EP3109976 - BRUSHLESS MOTOR WITH END COVERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.08.2021 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.12.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.06.2017 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 25.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.08.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.09.2021 [2021/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Amer S.p.A. Via Maestri del Lavoro, 1 36078 Valdagno (VI) / IT | [2016/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BATTISTELLA, Francesco CONTRADA NORI 41 36078 VALDAGNO VI / IT | 02 /
DALLA COSTA, Mirko VIA GOITO, 7 36015 SCHIO VI / IT | [2016/52] | Representative(s) | Modiano, Micaela Nadia, et al Modiano & Partners Via Meravigli, 16 20123 Milano / IT | [2016/52] | Application number, filing date | 16181616.0 | 16.06.2015 | [2016/52] | Priority number, date | IT2014PD00163 | 24.06.2014 Original published format: IT PD20140163 | [2016/52] | Previously filed application, date | EP20150172359 | 16.06.2015 | [2016/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3109976 | Date: | 28.12.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.11.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H02K5/15, H02K11/33, H02K5/22 | [2016/52] | CPC: |
H02K5/225 (EP,US);
H02K11/33 (EP,US);
H02K5/15 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/28] |
Former [2016/52] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BÜRSTENLOSER MOTOR MIT ENDKAPPEN | [2016/52] | English: | BRUSHLESS MOTOR WITH END COVERS | [2016/52] | French: | MOTEUR SANS BALAIS ET AVEC DES CAPUCHONS | [2016/52] | Examination procedure | 28.07.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 01.06.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.06.2017 | Examination requested [2017/28] | 16.12.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.04.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/38] | 20.05.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2021/38] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP15172359.0 / EP2961046 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2021 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2009140585 (PANT ALBERT KEITH [US]) [X] 1 * paragraph [0016] * * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0022]; figures 1,4-6 *; | [X]WO2010135922 (ZHONGSHAN BROAD OCEAN MOTOR [CN], et al) [X] 1 * abstract *; | [X]US2012080966 (TANG SONGFA [CN]) [X] 1* paragraph [0026]; figures 2,3,6 * |