EP3138485 - INCONSISTENT FIELD-BASED PATCH LOCATION COORDINATE CORRECTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 17.07.2020 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.03.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.08.2017 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 03.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Withdrawal of application | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Biosense Webster (Israel) Ltd. 4 Hatnufa Street 2066717 Yokneam / IL | [2017/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LUDWIN, Doron Moshe 4 Hatnufa Street 2066717 Yokneam / IL | 02 /
PERI, Eitan 4 Hatnufa Street 2066717 Yokneam / IL | 03 /
TURGEMAN, Aharon 4 Hatnufa Street 2066717 Yokneam / IL | 04 /
ROSENBERG, Avigdor 4 Hatnufa Street 2066717 Yokneam / IL | 05 /
SCHECHTER, Menachem 4 Hatnufa Street 2066717 Yokneam / IL | [2017/10] | Representative(s) | Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [2017/10] | Application number, filing date | 16186940.9 | 02.09.2016 | [2017/10] | Priority number, date | US201562214273P | 04.09.2015 Original published format: US 201562214273 P | US201615228627 | 04.08.2016 Original published format: US201615228627 | [2017/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3138485 | Date: | 08.03.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.02.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/06, A61B5/042, A61B5/046, A61B5/0464, // A61B5/00, A61M25/01 | [2017/10] | CPC: |
A61B5/063 (EP,CN,IL,US);
A61B5/062 (EP,CN,IL,US);
A61B5/283 (CN,US);
A61B5/287 (EP,US);
A61B5/361 (EP,US);
A61B5/363 (EP,US);
A61B5/6833 (US);
A61B6/12 (US);
A61B6/487 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/37] |
Former [2017/10] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KORREKTUR VON INKONSISTENTEN FELDBASIERTEN PATCH-POSITIONSKOORDINATEN | [2017/10] | English: | INCONSISTENT FIELD-BASED PATCH LOCATION COORDINATE CORRECTION | [2017/10] | French: | CORRECTION DE COORDONNEES INCONSISTANTS DE LOCALISATION DE RETOUCHE BASEE SUR DES CHAMPS | [2017/10] | Examination procedure | 02.09.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 02.08.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.08.2017 | Examination requested [2017/37] | 05.03.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.07.2020 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2020/34] | Divisional application(s) | EP20183929.7 | EP20184062.6 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2012172702 (KOYRAKH LEV A [US], et al) [A] 7,14 * paragraphs [0053] - [0058] *; | [XI]US2012265054 (OLSON ERIC S [US]) [X] 1-4,6,8-11,13,15 * paragraphs [0008] , [0013] , [0026] , [0027] , [0029] , [0030] , [0032] , [0035] , [0043] , [0056] , [0057] * * figures 1, 2 * [I] 5,7,12,14; | [A]US2013066193 (OLSON ERIC S [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2014028114 (ST JUDE MEDICAL ATRIAL FIBRILL [US]) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [A]WO2014182822 (ST JUDE MEDICAL ATRIAL FIBRILL [US]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]EP2886054 (BIOSENSE WEBSTER ISRAEL LTD [IL]) [A] 5,12 * figures 1, 2A, 2B * | by applicant | US5391199 | US5443489 | US5558091 | US5899860 | US5944022 | US5983126 | US6172499 | US6177792 | US6456864 | US6574498 | US6690963 | US6788967 | US2007016007 | US2009093806 | US2009138007 | US8456182 |