EP3159352 - STITCHED POLYPEPTIDES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 30.06.2023 Database last updated on 18.05.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.02.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.05.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.11.2017 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 24.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): EE, ES, SK | published on 12.06.2024 [2024/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states President and Fellows of Harvard College 17 Quincy Street Cambridge, MA 02138 / US | [2017/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Verdine, Gregory, L. 500 Atlantic Avenue Unit 18P Boston, MA 02210 / US | 02 /
Kim, Young-Woo 15 Emerson Street Belmont, MA 02478 / US | [2017/17] | Representative(s) | Avidity IP Broers Building Hauser Forum 21 JJ Thomson Avenue Cambridge CB3 0FA / GB | [2023/31] |
Former [2017/17] | Cole, William Gwyn, et al Avidity IP Broers Building Hauser Forum 21 J J Thomson Avenue Cambridge CB3 0FA / GB | Application number, filing date | 16182714.2 | 28.03.2008 | [2017/17] | Priority number, date | US20070908566P | 28.03.2007 Original published format: US 908566 P | [2017/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3159352 | Date: | 26.04.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3159352 | Date: | 02.08.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.01.2017 | Classification | IPC: | C07K1/107, C07K1/113, C07K7/56 | [2017/17] | CPC: |
C07K7/06 (EP,US);
C07K7/56 (KR);
C07K1/1075 (US);
A61K38/12 (KR);
A61P1/04 (EP);
A61P1/16 (EP);
A61P11/00 (EP);
A61P11/06 (EP);
A61P13/12 (EP);
A61P15/00 (EP);
A61P15/16 (EP);
A61P15/18 (EP);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P17/06 (EP);
A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P21/00 (EP);
A61P21/02 (EP);
A61P23/00 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP,KR);
A61P25/04 (EP);
A61P25/08 (EP);
A61P25/16 (EP);
A61P25/18 (EP);
A61P25/20 (EP);
A61P25/22 (EP);
A61P25/24 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P27/02 (EP);
A61P27/06 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P3/06 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P31/04 (EP);
A61P31/12 (EP);
A61P31/18 (EP);
A61P33/00 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P35/02 (EP);
A61P37/00 (EP);
A61P37/02 (EP,KR);
A61P37/06 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P5/00 (EP);
A61P5/14 (EP);
A61P5/18 (EP);
A61P7/00 (EP,KR);
A61P7/02 (EP);
A61P7/06 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP,KR);
A61P9/10 (EP);
A61P9/12 (EP);
C07C229/30 (US);
C07K1/107 (KR);
C07K1/113 (EP,US);
C07K14/001 (EP,US);
C07K14/005 (US);
C07K14/4705 (US);
C07K14/4746 (EP,US);
C07K14/4747 (US);
C07K14/605 (EP,US);
C07K14/705 (US);
C07K7/08 (EP,US);
C12N7/00 (US);
C12N9/22 (EP,US);
C12Y301/00 (EP,US);
C12N2740/16322 (US);
C12N2770/24222 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2017/49] |
Former [2017/17] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | GEHEFTETE POLYPEPTIDE | [2017/17] | English: | STITCHED POLYPEPTIDES | [2017/17] | French: | POLYPEPTIDES PIQUÉS | [2017/17] | Examination procedure | 04.08.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 26.10.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.10.2017 | Examination requested [2017/49] | 14.05.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.11.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.04.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M05) | 20.09.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.02.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.09.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 26.11.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.02.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.06.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 21.06.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.06.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP08744544.1 / EP2142562 | EP12159110.1 / EP2508531 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 26.11.2020 | Request for further processing filed | 26.11.2020 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 07.12.2020 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 04.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 04.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 04.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 27.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 27.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 27.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 28.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 27.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2021 | 14   M06   Fee paid on   27.05.2021 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 02.08.2023 | CZ | 02.08.2023 | DK | 02.08.2023 | EE | 02.08.2023 | ES | 02.08.2023 | FI | 02.08.2023 | HR | 02.08.2023 | LT | 02.08.2023 | LV | 02.08.2023 | NL | 02.08.2023 | PL | 02.08.2023 | RO | 02.08.2023 | SE | 02.08.2023 | SK | 02.08.2023 | NO | 02.11.2023 | GR | 03.11.2023 | IS | 02.12.2023 | PT | 04.12.2023 | [2024/23] |
Former [2024/22] | AT | 02.08.2023 | |
CZ | 02.08.2023 | ||
DK | 02.08.2023 | ||
FI | 02.08.2023 | ||
HR | 02.08.2023 | ||
LT | 02.08.2023 | ||
LV | 02.08.2023 | ||
NL | 02.08.2023 | ||
PL | 02.08.2023 | ||
RO | 02.08.2023 | ||
SE | 02.08.2023 | ||
NO | 02.11.2023 | ||
GR | 03.11.2023 | ||
IS | 02.12.2023 | ||
PT | 04.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 02.08.2023 | |
FI | 02.08.2023 | ||
HR | 02.08.2023 | ||
LT | 02.08.2023 | ||
LV | 02.08.2023 | ||
NL | 02.08.2023 | ||
PL | 02.08.2023 | ||
SE | 02.08.2023 | ||
NO | 02.11.2023 | ||
GR | 03.11.2023 | ||
IS | 02.12.2023 | ||
PT | 04.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AT | 02.08.2023 | |
FI | 02.08.2023 | ||
LT | 02.08.2023 | ||
NL | 02.08.2023 | ||
SE | 02.08.2023 | ||
NO | 02.11.2023 | ||
GR | 03.11.2023 | ||
IS | 02.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 02.08.2023 | |
NL | 02.08.2023 | ||
NO | 02.11.2023 | ||
GR | 03.11.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2004041275 (HOFFMANN LA ROCHE [CH]) [X] 14 * page 60; claim - *; | [Y]WO2005044839 (DANA FARBER CANCER INST INC [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * claim - *; | [X]US2006008848 (VERDINE GREGORY L [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * paragraphs [0038] , [0048] , [0052] , [0053]; figures 2,5; claims 3,10 *; | [E]WO2008061192 (DANA FARBER CANCER INST INC, et al) [E] 1-15 * claim - *; | [E]WO2008095063 (DANA FARBER CANCER INST INC [US], et al) [E] 1-15 * claim - *; | [Y] - WALENSKY LOREN D ET AL, "A stapled BID BH3 helix directly binds and activates BAX.", MOLECULAR CELL 20 OCT 2006, (20061020), vol. 24, no. 2, ISSN 1097-2765, pages 199 - 210, XP009107657 [Y] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1586/14787210.4.2.261 | [Y] - BERNAL FEDERICO ET AL, "Reactivation of the p53 tumor suppressor pathway by a stapled p53 peptide.", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY 7 MAR 2007, (20070207), vol. 129, no. 9, ISSN 0002-7863, pages 2456 - 2457, XP009107955 [Y] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ja0693587 | [Y] - WALENSKY L D ET AL, "Activation of apoptosis in vivo by a hydrocarbon-stapled BH3 helix", SCIENCE, AMERICAN ASSOCIATION FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF SCIENCE, US, WASHINGTON, DC, (20040101), vol. 305, ISSN 0036-8075, pages 1466 - 1470, XP002491411 [Y] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.1099191 | [Y] - PHELAN J C ET AL, "A GENERAL METHOD FOR CONSTRAINING SHORT PEPTIDES TO AN ASPIRE- HELICAL CONFORMATION", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, WASHINGTON, DC.; US, US, (19970122), vol. 119, no. 3, ISSN 0002-7863, pages 455 - 460, XP002059088 [Y] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ja9611654 | [X] - ROOS ERIC C ET AL, "Synthesis of alpha-substituted alpha-amino acids via cationic intermediates", JOURNAL OF ORGANIC CHEMISTRY, (1993), vol. 58, no. 12, ISSN 0022-3263, pages 3259 - 3268, XP009108003 [X] 14 * compound 32 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jo00064a011 | [X] - ELLIS TREVOR K ET AL, "Design, synthesis, and evaluation of a new generation of modular nucleophilic glycine equivalents for the efficient synthesis of sterically constrained alpha-amino acids.", THE JOURNAL OF ORGANIC CHEMISTRY 27 OCT 2006, (20061027), vol. 71, no. 22, ISSN 0022-3263, pages 8572 - 8578, XP009108010 [X] 14 * compound 21 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jo0616198 | by applicant | US4270537 | US4596556 | US4790824 | US4886499 | US4940460 | US4941880 | US5015235 | US5064413 | US5141496 | US5190521 | US5312335 | US5328483 | US5334144 | US5339163 | US5383851 | US5417662 | US5466220 | US5480381 | US5503627 | US5520639 | US5527288 | US5569189 | US5599302 | WO9713537 | US5649912 | WO9737705 | US5704911 | US5811515 | US5893397 | WO9934850 | US5993412 | US2004067503 | US2005250680 | - BABINE ET AL., CHERN. REV., (1997), vol. 97, page 1359 | - GANTE, J. ANGEW. CHEM. INT. ED. ENGL., (1994), vol. 33, pages 1699 - 1720 | - R. M. J. LISKAMP, RED. TRAV. CHIM. PAYS-BAS, (1994), vol. 113, page 1 | - GIANNIS, T. KOLTER, ANGEW. CHON. INT. ED. ENGL., (1993), vol. 32, page 1244 | - P. D. BAILEY, Peptide Chemistry, WILEY, (1990), page 182 | - PHELAN ET AL., J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (1997), vol. 119, page 455 | - LEUC ET AL., PROC. NAT'L. ACAD. SCI. USA, (2003), vol. 100, page 11273 | - BRACKEN ET AL., J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (1994), vol. 116, page 6432 | - YAN ET AL., BIOORG. MED, CHEM., (2004), vol. 14, page 1403 | - J ORG. CHEM., (2001), vol. 66, no. 16 | - BLACKWELL ET AL., ANGEW CHEM. INT. ED., (1994), vol. 37, page 3281 | - SCHAFMICSTER ET AL., J. AIN. CHEM. SOC., (2000), vol. 122, pages 5891 - 5892 | - WALENSKY ET AL., SCIENCE, (2004), vol. 305, pages 1466 - 1470 | - "Periodic Table of the Elements, CAS version", W. M. HAYNES, Handbook of Chemistry and Physics | - WILEN, S.H. ET AL., TETRAHEDRON, (1977), vol. 33, page 2725 | - WILEN, S.H., Tables of Resolving Agents and Optical Resolutions, UNIV. OF NOTRE DAME PRESS, (1972), page 268 | - S. M, BERGE ET AL., J. PHARMACEUTICAL SCIENCES, (1977), vol. 66, pages 1 - 19 | - WALENSKY ET AL., SCIENCE, (2004), pages 305 - 1466 | - GRUBBS ET AL., ACC. CHEM. RES., (1995), vol. 28, pages 446 - 452 | - SCHROCK ET AL., ORGANOMETALLICS, (1982), vol. 1, page 1645 | - GALLIVAN ET AL., TETRAHEDRON LETTERS, (2005), vol. 46, pages 2577 - 2580 | - FURSTNER ET AL., J. AM. CHEN!. SOC., (1999), vol. 121, page 9453 | - CHEM. EUR. J., (2001), vol. 7, page 5299 | - FURSTNER ET AL., J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (1996), vol. 118, page 12349 | - VAICKUS, L., CRIT REV. IN ONCOL./HEMOTOI., (1991), vol. 11, pages 267 - 297 | - SHAIR, CHEM. & BIOL., (1997), vol. 4, page 791 | - HARPER, LANCET, (2004), vol. 364, page 1757 | - SCHAFMEISTER ET AL., J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (2000), vol. 122, pages 5891 - 5892 | - BIERZYNSKI, A.; KIM, P, S.; BALDWIN, R. L., PROC. ACAD. SCI. U.S.A., (1982), vol. 79, pages 2470 - 2474 | - SCHAFRNEISTER, C, E.; PO, J.; VERDINE, G. L., J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (2000), vol. 122, pages 5891 - 5892 | - DENMARK, S. E.; STAVENGER, R. A.; FAUCHER, A.-M.; EDWARDS, J. P., J, ORG. CHEM., (1997), vol. 62, pages 3375 - 3389 | - NODE ET AL., J. ORG. CHEM., (1981), vol. 46, page 1991 | - FAVRIN, G.; IRBACK, A.; SAMUELSSON, B.; WALLIN; S., BIOPHYSIC. J., (2003), vol. 85, pages 1457 - 1465 | - SCHRODINGER, Macromodel, LLC, (2005), vol. 9.1 | - STILL, W. C.; TEMPCZYK, A; HAWLELY, R. C.; HENDRICKSON, T. A., "A General Treatment of Solvation for Molecular Mechanics", J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (1990), vol. 112, pages 6127 - 6129 |