EP3231408 - VIBRATING PLATE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.11.2019 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 30.11.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.07.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.12.2017 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Invitalis GmbH Wackerstrasse 16 85084 Reichertshofen / DE | [2019/09] |
Former [2017/42] | For all designated states Invitalis GmbH Ferdinand-Braun-Straße 22 85053 Ingolstadt / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jeske, Petra Zentrum 95 6233 Kramsach / AT | [2017/42] | Representative(s) | Louis Pöhlau Lohrentz Patentanwälte Postfach 30 55 90014 Nürnberg / DE | [2017/42] | Application number, filing date | 16185988.9 | 26.08.2016 | [2017/42] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3231408 | Date: | 18.10.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3231408 | Date: | 02.01.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.02.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A61H1/00, A61H23/02, A63B21/04, A63B21/055 | [2017/42] | CPC: |
A61H1/005 (EP);
A61H23/02 (EP);
A63B21/0442 (EP);
A63B21/0552 (EP);
A61H2201/0107 (EP);
A61H2201/0161 (EP);
A61H2201/1633 (EP);
A61H2201/1635 (EP);
A61H2201/164 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/42] | Title | German: | VIBRATIONSPLATTE | [2017/42] | English: | VIBRATING PLATE | [2017/42] | French: | PLAQUE VIBRANTE | [2017/42] | Examination procedure | 26.08.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 15.08.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.08.2017 | Examination requested [2017/42] | 12.12.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.04.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.07.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.11.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 19.11.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.11.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 03.10.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 26.08.2016 | AL | 02.01.2019 | CY | 02.01.2019 | CZ | 02.01.2019 | DK | 02.01.2019 | EE | 02.01.2019 | ES | 02.01.2019 | FI | 02.01.2019 | HR | 02.01.2019 | IT | 02.01.2019 | LT | 02.01.2019 | LV | 02.01.2019 | MC | 02.01.2019 | MK | 02.01.2019 | MT | 02.01.2019 | PL | 02.01.2019 | RO | 02.01.2019 | RS | 02.01.2019 | SE | 02.01.2019 | SI | 02.01.2019 | SK | 02.01.2019 | SM | 02.01.2019 | TR | 02.01.2019 | BG | 02.04.2019 | NO | 02.04.2019 | GR | 03.04.2019 | IS | 02.05.2019 | PT | 02.05.2019 | IE | 26.08.2019 | LU | 26.08.2019 | [2022/32] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 26.08.2016 | |
AL | 02.01.2019 | ||
CY | 02.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 02.01.2019 | ||
DK | 02.01.2019 | ||
EE | 02.01.2019 | ||
ES | 02.01.2019 | ||
FI | 02.01.2019 | ||
HR | 02.01.2019 | ||
IT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LV | 02.01.2019 | ||
MC | 02.01.2019 | ||
MT | 02.01.2019 | ||
PL | 02.01.2019 | ||
RO | 02.01.2019 | ||
RS | 02.01.2019 | ||
SE | 02.01.2019 | ||
SI | 02.01.2019 | ||
SK | 02.01.2019 | ||
SM | 02.01.2019 | ||
TR | 02.01.2019 | ||
BG | 02.04.2019 | ||
NO | 02.04.2019 | ||
GR | 03.04.2019 | ||
IS | 02.05.2019 | ||
PT | 02.05.2019 | ||
IE | 26.08.2019 | ||
LU | 26.08.2019 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 26.08.2016 | |
AL | 02.01.2019 | ||
CY | 02.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 02.01.2019 | ||
DK | 02.01.2019 | ||
EE | 02.01.2019 | ||
ES | 02.01.2019 | ||
FI | 02.01.2019 | ||
HR | 02.01.2019 | ||
IT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LV | 02.01.2019 | ||
MC | 02.01.2019 | ||
PL | 02.01.2019 | ||
RO | 02.01.2019 | ||
RS | 02.01.2019 | ||
SE | 02.01.2019 | ||
SI | 02.01.2019 | ||
SK | 02.01.2019 | ||
SM | 02.01.2019 | ||
TR | 02.01.2019 | ||
BG | 02.04.2019 | ||
NO | 02.04.2019 | ||
GR | 03.04.2019 | ||
IS | 02.05.2019 | ||
PT | 02.05.2019 | ||
IE | 26.08.2019 | ||
LU | 26.08.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 02.01.2019 | |
CY | 02.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 02.01.2019 | ||
DK | 02.01.2019 | ||
EE | 02.01.2019 | ||
ES | 02.01.2019 | ||
FI | 02.01.2019 | ||
HR | 02.01.2019 | ||
IT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LV | 02.01.2019 | ||
MC | 02.01.2019 | ||
PL | 02.01.2019 | ||
RO | 02.01.2019 | ||
RS | 02.01.2019 | ||
SE | 02.01.2019 | ||
SI | 02.01.2019 | ||
SK | 02.01.2019 | ||
SM | 02.01.2019 | ||
TR | 02.01.2019 | ||
BG | 02.04.2019 | ||
NO | 02.04.2019 | ||
GR | 03.04.2019 | ||
IS | 02.05.2019 | ||
PT | 02.05.2019 | ||
IE | 26.08.2019 | ||
LU | 26.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 02.01.2019 | |
CZ | 02.01.2019 | ||
DK | 02.01.2019 | ||
EE | 02.01.2019 | ||
ES | 02.01.2019 | ||
FI | 02.01.2019 | ||
HR | 02.01.2019 | ||
IT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LV | 02.01.2019 | ||
MC | 02.01.2019 | ||
PL | 02.01.2019 | ||
RO | 02.01.2019 | ||
RS | 02.01.2019 | ||
SE | 02.01.2019 | ||
SI | 02.01.2019 | ||
SK | 02.01.2019 | ||
SM | 02.01.2019 | ||
TR | 02.01.2019 | ||
BG | 02.04.2019 | ||
NO | 02.04.2019 | ||
GR | 03.04.2019 | ||
IS | 02.05.2019 | ||
PT | 02.05.2019 | ||
IE | 26.08.2019 | ||
LU | 26.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AL | 02.01.2019 | |
CZ | 02.01.2019 | ||
DK | 02.01.2019 | ||
EE | 02.01.2019 | ||
ES | 02.01.2019 | ||
FI | 02.01.2019 | ||
HR | 02.01.2019 | ||
IT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LV | 02.01.2019 | ||
MC | 02.01.2019 | ||
PL | 02.01.2019 | ||
RO | 02.01.2019 | ||
RS | 02.01.2019 | ||
SE | 02.01.2019 | ||
SI | 02.01.2019 | ||
SK | 02.01.2019 | ||
SM | 02.01.2019 | ||
TR | 02.01.2019 | ||
BG | 02.04.2019 | ||
NO | 02.04.2019 | ||
GR | 03.04.2019 | ||
IS | 02.05.2019 | ||
PT | 02.05.2019 | ||
LU | 26.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 02.01.2019 | |
CZ | 02.01.2019 | ||
DK | 02.01.2019 | ||
EE | 02.01.2019 | ||
ES | 02.01.2019 | ||
FI | 02.01.2019 | ||
HR | 02.01.2019 | ||
IT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LV | 02.01.2019 | ||
PL | 02.01.2019 | ||
RO | 02.01.2019 | ||
RS | 02.01.2019 | ||
SE | 02.01.2019 | ||
SI | 02.01.2019 | ||
SK | 02.01.2019 | ||
SM | 02.01.2019 | ||
TR | 02.01.2019 | ||
BG | 02.04.2019 | ||
NO | 02.04.2019 | ||
GR | 03.04.2019 | ||
IS | 02.05.2019 | ||
PT | 02.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/13] | AL | 02.01.2019 | |
CZ | 02.01.2019 | ||
DK | 02.01.2019 | ||
EE | 02.01.2019 | ||
ES | 02.01.2019 | ||
FI | 02.01.2019 | ||
HR | 02.01.2019 | ||
IT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LV | 02.01.2019 | ||
PL | 02.01.2019 | ||
RO | 02.01.2019 | ||
RS | 02.01.2019 | ||
SE | 02.01.2019 | ||
SI | 02.01.2019 | ||
SK | 02.01.2019 | ||
SM | 02.01.2019 | ||
BG | 02.04.2019 | ||
NO | 02.04.2019 | ||
GR | 03.04.2019 | ||
IS | 02.05.2019 | ||
PT | 02.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 02.01.2019 | |
CZ | 02.01.2019 | ||
DK | 02.01.2019 | ||
EE | 02.01.2019 | ||
ES | 02.01.2019 | ||
FI | 02.01.2019 | ||
HR | 02.01.2019 | ||
IT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LV | 02.01.2019 | ||
PL | 02.01.2019 | ||
RO | 02.01.2019 | ||
RS | 02.01.2019 | ||
SE | 02.01.2019 | ||
SK | 02.01.2019 | ||
SM | 02.01.2019 | ||
BG | 02.04.2019 | ||
NO | 02.04.2019 | ||
GR | 03.04.2019 | ||
IS | 02.05.2019 | ||
PT | 02.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | AL | 02.01.2019 | |
CZ | 02.01.2019 | ||
DK | 02.01.2019 | ||
EE | 02.01.2019 | ||
ES | 02.01.2019 | ||
FI | 02.01.2019 | ||
HR | 02.01.2019 | ||
IT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LV | 02.01.2019 | ||
PL | 02.01.2019 | ||
RO | 02.01.2019 | ||
RS | 02.01.2019 | ||
SE | 02.01.2019 | ||
SK | 02.01.2019 | ||
BG | 02.04.2019 | ||
NO | 02.04.2019 | ||
GR | 03.04.2019 | ||
IS | 02.05.2019 | ||
PT | 02.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | DK | 02.01.2019 | |
ES | 02.01.2019 | ||
FI | 02.01.2019 | ||
HR | 02.01.2019 | ||
IT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LV | 02.01.2019 | ||
PL | 02.01.2019 | ||
RS | 02.01.2019 | ||
SE | 02.01.2019 | ||
BG | 02.04.2019 | ||
NO | 02.04.2019 | ||
GR | 03.04.2019 | ||
IS | 02.05.2019 | ||
PT | 02.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/46] | ES | 02.01.2019 | |
FI | 02.01.2019 | ||
HR | 02.01.2019 | ||
IT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LV | 02.01.2019 | ||
PL | 02.01.2019 | ||
RS | 02.01.2019 | ||
SE | 02.01.2019 | ||
BG | 02.04.2019 | ||
NO | 02.04.2019 | ||
GR | 03.04.2019 | ||
IS | 02.05.2019 | ||
PT | 02.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/39] | ES | 02.01.2019 | |
FI | 02.01.2019 | ||
HR | 02.01.2019 | ||
LT | 02.01.2019 | ||
LV | 02.01.2019 | ||
PL | 02.01.2019 | ||
RS | 02.01.2019 | ||
SE | 02.01.2019 | ||
BG | 02.04.2019 | ||
NO | 02.04.2019 | ||
GR | 03.04.2019 | ||
IS | 02.05.2019 | ||
PT | 02.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/38] | ES | 02.01.2019 | |
FI | 02.01.2019 | ||
LT | 02.01.2019 | ||
PL | 02.01.2019 | ||
SE | 02.01.2019 | ||
BG | 02.04.2019 | ||
NO | 02.04.2019 | ||
GR | 03.04.2019 | ||
PT | 02.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | ES | 02.01.2019 | |
FI | 02.01.2019 | ||
LT | 02.01.2019 | ||
PL | 02.01.2019 | ||
SE | 02.01.2019 | ||
NO | 02.04.2019 | ||
GR | 03.04.2019 | ||
PT | 02.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/35] | ES | 02.01.2019 | |
FI | 02.01.2019 | ||
LT | 02.01.2019 | ||
PL | 02.01.2019 | ||
SE | 02.01.2019 | ||
NO | 02.04.2019 | ||
PT | 02.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | FI | 02.01.2019 | |
LT | 02.01.2019 | ||
SE | 02.01.2019 | ||
NO | 02.04.2019 | ||
PT | 02.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/33] | FI | 02.01.2019 | |
LT | 02.01.2019 | ||
NO | 02.04.2019 | ||
PT | 02.05.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US3140711 (HARRY MCGATHEY WENDELL) [X] 1,2,5-8 * column 4, lines 14-24; figures 1,3,10 * [I] 3,4,9-15; | [XI]US2008009776 (TRANDAFIR TITI [US]) [X] 1,6,7,11,13 * paragraphs [0073] - [0078]; figures 5-8 * [I] 2-5,8-10,12,14,15; | [XI]US7402145 (WOGGON DENNIS A [US], et al) [X] 1,6-9 * column 3, lines 46,47 * * column 8, lines 11-14; figures 1-3,7 * [I] 2-5,10-15; | [X]US2271382 (WORTHINGTON RAY W) [X] 1,6,7,11 * page 2, column r, lines 19-25; figure 2 *; | [XI]DE20312552U (RS VERLAG & BERATUNG GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,2,5-7 * figure 2; claims 1,2,4 * [I] 3,4,8-15 | Examination | GB2483621 |