EP3276994 - SUBSCRIBER IDENTITY MODULE FOR ACCESS TO A MOBILE PHONE NETWORK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.03.2021 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 17.04.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.12.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.11.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 31.07.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.05.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.12.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Deutsche Telekom AG Friedrich-Ebert-Allee 140 53113 Bonn / DE | [2020/21] |
Former [2018/05] | For all designated states Deutsche Telekom AG Friedrich-Ebert-Allee 140 53113 Bonn / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SONNTAG, Thomas Compbachweg 27b 53343 Wachtberg / DE | [2018/05] | Representative(s) | RDL Patentanwälte PartG mbB Senefelderstrasse 26 70176 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2020/21] | Raible Deissler Lehmann Patentanwälte PartG mbB Senefelderstrasse 26 70176 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [2018/05] | Patentship Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Elsenheimerstraße 65 80687 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 16182089.9 | 29.07.2016 | [2018/05] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3276994 | Date: | 31.01.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3276994 | Date: | 20.05.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.11.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H04W8/18, H04W8/20, // H04W4/00 | [2018/05] | CPC: |
H04W8/205 (EP);
H04W12/04 (EP);
H04W12/35 (EP);
H04W8/183 (EP);
H04W4/70 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/05] | Title | German: | TEILNEHMERIDENTITÄTSMODUL FÜR EINEN ZUGRIFF AUF EIN MOBILFUNKNETZWERK | [2018/05] | English: | SUBSCRIBER IDENTITY MODULE FOR ACCESS TO A MOBILE PHONE NETWORK | [2018/05] | French: | MODULE D'IDENTITE D'ABONNE POUR UN ACCES A UN RESEAU HERTZIEN MOBILE | [2018/05] | Examination procedure | 29.07.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 14.03.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.03.2017 | Examination requested [2018/05] | 07.05.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.05.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.08.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.11.2019 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 19.12.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.04.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 09.04.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.04.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 23.02.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 29.07.2016 | AL | 20.05.2020 | CY | 20.05.2020 | CZ | 20.05.2020 | DK | 20.05.2020 | EE | 20.05.2020 | FI | 20.05.2020 | HR | 20.05.2020 | LT | 20.05.2020 | LV | 20.05.2020 | MC | 20.05.2020 | MK | 20.05.2020 | MT | 20.05.2020 | NL | 20.05.2020 | RO | 20.05.2020 | RS | 20.05.2020 | SE | 20.05.2020 | SI | 20.05.2020 | SK | 20.05.2020 | SM | 20.05.2020 | IE | 29.07.2020 | LU | 29.07.2020 | BE | 31.07.2020 | CH | 31.07.2020 | LI | 31.07.2020 | BG | 20.08.2020 | NO | 20.08.2020 | GR | 21.08.2020 | IS | 20.09.2020 | PT | 21.09.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/28] | HU | 29.07.2016 | |
AL | 20.05.2020 | ||
CY | 20.05.2020 | ||
CZ | 20.05.2020 | ||
DK | 20.05.2020 | ||
EE | 20.05.2020 | ||
FI | 20.05.2020 | ||
HR | 20.05.2020 | ||
LT | 20.05.2020 | ||
LV | 20.05.2020 | ||
MC | 20.05.2020 | ||
MT | 20.05.2020 | ||
NL | 20.05.2020 | ||
RO | 20.05.2020 | ||
RS | 20.05.2020 | ||
SE | 20.05.2020 | ||
SI | 20.05.2020 | ||
SK | 20.05.2020 | ||
SM | 20.05.2020 | ||
IE | 29.07.2020 | ||
LU | 29.07.2020 | ||
BE | 31.07.2020 | ||
CH | 31.07.2020 | ||
LI | 31.07.2020 | ||
BG | 20.08.2020 | ||
NO | 20.08.2020 | ||
GR | 21.08.2020 | ||
IS | 20.09.2020 | ||
PT | 21.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AL | 20.05.2020 | |
CZ | 20.05.2020 | ||
DK | 20.05.2020 | ||
EE | 20.05.2020 | ||
FI | 20.05.2020 | ||
HR | 20.05.2020 | ||
LT | 20.05.2020 | ||
LV | 20.05.2020 | ||
MC | 20.05.2020 | ||
NL | 20.05.2020 | ||
RO | 20.05.2020 | ||
RS | 20.05.2020 | ||
SE | 20.05.2020 | ||
SI | 20.05.2020 | ||
SK | 20.05.2020 | ||
SM | 20.05.2020 | ||
IE | 29.07.2020 | ||
LU | 29.07.2020 | ||
BE | 31.07.2020 | ||
CH | 31.07.2020 | ||
LI | 31.07.2020 | ||
BG | 20.08.2020 | ||
NO | 20.08.2020 | ||
GR | 21.08.2020 | ||
IS | 20.09.2020 | ||
PT | 21.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AL | 20.05.2020 | |
CZ | 20.05.2020 | ||
DK | 20.05.2020 | ||
EE | 20.05.2020 | ||
FI | 20.05.2020 | ||
HR | 20.05.2020 | ||
LT | 20.05.2020 | ||
LV | 20.05.2020 | ||
MC | 20.05.2020 | ||
NL | 20.05.2020 | ||
RO | 20.05.2020 | ||
RS | 20.05.2020 | ||
SE | 20.05.2020 | ||
SI | 20.05.2020 | ||
SK | 20.05.2020 | ||
SM | 20.05.2020 | ||
LU | 29.07.2020 | ||
BE | 31.07.2020 | ||
CH | 31.07.2020 | ||
LI | 31.07.2020 | ||
BG | 20.08.2020 | ||
NO | 20.08.2020 | ||
GR | 21.08.2020 | ||
IS | 20.09.2020 | ||
PT | 21.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | AL | 20.05.2020 | |
CZ | 20.05.2020 | ||
DK | 20.05.2020 | ||
EE | 20.05.2020 | ||
FI | 20.05.2020 | ||
HR | 20.05.2020 | ||
LT | 20.05.2020 | ||
LV | 20.05.2020 | ||
MC | 20.05.2020 | ||
NL | 20.05.2020 | ||
RO | 20.05.2020 | ||
RS | 20.05.2020 | ||
SE | 20.05.2020 | ||
SK | 20.05.2020 | ||
SM | 20.05.2020 | ||
LU | 29.07.2020 | ||
CH | 31.07.2020 | ||
LI | 31.07.2020 | ||
BG | 20.08.2020 | ||
NO | 20.08.2020 | ||
GR | 21.08.2020 | ||
IS | 20.09.2020 | ||
PT | 21.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/13] | AL | 20.05.2020 | |
CZ | 20.05.2020 | ||
DK | 20.05.2020 | ||
EE | 20.05.2020 | ||
FI | 20.05.2020 | ||
HR | 20.05.2020 | ||
LT | 20.05.2020 | ||
LV | 20.05.2020 | ||
MC | 20.05.2020 | ||
NL | 20.05.2020 | ||
RO | 20.05.2020 | ||
RS | 20.05.2020 | ||
SE | 20.05.2020 | ||
SK | 20.05.2020 | ||
SM | 20.05.2020 | ||
BG | 20.08.2020 | ||
NO | 20.08.2020 | ||
GR | 21.08.2020 | ||
IS | 20.09.2020 | ||
PT | 21.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AL | 20.05.2020 | |
CZ | 20.05.2020 | ||
DK | 20.05.2020 | ||
EE | 20.05.2020 | ||
FI | 20.05.2020 | ||
HR | 20.05.2020 | ||
LT | 20.05.2020 | ||
LV | 20.05.2020 | ||
NL | 20.05.2020 | ||
RO | 20.05.2020 | ||
RS | 20.05.2020 | ||
SE | 20.05.2020 | ||
SK | 20.05.2020 | ||
SM | 20.05.2020 | ||
BG | 20.08.2020 | ||
NO | 20.08.2020 | ||
GR | 21.08.2020 | ||
IS | 20.09.2020 | ||
PT | 21.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AL | 20.05.2020 | |
CZ | 20.05.2020 | ||
DK | 20.05.2020 | ||
EE | 20.05.2020 | ||
FI | 20.05.2020 | ||
HR | 20.05.2020 | ||
LT | 20.05.2020 | ||
LV | 20.05.2020 | ||
NL | 20.05.2020 | ||
RO | 20.05.2020 | ||
RS | 20.05.2020 | ||
SE | 20.05.2020 | ||
SM | 20.05.2020 | ||
BG | 20.08.2020 | ||
NO | 20.08.2020 | ||
GR | 21.08.2020 | ||
IS | 20.09.2020 | ||
PT | 21.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | AL | 20.05.2020 | |
DK | 20.05.2020 | ||
FI | 20.05.2020 | ||
HR | 20.05.2020 | ||
LT | 20.05.2020 | ||
LV | 20.05.2020 | ||
NL | 20.05.2020 | ||
RO | 20.05.2020 | ||
RS | 20.05.2020 | ||
SE | 20.05.2020 | ||
SM | 20.05.2020 | ||
BG | 20.08.2020 | ||
NO | 20.08.2020 | ||
GR | 21.08.2020 | ||
IS | 20.09.2020 | ||
PT | 21.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/04] | AL | 20.05.2020 | |
FI | 20.05.2020 | ||
HR | 20.05.2020 | ||
LT | 20.05.2020 | ||
LV | 20.05.2020 | ||
NL | 20.05.2020 | ||
RS | 20.05.2020 | ||
SE | 20.05.2020 | ||
BG | 20.08.2020 | ||
NO | 20.08.2020 | ||
GR | 21.08.2020 | ||
IS | 20.09.2020 | ||
PT | 21.09.2020 | ||
Former [2021/01] | FI | 20.05.2020 | |
HR | 20.05.2020 | ||
LT | 20.05.2020 | ||
LV | 20.05.2020 | ||
RS | 20.05.2020 | ||
SE | 20.05.2020 | ||
BG | 20.08.2020 | ||
NO | 20.08.2020 | ||
GR | 21.08.2020 | ||
IS | 20.09.2020 | ||
PT | 21.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | FI | 20.05.2020 | |
HR | 20.05.2020 | ||
LT | 20.05.2020 | ||
LV | 20.05.2020 | ||
RS | 20.05.2020 | ||
SE | 20.05.2020 | ||
NO | 20.08.2020 | ||
GR | 21.08.2020 | ||
IS | 20.09.2020 | ||
PT | 21.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | FI | 20.05.2020 | |
HR | 20.05.2020 | ||
LT | 20.05.2020 | ||
LV | 20.05.2020 | ||
SE | 20.05.2020 | ||
NO | 20.08.2020 | ||
GR | 21.08.2020 | ||
IS | 20.09.2020 | ||
PT | 21.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | FI | 20.05.2020 | |
LT | 20.05.2020 | ||
SE | 20.05.2020 | ||
NO | 20.08.2020 | ||
IS | 20.09.2020 | ||
PT | 21.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | LT | 20.05.2020 | |
NO | 20.08.2020 | ||
IS | 20.09.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | IS | 20.09.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [IA]US2012282891 (MOHAMMED JAHANGIR [US], et al) [I] 1,8,9,15 * abstract * * figures 3,4B,5,6,15-17 * * paragraph [0003] - paragraph [0004] * * paragraph [0031] * * paragraph [0036] * * paragraph [0039] - paragraph [0041] * * paragraph [0074] * * paragraph [0090] - paragraph [0095] * [A] 2-7,10-14; | [Y] - GSMA, "5G capabilities and requirements", vol. SA WG3, no. Chennai (India); 20160725 - 20160729, (20160724), 3GPP DRAFT; S3-160910 N2020_001 - LIAISON STATEMENT ON 5G CAPABILITIES AND REQUIREMENTS, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Meetings_3GPP_SYNC/SA3/Docs/, (20160724), XP051141678 [Y] 1-15 * 2.3 Roaming * * 2.6 Network Orchestration * | [Y] - HUAWEI ET AL, "Adding authentication for remote provisioning", vol. SA WG2, no. Vienna, Austria; 20160711 - 20160715, (20160710), 3GPP DRAFT; S2-163526_REMOTE PROVISIONING GENERAL SOLUTION-V10, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Meetings_3GPP_SYNC/SA2/Docs/, (20160710), XP051118118 [Y] 1-15 * 6.12.X.1 General description * * figures 6.12.X.2-1 * | [A] - "NGMN_5G_White_Paper_V1_0", ETSI DRAFT; NGMN_5G_WHITE_PAPER_V1_0, EUROPEAN TELECOMMUNICATIONS STANDARDS INSTITUTE (ETSI), 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS ; FRANCE, (20150625), vol. SmartM2M - Open, pages 1 - 125, XP014258882 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * |