EP3169062 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR EPISODE TRACKING IN AN INTERACTIVE MEDIA ENVIRONMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.07.2020 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 12.07.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 05.07.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.06.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.02.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.03.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.11.2017 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 18.04.2017 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 15.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.07.2021 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 11.08.2021 [2021/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rovi Guides, Inc. 2160 Gold Street San Jose, CA 95002 / US | [2018/01] |
Former [2017/20] | For all designated states Rovi Guides, Inc. 2 Circle Star Way San Carlos, CA 94070 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cordray, Charles 200 Mercer Street, Apt. 2B New York, New York 10012 / US | 02 /
Walker, Todd A. 77 Highpoint Drive Berwyn, Pennsylvania 19312 / US | 03 /
Armaly, Samir B. 4400 Belair Drive La Canada, California 91011 / US | [2017/20] | Representative(s) | Haley Guiliano International LLP 26-28 Bedford Row London WC1R 4HE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2019/33] | Pisani, Diana Jean Haley Guiliano International LLP Central Court 25 Southampton Buildings London WC2A 1AL / GB | ||
Former [2017/20] | Pisani, Diana Jean, et al Ropes & Gray International LLP 60 Ludgate Hill London EC4M 7AW / GB | Application number, filing date | 16186676.9 | 08.12.2006 | [2017/20] | Priority number, date | US20050324156 | 29.12.2005 Original published format: US 324156 | US20050323464 | 29.12.2005 Original published format: US 323464 | [2017/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3169062 | Date: | 17.05.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3169062 | Date: | 14.08.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.03.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H04N7/16, H04N5/445, H04N21/458, H04N21/482 | [2017/20] | CPC: |
H04N7/16 (EP);
H04N21/252 (EP);
H04N21/42206 (EP);
H04N21/458 (EP);
H04N21/466 (EP);
H04N21/4667 (EP);
H04N21/4751 (EP);
H04N21/4826 (EP);
H04N21/4532 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2017/52] |
Former [2017/20] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUR EPISODENVERFOLGUNG IN EINER INTERAKTIVEN MEDIENUMGEBUNG | [2017/20] | English: | SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR EPISODE TRACKING IN AN INTERACTIVE MEDIA ENVIRONMENT | [2017/20] | French: | SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉ DE SUIVI D'ÉPISODE DANS UN ENVIRONNEMENT INTERACTIF MULTIMÉDIA | [2017/20] | Examination procedure | 31.08.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.11.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.11.2017 | Examination requested [2017/52] | 05.03.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.06.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.01.2019 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 24.01.2019 | 24.01.2019 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 08.02.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.06.2019 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 17.06.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 17.06.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 04.07.2019 | Information about intention to grant a patent | 04.07.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP06839252.1 / EP1969844 | EP09013672.2 / EP2169952 | EP14177889.4 / EP2802142 | Opposition(s) | 03.06.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 28.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 05.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 12.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 12.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2016 | 11   M06   Fee paid on   05.01.2017 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 08.12.2006 | CY | 14.08.2019 | CZ | 14.08.2019 | EE | 14.08.2019 | LT | 14.08.2019 | LV | 14.08.2019 | MC | 14.08.2019 | PL | 14.08.2019 | RO | 14.08.2019 | SI | 14.08.2019 | SK | 14.08.2019 | TR | 14.08.2019 | BG | 14.11.2019 | GR | 15.11.2019 | IE | 08.12.2019 | LU | 08.12.2019 | IS | 14.12.2019 | [2021/32] |
Former [2021/26] | CY | 14.08.2019 | |
CZ | 14.08.2019 | ||
EE | 14.08.2019 | ||
LT | 14.08.2019 | ||
LV | 14.08.2019 | ||
MC | 14.08.2019 | ||
PL | 14.08.2019 | ||
RO | 14.08.2019 | ||
SI | 14.08.2019 | ||
SK | 14.08.2019 | ||
TR | 14.08.2019 | ||
BG | 14.11.2019 | ||
GR | 15.11.2019 | ||
IE | 08.12.2019 | ||
LU | 08.12.2019 | ||
IS | 14.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/46] | CZ | 14.08.2019 | |
EE | 14.08.2019 | ||
LT | 14.08.2019 | ||
LV | 14.08.2019 | ||
MC | 14.08.2019 | ||
PL | 14.08.2019 | ||
RO | 14.08.2019 | ||
SI | 14.08.2019 | ||
SK | 14.08.2019 | ||
TR | 14.08.2019 | ||
BG | 14.11.2019 | ||
GR | 15.11.2019 | ||
IE | 08.12.2019 | ||
LU | 08.12.2019 | ||
IS | 14.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/39] | CZ | 14.08.2019 | |
EE | 14.08.2019 | ||
LT | 14.08.2019 | ||
LV | 14.08.2019 | ||
MC | 14.08.2019 | ||
PL | 14.08.2019 | ||
RO | 14.08.2019 | ||
SI | 14.08.2019 | ||
SK | 14.08.2019 | ||
TR | 14.08.2019 | ||
BG | 14.11.2019 | ||
GR | 15.11.2019 | ||
IS | 14.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/37] | CZ | 14.08.2019 | |
EE | 14.08.2019 | ||
LT | 14.08.2019 | ||
LV | 14.08.2019 | ||
PL | 14.08.2019 | ||
RO | 14.08.2019 | ||
SI | 14.08.2019 | ||
SK | 14.08.2019 | ||
TR | 14.08.2019 | ||
BG | 14.11.2019 | ||
GR | 15.11.2019 | ||
IS | 14.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/36] | CZ | 14.08.2019 | |
EE | 14.08.2019 | ||
LT | 14.08.2019 | ||
LV | 14.08.2019 | ||
PL | 14.08.2019 | ||
RO | 14.08.2019 | ||
SK | 14.08.2019 | ||
TR | 14.08.2019 | ||
BG | 14.11.2019 | ||
GR | 15.11.2019 | ||
IS | 14.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/25] | CZ | 14.08.2019 | |
EE | 14.08.2019 | ||
LT | 14.08.2019 | ||
LV | 14.08.2019 | ||
PL | 14.08.2019 | ||
RO | 14.08.2019 | ||
SK | 14.08.2019 | ||
TR | 14.08.2019 | ||
BG | 14.11.2019 | ||
GR | 15.11.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | EE | 14.08.2019 | |
LT | 14.08.2019 | ||
LV | 14.08.2019 | ||
PL | 14.08.2019 | ||
RO | 14.08.2019 | ||
TR | 14.08.2019 | ||
BG | 14.11.2019 | ||
GR | 15.11.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | EE | 14.08.2019 | |
LT | 14.08.2019 | ||
LV | 14.08.2019 | ||
PL | 14.08.2019 | ||
RO | 14.08.2019 | ||
TR | 14.08.2019 | ||
BG | 14.11.2019 | ||
GR | 15.11.2019 | ||
IS | 14.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/22] | EE | 14.08.2019 | |
LT | 14.08.2019 | ||
LV | 14.08.2019 | ||
TR | 14.08.2019 | ||
BG | 14.11.2019 | ||
GR | 15.11.2019 | ||
IS | 14.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | LT | 14.08.2019 | |
LV | 14.08.2019 | ||
TR | 14.08.2019 | ||
BG | 14.11.2019 | ||
GR | 15.11.2019 | ||
IS | 14.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | LT | 14.08.2019 | |
LV | 14.08.2019 | ||
BG | 14.11.2019 | ||
GR | 15.11.2019 | ||
IS | 14.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | LT | 14.08.2019 | |
BG | 14.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/08] | LT | 14.08.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO0184340 (ON24 INC [US]); | [A]WO0207433 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL]); | [A]US2003208763 (MCELHATTEN DAVID [US], et al); | [I]US2004221308 (CUTTNER CRAIG D [US], et al); | [I]US2005235316 (AHMAD-TAYLOR TY O [US]) | Examination | US2003190150 | by applicant | US2001047298 | US2003149988 | US2005229213 |