EP3170753 - ENERGY EFFICIENT SATELLITE MANEUVERING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.10.2020 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 25.10.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 10.06.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Boeing Company 100 North Riverside Plaza Chicago, IL 60606-1596 / US | [2017/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LUI, Timothy S. c/o Boeing Satellite Systems 1950 E. Imperial Hwy El Segundo, CA 90245 / US | 02 /
LEE, Kangsik c/o Boeing Satellite Systems 1950 E. Imperial Hwy El Segundo, CA 90245 / US | [2017/21] | Representative(s) | Witte, Weller & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 10 54 62 70047 Stuttgart / DE | [2017/21] | Application number, filing date | 16185325.4 | 23.08.2016 | [2017/21] | Priority number, date | US201514940811 | 13.11.2015 Original published format: US201514940811 | [2017/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3170753 | Date: | 24.05.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3170753 | Date: | 27.11.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.04.2017 | Classification | IPC: | B64G1/24, B64G1/26, B64G1/28, B64G1/34, // B64G1/36 | [2019/26] | CPC: |
B64G1/26 (EP,CN,KR,RU,US);
B64G1/34 (EP,CN,KR,RU,US);
B64G1/2427 (EP,CN,KR,RU);
B64G1/245 (CN,US);
B64G1/242 (US);
B64G1/2425 (EP,CN,KR,RU);
B64G1/244 (EP,KR,US);
B64G1/283 (EP,KR,US);
B64G1/285 (EP,KR,US);
|
Former IPC [2017/21] | B64G1/24, B64G1/26, B64G1/28, B64G1/34 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/52] |
Former [2017/21] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | ENERGIEEFFIZIENTE SATELLITENMANÖVRIERUNG | [2017/21] | English: | ENERGY EFFICIENT SATELLITE MANEUVERING | [2017/21] | French: | MANOEUVRE DE SATELLITE EFFICACE EN ÉNERGIE | [2017/21] | Examination procedure | 23.08.2016 | Examination requested [2017/21] | 23.08.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 21.11.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.06.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.10.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 17.10.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 17.10.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 28.08.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 23.08.2016 | AL | 27.11.2019 | AT | 27.11.2019 | CY | 27.11.2019 | CZ | 27.11.2019 | DK | 27.11.2019 | EE | 27.11.2019 | ES | 27.11.2019 | FI | 27.11.2019 | HR | 27.11.2019 | IT | 27.11.2019 | LT | 27.11.2019 | LV | 27.11.2019 | MC | 27.11.2019 | MK | 27.11.2019 | MT | 27.11.2019 | NL | 27.11.2019 | PL | 27.11.2019 | RO | 27.11.2019 | RS | 27.11.2019 | SE | 27.11.2019 | SI | 27.11.2019 | SK | 27.11.2019 | SM | 27.11.2019 | TR | 27.11.2019 | BG | 27.02.2020 | NO | 27.02.2020 | GR | 28.02.2020 | IS | 27.03.2020 | PT | 19.04.2020 | IE | 23.08.2020 | LU | 23.08.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 23.08.2016 | |
AL | 27.11.2019 | ||
AT | 27.11.2019 | ||
CY | 27.11.2019 | ||
CZ | 27.11.2019 | ||
DK | 27.11.2019 | ||
EE | 27.11.2019 | ||
ES | 27.11.2019 | ||
FI | 27.11.2019 | ||
HR | 27.11.2019 | ||
IT | 27.11.2019 | ||
LT | 27.11.2019 | ||
LV | 27.11.2019 | ||
MC | 27.11.2019 | ||
MT | 27.11.2019 | ||
NL | 27.11.2019 | ||
PL | 27.11.2019 | ||
RO | 27.11.2019 | ||
RS | 27.11.2019 | ||
SE | 27.11.2019 | ||
SI | 27.11.2019 | ||
SK | 27.11.2019 | ||
SM | 27.11.2019 | ||
TR | 27.11.2019 | ||
BG | 27.02.2020 | ||
NO | 27.02.2020 | ||
GR | 28.02.2020 | ||
IS | 27.03.2020 | ||
PT | 19.04.2020 | ||
IE | 23.08.2020 | ||
LU | 23.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AL | 27.11.2019 | |
AT | 27.11.2019 | ||
CZ | 27.11.2019 | ||
DK | 27.11.2019 | ||
EE | 27.11.2019 | ||
ES | 27.11.2019 | ||
FI | 27.11.2019 | ||
HR | 27.11.2019 | ||
IT | 27.11.2019 | ||
LT | 27.11.2019 | ||
LV | 27.11.2019 | ||
MC | 27.11.2019 | ||
NL | 27.11.2019 | ||
PL | 27.11.2019 | ||
RO | 27.11.2019 | ||
RS | 27.11.2019 | ||
SE | 27.11.2019 | ||
SI | 27.11.2019 | ||
SK | 27.11.2019 | ||
SM | 27.11.2019 | ||
BG | 27.02.2020 | ||
NO | 27.02.2020 | ||
GR | 28.02.2020 | ||
IS | 27.03.2020 | ||
PT | 19.04.2020 | ||
IE | 23.08.2020 | ||
LU | 23.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | AL | 27.11.2019 | |
AT | 27.11.2019 | ||
CZ | 27.11.2019 | ||
DK | 27.11.2019 | ||
EE | 27.11.2019 | ||
ES | 27.11.2019 | ||
FI | 27.11.2019 | ||
HR | 27.11.2019 | ||
IT | 27.11.2019 | ||
LT | 27.11.2019 | ||
LV | 27.11.2019 | ||
MC | 27.11.2019 | ||
NL | 27.11.2019 | ||
PL | 27.11.2019 | ||
RO | 27.11.2019 | ||
RS | 27.11.2019 | ||
SE | 27.11.2019 | ||
SI | 27.11.2019 | ||
SK | 27.11.2019 | ||
SM | 27.11.2019 | ||
BG | 27.02.2020 | ||
NO | 27.02.2020 | ||
GR | 28.02.2020 | ||
IS | 27.03.2020 | ||
PT | 19.04.2020 | ||
LU | 23.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/18] | AL | 27.11.2019 | |
AT | 27.11.2019 | ||
CZ | 27.11.2019 | ||
DK | 27.11.2019 | ||
EE | 27.11.2019 | ||
ES | 27.11.2019 | ||
FI | 27.11.2019 | ||
HR | 27.11.2019 | ||
IT | 27.11.2019 | ||
LT | 27.11.2019 | ||
LV | 27.11.2019 | ||
MC | 27.11.2019 | ||
NL | 27.11.2019 | ||
PL | 27.11.2019 | ||
RO | 27.11.2019 | ||
RS | 27.11.2019 | ||
SE | 27.11.2019 | ||
SI | 27.11.2019 | ||
SK | 27.11.2019 | ||
SM | 27.11.2019 | ||
BG | 27.02.2020 | ||
NO | 27.02.2020 | ||
GR | 28.02.2020 | ||
IS | 27.03.2020 | ||
PT | 19.04.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AL | 27.11.2019 | |
AT | 27.11.2019 | ||
CZ | 27.11.2019 | ||
DK | 27.11.2019 | ||
EE | 27.11.2019 | ||
ES | 27.11.2019 | ||
FI | 27.11.2019 | ||
HR | 27.11.2019 | ||
IT | 27.11.2019 | ||
LT | 27.11.2019 | ||
LV | 27.11.2019 | ||
NL | 27.11.2019 | ||
PL | 27.11.2019 | ||
RO | 27.11.2019 | ||
RS | 27.11.2019 | ||
SE | 27.11.2019 | ||
SI | 27.11.2019 | ||
SK | 27.11.2019 | ||
SM | 27.11.2019 | ||
BG | 27.02.2020 | ||
NO | 27.02.2020 | ||
GR | 28.02.2020 | ||
IS | 27.03.2020 | ||
PT | 19.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | AL | 27.11.2019 | |
AT | 27.11.2019 | ||
CZ | 27.11.2019 | ||
DK | 27.11.2019 | ||
EE | 27.11.2019 | ||
ES | 27.11.2019 | ||
FI | 27.11.2019 | ||
HR | 27.11.2019 | ||
LT | 27.11.2019 | ||
LV | 27.11.2019 | ||
NL | 27.11.2019 | ||
PL | 27.11.2019 | ||
RO | 27.11.2019 | ||
RS | 27.11.2019 | ||
SE | 27.11.2019 | ||
SI | 27.11.2019 | ||
SK | 27.11.2019 | ||
SM | 27.11.2019 | ||
BG | 27.02.2020 | ||
NO | 27.02.2020 | ||
GR | 28.02.2020 | ||
IS | 27.03.2020 | ||
PT | 19.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 27.11.2019 | |
CZ | 27.11.2019 | ||
DK | 27.11.2019 | ||
EE | 27.11.2019 | ||
ES | 27.11.2019 | ||
FI | 27.11.2019 | ||
HR | 27.11.2019 | ||
LT | 27.11.2019 | ||
LV | 27.11.2019 | ||
NL | 27.11.2019 | ||
RO | 27.11.2019 | ||
RS | 27.11.2019 | ||
SE | 27.11.2019 | ||
SK | 27.11.2019 | ||
SM | 27.11.2019 | ||
BG | 27.02.2020 | ||
NO | 27.02.2020 | ||
GR | 28.02.2020 | ||
IS | 27.03.2020 | ||
PT | 19.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 27.11.2019 | |
CZ | 27.11.2019 | ||
DK | 27.11.2019 | ||
EE | 27.11.2019 | ||
ES | 27.11.2019 | ||
FI | 27.11.2019 | ||
HR | 27.11.2019 | ||
LT | 27.11.2019 | ||
LV | 27.11.2019 | ||
NL | 27.11.2019 | ||
RO | 27.11.2019 | ||
RS | 27.11.2019 | ||
SE | 27.11.2019 | ||
BG | 27.02.2020 | ||
NO | 27.02.2020 | ||
GR | 28.02.2020 | ||
IS | 27.03.2020 | ||
PT | 19.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | AL | 27.11.2019 | |
CZ | 27.11.2019 | ||
ES | 27.11.2019 | ||
FI | 27.11.2019 | ||
HR | 27.11.2019 | ||
LT | 27.11.2019 | ||
LV | 27.11.2019 | ||
NL | 27.11.2019 | ||
RO | 27.11.2019 | ||
RS | 27.11.2019 | ||
SE | 27.11.2019 | ||
BG | 27.02.2020 | ||
NO | 27.02.2020 | ||
GR | 28.02.2020 | ||
IS | 27.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/34] | AL | 27.11.2019 | |
ES | 27.11.2019 | ||
FI | 27.11.2019 | ||
HR | 27.11.2019 | ||
LT | 27.11.2019 | ||
LV | 27.11.2019 | ||
NL | 27.11.2019 | ||
RS | 27.11.2019 | ||
SE | 27.11.2019 | ||
BG | 27.02.2020 | ||
NO | 27.02.2020 | ||
GR | 28.02.2020 | ||
IS | 27.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/32] | AL | 27.11.2019 | |
FI | 27.11.2019 | ||
HR | 27.11.2019 | ||
LT | 27.11.2019 | ||
LV | 27.11.2019 | ||
NL | 27.11.2019 | ||
RS | 27.11.2019 | ||
SE | 27.11.2019 | ||
BG | 27.02.2020 | ||
NO | 27.02.2020 | ||
GR | 28.02.2020 | ||
IS | 27.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/26] | FI | 27.11.2019 | |
HR | 27.11.2019 | ||
LT | 27.11.2019 | ||
LV | 27.11.2019 | ||
NL | 27.11.2019 | ||
RS | 27.11.2019 | ||
SE | 27.11.2019 | ||
BG | 27.02.2020 | ||
NO | 27.02.2020 | ||
GR | 28.02.2020 | ||
IS | 27.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | FI | 27.11.2019 | |
LT | 27.11.2019 | ||
LV | 27.11.2019 | ||
NL | 27.11.2019 | ||
SE | 27.11.2019 | ||
BG | 27.02.2020 | ||
NO | 27.02.2020 | ||
GR | 28.02.2020 | ||
IS | 27.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | FI | 27.11.2019 | |
LT | 27.11.2019 | ||
LV | 27.11.2019 | ||
NL | 27.11.2019 | ||
SE | 27.11.2019 | ||
BG | 27.02.2020 | ||
NO | 27.02.2020 | ||
GR | 28.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | FI | 27.11.2019 | |
LT | 27.11.2019 | ||
SE | 27.11.2019 | ||
BG | 27.02.2020 | ||
NO | 27.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/21] | NO | 27.02.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0578176 (HUGHES AIRCRAFT CO [US]); | [A]EP0716365 (LORAL SPACE SYSTEMS INC [US]); | [XI]US2008128559 (HO YIU-HUNG M [US], et al); |