EP3125128 - CABLE CHIP SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 15.03.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.06.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.08.2017 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 30.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.03.2024 | Refusal of application | published on 17.04.2024 [2024/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states INVISIO A/S Stamholmen 157 2650 Hvidovre / DK | [2022/10] |
Former [2020/06] | For all designated states INVISIO COMMUNICATIONS A/S Stamholmen 157 Hvidovre / DK | ||
Former [2017/05] | For all designated states Nextlink IPR AB Box 151 201 21 Malmö / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TRAJKOVSKI, Ljupco Krinkelvej 9 2880 Bagsværd / DK | 02 /
IVERSEN, Steen Ejboparken 41, 1. tv. 4000 Roskilde / DK | 03 /
LARSEN, Jan Jordbærvangen 37 2765 Smørum / DK | [2017/05] | Representative(s) | Guardian IP Consulting I/S Diplomvej, Building 381 2800 Kgs. Lyngby / DK | [2017/05] | Application number, filing date | 16185827.9 | 01.05.2013 | [2017/05] | Priority number, date | DK20120070224 | 02.05.2012 Original published format: DK 201270224 | [2017/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3125128 | Date: | 01.02.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.12.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G06F13/40, G06F13/42, H04W4/10 | [2017/05] | CPC: |
H04W4/10 (EP,US);
G06F13/4027 (EP,US);
G06F13/426 (EP,US);
H04M1/72406 (US);
H04M1/72409 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/36] |
Former [2017/05] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | KABELCHIPSYSTEM | [2017/05] | English: | CABLE CHIP SYSTEM | [2017/05] | French: | SYSTÈME DE PUCE DE CÂBLE | [2017/05] | Examination procedure | 26.08.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 31.07.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.07.2017 | Examination requested [2017/36] | 25.06.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.01.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.10.2021 | Date of oral proceedings | 04.11.2021 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 19.11.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2024/16] | 21.07.2023 | Observations by third parties | 11.03.2024 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2024/16] | Appeal following examination | 28.01.2022 | Appeal received No. T1141/22 | 28.01.2022 | Payment of appeal fee | 28.03.2022 | Statement of grounds filed | 11.03.2024 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant withdrawn | 11.03.2024 | Date of oral proceedings | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP13722332.7 / EP2845115 | Divisional application(s) | EP23165562.2 / EP4224327 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 18.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 26.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9411802 (NEW MEDIA CORP [US]) [A] 1-18 * figures 1,5A * * page 3, line 9 - line 15 * * page 4, line 22 - line 25 * * page 6, line 29 - line 37 * * page 7, line 24 - line 26 *; | [A]WO9918496 (ELECTRONICS DEV CORP [US], et al) [A] 1-18 * the whole document *; | [Y]WO03007149 (SENDO INT LTD [CN], et al) [Y] 5,13 * page 8, line 3 - line 11 * * figures 3,4 *; | [Y]US2005075133 (PINDER ELLIS A [US], et al) [Y] 8,16 * figure 1 * * paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0021] *; | [IY]US2010151722 (BELLER JUERGEN [DE], et al) [I] 1-4,6,7,9-12,14,15,17,18 * figures 1-3 * * paragraphs [0007] , [0018] , [0021] * [Y] 5,8,13,16; | [A]WO2011128489 (SAVOX COMM OY AB LTD [FI], et al) [A] 1-18* the whole document * | other | US7426585 |