EP3203576 - PLANAR PRINTED ANTENNA AND SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.07.2018 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 07.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.07.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.08.2018 [2018/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Arcadyan Technology Corporation No. 8, Sec. 2 Guangfu Road Hsinchu City 30071 / TW | [2017/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HUANG, Chih-Yung No. 222, 1st Side St. 423 Dongshi Township, Taichung County / TW | 02 /
LO, Kuo-Chang No. 449, Sec. 1, Xinglong Rd. 351 Toufen Township, Miaoli County / TW | [2017/32] | Representative(s) | Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Hamborner Straße 53 40472 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/32] | Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Kennedydamm 55 / Roßstrasse 40476 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 16183511.1 | 10.08.2016 | [2017/32] | Priority number, date | TW20160104039 | 05.02.2016 Original published format: TW 105104039 | [2017/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3203576 | Date: | 09.08.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.06.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H01Q1/24, H01Q9/04 | [2017/32] | CPC: |
H01Q1/243 (EP,US);
H01Q9/285 (US);
H01Q1/48 (US);
H01Q9/0421 (EP,US);
H01Q9/045 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/32] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PLANARE GEDRUCKTE ANTENNE UND SYSTEM | [2017/32] | English: | PLANAR PRINTED ANTENNA AND SYSTEM | [2017/32] | French: | SYSTÈME ET ANTENNE À CIRCUITS IMPRIMÉS PLANE | [2017/32] | Examination procedure | 10.02.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/32] | 21.03.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2018/32] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2008055164 (ZHANG ZHIJUN [US], et al) [Y] 7,8,11* paragraph [0076] - paragraph [0083]; figures 4-11 *; | [Y]US7466276 (CHEN PO-CHUAN [TW]) [Y] 5 * column 3, line 36 - column 4, line 8; figure 6 *; | [XY]US2015061940 (CHEN HSIN-HONG [TW], et al) [X] 1-4,6,9,10 * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0031]; figures 1, 2 * [Y] 5,7,8,11 |