EP3165538 - ANTI C-MET ANTIBODIES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.04.2018 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 07.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.04.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.05.2018 [2018/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states argenx BVBA Industriepark 7 9052 Zwijnaarde / BE | [2017/39] |
Former [2017/19] | For all designated states ARGEN-X NV Willemstraat 5 4811 AH Breda / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HULTBERG, Anna Quastraat 22 9270 Laarne / BE | 02 /
SAUNDERS, Michael Jonction 38 1190 Brussels / BE | 03 /
DE HAARD, Johannes t'Zwint 1 4436 NA Oudelande / BE | 04 /
FEST JENS, Els Ellestraat 116D 8550 Zwevegem / BE | 05 /
DE JONGE, Natalie Restert 94 9320 Nieuwerkerken / BE | 06 /
MICHIELI, Paulo Via Bellini 66/1 10040 Rivalta di Torino / IT | 07 /
BASILICO, Cristina Via Miravalle 5, Pavarolo 10020 Torino / IT | 08 /
DREIER, Torsten Nelemeersstraat 32 9830 St. Martens Latem / BE | [2017/19] | Representative(s) | Boult Wade Tennant LLP Salisbury Square House 8 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8AP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2017/19] | Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | Application number, filing date | 16187257.7 | 03.11.2011 | [2017/19] | Priority number, date | US20100409866P | 03.11.2010 Original published format: US 409866 P | [2017/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3165538 | Date: | 10.05.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.04.2017 | Classification | IPC: | C07K16/28, A61K39/395, A61P35/00 | [2017/19] | CPC: |
C07K16/2863 (EP,RU,US);
C07K16/32 (RU,US);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61K2039/505 (RU,US);
C07K2317/14 (US);
C07K2317/22 (EP,US);
C07K2317/30 (US);
C07K2317/32 (RU);
C07K2317/33 (US);
C07K2317/55 (US);
C07K2317/56 (RU,US);
C07K2317/565 (US);
C07K2317/73 (US);
C07K2317/732 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/19] | Title | German: | ANTI-C-MET-ANTIKÖRPER | [2017/19] | English: | ANTI C-MET ANTIBODIES | [2017/19] | French: | ANTICORPS ANTI C-MET | [2017/19] | Examination procedure | 11.11.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/21] | 22.12.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2018/21] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP11778618.6 / EP2635602 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2017 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XDI]WO2009007427 (PF MEDICAMENT [FR], et al) [XD] 1-8,10,11,13-15 * page 4, line 23 - line 25 * * page 5, line 20 * * page 28, line 15 - line 18 * * page 29, line 6 - line 9 * * page 32, line 1 - line 27 * * page 33, line 24 - line 27 * * page 57, line 18 - line 21 * * page 78, line 10 - line 21 * * examples 12,17,25 * [I] 9,12; | [I]WO2009142738 (ONCOMED PHARM INC [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0016] * * paragraph [0082] * * paragraph [0089] * * paragraph [0125] * * paragraph [0171] - paragraph [0172] * * example 2 * * claims 10-21,25-36,81,83,122-125,134,135 *; | [XDI]WO2010059654 (LILLY CO ELI [US], et al) [XD] 1,2,4,7,8,10,13,15 * page 20, line 13 - page 21, line 10 * * page 39, paragraph 5 - paragraph 14 * * example 9 * * sequences 29,41 * [I] 9,11,12,14; | [I] - VAN DOR HORST E H ET AL, "Discovery of fully human anti-MET monoclonal antibodies with antitumor activity against jhik enk mum hi ml hi colon cancer tumor models in vivo", NEOPLASIA, NEOPLASIA PRESS, ANN ARBOR, MI, US, (20090401), vol. 11, no. 4, ISSN 1522-8002, pages 355 - 364, XP008118189 [I] 1-15 * abstract * * page 358, column l, paragraph 1 - column r, paragraph 1 * * page 364, column l, paragraph 1 * * figure W1 * | [I] - TOSCHI LUCA ET AL, "Single-agent and combination therapeutic strategies to inhibit hepatocyte growth factor/MET signaling in cancer", CLINICAL CANCER RESEARCH, THE AMERICAN ASSOCIATION FOR CANCER RESEARCH, US, vol. 14, no. 19, doi:10.1158/1078-0432.CCR-08-0071, ISSN 1078-0432, (20081001), pages 5941 - 5946, (20081014), XP002588857 [I] 1-15 * page 5942, column l, paragraph 2 * * page 5943, column l, paragraph 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1158/1078-0432.CCR-08-0071 | by applicant | WO9638557 | US5892019 | WO2007126799 | WO2009007427 | US2009191580 | EP2119448 | WO2009145606 | WO2010001251 | WO2010059654 | WO2010069765 | - EDER ET AL., CLIN CANCER RESEARCH, (2009), vol. 15, no. 7 | - TATUSOVA ET AL., "Blast 2 sequences - a new tool for comparing protein and nucleotide sequences", FEMS MICROBIOL LETT., vol. 174, pages 247 - 250, URL: http://www.ncbi.nlm.nih.gov/ gorf/bl2.html | - MOREA ET AL., METHODS, (2000), vol. 20, pages 267 - 279 | - CHOTHIA ET AL., J. MOL. BIOL., (1992), vol. 227, pages 799 - 817 | - TRAMONTANO ET AL., J. MOL. BIOL, (1990), vol. 215, pages 175 - 182 | - KABAT ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (1977), vol. 252, pages 6609 - 6616 | - CHOTHIA ET AL., J. MOL. BIOL., (1987), vol. 196, pages 901 - 917 | - MACCALLUM ET AL., J. MOL. BIOL., (1996), vol. 262, pages 732 - 745 | - ROUX ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (1998), vol. 161, page 4083 | - MARTIN ET AL., J. MOL. BIOL., (1996), vol. 263, pages 800 - 815 | - QU, CLIN. CANCER RES., (1999), vol. 5, pages 3095 - 3100 | - ONO ET AL., MOL. IMMUNOL., (1999), vol. 36, pages 387 - 395 | - LEFRANC ET AL., NAR, vol. 27, (1999), pages 209 - 212, URL: http://imgt.cines.fr | - TRAMONTANO ET AL., PROTEINS, (1989), vol. 6, pages 382 - 394 | - TOMLINSON ET AL., EMBO J., (1995), vol. 14, pages 4628 - 4638 | - WILLIAMS ET AL., J. MOL. BIOL., (1996), vol. 264, pages 220 - 232 | - WILLIAMS ET AL., J. MOL. BIOL., vol. 264, (1996), pages 220 - 232, URL: http://www.bioc.uzh.ch/antibody/Sequences/Germlines/VBase_hVL.html | - TOMLINSON ET AL., EMBO J., vol. 14, (1995), pages 4628 - 4638, URL: http://www.bioc.uzh.ch/antibody/Sequences/Germlines/VBase_hVK.html | - TRUSOLINO ET AL., NATURE REVIEWS, MOLECULAR CELL BIOLOGY, (2010), vol. 11, pages 834 - 848 | - SMOLEN ET AL., PNAS, (2006), vol. 103, pages 2316 - 2321 | - HOLLIGER; HUDSON, NATURE BIOTECHNOL., (2005), vol. 23, pages 1126 - 1136 | - CARON ET AL., J. EXP. MED., (1992), vol. 176, pages 1191 - 1195 | - SHOPES, B., J. IMMUNOL., (1992), vol. 148, pages 2918 - 2922 | - STEVENSON ET AL., ANTI-CANCER DRUG DESIGN, (1989), vol. 3, pages 219 - 230 | - CHAN; CARTER, NATURE REVIEWS: IMMUNOLOGY, (2010), vol. 10, pages 301 - 316 | - NATSUME ET AL., DRUG DESIGN DEVELOPMENT AND THERAPY, (2009), vol. 3, pages 7 - 16 | - YAMANE-OHNUKI; SATOH, MABS, (2009), vol. 1, no. 3, pages 230 - 236 | - ARMOUR, K. L. ET AL., EUR. J. IMMUNOL., (1999), vol. 29, pages 2613 - 2624 | - RIDGWAY JB; PRESTA LG; CARTER P, "Knobs-into-holes' engineering of antibody CH3 domains for heavy chain heterodimerization", PROTEIN ENG., (199607), vol. 9, no. 7, doi:doi:10.1093/protein/9.7.617, pages 617 - 621, XP002610995 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/protein/9.7.617 | - MERCHANT AM; ZHU Z; YUAN JQ; GODDARD A; ADAMS CW; PRESTA LG; CARTER P, "An efficient route to human bispecific IgG", NAT BIOTECHNOL., (199807), vol. 16, no. 7, doi:doi:10.1038/nbt0798-677, pages 677 - 681, XP002141015 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nbt0798-677 | - HARLOW; LANE, Antibodies, A Laboratory Manual, COLD SPRING HARBOR LABORATORY PRESS, (1988), pages 567 - 569 | - GRAHAM ET AL., J. GEN. VIROL., (1977), vol. 36, page 59 | - URLAUB ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1980), vol. 77, page 4216 | - MATHER, BIOL. REPROD., (1980), vol. 23, pages 243 - 251 | - MATHER ET AL., Annals N.Y. Acad. Sci., (1982), vol. 383, pages 44 - 68 | - WANG ET AL., JOURNAL OF PHARMACEUTICAL SCIENCES, (2007), vol. 96, page 26 | - DE HAARD H ET AL., JBC, (1999), vol. 274, pages 18218 - 18230 | - CHOMCZYNSKI P ET AL., ANAL. BIOCHEM., (1987), vol. 162, pages 156 - 159 | - HAARD H ET AL., BIOL. CHEM., (1999), page 274 | - DALEY LP ET AL., CLIN. DIAGN. LAB IMMUNOL., (2005), vol. 12, pages 380 - 386 | - C. BASILICO ET AL., J BIOL. CHEM., (2008), vol. 283, pages 21267 - 2127 | - BACA ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (1997), vol. 272, pages 10678 - 10684 | - TSURUSHITA ET AL., J. IMMUNOL. METHODS, (2004), vol. 295, pages 9 - 19 |