EP3136493 - FUEL CELL VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.2018 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 06.10.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 31.05.2017 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Honda Motor Co., Ltd. 1-1, Minami-Aoyama 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 107-8556 / JP | [2017/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NAKAGAWA, Satoshi c/o HONDA R&D CO., LTD. 4-1, Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi, Saitama 351-0193 / JP | 02 /
TANAKA, Manabu c/o HONDA R&D CO., LTD. 4-1, Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi, Saitama 351-0193 / JP | 03 /
MATSUMOTO, Mitsunori c/o HONDA R&D CO., LTD. 4-1, Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi, Saitama 351-0193 / JP | 04 /
IWATSUKI, Shuichiro c/o HONDA R&D CO., LTD. 4-1, Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi, Saitama 351-0193 / JP | 05 /
HORIUCHI, Momoka c/o HONDA R&D CO., LTD. 4-1, Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi, Saitama 351-0193 / JP | [2017/09] | Representative(s) | Weickmann & Weickmann PartmbB Postfach 860 820 81635 München / DE | [2017/09] | Application number, filing date | 16185646.3 | 25.08.2016 | [2017/09] | Priority number, date | JP20150168151 | 27.08.2015 Original published format: JP 2015168151 | [2017/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3136493 | Date: | 01.03.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3136493 | Date: | 08.11.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.10.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H01M8/2475, B60L11/18, // H01M8/0662 | [2017/21] | CPC: |
B60L50/71 (EP,US);
B60K13/04 (US);
B60K1/04 (CN);
B60K8/00 (CN);
B60L50/50 (CN);
B60L50/72 (EP,US);
B60L58/33 (EP,US);
H01M8/0662 (EP,CN,US);
H01M8/24 (US);
H01M8/2465 (CN);
H01M8/2475 (EP,US);
H01M2250/20 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2017/09] | H01M8/2475, // H01M8/0662 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/09] | Title | German: | BRENNSTOFFZELLENFAHRZEUG | [2017/09] | English: | FUEL CELL VEHICLE | [2017/09] | French: | VÉHICULE À PILE DE COMBUSTIBLE | [2017/09] | Examination procedure | 25.08.2016 | Examination requested [2017/09] | 25.08.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 06.03.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.06.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.09.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 29.09.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.09.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 09.08.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/42] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 25.08.2016 | AL | 08.11.2017 | AT | 08.11.2017 | CY | 08.11.2017 | CZ | 08.11.2017 | DK | 08.11.2017 | EE | 08.11.2017 | ES | 08.11.2017 | FI | 08.11.2017 | HR | 08.11.2017 | IT | 08.11.2017 | LT | 08.11.2017 | LV | 08.11.2017 | MC | 08.11.2017 | MK | 08.11.2017 | NL | 08.11.2017 | PL | 08.11.2017 | PT | 08.11.2017 | RO | 08.11.2017 | RS | 08.11.2017 | SE | 08.11.2017 | SK | 08.11.2017 | SM | 08.11.2017 | TR | 08.11.2017 | BG | 08.02.2018 | NO | 08.02.2018 | GR | 09.02.2018 | IS | 08.03.2018 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 25.08.2016 | |
AT | 08.11.2017 | ||
CY | 08.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 08.11.2017 | ||
DK | 08.11.2017 | ||
EE | 08.11.2017 | ||
ES | 08.11.2017 | ||
FI | 08.11.2017 | ||
HR | 08.11.2017 | ||
IT | 08.11.2017 | ||
LT | 08.11.2017 | ||
LV | 08.11.2017 | ||
MC | 08.11.2017 | ||
MK | 08.11.2017 | ||
NL | 08.11.2017 | ||
PL | 08.11.2017 | ||
PT | 08.11.2017 | ||
RO | 08.11.2017 | ||
RS | 08.11.2017 | ||
SE | 08.11.2017 | ||
SK | 08.11.2017 | ||
SM | 08.11.2017 | ||
TR | 08.11.2017 | ||
BG | 08.02.2018 | ||
NO | 08.02.2018 | ||
GR | 09.02.2018 | ||
IS | 08.03.2018 | ||
Former [2020/30] | HU | 25.08.2016 | |
AT | 08.11.2017 | ||
CY | 08.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 08.11.2017 | ||
DK | 08.11.2017 | ||
EE | 08.11.2017 | ||
ES | 08.11.2017 | ||
FI | 08.11.2017 | ||
HR | 08.11.2017 | ||
IT | 08.11.2017 | ||
LT | 08.11.2017 | ||
LV | 08.11.2017 | ||
MC | 08.11.2017 | ||
NL | 08.11.2017 | ||
PL | 08.11.2017 | ||
PT | 08.11.2017 | ||
RO | 08.11.2017 | ||
RS | 08.11.2017 | ||
SE | 08.11.2017 | ||
SK | 08.11.2017 | ||
SM | 08.11.2017 | ||
TR | 08.11.2017 | ||
BG | 08.02.2018 | ||
NO | 08.02.2018 | ||
GR | 09.02.2018 | ||
IS | 08.03.2018 | ||
Former [2020/28] | AT | 08.11.2017 | |
CY | 08.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 08.11.2017 | ||
DK | 08.11.2017 | ||
EE | 08.11.2017 | ||
ES | 08.11.2017 | ||
FI | 08.11.2017 | ||
HR | 08.11.2017 | ||
IT | 08.11.2017 | ||
LT | 08.11.2017 | ||
LV | 08.11.2017 | ||
MC | 08.11.2017 | ||
NL | 08.11.2017 | ||
PL | 08.11.2017 | ||
PT | 08.11.2017 | ||
RS | 08.11.2017 | ||
SE | 08.11.2017 | ||
SK | 08.11.2017 | ||
SM | 08.11.2017 | ||
TR | 08.11.2017 | ||
BG | 08.02.2018 | ||
NO | 08.02.2018 | ||
GR | 09.02.2018 | ||
IS | 08.03.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AT | 08.11.2017 | |
CY | 08.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 08.11.2017 | ||
DK | 08.11.2017 | ||
EE | 08.11.2017 | ||
ES | 08.11.2017 | ||
FI | 08.11.2017 | ||
HR | 08.11.2017 | ||
IT | 08.11.2017 | ||
LT | 08.11.2017 | ||
LV | 08.11.2017 | ||
MC | 08.11.2017 | ||
NL | 08.11.2017 | ||
PL | 08.11.2017 | ||
RS | 08.11.2017 | ||
SE | 08.11.2017 | ||
SK | 08.11.2017 | ||
SM | 08.11.2017 | ||
TR | 08.11.2017 | ||
BG | 08.02.2018 | ||
NO | 08.02.2018 | ||
GR | 09.02.2018 | ||
IS | 08.03.2018 | ||
Former [2019/15] | AT | 08.11.2017 | |
CY | 08.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 08.11.2017 | ||
DK | 08.11.2017 | ||
EE | 08.11.2017 | ||
ES | 08.11.2017 | ||
FI | 08.11.2017 | ||
HR | 08.11.2017 | ||
IT | 08.11.2017 | ||
LT | 08.11.2017 | ||
LV | 08.11.2017 | ||
MC | 08.11.2017 | ||
NL | 08.11.2017 | ||
PL | 08.11.2017 | ||
RS | 08.11.2017 | ||
SE | 08.11.2017 | ||
SK | 08.11.2017 | ||
SM | 08.11.2017 | ||
BG | 08.02.2018 | ||
NO | 08.02.2018 | ||
GR | 09.02.2018 | ||
IS | 08.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 08.11.2017 | |
CY | 08.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 08.11.2017 | ||
DK | 08.11.2017 | ||
EE | 08.11.2017 | ||
ES | 08.11.2017 | ||
FI | 08.11.2017 | ||
HR | 08.11.2017 | ||
IT | 08.11.2017 | ||
LT | 08.11.2017 | ||
LV | 08.11.2017 | ||
NL | 08.11.2017 | ||
PL | 08.11.2017 | ||
RS | 08.11.2017 | ||
SE | 08.11.2017 | ||
SK | 08.11.2017 | ||
SM | 08.11.2017 | ||
BG | 08.02.2018 | ||
NO | 08.02.2018 | ||
GR | 09.02.2018 | ||
IS | 08.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | AT | 08.11.2017 | |
CY | 08.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 08.11.2017 | ||
DK | 08.11.2017 | ||
EE | 08.11.2017 | ||
ES | 08.11.2017 | ||
FI | 08.11.2017 | ||
HR | 08.11.2017 | ||
LT | 08.11.2017 | ||
LV | 08.11.2017 | ||
NL | 08.11.2017 | ||
PL | 08.11.2017 | ||
RS | 08.11.2017 | ||
SE | 08.11.2017 | ||
SK | 08.11.2017 | ||
SM | 08.11.2017 | ||
BG | 08.02.2018 | ||
NO | 08.02.2018 | ||
GR | 09.02.2018 | ||
IS | 08.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | AT | 08.11.2017 | |
CY | 08.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 08.11.2017 | ||
DK | 08.11.2017 | ||
EE | 08.11.2017 | ||
ES | 08.11.2017 | ||
FI | 08.11.2017 | ||
HR | 08.11.2017 | ||
LT | 08.11.2017 | ||
LV | 08.11.2017 | ||
NL | 08.11.2017 | ||
RS | 08.11.2017 | ||
SE | 08.11.2017 | ||
SK | 08.11.2017 | ||
BG | 08.02.2018 | ||
NO | 08.02.2018 | ||
GR | 09.02.2018 | ||
IS | 08.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/24] | AT | 08.11.2017 | |
ES | 08.11.2017 | ||
FI | 08.11.2017 | ||
HR | 08.11.2017 | ||
LT | 08.11.2017 | ||
LV | 08.11.2017 | ||
NL | 08.11.2017 | ||
RS | 08.11.2017 | ||
SE | 08.11.2017 | ||
BG | 08.02.2018 | ||
NO | 08.02.2018 | ||
GR | 09.02.2018 | ||
IS | 08.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/23] | AT | 08.11.2017 | |
ES | 08.11.2017 | ||
FI | 08.11.2017 | ||
HR | 08.11.2017 | ||
LT | 08.11.2017 | ||
NL | 08.11.2017 | ||
RS | 08.11.2017 | ||
SE | 08.11.2017 | ||
NO | 08.02.2018 | ||
GR | 09.02.2018 | ||
IS | 08.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/22] | ES | 08.11.2017 | |
FI | 08.11.2017 | ||
LT | 08.11.2017 | ||
NL | 08.11.2017 | ||
NO | 08.02.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]FR2829295 (PEUGEOT CITROEN AUTOMOBILES SA [FR]) [X] 1,2 * page 4, lines 2-15; figure 2 * [I] 3-9; | [A]EP1408571 (NISSAN MOTOR [JP]) [A] 7,8* paragraphs [0003] - [0007]; figures 1-9 *; | [XI]JP2010126015 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [X] 1,6 * abstract * * figures 1,4,5 * [I] 2-5,7-9 | by applicant | JP2004040950 |