EP3127725 - TRAILER COUPLING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 01.12.2023 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 04.09.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 29.04.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.06.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.08.2017 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 06.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ACPS Automotive GmbH Bertha-Benz-Strasse 2 74379 Ingersheim / DE | [2022/50] |
Former [2019/41] | For all designated states ACPS Automotive GmbH Steinbeisstrasse 6 71706 Markgröningen / DE | ||
Former [2018/02] | For all designated states Bosal ACPS Holding 2 B.V. Kamerlingh Onnesweg 5 4131 PK Vianen / NL | ||
Former [2017/06] | For all designated states Scambia Holdings Cyprus Limited 17 Gr. Xenopoulou Street 3106 Limassol / CY | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Burkhardt, Volker Panoramaweg 47 71696 Möglingen / DE | 02 /
Gentner, Wolfgang Ziegeläckerstrasse 23 71711 Steinheim / DE | 03 /
Noatsch, Bernd Ulmenstrasse 4 71069 Sindelfingen / DE | [2017/06] | Representative(s) | Hoeger, Stellrecht & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Uhlandstrasse 14c 70182 Stuttgart / DE | [2017/06] | Application number, filing date | 16180963.7 | 25.07.2016 | [2017/06] | Priority number, date | DE201510112741 | 03.08.2015 Original published format: DE102015112741 | [2017/06] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3127725 | Date: | 08.02.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3127725 | Date: | 07.10.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/41] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP3127725 | Date: | 03.01.2024 | Language: | DE | [2024/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.12.2016 | Classification | IPC: | B60D1/06, B60D1/62 | [2017/06] | CPC: |
B60D1/06 (EP);
B60D1/62 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/37] |
Former [2017/06] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ANHÄNGEKUPPLUNG | [2017/06] | English: | TRAILER COUPLING | [2017/06] | French: | ATTELAGE | [2017/06] | Examination procedure | 25.07.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 02.08.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.08.2017 | Examination requested [2017/37] | 21.06.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.01.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 18.03.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.04.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.08.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 26.08.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.08.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
05.07.2021
WESTFALIA - Automotive GmbH Am Sandberg 45 33378 Rheda-Wiedenbrück / DE Opponent's representative Patentanwälte Bregenzer und Reule Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Neckarstraße 47 73728 Esslingen / DE | [2021/32] | 22.07.2021 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 29.11.2021 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 15.12.2022 | Date of oral proceedings | 10.05.2023 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 10.05.2023 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 06.07.2023 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 29.08.2023 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 29.11.2023 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Appeal following opposition | 26.06.2023 | Appeal received No. T1177/23 | 26.06.2023 | Payment of appeal fee | 06.07.2023 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent withdrawn | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 18.03.2020 | Request for further processing filed | 18.03.2020 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 31.03.2020 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 25.07.2016 | AL | 07.10.2020 | CY | 07.10.2020 | CZ | 07.10.2020 | DK | 07.10.2020 | EE | 07.10.2020 | ES | 07.10.2020 | FI | 07.10.2020 | HR | 07.10.2020 | IT | 07.10.2020 | LT | 07.10.2020 | LV | 07.10.2020 | MC | 07.10.2020 | MK | 07.10.2020 | MT | 07.10.2020 | PL | 07.10.2020 | RO | 07.10.2020 | RS | 07.10.2020 | SE | 07.10.2020 | SI | 07.10.2020 | SK | 07.10.2020 | SM | 07.10.2020 | TR | 07.10.2020 | BG | 07.01.2021 | NO | 07.01.2021 | GR | 08.01.2021 | IS | 07.02.2021 | PT | 08.02.2021 | AT | 25.07.2021 | IE | 25.07.2021 | LU | 25.07.2021 | BE | 31.07.2021 | CH | 31.07.2021 | LI | 31.07.2021 | [2024/41] |
Former [2024/29] | HU | 25.07.2016 | |
AL | 07.10.2020 | ||
CY | 07.10.2020 | ||
CZ | 07.10.2020 | ||
DK | 07.10.2020 | ||
EE | 07.10.2020 | ||
ES | 07.10.2020 | ||
FI | 07.10.2020 | ||
HR | 07.10.2020 | ||
IT | 07.10.2020 | ||
LT | 07.10.2020 | ||
LV | 07.10.2020 | ||
MC | 07.10.2020 | ||
MK | 07.10.2020 | ||
PL | 07.10.2020 | ||
RO | 07.10.2020 | ||
RS | 07.10.2020 | ||
SE | 07.10.2020 | ||
SI | 07.10.2020 | ||
SK | 07.10.2020 | ||
SM | 07.10.2020 | ||
TR | 07.10.2020 | ||
BG | 07.01.2021 | ||
NO | 07.01.2021 | ||
GR | 08.01.2021 | ||
IS | 07.02.2021 | ||
PT | 08.02.2021 | ||
AT | 25.07.2021 | ||
IE | 25.07.2021 | ||
LU | 25.07.2021 | ||
BE | 31.07.2021 | ||
CH | 31.07.2021 | ||
LI | 31.07.2021 | ||
Former [2024/22] | HU | 25.07.2016 | |
AL | 07.10.2020 | ||
CY | 07.10.2020 | ||
CZ | 07.10.2020 | ||
DK | 07.10.2020 | ||
EE | 07.10.2020 | ||
ES | 07.10.2020 | ||
FI | 07.10.2020 | ||
HR | 07.10.2020 | ||
IT | 07.10.2020 | ||
LT | 07.10.2020 | ||
LV | 07.10.2020 | ||
MC | 07.10.2020 | ||
MK | 07.10.2020 | ||
PL | 07.10.2020 | ||
RO | 07.10.2020 | ||
RS | 07.10.2020 | ||
SE | 07.10.2020 | ||
SI | 07.10.2020 | ||
SK | 07.10.2020 | ||
SM | 07.10.2020 | ||
BG | 07.01.2021 | ||
NO | 07.01.2021 | ||
GR | 08.01.2021 | ||
IS | 07.02.2021 | ||
PT | 08.02.2021 | ||
AT | 25.07.2021 | ||
IE | 25.07.2021 | ||
LU | 25.07.2021 | ||
BE | 31.07.2021 | ||
CH | 31.07.2021 | ||
LI | 31.07.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | HU | 25.07.2016 | |
AL | 07.10.2020 | ||
CY | 07.10.2020 | ||
CZ | 07.10.2020 | ||
DK | 07.10.2020 | ||
EE | 07.10.2020 | ||
ES | 07.10.2020 | ||
FI | 07.10.2020 | ||
HR | 07.10.2020 | ||
IT | 07.10.2020 | ||
LT | 07.10.2020 | ||
LV | 07.10.2020 | ||
MC | 07.10.2020 | ||
PL | 07.10.2020 | ||
RO | 07.10.2020 | ||
RS | 07.10.2020 | ||
SE | 07.10.2020 | ||
SI | 07.10.2020 | ||
SK | 07.10.2020 | ||
SM | 07.10.2020 | ||
BG | 07.01.2021 | ||
NO | 07.01.2021 | ||
GR | 08.01.2021 | ||
IS | 07.02.2021 | ||
PT | 08.02.2021 | ||
AT | 25.07.2021 | ||
IE | 25.07.2021 | ||
LU | 25.07.2021 | ||
BE | 31.07.2021 | ||
CH | 31.07.2021 | ||
LI | 31.07.2021 | ||
Former [2023/29] | HU | 25.07.2016 | |
AL | 07.10.2020 | ||
CZ | 07.10.2020 | ||
DK | 07.10.2020 | ||
EE | 07.10.2020 | ||
ES | 07.10.2020 | ||
FI | 07.10.2020 | ||
HR | 07.10.2020 | ||
IT | 07.10.2020 | ||
LT | 07.10.2020 | ||
LV | 07.10.2020 | ||
MC | 07.10.2020 | ||
PL | 07.10.2020 | ||
RO | 07.10.2020 | ||
RS | 07.10.2020 | ||
SE | 07.10.2020 | ||
SI | 07.10.2020 | ||
SK | 07.10.2020 | ||
SM | 07.10.2020 | ||
BG | 07.01.2021 | ||
NO | 07.01.2021 | ||
GR | 08.01.2021 | ||
IS | 07.02.2021 | ||
PT | 08.02.2021 | ||
AT | 25.07.2021 | ||
IE | 25.07.2021 | ||
LU | 25.07.2021 | ||
BE | 31.07.2021 | ||
CH | 31.07.2021 | ||
LI | 31.07.2021 | ||
Former [2022/48] | AL | 07.10.2020 | |
CZ | 07.10.2020 | ||
DK | 07.10.2020 | ||
EE | 07.10.2020 | ||
ES | 07.10.2020 | ||
FI | 07.10.2020 | ||
HR | 07.10.2020 | ||
IT | 07.10.2020 | ||
LT | 07.10.2020 | ||
LV | 07.10.2020 | ||
MC | 07.10.2020 | ||
PL | 07.10.2020 | ||
RO | 07.10.2020 | ||
RS | 07.10.2020 | ||
SE | 07.10.2020 | ||
SI | 07.10.2020 | ||
SK | 07.10.2020 | ||
SM | 07.10.2020 | ||
BG | 07.01.2021 | ||
NO | 07.01.2021 | ||
GR | 08.01.2021 | ||
IS | 07.02.2021 | ||
PT | 08.02.2021 | ||
AT | 25.07.2021 | ||
IE | 25.07.2021 | ||
LU | 25.07.2021 | ||
BE | 31.07.2021 | ||
CH | 31.07.2021 | ||
LI | 31.07.2021 | ||
Former [2022/35] | AL | 07.10.2020 | |
CZ | 07.10.2020 | ||
DK | 07.10.2020 | ||
EE | 07.10.2020 | ||
ES | 07.10.2020 | ||
FI | 07.10.2020 | ||
HR | 07.10.2020 | ||
IT | 07.10.2020 | ||
LT | 07.10.2020 | ||
LV | 07.10.2020 | ||
MC | 07.10.2020 | ||
PL | 07.10.2020 | ||
RO | 07.10.2020 | ||
RS | 07.10.2020 | ||
SE | 07.10.2020 | ||
SI | 07.10.2020 | ||
SK | 07.10.2020 | ||
SM | 07.10.2020 | ||
BG | 07.01.2021 | ||
NO | 07.01.2021 | ||
GR | 08.01.2021 | ||
IS | 07.02.2021 | ||
PT | 08.02.2021 | ||
IE | 25.07.2021 | ||
LU | 25.07.2021 | ||
BE | 31.07.2021 | ||
CH | 31.07.2021 | ||
LI | 31.07.2021 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AL | 07.10.2020 | |
CZ | 07.10.2020 | ||
DK | 07.10.2020 | ||
EE | 07.10.2020 | ||
ES | 07.10.2020 | ||
FI | 07.10.2020 | ||
HR | 07.10.2020 | ||
IT | 07.10.2020 | ||
LT | 07.10.2020 | ||
LV | 07.10.2020 | ||
MC | 07.10.2020 | ||
PL | 07.10.2020 | ||
RO | 07.10.2020 | ||
RS | 07.10.2020 | ||
SE | 07.10.2020 | ||
SI | 07.10.2020 | ||
SK | 07.10.2020 | ||
SM | 07.10.2020 | ||
BG | 07.01.2021 | ||
NO | 07.01.2021 | ||
GR | 08.01.2021 | ||
IS | 07.02.2021 | ||
PT | 08.02.2021 | ||
LU | 25.07.2021 | ||
BE | 31.07.2021 | ||
CH | 31.07.2021 | ||
LI | 31.07.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AL | 07.10.2020 | |
CZ | 07.10.2020 | ||
DK | 07.10.2020 | ||
EE | 07.10.2020 | ||
ES | 07.10.2020 | ||
FI | 07.10.2020 | ||
HR | 07.10.2020 | ||
IT | 07.10.2020 | ||
LT | 07.10.2020 | ||
LV | 07.10.2020 | ||
MC | 07.10.2020 | ||
PL | 07.10.2020 | ||
RO | 07.10.2020 | ||
RS | 07.10.2020 | ||
SE | 07.10.2020 | ||
SI | 07.10.2020 | ||
SK | 07.10.2020 | ||
SM | 07.10.2020 | ||
BG | 07.01.2021 | ||
NO | 07.01.2021 | ||
GR | 08.01.2021 | ||
IS | 07.02.2021 | ||
PT | 08.02.2021 | ||
LU | 25.07.2021 | ||
CH | 31.07.2021 | ||
LI | 31.07.2021 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AL | 07.10.2020 | |
CZ | 07.10.2020 | ||
DK | 07.10.2020 | ||
EE | 07.10.2020 | ||
ES | 07.10.2020 | ||
FI | 07.10.2020 | ||
HR | 07.10.2020 | ||
IT | 07.10.2020 | ||
LT | 07.10.2020 | ||
LV | 07.10.2020 | ||
MC | 07.10.2020 | ||
PL | 07.10.2020 | ||
RO | 07.10.2020 | ||
RS | 07.10.2020 | ||
SE | 07.10.2020 | ||
SI | 07.10.2020 | ||
SK | 07.10.2020 | ||
SM | 07.10.2020 | ||
BG | 07.01.2021 | ||
NO | 07.01.2021 | ||
GR | 08.01.2021 | ||
PT | 08.02.2021 | ||
CH | 31.07.2021 | ||
LI | 31.07.2021 | ||
IS | 24.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/18] | AL | 07.10.2020 | |
CZ | 07.10.2020 | ||
DK | 07.10.2020 | ||
EE | 07.10.2020 | ||
ES | 07.10.2020 | ||
FI | 07.10.2020 | ||
HR | 07.10.2020 | ||
IT | 07.10.2020 | ||
LT | 07.10.2020 | ||
LV | 07.10.2020 | ||
MC | 07.10.2020 | ||
PL | 07.10.2020 | ||
RO | 07.10.2020 | ||
RS | 07.10.2020 | ||
SE | 07.10.2020 | ||
SI | 07.10.2020 | ||
SK | 07.10.2020 | ||
SM | 07.10.2020 | ||
BG | 07.01.2021 | ||
NO | 07.01.2021 | ||
GR | 08.01.2021 | ||
PT | 08.02.2021 | ||
IS | 24.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AL | 07.10.2020 | |
CZ | 07.10.2020 | ||
DK | 07.10.2020 | ||
EE | 07.10.2020 | ||
ES | 07.10.2020 | ||
FI | 07.10.2020 | ||
HR | 07.10.2020 | ||
IT | 07.10.2020 | ||
LT | 07.10.2020 | ||
LV | 07.10.2020 | ||
PL | 07.10.2020 | ||
RO | 07.10.2020 | ||
RS | 07.10.2020 | ||
SE | 07.10.2020 | ||
SI | 07.10.2020 | ||
SK | 07.10.2020 | ||
SM | 07.10.2020 | ||
BG | 07.01.2021 | ||
NO | 07.01.2021 | ||
GR | 08.01.2021 | ||
PT | 08.02.2021 | ||
IS | 24.12.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | AL | 07.10.2020 | |
CZ | 07.10.2020 | ||
DK | 07.10.2020 | ||
EE | 07.10.2020 | ||
ES | 07.10.2020 | ||
FI | 07.10.2020 | ||
HR | 07.10.2020 | ||
IT | 07.10.2020 | ||
LT | 07.10.2020 | ||
LV | 07.10.2020 | ||
PL | 07.10.2020 | ||
RO | 07.10.2020 | ||
RS | 07.10.2020 | ||
SE | 07.10.2020 | ||
SI | 07.10.2020 | ||
SK | 07.10.2020 | ||
SM | 07.10.2020 | ||
BG | 07.01.2021 | ||
NO | 07.01.2021 | ||
GR | 08.01.2021 | ||
IS | 07.02.2021 | ||
PT | 08.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/48] | AL | 07.10.2020 | |
CZ | 07.10.2020 | ||
DK | 07.10.2020 | ||
EE | 07.10.2020 | ||
ES | 07.10.2020 | ||
FI | 07.10.2020 | ||
HR | 07.10.2020 | ||
IT | 07.10.2020 | ||
LT | 07.10.2020 | ||
LV | 07.10.2020 | ||
PL | 07.10.2020 | ||
RO | 07.10.2020 | ||
RS | 07.10.2020 | ||
SE | 07.10.2020 | ||
SK | 07.10.2020 | ||
SM | 07.10.2020 | ||
BG | 07.01.2021 | ||
NO | 07.01.2021 | ||
GR | 08.01.2021 | ||
IS | 07.02.2021 | ||
PT | 08.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/45] | AL | 07.10.2020 | |
CZ | 07.10.2020 | ||
DK | 07.10.2020 | ||
EE | 07.10.2020 | ||
ES | 07.10.2020 | ||
FI | 07.10.2020 | ||
HR | 07.10.2020 | ||
LT | 07.10.2020 | ||
LV | 07.10.2020 | ||
PL | 07.10.2020 | ||
RO | 07.10.2020 | ||
RS | 07.10.2020 | ||
SE | 07.10.2020 | ||
SK | 07.10.2020 | ||
SM | 07.10.2020 | ||
BG | 07.01.2021 | ||
NO | 07.01.2021 | ||
GR | 08.01.2021 | ||
IS | 07.02.2021 | ||
PT | 08.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | CZ | 07.10.2020 | |
DK | 07.10.2020 | ||
EE | 07.10.2020 | ||
ES | 07.10.2020 | ||
FI | 07.10.2020 | ||
HR | 07.10.2020 | ||
LT | 07.10.2020 | ||
LV | 07.10.2020 | ||
PL | 07.10.2020 | ||
RO | 07.10.2020 | ||
RS | 07.10.2020 | ||
SE | 07.10.2020 | ||
SK | 07.10.2020 | ||
SM | 07.10.2020 | ||
BG | 07.01.2021 | ||
NO | 07.01.2021 | ||
GR | 08.01.2021 | ||
IS | 07.02.2021 | ||
PT | 08.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | CZ | 07.10.2020 | |
EE | 07.10.2020 | ||
ES | 07.10.2020 | ||
FI | 07.10.2020 | ||
HR | 07.10.2020 | ||
LT | 07.10.2020 | ||
LV | 07.10.2020 | ||
PL | 07.10.2020 | ||
RO | 07.10.2020 | ||
RS | 07.10.2020 | ||
SE | 07.10.2020 | ||
SK | 07.10.2020 | ||
SM | 07.10.2020 | ||
BG | 07.01.2021 | ||
NO | 07.01.2021 | ||
GR | 08.01.2021 | ||
IS | 07.02.2021 | ||
PT | 08.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/35] | CZ | 07.10.2020 | |
ES | 07.10.2020 | ||
FI | 07.10.2020 | ||
HR | 07.10.2020 | ||
LT | 07.10.2020 | ||
LV | 07.10.2020 | ||
PL | 07.10.2020 | ||
RO | 07.10.2020 | ||
RS | 07.10.2020 | ||
SE | 07.10.2020 | ||
SK | 07.10.2020 | ||
SM | 07.10.2020 | ||
BG | 07.01.2021 | ||
NO | 07.01.2021 | ||
GR | 08.01.2021 | ||
IS | 07.02.2021 | ||
PT | 08.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/34] | CZ | 07.10.2020 | |
ES | 07.10.2020 | ||
FI | 07.10.2020 | ||
HR | 07.10.2020 | ||
LT | 07.10.2020 | ||
LV | 07.10.2020 | ||
PL | 07.10.2020 | ||
RS | 07.10.2020 | ||
SE | 07.10.2020 | ||
SM | 07.10.2020 | ||
BG | 07.01.2021 | ||
NO | 07.01.2021 | ||
GR | 08.01.2021 | ||
IS | 07.02.2021 | ||
PT | 08.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/33] | ES | 07.10.2020 | |
FI | 07.10.2020 | ||
HR | 07.10.2020 | ||
LT | 07.10.2020 | ||
LV | 07.10.2020 | ||
PL | 07.10.2020 | ||
RS | 07.10.2020 | ||
SE | 07.10.2020 | ||
SM | 07.10.2020 | ||
BG | 07.01.2021 | ||
NO | 07.01.2021 | ||
GR | 08.01.2021 | ||
IS | 07.02.2021 | ||
PT | 08.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/32] | ES | 07.10.2020 | |
FI | 07.10.2020 | ||
HR | 07.10.2020 | ||
LV | 07.10.2020 | ||
PL | 07.10.2020 | ||
RS | 07.10.2020 | ||
SE | 07.10.2020 | ||
SM | 07.10.2020 | ||
BG | 07.01.2021 | ||
NO | 07.01.2021 | ||
GR | 08.01.2021 | ||
IS | 07.02.2021 | ||
PT | 08.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/28] | ES | 07.10.2020 | |
FI | 07.10.2020 | ||
HR | 07.10.2020 | ||
LV | 07.10.2020 | ||
PL | 07.10.2020 | ||
RS | 07.10.2020 | ||
SE | 07.10.2020 | ||
BG | 07.01.2021 | ||
NO | 07.01.2021 | ||
GR | 08.01.2021 | ||
IS | 07.02.2021 | ||
PT | 08.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/25] | ES | 07.10.2020 | |
FI | 07.10.2020 | ||
LV | 07.10.2020 | ||
PL | 07.10.2020 | ||
RS | 07.10.2020 | ||
SE | 07.10.2020 | ||
BG | 07.01.2021 | ||
NO | 07.01.2021 | ||
GR | 08.01.2021 | ||
IS | 07.02.2021 | ||
PT | 08.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/23] | FI | 07.10.2020 | |
LV | 07.10.2020 | ||
RS | 07.10.2020 | ||
SE | 07.10.2020 | ||
BG | 07.01.2021 | ||
NO | 07.01.2021 | ||
GR | 08.01.2021 | ||
PT | 08.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/22] | FI | 07.10.2020 | |
RS | 07.10.2020 | ||
NO | 07.01.2021 | ||
PT | 08.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/21] | FI | 07.10.2020 | |
PT | 08.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/20] | FI | 07.10.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE102010045519 (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]) [Y] 1,2,4-8,10-15 * paragraphs [0029] , [0030] , [0032] * * figure 1 *; | [Y]EP2567837 (SCAMBIA HOLDINGS CYPRUS LTD [CY]) [Y] 1,2,4-8,10-15* figure 9 *; | [XYI]DE202013000779U (WESTFALIA AUTOMOTIVE GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,2,4-8,10-15 * paragraphs [0001] , [0033] , [0037] , [0038] , [0040] , [0041] * * figures 1,2 * [Y] 13 [I] 3,9 | Opposition | GB465020 | US5159312 | DE102010029414 | DE102010045519 | EP2567837 | DE202013000779U | EP2952367 | WO2015185358 | DE102012001921 | DE102014108071 | DE102014107967 |