EP3135236 - SYSTEM FOR CONTROLLING CATHETER POWER BASED ON CONTACT FORCE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2017/09] | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR CONTROLLING CATHETER POWER BASED ON CONTACT FORCE | ||
[2022/47] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 20.10.2023 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.06.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.05.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.01.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.10.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.09.2017 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 27.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.04.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 22.05.2024 [2024/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Biosense Webster (Israel) Ltd. 4 Hatnufa Street Yokneam 2066717 / IL | [2022/24] |
Former [2017/09] | For all designated states Biosense Webster (Israel) Ltd. 4 Hatnufa Street 2066717 Yokneam / IL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FANG, Itzhak 15715 Arrow Highway Irwindale, CA California 91706 / US | 02 /
CONSTANTINE, Garth 15715 Arrow Highway Irwindale, CA California 91706 / US | [2017/09] | Representative(s) | Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [2017/09] | Application number, filing date | 16185548.1 | 24.08.2016 | [2017/09] | Priority number, date | US201514835413 | 25.08.2015 Original published format: US201514835413 | [2017/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3135236 | Date: | 01.03.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3135236 | Date: | 22.11.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.01.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A61B18/14, A61B18/00, A61B90/00 | [2017/09] | CPC: |
A61B18/1492 (EP,CN,US);
A61B1/12 (CN);
A61B2018/00357 (US);
A61B2018/00577 (US);
A61B2018/00642 (CN);
A61B2018/00666 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00702 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00708 (US);
A61B2018/00773 (CN,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/40] |
Former [2017/09] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | SYSTEM ZUR STEUERUNG DER KATHETERLEISTUNG AUF BASIS VON KONTAKTKRAFT | [2022/47] | English: | SYSTEM FOR CONTROLLING CATHETER POWER BASED ON CONTACT FORCE | [2022/47] | French: | SYSTÈME DE COMMANDE DE PUISSANCE DE CATHÉTER SUR LA BASE DE LA FORCE DE CONTACT | [2022/47] |
Former [2017/09] | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR STEUERUNG DER KATHETERLEISTUNG AUF BASIS VON KONTAKTKRAFT | ||
Former [2017/09] | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR CONTROLLING CATHETER POWER BASED ON CONTACT FORCE | ||
Former [2017/09] | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE DE PUISSANCE DE CATHÉTER SUR LA BASE DE LA FORCE DE CONTACT | Examination procedure | 24.08.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 25.08.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.08.2017 | Examination requested [2017/40] | 09.10.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.01.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.01.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.05.2023 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 26.06.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.10.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 12.10.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.10.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 05.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GR | 23.02.2024 | IS | 22.03.2024 | [2024/20] | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2008161796 (CAO HONG [US], et al) [X] 1 * claims 21,22 *; | [X]EP2047797 (BIOSENSE WEBSTER INC [US]) [X] 1 * paragraph [0034] *; | [X]US2010121138 (GOLDENBERG ALEX S [US], et al) [X] 1* paragraph [0043] *; | [X]EP2449996 (BIOSENSE WEBSTER ISRAEL LTD [IL]) [X] 1,6 * figure 4 * * paragraph [0044] - paragraph [0048] *; | [XI]US2013296850 (OLSON ERIC STEVEN [US]) [X] 1-4,10 * paragraph [0049] - paragraph [0050] * * paragraph [0040] * * paragraph [0050] * * paragraph [0051] * [I] 6-9 |