EP3162647 - APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR LEARNING TOUCH POINT OF ENGINE CLUTCH OF HYBRID ELECTRIC VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 03.07.2020 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.05.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.11.2017 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 31.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2020 | Withdrawal of application | published on 05.08.2020 [2020/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hyundai Motor Company 12, Heolleung-ro Seocho-gu Seoul 137-938 / KR | [2017/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PARK, Song Il 19-1302, 104, Olympic-ro 35-gil, Songpa-gu Seoul / KR | 02 /
KIM, Do Hee A-1419, 393, Seongnam-daero, Bundang-gu Seongnam-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | 03 /
KIM, Yeon Bok 105-203, 77, Hwangsong-ro, Jungwon-gu Seongnam-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | 04 /
KIM, Sungdeok 201, 2-1, Eunhaeng-ro 78beon-gil, Jungwon-gu Seongnam-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | [2017/18] | Representative(s) | Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Am Brauhaus 8 01099 Dresden / DE | [2017/18] | Application number, filing date | 16181444.7 | 27.07.2016 | [2017/18] | Priority number, date | KR20150152445 | 30.10.2015 Original published format: KR 20150152445 | [2017/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3162647 | Date: | 03.05.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.03.2017 | Classification | IPC: | B60W10/02, B60W10/08, B60W30/18, B60W20/00, // B60K6/48, B60W50/00 | [2017/18] | CPC: |
B60W20/40 (EP,US);
B60W10/113 (CN);
B60K6/387 (EP,US);
B60W10/02 (EP,CN,US);
B60W10/06 (CN);
B60W10/08 (EP,CN,US);
B60W20/00 (EP,US);
B60W20/10 (CN);
B60W30/18072 (EP,US);
F16D48/06 (EP);
F16D48/08 (EP,US);
B60K2006/4825 (EP,US);
B60W2030/1809 (EP,US);
B60W2050/0075 (EP,US);
B60W2050/0087 (EP,US);
B60W2050/0088 (EP,US);
B60W2510/0225 (US);
B60W2510/0638 (CN);
B60W2510/081 (CN,US);
B60W2510/082 (EP,US);
B60W2510/083 (US);
B60W2510/084 (EP,US);
B60W2510/1005 (US);
B60W2510/1015 (CN);
B60W2510/244 (EP,US);
B60W2540/10 (US);
B60W2540/12 (US);
B60W2540/16 (EP,US);
B60W2710/021 (CN);
B60W2710/022 (US);
B60W2710/027 (EP,US);
B60W2710/0644 (CN);
B60W2710/0666 (CN);
B60W2710/081 (EP,CN,US);
B60W2710/083 (CN);
B60W2710/1011 (EP,US);
B60Y2200/92 (US);
B60Y2300/182 (US);
B60Y2300/42 (US);
B60Y2300/60 (US);
B60Y2300/91 (US);
B60Y2400/42 (US);
B60Y2400/4242 (EP,US);
F16D2500/10412 (EP);
F16D2500/1066 (EP);
F16D2500/3024 (EP);
F16D2500/3067 (EP);
F16D2500/5012 (EP);
F16D2500/50233 (EP);
F16D2500/50245 (EP);
F16D2500/50251 (EP,US);
F16D2500/50257 (EP);
F16D2500/5026 (EP,US);
F16D2500/50281 (EP,US);
F16D2500/70406 (EP);
F16D2500/70454 (EP);
F16D2500/70605 (EP);
Y02T10/60 (EP,US);
Y02T10/62 (EP,US);
Y10S903/914 (EP,US);
Y10S903/93 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/50] |
Former [2017/18] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM LERNEN EINES BERÜHRUNGSPUNKTES EINER MOTORKUPPLUNG EINES ELEKTRO-HYBRIDFAHRZEUGS | [2017/18] | English: | APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR LEARNING TOUCH POINT OF ENGINE CLUTCH OF HYBRID ELECTRIC VEHICLE | [2017/18] | French: | APPAREIL ET PROCÉDÉ POUR L'APPRENTISSAGE D'UN POINT DE CONTACT TACTILE D'EMBRAYAGE DE MOTEUR DE VÉHICULE ÉLECTRIQUE HYBRIDE | [2017/18] | Examination procedure | 27.07.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 03.11.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.11.2017 | Examination requested [2017/50] | 19.05.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 01.07.2020 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2020/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE10349445 (LUK LAMELLEN & KUPPLUNGSBAU [DE]) [Y] 3,11 * figures 1,10,11 ** paragraphs [0105] - [0117] *; | [XYI]US2013325231 (PARK JOONYOUNG [KR]) [X] 1,6,8,10 * figures 1,2 * * paragraphs [0016] - [0019] - [0029] - [0037] - [0044] - [0050] * [Y] 3,11 [I] 2,4,5,7,9,12,13; | [XYI]DE102012224278 (HYUNDAI MOTOR CO LTD [KR], et al) [X] 1,6,8,10 * figures 4-6 * * paragraphs [0041] , [0047] - [0053] - [0057] * [Y] 3,11 [I] 2,4,5,7,9,12,13 |