EP3278878 - DEVICE FOR REMOVING PARTICLES FROM A MATERIAL IN MOVEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.06.2021 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.08.2018 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 05.01.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.06.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.07.2021 [2021/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Haute Ecole d'Ingénierie et de Gestion du Canton de Vaud (HEIG-VD) Route de cheseaux 1 Case postale 521 1401 Yverdon-les-bains / CH | [2018/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BÉGUIN, Mathias Av. de Grandson 25 1400 Yverdon-les-Bains / CH | 02 /
CALDAS, Danny Ch. de la Magnenette 17 1350 Orbe / CH | [2018/06] | Representative(s) | Schneiter, Sorin, et al Omnis IP SA Avenue de Riond-Bosson 3 1110 Morges / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2018/06] | Schneiter, Sorin Schneiter & Vuille IP Partners Ch. de Champ-Colomb 7B 1024 Ecublens / CH | Application number, filing date | 16183005.4 | 05.08.2016 | [2018/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3278878 | Date: | 07.02.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.02.2017 | Classification | IPC: | B03C1/027, B03C1/033, B03C1/034, B03C1/28 | [2018/06] | CPC: |
B03C1/027 (EP);
B03C1/0332 (EP);
B03C1/034 (EP);
B03C1/288 (EP);
B03C2201/18 (EP);
B03C2201/20 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/37] |
Former [2018/06] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR ENTFERNUNG VON PARTIKELN VON EINEM MATERIAL IN BEWEGUNG | [2018/06] | English: | DEVICE FOR REMOVING PARTICLES FROM A MATERIAL IN MOVEMENT | [2018/06] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'ÉLIMINATION DE PARTICULES D'UN MATÉRIAU EN MOUVEMENT | [2018/06] | Examination procedure | 05.08.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 18.07.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.08.2018 | Examination requested [2018/37] | 02.03.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/30] | 24.03.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2021/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2020 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US5932096 (SAHO NORIHIDE [JP], et al) [X] 1-5,9-15 * figures 1-3,7 * * column 4, line 49 - column 9, line 52 * * column 12, line 8 - line 34 * * column 1, line 4 - line 9 * [I] 6-8; | [XI]DE2655140 (KLOECKNER HUMBOLDT DEUTZ AG) [X] 1-5,9-12,14,15 * figure 3 * * column 5, line 65 - column 6, line 25 * [I] 6-8,13; | [XI]JPS61118112 (NEC CORP) [X] 1-6,9-12,14,15 * figure 1 * [I] 7,8,13; | [XI]CN2274532Y (CHANGSHA MINING AND METALLIZIN [CN]) [X] 1-6,9-12,14,15 * figures 1,2 * [I] 7,8,13; | [XI]CN204892115U (ZHENGZHOU INST MULTIPURPOSE UTILIZATION MINERAL RESOURCES CAGS) [X] 1-6,9-12,14,15 * figures 1,2 * * paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0027] * [I] 7,8,13 | by applicant | US8474629 | FR2447228 | FR2722120 | US4157955 | US5740919 |