EP3127921 - METHOD OF MODIFYING ISOELECTRIC POINT OF ANTIBODY VIA AMINO ACID SUBSTITION IN CDR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.09.2018 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.08.2017 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 06.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.03.2024 | New entry: Decision on request for further processing | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CHUGAI SEIYAKU KABUSHIKI KAISHA 5-1, Ukima 5-chome Kita-ku Tokyo 115-8543 / JP | [2017/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
IGAWA, Tomoyuki c/o Chugai Seiyaku Kabushiki Kaisha 135 Komakado 1-chome Gotenba-shi, Shizuoka, 412-8513 / JP | 02 /
TSUNODA, Hiroyuki c/o Chugai Seiyaku Kabushiki Kaisha 135 Komakado 1-chome Gotenba-shi, Shizuoka, 412-8513 / JP | 03 /
TACHIBANA, Tatsuhiko c/o Chugai Seiyaku Kabushiki Kaisha 135 Komakado 1-chome Gotenba-shi, Shizuoka, 412-8513 / JP | 04 /
KURAMOCHI, Taichi c/o Chugai Seiyaku Kabushiki 135 Komakado 1-chome Gotenba-shi, Shizuoka, 412-8513 / JP | [2017/06] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [2017/06] | Application number, filing date | 16183476.7 | 26.09.2008 | [2017/06] | Priority number, date | JP20070250165 | 26.09.2007 Original published format: JP 2007250165 | JP20070256063 | 28.09.2007 Original published format: JP 2007256063 | [2017/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3127921 | Date: | 08.02.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.12.2016 | Classification | IPC: | C07K16/28, A61K39/395, A61P43/00, C07K16/46, C12N1/15, C12N1/19, C12N1/21, C12N5/10, C12N15/09, C12P21/02 | [2017/06] | CPC: |
A61K39/39591 (EP,CN,IL,US);
C07K16/28 (EP,IL,KR,US);
C07K16/00 (EP,CN,IL,US);
C07K16/2866 (EP,IL,US);
A61K39/39 (KR);
A61P37/02 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C07K1/16 (KR);
C12N15/63 (KR);
G01N33/6854 (IL,US);
C07K2317/24 (IL,US);
C07K2317/565 (EP,CN,IL,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2017/36] |
Former [2017/06] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR MODIFIZIERUNG EINES ISOELEKTRISCHEN PUNKTS EINES ANTIKÖRPERS ÜBER AMINOSÄURESUBSTITION IN CDR | [2017/06] | English: | METHOD OF MODIFYING ISOELECTRIC POINT OF ANTIBODY VIA AMINO ACID SUBSTITION IN CDR | [2017/06] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE MODIFICATION D'UN ANTICORPS PAR POINT ISOÉLECTRIQUE PAR SUBSTITUTION D'ACIDE AMINÉ DANS CDR | [2017/06] | Examination procedure | 10.08.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 27.07.2017 | Examination requested [2017/36] | 21.11.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.09.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.06.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.06.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 19.05.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.06.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.01.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 19.03.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP08834150.8 / EP2202245 | Divisional application(s) | EP20159129.4 / EP3689912 | EP24152321.6 | EP24152324.0 / EP4339294 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 19.03.2024 | Request for further processing filed | 19.03.2024 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 25.03.2024 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 19.05.2021 | Request for further processing filed | 19.05.2021 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 31.05.2021 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 28.06.2019 | Request for further processing filed | 28.06.2019 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 08.07.2019 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 21.11.2017 | Request for further processing filed | 21.11.2017 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 30.11.2017 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 07.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 07.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 22.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 24.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 24.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 23.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 23.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 20.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 21.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 16 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9803546 (AMGEN INC [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * page 2, line 33 - line 35 * * page 21, line 25 - line 30 * * page 26, line 5 - line 10 * * page 1; table 2 * * page 36 *; | [X]WO2006004663 (MEDIMMUNE INC [US], et al) [X] 13-15 * figure 1B *; | [A]US2007059312 (BACA MANUEL [AU], et al) [A] 1-15 * table 11 *; | [AP]WO2007114319 (CHUGAI PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD [JP], et al) [AP] 1-15 * the whole document *; | EP2006381 [ ] (CHUGAI PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD [JP]) [ ] * paragraph [0005] * * paragraph [0009] * * paragraph [0020] * * paragraph [0022] * * page 5, lines 10,19 *; | [A] - TAN P H ET AL, "Engineering the isoelectric point of a renal cell carcinoma targeting antibody greatly enhances scFv solubility", IMMUNOTECHNOLOGY, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS BV, NL LNKD- DOI:10.1016/S1380-2933(98)00011-6, (19981001), vol. 4, no. 2, ISSN 1380-2933, pages 107 - 114, XP004153635 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S1380-2933(98)00011-6 | by applicant | EP0125023 | EP0239400 | EP0404097 | WO9201047 | WO9203918 | WO9220791 | JPH059878B | WO9306213 | WO9311161 | WO9311236 | WO9312227 | WO9319172 | WO9402602 | WO9501438 | WO9515393 | WO9515388 | WO9602576 | WO9634096 | WO9633735 | WO9813388 | WO9846777 | WO03039485 | US2006019342 | WO2006046751 | US2006122377 | US2006194280 | WO2007014278 | WO2007059782 | WO2007114319 | WO2007114325 | US2007280945 | JP2008504970 | - JANICE M REICHERT; CLARK J ROSENSWEIG; LAURA B FADEN; MATTHEW C DEWITZ, "Monoclonal antibody successes in the clinic", NATURE BIOTECHNOLOGY, (2005), vol. 23, doi:doi:10.1038/nbt0905-1073, pages 1073 - 1078, XP002555770 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nbt0905-1073 | - PAVLOU AK; BELSEY MJ., "The therapeutic antibodies market to 2008", EUR J PHARM BIOPHARM, (200504), vol. 59, no. 3, doi:doi:10.1016/j.ejpb.2004.11.007, pages 389 - 96, XP025317626 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ejpb.2004.11.007 | - PRESTA LG, "Engineering of therapeutic antibodies to minimize immunogenicity and optimize function", ADV DRUG DELIV REV., (20060807), vol. 58, no. 5-6, doi:doi:10.1016/j.addr.2006.01.026, pages 640 - 56, XP024892146 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.addr.2006.01.026 | - KIM SJ; PARK Y; HONG HJ, "Antibody engineering for the development of therapeutic antibodies", MOL CELLS., (20050831), vol. 20, no. 1, pages 17 - 29, XP055199890 | - FUJII I, "Antibody affinity maturation by random mutagenesis", METHODS MOL BIOL, (2004), vol. 248, pages 345 - 59 | - SHIRE SJ; SHAHROKH Z; LIU J, "Challenges in the development of high protein concentration formulations", J PHARM SCI., (200406), vol. 93, no. 6, doi:doi:10.1002/jps.20079, pages 1390 - 402, XP009108986 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/jps.20079 | - SALFELD JG., "Isotype selection in antibody engineering", NAT BIOTECHNOL., (200712), vol. 25, no. 12, doi:doi:10.1038/nbt1207-1369, pages 1369 - 72, XP002668461 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nbt1207-1369 | - HINTON PR; JOHLFS MG; XIONG JM; HANESTAD K; ONG KC; BULLOCK C; KELLER S; TANG MT; TSO JY; VASQUEZ M, "Engineered human IgG antibodies with longer serum half-lives in primates", J BIOL CHEM., (20040220), vol. 279, no. 8, pages 6213 - 6 | - HINTON PR; XIONG JM; JOHLFS MG; TANG MT; KELLER S; TSURUSHITA N, "An engineered human IgGI antibody with longer serum half-life", J IMMUNOL., (20060101), vol. 176, no. L, pages 346 - 56 | - GHETIE V; POPOV S; BORVAK J; RADU C; MATESOI D; MEDESAN C; OBER RJ; WARD ES., "Increasing the serum persistence of an IgG fragment by random mutagenesis", NAT BIOTECHNOL., (199707), vol. 15, no. 7, doi:doi:10.1038/nbt0797-637, pages 637 - 40, XP000876642 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nbt0797-637 | - ALMAGRO JC; FRANSSON J., "Humanization of antibodies", FRONT BIOSCI., (20080101), vol. 13, pages 1619 - 33 | - LIU H; GAZA-BULSECO G; FALDU D; CHUMSAE C; SUN J., "Heterogeneity of monoclonal antibodies", J PHARM SCI., (200807), vol. 97, no. 7, pages 2426 - 47 | - CHEN C; ROBERTS VA; RITTENBERG MB, "Generation and analysis of random point mutations in an antibody CDR2 sequence: many mutated antibodies lose their ability to bind antigen", J EXP MED., (19920901), vol. 176, no. 3, doi:doi:10.1084/jem.176.3.855, pages 855 - 66, XP002517166 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1084/jem.176.3.855 | - CHEN C; MARTIN TM; STEVENS S; RITTENBERG MB., "Defective secretion of an immunoglobulin caused by mutations in the heavy chain complementarity determining region 2.", J EXP MED., (19940801), vol. 180, no. 2, pages 577 - 86 | - WIENS GD; HELDWEIN KA; STENZEL-POORE MP; RITTENBERG MB., "Somatic mutation in VH complementarity-determining region 2 and framework region 2: differential effects on antigen binding and Ig secretion.", J IMMUNOL., (19970801), vol. 159, no. 3, pages 1293 - 302 | - WIENS GD; LEKKERKERKER A; VELTMAN I; RITTENBERG MB, "Mutation of a single conserved residue in VH complementarity-determining region 2 results in a severe Ig secretion defect", J IMMUNOL., (20010815), vol. 167, no. 4, pages 2179 - 86 | - ZWICK MB; KOMORI HK; STANFIELD RL; CHURCH S; WANG M; PARREN PW; KUNERT R; KATINGER H; WILSON IA; BURTON DR, "The long third complementarity-determining region of the heavy chain is important in the activity of the broadly neutralizing anti-human immunodeficiency virus type 1 antibody 2F5.", J VIROL, (200403), vol. 78, no. 6, doi:doi:10.1128/JVI.78.6.3155-3161.2004, pages 3155 - 61, XP008125658 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/JVI.78.6.3155-3161.2004 | - KOMISSAROV AA; MARCHBANK MT; CALCUTT MJ; QUINN TP; DEUTSCHER SL, "Site-specific mutagenesis of a recombinant anti-single-stranded DNA Fab. Role of heavy chain complementarity-determining region 3 residues in antigen interaction", J BIOL CHEM., (19971024), vol. 272, no. 43, pages 26864 - 70 | - GERSTNER RB; CARTER P; LOWMAN HB, "Sequence plasticity in the antigen-binding site of a therapeutic anti-HER2 antibody", J MOL BIOL., (20020830), vol. 321, no. 5, doi:doi:10.1016/S0022-2836(02)00677-0, pages 851 - 62, XP002972421 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0022-2836(02)00677-0 | - VAJDOS FF; ADAMS CW; BREECE TN; PRESTA LG; DE VOS AM; SIDHU SS, "Comprehensive functional maps of the antigen-binding site of an anti-ErbB2 antibody obtained with shotgun scanning mutagenesis", J MOL BIOL., (20020705), vol. 320, no. 2, doi:doi:10.1016/S0022-2836(02)00264-4, pages 415 - 28, XP027251270 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0022-2836(02)00264-4 | - PONS J; RAJPAL A; KIRSCH JF, "Energetic analysis of an antigen/antibody interface: alanine scanning mutagenesis and double mutant cycles on the HyHEL-10/lysozyme interaction", POTEIN SCI., (199905), vol. 8, no. 5, doi:doi:10.1110/ps.8.5.958, pages 958 - 68, XP002521752 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1110/ps.8.5.958 | - LEONG SR; DEFORGE L; PRESTA L; GONZALEZ T; FAN A; REICHERT M; CHUNTHARAPAI A; KIM KJ; TUMAS DB; LEE WP, "Adapting pharmacokinetic properties of a humanized anti-interleukin-8 antibody for therapeutic applications using site-specific pegylation", CYTOKINE, (20011107), vol. 16, no. 3, doi:doi:10.1006/cyto.2001.0936, pages 106 - 19, XP002665741 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/cyto.2001.0936 | - XIANG J; SRIVAMADAN M; RAJALA R; JIA Z, "Study of B72.3 combining sites by molecular modeling and site-directed mutagenesis", PROTEIN ENG., (200005), vol. 13, no. 5, pages 339 - 44 | - ROTHE A; HOSSE RJ; POWER BE, "Ribosome display for improved biotherapeutic molecules", EXPERT OPIN BIOL THER, (200602), vol. 6, no. 2, doi:doi:10.1517/14712598.6.2.177, pages 177 - 87, XP009105147 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1517/14712598.6.2.177 | - SCHMITZ U; VERSMOLD A; KAUFMANN P; FRANK HG, "Phage display: a molecular tool for the generation of antibodies--a review", PLACENTA, (200003), vol. 21, pages 106 - 12 | - RAJPAL A; BEYAZ N; HABER L; CAPPUCCILLI G; YEE H; BHATT RR; TAKEUCHI T; LERNER RA; CREA R, "A general method for greatly improving the affinity of antibodies by using combinatorial libraries", PROC NATL ACAD SCI USA., (20050614), vol. 102, no. 24, doi:doi:10.1073/pnas.0503543102, pages 8466 - 71, XP002392777 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.0503543102 | - DE GROOT AS; KNOPP PM; MARTIN W, "De-immunization of therapeutic proteins by T-cell epitope modification", DEV BIOL (BASEL, (2005), vol. 122, pages 171 - 94, XP008074262 | - NYGREN ET AL., CURRENT OPINION IN STRUCTURAL BIOLOGY, (1997), vol. 7, pages 463 - 469 | - JOURNAL OF IMMUNOL METHODS, (2004), vol. 290, pages 3 - 28 | - BINZ ET AL., NATURE BIOTECH, (2005), vol. 23, pages 1257 - 1266 | - HOSSE ET AL., PROTEIN SCIENCE, (2006), vol. 15, pages 14 - 27 | - ORITA ET AL., BLOOD, (2005), vol. 105, pages 562 - 566 | - HUSTON ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1988), vol. 85, pages 5879 - 83 | - PLUCKTHUN, The Pharmacology of Monoclonal Antibodies, SPRINGER VERLAG, (1994), vol. 113, pages 269 - 315 | - HOLLIGER ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1993), vol. 90, pages 6444 - 8 | - JOHNSON ET AL., METHOD IN ENZYMOLOGY, (1991), vol. 203, pages 88 - 98 | - HOLLIGER ET AL., PROTEIN ENGINEERING, (1996), vol. 9, pages 299 - 305 | - PERISIC ET AL., STRUCTURE, (1994), vol. 2, pages 1217 - 26 | - JOHN ET AL., PROTEIN ENGINEERING, (1999), vol. 12, no. 7, pages 597 - 604 | - ATWELL ET AL., MOL. IMMUNOL., (1996), vol. 33, pages 1301 - 12 | - HUDSON ET AL., J IMMUNOL. METHODS, (1999), vol. 231, pages 177 - 89 | - JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGICAL METHODS, (1999), vol. 231, pages 177 - 89 | - CANCER RESEARCH, (2000), vol. 60, pages 4336 - 41 | - MORIMOTO ET AL., J. BIOCHEM. BIOPHYS. METHODS, (1992), vol. 24, pages 107 - 17 | - BRENNAN ET AL., SCIENCE, (1985), vol. 229, page 81 | - CO ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (1994), vol. 152, pages 2968 - 76 | - BETTER; HORWITZ, METHODS ENZYMOL., (1989), vol. 178, pages 476 - 96 | - PLUCKTHUN; SKERRA, METHODS ENZYMOL., (1989), vol. 178, pages 497 - 515 | - LAMOYI, METHODS ENZYMOL., (1986), vol. 121, pages 652 - 63 | - ROUSSEAUX ET AL., METHODS ENZYMOL., (1986), vol. 121, pages 663 - 9 | - BIRD; WALKER, TRENDS BIOTECHNOL., (1991), vol. 9, pages 132 - 7 | - PLUCKTHUN, The Pharmacology of Monoclonal Antibody, SPRINGER VERLAG, (1994), vol. 113, pages 269 - 315 | - P. HOLLIGER ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1993), vol. 90, pages 6444 - 6448 | - HE XY; XU Z; MELROSE J; MULLOWNEY A; VASQUEZ M; QUEEN C; VEXLER V; KLINGBEIL C; CO MS; BERG EL, "Humanization and pharmacokinetics of a monoclonal antibody with specificity for both E- and P-selectin", J IMMUNOL., (1998), vol. 160, no. 2, pages 1029 - 35, XP002959848 | - J IMMUNOL., (1998), vol. 160, no. 2, pages 1029 - 35 | - BINZ HK; AMSTUTZ P; PLUCKTHUN A, "Engineering novel binding proteins from nonimmunoglobulin domains.", NAT BIOTECHNOL., (200510), vol. 23, no. 10, doi:doi:10.1038/nbt1127, pages 1257 - 68, XP002381839 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nbt1127 | - KATAYOSE Y; KUDO T; SUZUKI M; SHINODA M; SAIJYO S; SAKURAI N; SAEKI H; FUKUHARA K; IMAI K; MATSUNO S, "MUC1-specific targeting immunotherapy with bispecific antibodies: inhibition of xenografted human bile duct carcinoma growth", CANCER RES., (1996), vol. 56, no. 18, pages 4205 - 12, XP002932515 | - CURR. OPIN. DRUG DISCOV. DEVEL., (2006), vol. 9, no. 2, pages 184 - 93 | - ONO K; OHTOMO T; YOSHIDA K; YOSHIMURA Y; KAWAI S; KOISHIHARA Y; OZAKI S; KOSAKA M; TSUCHIYA M., "The humanized a-,it.-HMIJ.24 antibody effectively kills multiple myeloma cells by human effector cell-mediated cytotoxicity", MOL. IMMUNOL., (1999), vol. 36, no. 6, doi:doi:10.1016/S0161-5890(99)00029-2, pages 387 - 395, XP002282626 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0161-5890(99)00029-2 | - DALL'ACQUA WF; DAMSCHRODER MM; ZHANG J; WOODS RM; WIDJAJA L; YU J; WU H, "Antibody humanization by framework shuffling", METHODS, (2005), vol. 36, no. 1, doi:doi:10.1016/j.ymeth.2005.01.005, pages 43 - 60, XP004852552 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ymeth.2005.01.005 | - GOBBURU JV; TENHOOR C; ROGGE MC; FRAZIER DE JR; THOMAS D; BENJAMIN C; HESS DM; JUSKO WJ., "Pharmacokinetics/dynamics of 5c8, a monoclonal antibody to CD 154 (CD40 ligand) suppression of an immune response in monkeys", J PHARMACOL EXP THER, (1998), vol. 286, no. 2, pages 925 - 30, XP000989582 | - KASHMIRI SV; SHU L; PADLAN EA; MILENIC DE; SCHLOM J; HAND PH, "Generation, characterization, and in vivo studies of humanized anticarcinoma antibody CC49", HYBRIDOMA, (1995), vol. 14, no. 5, pages 461 - 73, XP000198397 | - GRAVES SS; GOSHORN SC; STONE DM; AXWORTHY DB; RENO JM; BOTTINO B; SEARLE S; HENRY A; PEDERSEN J; REES AR, "Molecular modeling and preclinical evaluation of the humanized NR-LU-13 antibody", CLIN CANCER RES., (1999), vol. 5, no. 4, pages 899 - 908, XP000941615 | - COUTO JR; BLANK EW; PETERSON JA; CERIANI RL, "Anti-BA46 monoclonal antibody Mc3: humanization using a novel positional consensus and in vivo and in vitro characterization", CANCER RES., (1995), vol. 55, no. 8, pages 1717 - 22, XP000919432 | - NAT BIOTECHNOL., (1997), vol. 15, no. 7, pages 637 - 40 | - ADAMS CW; ALLISON DE; FLAGELLA K; PRESTA L; CLARKE J; DYBDAL N; MCKEEVER K; SLIWKOWSKI MX, "Humanization of a recombinant monoclonal antibody to produce a therapeutic HER dimerization inhibitor, pertuzumab", CANCER IMMUNOL IMMUNOTHER., (2006), vol. 55, no. 6, doi:doi:10.1007/s00262-005-0058-x, pages 717 - 27, XP019333247 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s00262-005-0058-x | - VAISITTI T; DEAGLIO S; MALAVASI F, "Cationization of monoclonal antibodies: another step towards the ''magic bullet''?", J BIOL REGUL HOMEOSTAGENTS., (2005), vol. 19, no. 3-4, pages 105 - 12, XP009125963 | - PARDRIDGE WM; BUCIAK J; YANG J; WU D., ENHANCED ENDOCYTOSIS IN CULTURED HUMAN BREAST CARCINOMA CELLS AND IN VIVO BIODISTRIBUTION IN RATS OF A HUMANIZED MONOCLONAL ANTIBODY AFTER CATIONIZATION OF THE PROTEIN, (1998), vol. 286, no. L, pages 548 - 54 | - CHOTHIA ET AL., NATURE, (1989), vol. 342, page 877 | - SATO, K. ET AL., CANCER RES., (1993), vol. 53, pages 851 - 856 | - AMIT ET AL., SCIENCE, (1986), vol. 233, pages 747 - 53 | - CHOTHIA ET AL., J. MOL. BIOL., (1987), vol. 196, pages 901 - 17 | - MOL IMMUNOL., (1999), vol. 36, no. 6, pages 387 - 395 | - ABHINANDAN K. R.; MARTIN C. R., J. MOL. BIOL., (2007), vol. 369, pages 852 - 862 | - CLACKSON ET AL., NATURE, (1991), vol. 352, pages 624 - 8 | - MARKS ET AL., J. MOL. BIOL., (1991), vol. 222, pages 581 - 97 | - WATERHOUSES ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (1993), vol. 21, pages 2265 - 6 | - GRIFFITHS ET AL., EMBO J., (1994), vol. 13, pages 3245 - 60 | - VAUGHAN ET AL., NATURE BIOTECHNOLOGY, (1996), vol. 14, pages 309 - 14 | - MENDEZ ET AL., NAT. GENET, (1997), vol. 15, pages 146 - 56 | - GODING, Monoclonal Antibodies: Principles and Practice, ACADEMIC PRESS, (1986), pages 59 - 103 | - G. KOHLER; C. MILSTEIN, METHODS ENZYMOL., (1981), pages 3 - 46 | - K. SATO ET AL., CANCER RES., (1993), vol. 53, pages 851 - 856 | - KUNKEL, PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1985), vol. 82, page 488 | - BIOTECHNOL BIOENG., (2004), vol. 87, no. 5, pages 614 - 22 | - BIOTECHNOL BIOENG, (2006), vol. 93, no. 5, pages 851 - 61 | - NATURE BIOTECHNOLOGY, (2006), vol. 24, pages 1591 - 7 | - NATURE BIOTECHNOLOGY, (2006), vol. 24, pages 210 - 5 | - MOL. CELL BIOL., (1998), vol. 8, pages 466 - 472 | - J. EXP. MED., (1995), vol. 108, page 945 | - VALLE ET AL., NATURE, (1981), vol. 291, pages 338 - 340 | - EBERT ET AL., BIO/TECHNOLOGY, (1994), vol. 12, pages 699 - 702 | - SUSUMU ET AL., NATURE, (1985), vol. 315, pages 592 - 594 | - MA ET AL., EUR. J. IMMUNOL., (1994), vol. 24, pages 131 - 138 | - COX K.M. ET AL., NAT. BIOTECHNOL., (200612), vol. 24, no. 12, pages 1591 - 1597 | - CURR. OPIN. BIOTECHNOL, (199408), vol. 5, no. 4, pages 428 - 33 | - NAT. BIOTECHNOL., (200509), vol. 23, no. 9, pages L 126 - 36 | - CO, M. S. ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (1994), vol. 152, pages 2968 - 2976 | - BETTER, M.; HORWITZ, A. H., METHODS IN ENZYMOLOGY, (1989), vol. 178, pages 476 - 496 | - PLIICKTHUN, A.; SKERRA, A., METHODS IN ENZYMOLOGY, (1989), vol. 178, pages 497 - 515 | - LAMOYI, E., METHODS IN ENZYMOLOGY, (1989), vol. 121, pages 652 - 663 | - ROUSSEAUX, J. ET AL., METHODS IN ENZYMOLOGY, (1989), vol. 121, pages 663 - 66 | - BIRD, R. E. ET AL., TIBTECH, (1991), vol. 9, pages 132 - 137 | - HUSTON, J. S. ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1988), vol. 85, pages 5879 - 5883 | - MOL. IMMUNOL, (199301), vol. 30, no. 1, pages 105 - 8 | - EUR. J. IMMUNOL., (199908), vol. 29, no. 8, pages 2613 - 24 | - HASHIMOTO-GOTOH, T.; MIZUNO, T.; OGASAHARA, Y.; NAKAGAWA, M., "An oligodeoxyribonucleotide-directed dual amber method for site-directed mutagenesis", GENE, (1995), vol. 152, doi:doi:10.1016/0378-1119(94)00750-M, pages 271 - 275, XP004042690 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0378-1119(94)00750-M | - ZOLLER, M. J.; SMITH, M., "Oligonucleotide-directed mutagenesis of DNA fragments cloned into M13 vectors", METHODS ENZYMOL., (1983), vol. 100, doi:doi:10.1016/0076-6879(83)00074-9, pages 468 - 500, XP001088749 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0076-6879(83)00074-9 | - KRAMER, W.; DRUTSA, V.; JANSEN, H. W.; KRAMER, B.; PFLUGFELDER, M.; FRITZ, H. J., "The gapped duplex DNA approach to oligonucleotide-directed mutation construction", NUCLEIC ACIDS RES., (1984), vol. 12, pages 9441 - 9456, XP002026371 | - KRAMER W.; FRITZ H. J., "Oligonucleotide-directed construction of mutations via gapped duplex DNA Methods", ENZYMOL, (1987), vol. 154, pages 350 - 367 | - KUNKEL, T. A., "Rapid and efficient site-specific mutagenesis without phenotypic selection", PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1985), vol. 82, doi:doi:10.1073/pnas.82.2.488, pages 488 - 492, XP002052322 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.82.2.488 | - MOL. IMMUNOL., (200704), vol. 44, no. 11, pages 3049 - 60 | - NATURE BIOTECHNOLOGY, (2007), vol. 25, pages 563 - 565 | - NATURE BIOTECHNOLOGY, (1998), vol. 16, pages 773 - 777 | - BIOCHEMICAL AND BIOPHYSICAL RESEARCH COMMUNICATIONS, (1999), vol. 255, pages 444 - 450 | - NATURE BIOTECHNOLOGY, (2005), vol. 23, pages 1159 - 1169 | - JOURNAL OF VIROLOGY, (2001), vol. 75, pages 2803 - 2809 | - BIOCHEMICAL AND BIOPHYSICAL RESEARCH COMMUNICATIONS, (2003), vol. 308, pages 94 - 100 | - R. W. MALONE ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1989), vol. 86, page 6077 | - P. L. FEIGNER ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1987), vol. 84, page 7413 | - F. L. GRAHAM; A. J. VAN DER EB, VIROLOGY, (1973), vol. 52, pages 456 - 467 | - MOL. IMMUNOL., (199301), vol. 30, no. 1, pages 105 - 8 | - J. BIOCHEM., (1990), vol. 108, pages 673 - 676 | - YAMASAKI ET AL., SCIENCE, (1988), vol. 241, pages 825 - 828 | - HIBI ET AL., CELL, (1990), vol. 63, pages 1149 - 1157 | - HIRATA ET AL., FEBS LETTER, (1994), vol. 356, pages 244 - 248 | - CANCER RES., (19930215), vol. 53, no. 4, pages 851 - 6 | - J. MOL. BIOL., (1996), vol. 256, pages 77 - 88 | - NATURE BIOTECHNOLOGY, (199906), vol. 17, pages 568 - 572 | - J. IMMUNOLOGICAL METHODS, (1999), vol. 231, pages 119 - 135 | - NATURE BIOTECHNOLOGY, (200012), vol. 18, pages 1287 - 1292 | - JBC, (2004), vol. 279, no. 18, pages 18870 - 18877 | - J. MOL. BIOL., (1992), vol. 227, pages 381 - 388 | - METHODS, (200412), vol. 34, no. 4, pages 468 - 75 | - BIOCHEM. BIOPHYS. RES. COMMUN, (20070413), vol. 355, no. 3, pages 751 - 7 | - MOL IMMUNOL., (200704), vol. 44, no. 11, pages 3049 - 60 | - PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA., (19950523), vol. 92, no. 11, pages 4862 - 6 | - CHU GC, PHARM. RES., (20070324), vol. 24, no. 6, pages 1145 - 56 | - JOHNSON KA ET AL., ANAL. BIOCHEM., (20070101), vol. 360, no. 1, pages 75 - 83 | - CHU GC ET AL., PHARM RES., (20070324), vol. 24, no. 6, pages 1145 - 56 | - RODOLFO ET AL., IMMUNOLOGY LETTERS, (1999), pages 47 - 52 | - STRAND V ET AL., NAT. REV. DRUG DISCOV, (200701), vol. 6, no. 1, pages 75 - 92 | - GESSNER JE ET AL., ANN. HEMATOL, (199806), vol. 76, no. 6, pages 231 - 48 | - ANN. HEMATOL, (199806), vol. 76, no. 6, pages 231 - 48 | - COLE MS ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (19971001), vol. 159, no. 7, pages 3613 - 21 | - REDDY MP ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (20000215), vol. 164, no. 4, pages 1925 - 33 | - CHAU LA ET AL., TRANSPLANTATION, (20010415), vol. 71, no. 7, pages 941 - 50 | - KIM SJ ET AL., MOL CELLS, (20050831), vol. 20, no. 1, pages 17 - 29 | - J. IMMUNOL., (199908), vol. 29, no. 8, pages 2613 - 24 | - CANCER RESEARCH, (1993), vol. 53, pages 851 - 856 | - NAT. REV. IMMUNOL, (200709), vol. 7, no. 9, pages 715 - 25 | - NAT. BIOTECHNOL., (200712), vol. 25, no. 12, pages 1369 - 72 | - J. BIOL. CHEM., (20070119), vol. 282, no. 3, pages 1709 - 17 | - J. IMMUNOL., (20060101), vol. 176, no. 1, pages 346 - 56 | - PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA., (20061205), vol. 103, no. 49, pages 18709 - 14 | - INT. IMMUNOL, (200612), vol. 18, no. 12, pages 1759 - 69 | - J. EXP. MED., (1994), vol. 180, no. 6, pages 2377 - 2381 | - PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA., (2002), vol. 99, no. 26, pages 16899 - 16903 | - J. IMMUNOL., (20021101), vol. 169, no. 9, pages 5171 - 80 | - J. PHARM. SCI., (200804), vol. 97, no. 4, pages 1414 - 26 | - BIRNEY ET AL., ENSEMBL 2006, NUCLEIC ACIDS RES, (20060101), vol. 34, pages D556 - 61 | - YAGI T, PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1990), vol. 87, pages 9918 - 22 | - POPO H, BIOCHEMICAL GENETICS, (1990), vol. 28, pages 299 - 308 | - WEITZHANDLER M. ET AL., JOURNAL OF PHARMACEUTICAL SCIENCES, (1994), vol. 83, no. 12, pages 1670 - 1675 | - SCHENK B ET AL., THE JOURNAL OF CLINICAL INVESTIGATION, (2001), vol. 108, no. 11, pages 1687 - 1695 | - BIGGE J. C. ET AL., ANALYTICAL BIOCHEMISTRY, (1995), vol. 230, no. 2, pages 229 - 238 | - PROTEIN SCIENCE, (1995), no. 4, pages 2411 - 2423 |