EP3150760 - REVERSIBLE COLOR-CHANGING SANITIZER-INDICATING NONWOVEN WIPE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.03.2022 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.04.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 10.11.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.03.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.09.2017 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 03.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.04.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 15.05.2024 [2024/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Illinois Tool Works, Inc. 155 Harlem Avenue Glenview, Illinois 60025 / US | [2021/18] |
Former [2017/14] | For all designated states Illinois Tool Works, Inc. 155 Harlem Avenue, Glenview Illinois 60025 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FARRUGIA, Darren J Illinois Tool Works 155 Harlem Avenue Glenview, IL Illinois 60025 / US | 02 /
WARD, Lesley J Illinois Tool Works 155 Harlem Avenue Glenview, IL Illinois 60025 / US | 03 /
REICHART, Veronica R Illinois Tool Works 155 Harlem Avenue Glenview, IL Illinois 60025 / US | [2017/14] | Representative(s) | HGF HGF Limited 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2021/18] | HGF 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | ||
Former [2017/14] | Jones, Keith William, et al Murgitroyd & Company Scotland House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 16183751.3 | 04.03.2010 | [2017/14] | Priority number, date | US20090211505P | 31.03.2009 Original published format: US 211505 P | US20100702138 | 08.02.2010 Original published format: US 702138 | [2017/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3150760 | Date: | 05.04.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3150760 | Date: | 05.05.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.03.2017 | Classification | IPC: | D06P1/00, A01N25/34, A01N33/12, A47L13/16, A61L2/28, C11D1/62, C11D3/40, C11D3/48, C11D17/04, D06P5/13, D06P1/651, D06P1/92, D06P1/50, A47L13/17, C11D3/43, G01N31/22 | [2017/14] | CPC: |
A47L13/17 (EP,US);
A01N25/34 (EP,US);
A01N33/12 (EP,US);
A47L13/16 (EP,US);
C11D1/62 (EP,US);
C11D17/049 (EP,US);
C11D3/40 (EP,US);
C11D3/43 (EP,US);
C11D3/48 (EP,US);
D06P1/004 (EP,US);
D06P1/50 (EP,US);
D06P1/65118 (EP,US);
D06P1/65125 (EP,US);
D06P1/928 (EP,US);
D06P5/138 (EP,US);
G01N31/22 (EP,US);
A61L2/28 (EP,US);
Y10T442/20 (EP,US);
Y10T442/2525 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A01N33/12, A01N2300/00 (US,EP);
A01N33/12, A01N25/34 (EP,US) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/41] |
Former [2017/14] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | REVERSIBLES FARBWECHSELNDES DESINFEKTIONSMITTELANZEIGENDES VLIESTUCH | [2017/14] | English: | REVERSIBLE COLOR-CHANGING SANITIZER-INDICATING NONWOVEN WIPE | [2017/14] | French: | CHIFFON NON-TISSE AVEC INDICATEUR DE PRESENCE DE DESINFECTANT A CHANGEMENT DE COULEUR REVERSIBLE | [2017/14] | Examination procedure | 11.08.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 05.08.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.09.2017 | Examination requested [2017/41] | 29.03.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.07.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.12.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.04.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.12.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.03.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.11.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.03.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 05.03.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.03.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP10707414.8 / EP2414579 | Opposition(s) | 08.02.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 29.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2017 | 08   M06   Fee paid on   27.04.2017 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 04.03.2010 | AT | 05.05.2021 | CY | 05.05.2021 | CZ | 05.05.2021 | DK | 05.05.2021 | EE | 05.05.2021 | ES | 05.05.2021 | FI | 05.05.2021 | HR | 05.05.2021 | IT | 05.05.2021 | LT | 05.05.2021 | LV | 05.05.2021 | MC | 05.05.2021 | NL | 05.05.2021 | PL | 05.05.2021 | RO | 05.05.2021 | SE | 05.05.2021 | SI | 05.05.2021 | SK | 05.05.2021 | SM | 05.05.2021 | BG | 05.08.2021 | NO | 05.08.2021 | GR | 06.08.2021 | IS | 05.09.2021 | PT | 06.09.2021 | [2024/20] |
Former [2024/18] | HU | 04.03.2010 | |
AT | 05.05.2021 | ||
CZ | 05.05.2021 | ||
DK | 05.05.2021 | ||
EE | 05.05.2021 | ||
ES | 05.05.2021 | ||
FI | 05.05.2021 | ||
HR | 05.05.2021 | ||
IT | 05.05.2021 | ||
LT | 05.05.2021 | ||
LV | 05.05.2021 | ||
MC | 05.05.2021 | ||
NL | 05.05.2021 | ||
PL | 05.05.2021 | ||
RO | 05.05.2021 | ||
SE | 05.05.2021 | ||
SI | 05.05.2021 | ||
SK | 05.05.2021 | ||
SM | 05.05.2021 | ||
BG | 05.08.2021 | ||
NO | 05.08.2021 | ||
GR | 06.08.2021 | ||
IS | 05.09.2021 | ||
PT | 06.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/47] | AT | 05.05.2021 | |
CZ | 05.05.2021 | ||
DK | 05.05.2021 | ||
EE | 05.05.2021 | ||
ES | 05.05.2021 | ||
FI | 05.05.2021 | ||
HR | 05.05.2021 | ||
IT | 05.05.2021 | ||
LT | 05.05.2021 | ||
LV | 05.05.2021 | ||
MC | 05.05.2021 | ||
NL | 05.05.2021 | ||
PL | 05.05.2021 | ||
RO | 05.05.2021 | ||
SE | 05.05.2021 | ||
SI | 05.05.2021 | ||
SK | 05.05.2021 | ||
SM | 05.05.2021 | ||
BG | 05.08.2021 | ||
NO | 05.08.2021 | ||
GR | 06.08.2021 | ||
IS | 05.09.2021 | ||
PT | 06.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AT | 05.05.2021 | |
CZ | 05.05.2021 | ||
DK | 05.05.2021 | ||
EE | 05.05.2021 | ||
ES | 05.05.2021 | ||
FI | 05.05.2021 | ||
HR | 05.05.2021 | ||
IT | 05.05.2021 | ||
LT | 05.05.2021 | ||
LV | 05.05.2021 | ||
NL | 05.05.2021 | ||
PL | 05.05.2021 | ||
RO | 05.05.2021 | ||
SE | 05.05.2021 | ||
SI | 05.05.2021 | ||
SK | 05.05.2021 | ||
SM | 05.05.2021 | ||
BG | 05.08.2021 | ||
NO | 05.08.2021 | ||
GR | 06.08.2021 | ||
IS | 05.09.2021 | ||
PT | 06.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AT | 05.05.2021 | |
CZ | 05.05.2021 | ||
DK | 05.05.2021 | ||
EE | 05.05.2021 | ||
ES | 05.05.2021 | ||
FI | 05.05.2021 | ||
HR | 05.05.2021 | ||
LT | 05.05.2021 | ||
LV | 05.05.2021 | ||
NL | 05.05.2021 | ||
PL | 05.05.2021 | ||
RO | 05.05.2021 | ||
SE | 05.05.2021 | ||
SI | 05.05.2021 | ||
SK | 05.05.2021 | ||
SM | 05.05.2021 | ||
BG | 05.08.2021 | ||
NO | 05.08.2021 | ||
GR | 06.08.2021 | ||
IS | 05.09.2021 | ||
PT | 06.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AT | 05.05.2021 | |
CZ | 05.05.2021 | ||
DK | 05.05.2021 | ||
EE | 05.05.2021 | ||
ES | 05.05.2021 | ||
FI | 05.05.2021 | ||
HR | 05.05.2021 | ||
LT | 05.05.2021 | ||
LV | 05.05.2021 | ||
NL | 05.05.2021 | ||
PL | 05.05.2021 | ||
RO | 05.05.2021 | ||
SE | 05.05.2021 | ||
SK | 05.05.2021 | ||
SM | 05.05.2021 | ||
BG | 05.08.2021 | ||
NO | 05.08.2021 | ||
GR | 06.08.2021 | ||
IS | 05.09.2021 | ||
PT | 06.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AT | 05.05.2021 | |
CZ | 05.05.2021 | ||
DK | 05.05.2021 | ||
EE | 05.05.2021 | ||
ES | 05.05.2021 | ||
FI | 05.05.2021 | ||
HR | 05.05.2021 | ||
LT | 05.05.2021 | ||
LV | 05.05.2021 | ||
NL | 05.05.2021 | ||
PL | 05.05.2021 | ||
RO | 05.05.2021 | ||
SE | 05.05.2021 | ||
SK | 05.05.2021 | ||
SM | 05.05.2021 | ||
BG | 05.08.2021 | ||
NO | 05.08.2021 | ||
GR | 06.08.2021 | ||
PT | 06.09.2021 | ||
IS | 22.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | AT | 05.05.2021 | |
CZ | 05.05.2021 | ||
DK | 05.05.2021 | ||
ES | 05.05.2021 | ||
FI | 05.05.2021 | ||
HR | 05.05.2021 | ||
LT | 05.05.2021 | ||
LV | 05.05.2021 | ||
NL | 05.05.2021 | ||
PL | 05.05.2021 | ||
RO | 05.05.2021 | ||
SE | 05.05.2021 | ||
SK | 05.05.2021 | ||
SM | 05.05.2021 | ||
BG | 05.08.2021 | ||
NO | 05.08.2021 | ||
GR | 06.08.2021 | ||
IS | 05.09.2021 | ||
PT | 06.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AT | 05.05.2021 | |
CZ | 05.05.2021 | ||
DK | 05.05.2021 | ||
ES | 05.05.2021 | ||
FI | 05.05.2021 | ||
HR | 05.05.2021 | ||
LT | 05.05.2021 | ||
LV | 05.05.2021 | ||
NL | 05.05.2021 | ||
PL | 05.05.2021 | ||
SE | 05.05.2021 | ||
SM | 05.05.2021 | ||
BG | 05.08.2021 | ||
NO | 05.08.2021 | ||
GR | 06.08.2021 | ||
IS | 05.09.2021 | ||
PT | 06.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AT | 05.05.2021 | |
ES | 05.05.2021 | ||
FI | 05.05.2021 | ||
HR | 05.05.2021 | ||
LT | 05.05.2021 | ||
LV | 05.05.2021 | ||
NL | 05.05.2021 | ||
PL | 05.05.2021 | ||
SE | 05.05.2021 | ||
SM | 05.05.2021 | ||
BG | 05.08.2021 | ||
NO | 05.08.2021 | ||
GR | 06.08.2021 | ||
IS | 05.09.2021 | ||
PT | 06.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/04] | AT | 05.05.2021 | |
ES | 05.05.2021 | ||
FI | 05.05.2021 | ||
HR | 05.05.2021 | ||
LT | 05.05.2021 | ||
LV | 05.05.2021 | ||
NL | 05.05.2021 | ||
PL | 05.05.2021 | ||
SE | 05.05.2021 | ||
BG | 05.08.2021 | ||
NO | 05.08.2021 | ||
GR | 06.08.2021 | ||
IS | 05.09.2021 | ||
PT | 06.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/52] | AT | 05.05.2021 | |
ES | 05.05.2021 | ||
FI | 05.05.2021 | ||
HR | 05.05.2021 | ||
LT | 05.05.2021 | ||
LV | 05.05.2021 | ||
PL | 05.05.2021 | ||
SE | 05.05.2021 | ||
BG | 05.08.2021 | ||
NO | 05.08.2021 | ||
GR | 06.08.2021 | ||
IS | 05.09.2021 | ||
PT | 06.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/51] | AT | 05.05.2021 | |
ES | 05.05.2021 | ||
FI | 05.05.2021 | ||
HR | 05.05.2021 | ||
LT | 05.05.2021 | ||
LV | 05.05.2021 | ||
SE | 05.05.2021 | ||
BG | 05.08.2021 | ||
NO | 05.08.2021 | ||
GR | 06.08.2021 | ||
IS | 05.09.2021 | ||
PT | 06.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | AT | 05.05.2021 | |
FI | 05.05.2021 | ||
HR | 05.05.2021 | ||
LT | 05.05.2021 | ||
LV | 05.05.2021 | ||
SE | 05.05.2021 | ||
BG | 05.08.2021 | ||
NO | 05.08.2021 | ||
GR | 06.08.2021 | ||
PT | 06.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/49] | AT | 05.05.2021 | |
FI | 05.05.2021 | ||
HR | 05.05.2021 | ||
LT | 05.05.2021 | ||
LV | 05.05.2021 | ||
SE | 05.05.2021 | ||
BG | 05.08.2021 | ||
NO | 05.08.2021 | ||
GR | 06.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/47] | AT | 05.05.2021 | |
FI | 05.05.2021 | ||
LT | 05.05.2021 | ||
BG | 05.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AT | 05.05.2021 | |
FI | 05.05.2021 | ||
LT | 05.05.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JPS60178362 ; | [XI]US2003017605 (KRITZMAN AMNON [IL], et al) [X] 1,5,7-13,16-19 * paragraphs [0016] , [0025] , [0031] , [0050] - [0056] - [0059] , [0061]; example 1; table 1 *[I] 2-4; | [Y]US2006293205 (CHUNG JESSICA [US]) [Y] 1-4,6,11,13-15,20 * paragraphs [0002] , [0041] - [0045] - [0056] , [0073] , [0092] , [0135] - [0137]; claims 1-17; table 1 *; | [XI]WO2007060649 (COMMON SENSE LTD [IL], et al) [X] 1,5,7-13,16-19 * page 3, line 14 - page 5, line 29; example 4 * [I] 2-4; | [Y] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1985, no. 43, Database accession no. 1985-266450, XP002612809 & JPS60178362 A 19850912 (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO LTD) [Y] 1-4,6,11,13-15,20 * abstract * | by applicant | US4311479 | US4678704 |