EP3290143 - WELDING OR SOLDERING DEVICE AND WELDING OR SOLDERING METHOD WITH HAPTIC SIGNAL GENERATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.05.2019 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 31.08.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.03.2018 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 02.02.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.05.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.06.2019 [2019/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EWM AG Dr. Günter-Henle-Strasse 8 56271 Mündersbach / DE | [2018/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Szczesny, Michael Ringstraße 21 56271 Mündersbach / DE | [2018/10] | Representative(s) | Steiniger, Carmen Patentanwaltskanzlei Dr. Steiniger Reichsstraße 37 09112 Chemnitz / DE | [2018/10] | Application number, filing date | 16186883.1 | 01.09.2016 | [2018/10] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3290143 | Date: | 07.03.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.03.2017 | Classification | IPC: | B23K3/02, B23K3/08, B23K9/16, B23K9/29, B23K9/32, G06F3/01 | [2018/10] | CPC: |
B23K3/02 (EP);
B23K3/08 (EP);
B23K9/16 (EP);
B23K9/29 (EP);
B23K9/32 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/17] |
Former [2018/10] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCHWEISS- ODER LÖTVORRICHTUNG UND SCHWEISS- ODER LÖTVERFAHREN MIT HAPTISCHEM SIGNALGEBER | [2018/10] | English: | WELDING OR SOLDERING DEVICE AND WELDING OR SOLDERING METHOD WITH HAPTIC SIGNAL GENERATOR | [2018/10] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE SOUDURE OU DE BRASAGE ET PROCEDE DE SOUDURE OU DE BRASAGE COMPRENANT UN EMETTEUR DE SIGNAL HAPTIQUE | [2018/10] | Examination procedure | 01.09.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 19.03.2018 | Examination requested [2018/17] | 12.04.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.08.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.01.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/24] | 06.02.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2019/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US2006163228 (DANIEL JOSEPH A [US]) [X] 1,3,7 * paragraphs [0039] , [0041] - [0042]; figure - * [Y] 2,4-6,8-10; | [Y]US2009288272 (ZANELLA ALESSANDRO [IT], et al) [Y] 2,4 * paragraphs [0024] - [0026]; figure - *; | [Y]US2013264322 (BORNEMANN BRIAN J [US], et al) [Y] 5,6,8-10 * paragraphs [0020] - [0021]; figure - *; | [X]US2014374396 (LUO JYI-JIIN [US], et al) [X] 1,7 * paragraph [0027]; figure -; claims 1,6 *; | [X]US2016221098 (MARINO KENNETH D [US], et al) [X] 1,7 * paragraphs [0054] , [0088]; figure - * | by applicant | EP2022592 |