EP3165197 - KNEE REPLACEMENT SYSTEM WITH CONVEX TIBIAL BEARING SURFACE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.05.2018 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 07.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.05.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.06.2018 [2018/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ConforMIS, Inc. 600 Technology Park Drive Billerica, MA 01821 / US | [2017/35] |
Former [2017/19] | For all designated states ConforMIS, Inc. 28 Crosby Drive Bedford, MA 01730 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BOJARSKI, Raymond, A. 32 Colleens Way Attleboro, MA Massachusetts 02703 / US | 02 /
LANG, Philipp 7 Fair Oaks Terrace Lexington, MA Massachusetts 02421 / US | 03 /
CHAO, Nam 45 Perry Lane Marlborough, MA Massachusetts 01752 / US | 04 /
FITZ, Wolfgang 53 Lake Street Sherborn, MA Massachusetts 01770 / US | 05 /
SLAMIN, John 50 Cumberland Road Wrentham, MA Massachusetts 02093 / US | 06 /
STEINES, Daniel 210 Lincoln Street Lexington, MA Massachusetts 02421 / US | 07 /
MINAS, Thomas 47 Wilsondale Street Dover, MA Massachusetts 02030 / US | [2017/19] | Representative(s) | Grund, Martin Grund Intellectual Property Group Patentanwälte und Solicitor PartG mbB Steinsdorfstraße 2 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/19] | Grund, Martin Grund Intellectual Property Group Patentanwalt und Solicitor PartG mbB Postfach 44 05 16 80754 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 16182644.1 | 23.06.2010 | [2017/19] | Priority number, date | US20090269405P | 24.06.2009 Original published format: US 269405 P | US20090220726P | 26.06.2009 Original published format: US 220726 P | US20090273216P | 31.07.2009 Original published format: US 273216 P | US20090275174P | 26.08.2009 Original published format: US 275174 P | US20090280493P | 04.11.2009 Original published format: US 280493 P | US20090284458P | 18.12.2009 Original published format: US 284458 P | US20100660529 | 25.02.2010 Original published format: US 660529 | [2017/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3165197 | Date: | 10.05.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.04.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/38 | [2017/19] | CPC: |
A61F2/30942 (EP,CN,GB,US);
A61F2/389 (EP,CN,GB,US);
A61B34/10 (US);
A61B17/155 (US);
A61B17/157 (US);
A61F2/3836 (CN);
A61F2/384 (US);
A61F2/3859 (CN,US);
A61F2/3886 (EP,CN,GB,US);
A61F2/5046 (EP,CN,US);
A61B17/1764 (EP,CN,GB,US);
A61B2034/107 (US);
A61B2034/108 (US);
A61F2002/30324 (EP,CN,GB,US);
A61F2002/30327 (EP,CN,GB,US);
A61F2002/30952 (EP,CN,GB,US);
A61F2002/3096 (CN);
A61F2002/3895 (US);
B33Y80/00 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/19] | Title | German: | KNIEERSATZSYSTEM MIT KONVEXER TIBIALER LAGERFLÄCHE | [2017/19] | English: | KNEE REPLACEMENT SYSTEM WITH CONVEX TIBIAL BEARING SURFACE | [2017/19] | French: | SYSTÈME DE REMPLACEMENT DE GENOU AVEC SURFACE D'ARTICULATION TIBIALE CONVEXE | [2017/19] | Examination procedure | 11.11.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/23] | 22.12.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2018/23] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP10792589.3 / EP2445451 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]DE202004003133U (AAP IMPLANTATE AG [DE]) [X] 1,5-8 * paragraphs [0009] - [0014] * [Y] 2 [I] 10; | [Y]US2004204766 (SIEBEL THOMAS [DE]) [Y] 2* figures 2,6 *; | [X]WO2006092167 (MATHYS AG [CH], et al) [X] 1,7 * page 5, line 7 - page 6, line 35 *; | [XI]WO2007108933 (MAKO SURGICAL CORP [US], et al) [X] 1,2 * paragraphs [0066] - [0080] * [I] 10; | [X]WO2008028481 (SIEBEL THOMAS [DE]) [X] 1,5,7 * page 3, line 31 - page 4, line 28 * | by applicant | US2007100462 | US2009228113 | - Wohlers Report 2009, WOHLERS ASSOCIATES, (2009), ISBN 0-9754429-5-3 | - PHAM; DIMOV, Rapid manufacturing., SPRINGER-VERLAG, (2001), ISBN 1-85233-360-X | - BIDANDA AND BARTOLO, Virtual Prototyping & Bio Manufacturing in Medical Applications, SPRINGER, (20071217), ISBN 10: 038733429 | - BIDANDA AND BARTOLO, Bio-Materials and Prototyping Applications in Medicine, SPRINGER, (20071210), vol. 13, pages 978 - 03874768, ISBN 10: 038747682 | - LIOU, Rapid Prototyping and Engineering Applications: A Toolbox for Prototype Development, CRC, (20070926), vol. 13, pages 978 - 08493340, ISBN 10: 084933409 | - GIBSON, Advanced Manufacturing Technology for Medical Applications: Reverse Engineering. Software Conversion and Rapid Prototyping, WILEY, (200601), vol. 13, pages 978 - 04700168, ISBN 10: 047001688 | - BRANNER ET AL., "Coupled Field Simulation in Additive Layer Manufacturing", 3RD INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE PMI, (2008), page 10 |