CY | 25.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 25.08.2021 | ||
DK | 25.08.2021 | ||
EE | 25.08.2021 | ||
FI | 25.08.2021 | ||
HR | 25.08.2021 | ||
LT | 25.08.2021 | ||
LV | 25.08.2021 | ||
MC | 25.08.2021 | ||
NL | 25.08.2021 | ||
PL | 25.08.2021 | ||
RO | 25.08.2021 | ||
SE | 25.08.2021 | ||
SI | 25.08.2021 | ||
SK | 25.08.2021 | ||
IE | 24.10.2021 | ||
LU | 24.10.2021 | ||
BE | 31.10.2021 | ||
BG | 25.11.2021 | ||
NO | 25.11.2021 | ||
GR | 26.11.2021 | ||
IS | 25.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/48] | AT | 25.08.2021 | |
CZ | 25.08.2021 | ||
DK | 25.08.2021 | ||
EE | 25.08.2021 | ||
FI | 25.08.2021 | ||
HR | 25.08.2021 | ||
LT | 25.08.2021 | ||
LV | 25.08.2021 | ||
MC | 25.08.2021 | ||
NL | 25.08.2021 | ||
PL | 25.08.2021 | ||
RO | 25.08.2021 | ||
SE | 25.08.2021 | ||
SI | 25.08.2021 | ||
SK | 25.08.2021 | ||
IE | 24.10.2021 | ||
LU | 24.10.2021 | ||
BE | 31.10.2021 | ||
BG | 25.11.2021 | ||
NO | 25.11.2021 | ||
GR | 26.11.2021 | ||
IS | 25.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AT | 25.08.2021 | |
CZ | 25.08.2021 | ||
DK | 25.08.2021 | ||
EE | 25.08.2021 | ||
FI | 25.08.2021 | ||
HR | 25.08.2021 | ||
LT | 25.08.2021 | ||
LV | 25.08.2021 | ||
MC | 25.08.2021 | ||
NL | 25.08.2021 | ||
PL | 25.08.2021 | ||
RO | 25.08.2021 | ||
SE | 25.08.2021 | ||
SI | 25.08.2021 | ||
SK | 25.08.2021 | ||
LU | 24.10.2021 | ||
BE | 31.10.2021 | ||
BG | 25.11.2021 | ||
NO | 25.11.2021 | ||
GR | 26.11.2021 | ||
IS | 25.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/35] | AT | 25.08.2021 | |
CZ | 25.08.2021 | ||
DK | 25.08.2021 | ||
EE | 25.08.2021 | ||
FI | 25.08.2021 | ||
HR | 25.08.2021 | ||
LT | 25.08.2021 | ||
LV | 25.08.2021 | ||
MC | 25.08.2021 | ||
NL | 25.08.2021 | ||
PL | 25.08.2021 | ||
RO | 25.08.2021 | ||
SE | 25.08.2021 | ||
SK | 25.08.2021 | ||
LU | 24.10.2021 | ||
BE | 31.10.2021 | ||
BG | 25.11.2021 | ||
NO | 25.11.2021 | ||
GR | 26.11.2021 | ||
IS | 25.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/33] | AT | 25.08.2021 | |
CZ | 25.08.2021 | ||
DK | 25.08.2021 | ||
EE | 25.08.2021 | ||
FI | 25.08.2021 | ||
HR | 25.08.2021 | ||
LT | 25.08.2021 | ||
LV | 25.08.2021 | ||
MC | 25.08.2021 | ||
NL | 25.08.2021 | ||
PL | 25.08.2021 | ||
RO | 25.08.2021 | ||
SE | 25.08.2021 | ||
SK | 25.08.2021 | ||
BE | 31.10.2021 | ||
BG | 25.11.2021 | ||
NO | 25.11.2021 | ||
GR | 26.11.2021 | ||
IS | 25.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/24] | AT | 25.08.2021 | |
CZ | 25.08.2021 | ||
DK | 25.08.2021 | ||
EE | 25.08.2021 | ||
FI | 25.08.2021 | ||
HR | 25.08.2021 | ||
LT | 25.08.2021 | ||
LV | 25.08.2021 | ||
NL | 25.08.2021 | ||
PL | 25.08.2021 | ||
RO | 25.08.2021 | ||
SE | 25.08.2021 | ||
SK | 25.08.2021 | ||
BG | 25.11.2021 | ||
NO | 25.11.2021 | ||
GR | 26.11.2021 | ||
IS | 25.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AT | 25.08.2021 | |
DK | 25.08.2021 | ||
FI | 25.08.2021 | ||
HR | 25.08.2021 | ||
LT | 25.08.2021 | ||
LV | 25.08.2021 | ||
NL | 25.08.2021 | ||
PL | 25.08.2021 | ||
SE | 25.08.2021 | ||
BG | 25.11.2021 | ||
NO | 25.11.2021 | ||
GR | 26.11.2021 | ||
IS | 25.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/16] | AT | 25.08.2021 | |
FI | 25.08.2021 | ||
HR | 25.08.2021 | ||
LT | 25.08.2021 | ||
LV | 25.08.2021 | ||
NL | 25.08.2021 | ||
PL | 25.08.2021 | ||
SE | 25.08.2021 | ||
BG | 25.11.2021 | ||
NO | 25.11.2021 | ||
GR | 26.11.2021 | ||
IS | 25.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/12] | AT | 25.08.2021 | |
FI | 25.08.2021 | ||
HR | 25.08.2021 | ||
LT | 25.08.2021 | ||
LV | 25.08.2021 | ||
PL | 25.08.2021 | ||
SE | 25.08.2021 | ||
BG | 25.11.2021 | ||
NO | 25.11.2021 | ||
GR | 26.11.2021 | ||
IS | 25.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AT | 25.08.2021 | |
FI | 25.08.2021 | ||
LT | 25.08.2021 | ||
SE | 25.08.2021 | ||
BG | 25.11.2021 | ||
NO | 25.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AT | 25.08.2021 | |
LT | 25.08.2021 | ||
NO | 25.11.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO2005092290 (NOVARTIS AG [CH], et al) [Y] 1-73 * examples 1,2 *; | [XY]US2006252745 (ALMEIDA JOSE L D [PT], et al) [X] 1-42,44-48,73 * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0032] * [Y] 43,49-72; | [Y] - B HANCOCK, "The Relative Densities of Pharmaceutical Powders, Blends, Dry Granulations, and Immediate-Release Tablets", PHARMACEUTICAL TECHNOLOGY, (20030401), pages 64 - 80, XP055064508 [Y] 1-73 * the whole document * | by applicant | - European Pharmacopeia, (2007), pages 285 - 286 | - THE UNITED STATES PHARMACOPEIA CONVENTION, (2008), vol. 1, pages 231 - 232 |