EP3135896 - INTAKE APPARATUS FOR INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.01.2018 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 27.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.01.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.02.2018 [2018/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MAHLE Filter Systems Japan Corporation 1-9-12, Kita-otsuka Toshima-ku Tokyo 170-0004 / JP | [2017/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KAWANO, Takashi c/o MAHLE Filter Systems Japan Corporation 1-9-12, Kita-Otsuka Toshima-ku, Tokyo 170-0004 / JP | [2017/09] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2017/09] | Application number, filing date | 16185411.2 | 24.08.2016 | [2017/09] | Priority number, date | JP20150165324 | 25.08.2015 Original published format: JP 2015165324 | [2017/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3135896 | Date: | 01.03.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.01.2017 | Classification | IPC: | F02M35/10, F02D9/10, B29C65/08 | [2017/09] | CPC: |
B29C65/08 (US);
F02B31/06 (EP,CN,US);
F02D9/16 (EP,US);
F02M35/10078 (EP,US);
F02M35/10085 (EP,US);
F02M35/10255 (EP,CN,US);
F02M35/10262 (CN);
F02M35/10321 (EP,US);
F02M35/1036 (EP,US);
B29C65/06 (EP,US);
B29C66/1312 (EP,US);
B29C66/30223 (EP,US);
B29C66/322 (EP,US);
B29C66/543 (EP,US);
B29L2031/7492 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/09] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ANSAUGVORRICHTUNG FÜR EINEN VERBRENNUNGSMOTOR | [2017/09] | English: | INTAKE APPARATUS FOR INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE | [2017/09] | French: | COLLECTEUR D'ADMISSION POUR MOTEUR À COMBUSTION INTERNE | [2017/09] | Examination procedure | 02.09.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/09] | 11.10.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2018/09] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US2007028891 (AKAGAWA MASAMICHI [JP]) [X] 1 * paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0057]; figures 3, 6A, 6B, 7, 8 * [Y] 2-8; | [Y]US6895926 (MOREAU FABIEN [FR], et al) [Y] 2,3,7,8 * columns 6, l.49 - columns 7, l.6; figures 1-5C *; | [Y]US7624715 (GOLDIN ILIYA [US], et al) [Y] 2-8 * the whole document *; | [Y]US2007017468 (LETOURNEAU MARK [CA], et al) [Y] 2-8 * the whole document *; | [A]US5813380 (TAKAHASHI AKIRA [JP], et al) [A] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [A]EP2835525 (AISIN SEIKI [JP]) [A] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [A]US2005016487 (IKUMA TOMONORI [JP], et al) [A] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [A]EP1452723 (DENSO CORP [JP]) [A] 1-8 * figures 40, 42 *; | [A]US7121246 (UCHIYAMA SHIGEKI [JP]) [A] 1-8 * abstract *; | [A]US2004112322 (CORDUAN PASCAL [FR]) [A] 1-8 * paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0025] * | by applicant | JP20150001196 |