EP3282527 - AIR CONDITIONING OF ELECTRICAL DEVICES BY MEANS OF COMPRESSED AIR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.10.2019 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 31.01.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.08.2018 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 12.01.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.10.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.11.2019 [2019/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Werner-von-Siemens-Straße 1 80333 München / DE | [2018/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dvorszky, Peter Wenusweg 4 90763 Fürth / DE | 02 /
Stürzenhofecker, Gerhard Hohenlohestr. 39 91452 Wilhermsdorf / DE | [2018/07] | Application number, filing date | 16183182.1 | 08.08.2016 | [2018/07] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3282527 | Date: | 14.02.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.01.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H02B1/56, // H02B1/052 | [2018/07] | CPC: |
H02B1/56 (EP);
H02B1/052 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/38] |
Former [2018/07] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KLIMATISIERUNG VON ELEKTRISCHEN GERÄTEN MITTELS DRUCKLUFT | [2018/07] | English: | AIR CONDITIONING OF ELECTRICAL DEVICES BY MEANS OF COMPRESSED AIR | [2018/07] | French: | CLIMATISATION D'APPAREILS ELECTRIQUES AU MOYEN D'AIR COMPRIME | [2018/07] | Examination procedure | 08.08.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 09.08.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.08.2018 | Examination requested [2018/38] | 04.02.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.06.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/47] | 11.07.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2019/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2019 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP2190277 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [X] 1-13 * paragraph [0006]; figure 1 *; | [A]DE3509908 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1,4 * figure 1 * | by applicant | DE102012100974 |