EP3116194 - APPARATUS FOR GENERATING AND INTERPRETING A DATA STREAM WITH SEGMENTS HAVING SPECIFIED ENTRY POINTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.03.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 25.03.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.12.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.11.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.07.2017 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 09.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.04.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 15.05.2024 [2024/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dolby International AB 77 Sir John Rogerson's Quay Block C Grand Canal Docklands Dublin, D02 VK60 / IE | For all designated states SK Telecom. Co., Ltd. SK T-Tower, 11, Euljiro 2-ga Jung-gu Seoul 100-999 / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2022/46] | For all designated states Dolby International AB 77 Sir John Rogerson's Quay Block C Grand Canal Docklands Dublin, D02 VK60 / NL | ||
For all designated states SK Telecom. Co., Ltd. SK T-Tower, 11, Euljiro 2-ga Jung-gu Seoul 100-999 / KR | |||
Former [2022/19] | For all designated states Dolby International AB Mr. Treublaan 7 1097 DP Amsterdam / NL | ||
For all designated states SK Telecom. Co., Ltd. SK T-Tower, 11, Euljiro 2-ga Jung-gu Seoul 100-999 / KR | |||
Former [2017/02] | For all designated states Dolby International AB Apollo Building, 3E Herikerbergweg 1-35 1101 CN Amsterdam Zuid-Oost / NL | ||
For all designated states SK Telecom. Co., Ltd. SK T-Tower, 11, Euljiro 2-ga Jung-gu Seoul 100-999 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
EHRET, Andreas c/o Dolby Germany GmbH Deutschherrnstraße 15-19 90429 Nürnberg / DE | 02 /
HOERICH, Holger c/o Dolby Germany GmbH Deutschherrnstraße 15-19 90429 Nürnberg / DE | 03 /
SCHUG, Michael Taunusstraße 63 91056 Erlangen / DE | 04 /
SCHNEIDER, Andreas c/o Dolby Germany GmbH Deutschherrnstraße 15-19 90429 Nürnberg / DE | [2017/04] |
Former [2017/02] | 01 /
EHRET, Andreas Bleichstraße 16 90429 Nürnberg / DE | ||
02 /
HOERICH, Holger Grolandstraße 12 90408 Nürnberg / DE | |||
03 /
SCHUG, Michael Taunusstraße 63 91056 Erlangen / DE | |||
04 /
SCHNEIDER, Andreas Gostenhofer Hauptstraße 31 90443 Nürnberg / DE | Representative(s) | Zinkler, Franz Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler Zinkler, Schenk & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Radlkoferstrasse 2 81373 München / DE | [2017/02] | Application number, filing date | 16181756.4 | 30.05.2006 | [2017/02] | Priority number, date | US20050750897P | 16.12.2005 Original published format: US 750897 P | [2017/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3116194 | Date: | 11.01.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3116194 | Date: | 27.04.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/17] | Type: | B8 Corrected title page of specification | No.: | EP3116194 | Date: | 22.06.2022 | [2022/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.11.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/06, H04L1/00, A61P3/00, A61P3/04 | [2021/51] | CPC: |
H04L1/0083 (EP,US);
G10L19/005 (KR);
H04L65/762 (EP,US);
A61P3/00 (EP);
A61P3/04 (EP);
H03M7/30 (KR);
H04L65/1101 (US);
H04L65/70 (EP,US);
H04N19/895 (KR);
H04N21/233 (KR)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2017/02] | H04L29/06, H04L1/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2017/33] |
Former [2017/02] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR ERZEUGUNG UND INTERPRETATION EINES DATENSTROMS MIT SEGMENTEN MIT BESTIMMTEN EINTRITTSSTELLEN | [2017/02] | English: | APPARATUS FOR GENERATING AND INTERPRETING A DATA STREAM WITH SEGMENTS HAVING SPECIFIED ENTRY POINTS | [2017/02] | French: | APPAREIL PERMETTANT DE PRODUIRE ET D'INTERPRÉTER UN FLUX DE DONNÉES AVEC DES SEGMENTS COMPORTANT DES POINTS D'ENTRÉE SPÉCIFIÉS | [2017/02] | Examination procedure | 28.07.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 05.07.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.07.2017 | Examination requested [2017/33] | 19.11.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.06.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 02.09.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.04.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.10.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.12.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.03.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 17.03.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 17.03.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP06743086.8 / EP1964352 | Opposition(s) | 30.01.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/14] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 02.09.2019 | Request for further processing filed | 02.09.2019 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 10.09.2019 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 28.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 28.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 11.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 28.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 21.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 28.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 16 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.05.2006 | AT | 27.04.2022 | CY | 27.04.2022 | CZ | 27.04.2022 | DK | 27.04.2022 | EE | 27.04.2022 | ES | 27.04.2022 | FI | 27.04.2022 | IT | 27.04.2022 | LT | 27.04.2022 | LV | 27.04.2022 | MC | 27.04.2022 | NL | 27.04.2022 | PL | 27.04.2022 | RO | 27.04.2022 | SE | 27.04.2022 | SI | 27.04.2022 | SK | 27.04.2022 | IE | 30.05.2022 | LU | 30.05.2022 | BE | 31.05.2022 | CH | 31.05.2022 | LI | 31.05.2022 | BG | 27.07.2022 | GR | 28.07.2022 | IS | 27.08.2022 | PT | 29.08.2022 | [2024/20] |
Former [2024/18] | HU | 30.05.2006 | |
AT | 27.04.2022 | ||
CZ | 27.04.2022 | ||
DK | 27.04.2022 | ||
EE | 27.04.2022 | ||
ES | 27.04.2022 | ||
FI | 27.04.2022 | ||
IT | 27.04.2022 | ||
LT | 27.04.2022 | ||
LV | 27.04.2022 | ||
MC | 27.04.2022 | ||
NL | 27.04.2022 | ||
PL | 27.04.2022 | ||
RO | 27.04.2022 | ||
SE | 27.04.2022 | ||
SI | 27.04.2022 | ||
SK | 27.04.2022 | ||
IE | 30.05.2022 | ||
LU | 30.05.2022 | ||
BE | 31.05.2022 | ||
CH | 31.05.2022 | ||
LI | 31.05.2022 | ||
BG | 27.07.2022 | ||
GR | 28.07.2022 | ||
IS | 27.08.2022 | ||
PT | 29.08.2022 | ||
Former [2024/11] | AT | 27.04.2022 | |
CZ | 27.04.2022 | ||
DK | 27.04.2022 | ||
EE | 27.04.2022 | ||
ES | 27.04.2022 | ||
FI | 27.04.2022 | ||
IT | 27.04.2022 | ||
LT | 27.04.2022 | ||
LV | 27.04.2022 | ||
MC | 27.04.2022 | ||
NL | 27.04.2022 | ||
PL | 27.04.2022 | ||
RO | 27.04.2022 | ||
SE | 27.04.2022 | ||
SI | 27.04.2022 | ||
SK | 27.04.2022 | ||
IE | 30.05.2022 | ||
LU | 30.05.2022 | ||
BE | 31.05.2022 | ||
CH | 31.05.2022 | ||
LI | 31.05.2022 | ||
BG | 27.07.2022 | ||
GR | 28.07.2022 | ||
IS | 27.08.2022 | ||
PT | 29.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/25] | AT | 27.04.2022 | |
CZ | 27.04.2022 | ||
DK | 27.04.2022 | ||
EE | 27.04.2022 | ||
ES | 27.04.2022 | ||
FI | 27.04.2022 | ||
LT | 27.04.2022 | ||
LV | 27.04.2022 | ||
MC | 27.04.2022 | ||
NL | 27.04.2022 | ||
PL | 27.04.2022 | ||
RO | 27.04.2022 | ||
SE | 27.04.2022 | ||
SI | 27.04.2022 | ||
SK | 27.04.2022 | ||
IE | 30.05.2022 | ||
LU | 30.05.2022 | ||
BE | 31.05.2022 | ||
CH | 31.05.2022 | ||
LI | 31.05.2022 | ||
BG | 27.07.2022 | ||
GR | 28.07.2022 | ||
IS | 27.08.2022 | ||
PT | 29.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/20] | AT | 27.04.2022 | |
CZ | 27.04.2022 | ||
DK | 27.04.2022 | ||
EE | 27.04.2022 | ||
ES | 27.04.2022 | ||
FI | 27.04.2022 | ||
LT | 27.04.2022 | ||
LV | 27.04.2022 | ||
MC | 27.04.2022 | ||
NL | 27.04.2022 | ||
PL | 27.04.2022 | ||
RO | 27.04.2022 | ||
SE | 27.04.2022 | ||
SK | 27.04.2022 | ||
IE | 30.05.2022 | ||
LU | 30.05.2022 | ||
CH | 31.05.2022 | ||
LI | 31.05.2022 | ||
BG | 27.07.2022 | ||
GR | 28.07.2022 | ||
IS | 27.08.2022 | ||
PT | 29.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | AT | 27.04.2022 | |
CZ | 27.04.2022 | ||
DK | 27.04.2022 | ||
EE | 27.04.2022 | ||
ES | 27.04.2022 | ||
FI | 27.04.2022 | ||
LT | 27.04.2022 | ||
LV | 27.04.2022 | ||
MC | 27.04.2022 | ||
NL | 27.04.2022 | ||
PL | 27.04.2022 | ||
RO | 27.04.2022 | ||
SE | 27.04.2022 | ||
SK | 27.04.2022 | ||
LU | 30.05.2022 | ||
CH | 31.05.2022 | ||
LI | 31.05.2022 | ||
BG | 27.07.2022 | ||
GR | 28.07.2022 | ||
IS | 27.08.2022 | ||
PT | 29.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | AT | 27.04.2022 | |
DK | 27.04.2022 | ||
ES | 27.04.2022 | ||
FI | 27.04.2022 | ||
LT | 27.04.2022 | ||
LV | 27.04.2022 | ||
MC | 27.04.2022 | ||
NL | 27.04.2022 | ||
PL | 27.04.2022 | ||
SE | 27.04.2022 | ||
LU | 30.05.2022 | ||
BG | 27.07.2022 | ||
GR | 28.07.2022 | ||
IS | 27.08.2022 | ||
PT | 29.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/07] | AT | 27.04.2022 | |
DK | 27.04.2022 | ||
ES | 27.04.2022 | ||
FI | 27.04.2022 | ||
LT | 27.04.2022 | ||
LV | 27.04.2022 | ||
NL | 27.04.2022 | ||
PL | 27.04.2022 | ||
SE | 27.04.2022 | ||
BG | 27.07.2022 | ||
GR | 28.07.2022 | ||
IS | 27.08.2022 | ||
PT | 29.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/51] | AT | 27.04.2022 | |
ES | 27.04.2022 | ||
FI | 27.04.2022 | ||
LT | 27.04.2022 | ||
LV | 27.04.2022 | ||
NL | 27.04.2022 | ||
PL | 27.04.2022 | ||
SE | 27.04.2022 | ||
BG | 27.07.2022 | ||
GR | 28.07.2022 | ||
IS | 27.08.2022 | ||
PT | 29.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/50] | AT | 27.04.2022 | |
ES | 27.04.2022 | ||
FI | 27.04.2022 | ||
LT | 27.04.2022 | ||
LV | 27.04.2022 | ||
NL | 27.04.2022 | ||
PL | 27.04.2022 | ||
SE | 27.04.2022 | ||
BG | 27.07.2022 | ||
GR | 28.07.2022 | ||
PT | 29.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | AT | 27.04.2022 | |
ES | 27.04.2022 | ||
FI | 27.04.2022 | ||
LT | 27.04.2022 | ||
LV | 27.04.2022 | ||
NL | 27.04.2022 | ||
SE | 27.04.2022 | ||
BG | 27.07.2022 | ||
GR | 28.07.2022 | ||
PT | 29.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | AT | 27.04.2022 | |
ES | 27.04.2022 | ||
FI | 27.04.2022 | ||
LT | 27.04.2022 | ||
NL | 27.04.2022 | ||
SE | 27.04.2022 | ||
PT | 29.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/44] | NL | 27.04.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1021039 (CANON KK [JP]) [A] 1-11 * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0111]; figures 18,21 *; | [A]US2002118749 (GENTRIC PHILIPPE [FR], et al) [A] 1-11 * paragraph [0004] - paragraph [0018]; figure 2 *; | [A] - HANDLEY ACIRI C PERKINS UCL M, "Guidelines for Writers of RTP Payload Format Specifications; rfc2736.txt", IETF STANDARD, INTERNET ENGINEERING TASK FORCE, IETF, CH, (199912), ISSN 0000-0003, pages 1 - 10, XP015008519 [A] 1-11 * paragraph [003.] - paragraph [004.] * | [A] - KRETSCHMER-AT&T/BASSO-AT&T CIVANLAR-AT&T/QUACKENBUSH-AT&T SNYDER-AT&T, "RTP Payload Format for MPEG-2 and MPEG-4 AAC Streams; draft-ietf-avt-rtp-mpeg2aac-02.txt;", IETF STANDARD-WORKING-DRAFT, INTERNET ENGINEERING TASK FORCE, IETF, CH, (20010720), vol. avt, no. 2, ISSN 0000-0004, pages 1 - 10, XP015015872 [A] 1-11 * paragraph [1.1.] - paragraph [2.2.] * | [A] - "OVERVIEW OF THE MPEG-4 STANDARD", ISO/IEC JT1/SC29/WG11 N3747, XX, XX, (200010), pages 1 - 60, XP000925987 [A] 1-11 * paragraph [010.] - paragraph [10.2.] * |