EP3208655 - DISPLAY DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 05.07.2019 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.07.2019 | Withdrawal of application | published on 07.08.2019 [2019/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Display Co., Ltd. 1, Samsung-ro Giheung-Gu Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | [2017/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YUN, Jang 105-1305, 12, Sunae-ro 192beon-gil, Bundang-gu Seongnam-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | 02 /
ROH, Nam Seok 509-902, 361, Buljeong-ro, Bundang-gu Seongnam-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | 03 /
PARK, Seung Beom 105-1903, 226, Gongse-ro Giheung-gu Yongin-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | [2017/34] | Representative(s) | Gulde & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei mbB Wallstraße 58/59 10179 Berlin / DE | [2017/34] | Application number, filing date | 16186460.8 | 31.08.2016 | [2017/34] | Priority number, date | KR20160018272 | 17.02.2016 Original published format: KR 20160018272 | [2017/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3208655 | Date: | 23.08.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.02.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G02F1/1335, G02F1/137, G02F1/1343 | [2017/34] | CPC: |
G02F1/133617 (EP,US);
G02F1/133606 (CN);
C09K19/603 (US);
G02F1/133504 (US);
G02F1/133512 (US);
G02F1/133528 (US);
G02F1/13362 (CN);
G02F1/133621 (CN,US);
G02F1/13378 (US);
G02F1/134336 (US);
G02F1/13439 (US);
G02F1/13725 (EP,US);
G02F1/133357 (US);
G02F1/133614 (CN,US);
G02F1/133742 (US);
G02F1/134363 (EP,US);
G02F1/134372 (EP,US);
G02F2201/121 (US);
G02F2201/123 (US);
G02F2202/04 (US);
G02F2202/36 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/34] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ANZEIGEVORRICHTUNG | [2017/34] | English: | DISPLAY DEVICE | [2017/34] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'AFFICHAGE | [2017/34] | Examination procedure | 31.08.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 22.06.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.06.2017 | Examination requested [2017/34] | 01.07.2019 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2019/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [IY]US2002008841 (OHMURO KATSUFUMI [JP]) [I] 1-4,9,11,12 * paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0053]; figures 1-6 * * paragraph [0054] - paragraph [0058]; figures 7A, 7B * [Y] 5; | [XYI]GB2354336 (SCREEN TECHNOLOGY LTD [GB]) [X] 1-3,6,7,9,11,12 * the whole document * [Y] 5,10,13-15 [I] 4,8; | [Y]US2004125305 (NISHI TAKESHI [JP], et al) [Y] 10,13-15 * the whole document * | [Y] - IWANAGA H ET AL, "Properties of novel yellow anthraquinone dichroic dyes with naphthylthio groups for guest-host liquid crystal displays", JOURNAL OF MOLECULAR STRUCTURE, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 975, no. 1-3, ISSN 0022-2860, (20100630), pages 110 - 114, (20100409), XP027096670 [Y] 5 * abstract * |