EP3187085 - GROUND BRUSH FOR VACUUM CLEANER AND VACUUM CLEANER WITH THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.06.2018 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 02.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.06.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.07.2018 [2018/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Jiangsu Midea Cleaning Appliances Co., Ltd. No. 39 Caohu Avenue Xiangcheng Economic Development Zone Suzhou Jiangsu 215100 / CN | [2017/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SONG, Bingxian No. 39 Caohu Avenue Xiangcheng Economic Development Zone Suzhou, Jiangsu 215100 / CN | [2017/27] | Representative(s) | Romano, Giuseppe, et al Società Italiana Brevetti S.p.A Piazza di Pietra, 39 00186 Roma / IT | [2017/27] | Application number, filing date | 16184471.7 | 17.08.2016 | [2017/27] | Priority number, date | CN2016103337 | 04.01.2016 Original published format: CN201610003337 | CN2016205746U | 04.01.2016 Original published format: CN 201620005746 U | CN2016205909U | 04.01.2016 Original published format: CN 201620005909 U | [2017/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3187085 | Date: | 05.07.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.05.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A47L9/04 | [2017/27] | CPC: |
A47L9/0477 (EP,US);
A47L9/0673 (US);
A47L9/2857 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/27] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BODENBÜRSTE FÜR STAUBSAUGER UND STAUBSAUGER DAMIT | [2017/27] | English: | GROUND BRUSH FOR VACUUM CLEANER AND VACUUM CLEANER WITH THE SAME | [2017/27] | French: | BALAI DE SOL POUR ASPIRATEUR ET ASPIRATEUR EN ÉTANT ÉQUIPÉ | [2017/27] | Examination procedure | 06.01.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/27] | 16.02.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2018/27] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]CN204146956U (LOTES GUANGZHOU CO LTD) [X] 1-4,7,12 * paragraph [0035] * [I] 5,6,8-11; | [A]WO2015157196 (TIGER TOOL INTERNAT INC [CA], et al) [A] 1-12* paragraphs [0031] - [0034] *; | [P]US2016058256 (JU TED [TW], et al) [P] * paragraph [0038] * |