EP3278860 - METHOD FOR THE CREATION AND PROCESSING OF PRODUCTS OF THE OXIDATIVE COUPLING OF METHANE AND CORRESPONDING INSTALLATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.01.2019 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 05.01.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.01.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.02.2019 [2019/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Linde Aktiengesellschaft Klosterhofstrasse 1 80331 München / DE | [2018/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Voss, Christian Waldstraße 21d 82538 Geretsried / DE | 02 /
Leitmayr, Werner Brunnenstr. 11a 86633 Neuburg/Donau / DE | 03 /
Kemper, Rainer Plazerstraße 2a 81375 München / DE | 04 /
Mündl, Florian Matheisweg 26 83624 Otterfing / DE | 05 /
Haidegger, Ernst Rosenstraße 19a 85521 Riemerling / DE | [2018/06] | Representative(s) | Dehns Germany Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 33 04 29 80064 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/06] | m patent group Postfach 33 04 29 80064 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 16182257.2 | 01.08.2016 | [2018/06] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3278860 | Date: | 07.02.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.02.2017 | Classification | IPC: | B01D53/04, B01D53/047, C07C2/82, C07C2/84, C07C7/12 | [2018/06] | CPC: |
C07C2/82 (EP);
B01D53/0476 (EP);
C07C2/84 (EP);
C07C7/12 (EP);
B01D2256/24 (EP);
B01D2257/504 (EP);
B01D2257/7025 (EP);
B01D2257/80 (EP);
Y02C20/20 (EP);
Y02C20/40 (EP);
Y02P20/151 (EP);
Y02P20/156 (EP);
Y02P20/50 (EP)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C07C2/82, C07C11/04 (EP);
C07C2/84, C07C11/04 (EP);
C07C7/12, C07C11/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/06] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PROZESS ZUR ERZEUGUNG UND VERARBEITUNG VON PRODUKTEN DER OXIDATIVEN KOPPLUNG VON METHAN UND ENTSPRECHENDE ANLAGE | [2018/06] | English: | METHOD FOR THE CREATION AND PROCESSING OF PRODUCTS OF THE OXIDATIVE COUPLING OF METHANE AND CORRESPONDING INSTALLATION | [2018/06] | French: | PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION ET DE PREPARATION DE PRODUITS DU COUPLAGE PAR OXYDATION DE METHANE ET INSTALLATION CORRESPONDANTE | [2018/06] | Examination procedure | 08.08.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/06] | 18.09.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2019/06] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2018 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]DD275452 (LEIPZIG CHEMIEANLAGEN [DD]) [X] 1,2,8-10 * claims 1, 3 * * page 5, lines 15-39 * * page 4, lines 12-19 * * pages 7-8; example 2 * [I] 3-7; | [X]WO2016001116 (SHELL INT RESEARCH [NL], et al) [X] 9,10 * claims 1, 5 * * page 12, line 22 - page 16, line 18 *; | [X]WO2015162090 (SHELL INT RESEARCH [NL], et al) [X] 9,10 * claims 1, 4 * * page 6, line 29 - page 10, line 17 *; | [A]US2015307415 (RAFIQUE HUMERA A [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * page 12, paragraphs 126-130 * * page 17, paragraphs 186-190 - page 18 * * pages 30-31; examples 5, 6 * | by applicant | EP0675094 | - "Natural Gas", J.D. IDOL ET AL., Handbook of Industrial Chemistry and Biotechnology, SPRINGER, (2012), vol. 2 |