EP3128808 - LED LIGHTING FOR AN AUTOMOBILE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.01.2018 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 06.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.01.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.02.2018 [2018/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Curtis, Henry E. 107 Taylor Avenue Carterville, IL 62918 / US | [2017/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2017/06] | Representative(s) | Romano, Giuseppe, et al Società Italiana Brevetti S.p.A Piazza di Pietra, 39 00186 Roma / IT | [2017/06] | Application number, filing date | 16182171.5 | 01.08.2016 | [2017/06] | Priority number, date | US201514816022 | 02.08.2015 Original published format: US201514816022 | [2017/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3128808 | Date: | 08.02.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.12.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H05B33/08 | [2017/06] | CPC: |
B60Q3/80 (EP,US);
B60Q3/208 (EP,US);
H05B45/00 (EP,US);
H05B45/37 (EP,US);
H05B45/395 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/06] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LED-BELEUCHTUNG FÜR EIN KRAFTFAHRZEUG | [2017/06] | English: | LED LIGHTING FOR AN AUTOMOBILE | [2017/06] | French: | ÉCLAIRAGE À DEL POUR UNE AUTOMOBILE | [2017/06] | Examination procedure | 09.08.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/06] | 14.09.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2018/06] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]WO2014167291 (PILKINGTON GROUP LTD [GB]) [I] 1-10 * pages 8-12; figures 3-7 *; | [I]WO2014140130 (JAGUAR LAND ROVER LTD [GB]) [I] 1-10 * pages 3-10; figures 1, 5 *; | [I]US2014049977 (GOLD PETER [US]) [I] 1-10 * paragraphs [0062] - [0083]; figure 9 *; | [I]US2009251917 (WOLLNER MARK R [US], et al) [I] 1-10 * pages 1-5; figure 1 * | by applicant | US5655830 | US5193895 | US5528474 | US5404282 |