EP3127542 - ANTIVIRAL THERAPY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 20.07.2018 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.03.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.02.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.11.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.05.2017 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.05.2024 | Change - representative | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VIIV Healthcare Company 251 Little Falls Drive Wilmington, DE 19808 / US | [2017/40] |
Former [2017/06] | For all designated states VIIV Healthcare Company Corporation Service Company 2711 Centerville Road Suite 400 Wilmington DE 19808 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
UNDERWOOD, Mark Richard c/o GlaxoSmithKline, Global Patents Dept P.O. Box 13398 Five Moore Drive Research Triangle Park, NC North Carolina 27709 / US | [2017/06] | Representative(s) | Wilkinson, Johanna Elise GSK Legal & Compliance - Global Patents 79 New Oxford Street London WC1A 1DG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2017/06] | Gladwin, Amanda Rachel GlaxoSmithKline Global Patents (CN925.1) 980 Great West Road Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB | Application number, filing date | 16187411.0 | 24.01.2011 | [2017/06] | Priority number, date | US20100298589P | 27.01.2010 Original published format: US 298589 P | [2017/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3127542 | Date: | 08.02.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3127542 | Date: | 22.08.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.12.2016 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/5365, A61K31/52, A61P31/18 | [2017/06] | CPC: |
A61K31/5365 (EP,EA,IL,KR,US);
A61K31/536 (IL,KR,US);
A61K31/505 (EP,EA,IL,US);
A61K31/4985 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K31/513 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K31/52 (IL,KR,US);
A61K31/675 (IL,US);
A61K45/06 (EP,IL,US);
A61K9/0014 (EP,IL,US);
A61K9/0019 (EP,IL,US);
A61K9/0053 (EP,IL,US);
A61P31/00 (EP,IL);
A61P31/12 (EP,IL);
A61P31/18 (EP,EA,IL);
A61P37/04 (EP,IL);
| C-Set: |
A61K31/4985, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/505, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/513, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/5365, A61K2300/00 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/06] | Extension states | BA | 06.09.2016 | ME | 06.09.2016 | Title | German: | ANTIVIRALE THERAPIE | [2017/06] | English: | ANTIVIRAL THERAPY | [2017/06] | French: | THERAPIE ANTIVIRALE | [2017/06] | Examination procedure | 06.09.2016 | Examination requested [2017/06] | 06.09.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 19.05.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.09.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.11.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.02.2018 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 09.03.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.07.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 04.07.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 04.07.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP11737484.3 / EP2531027 | EP15164931.6 / EP2932970 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
20.05.2019
23.05.2019
ADMISSIBLE Cooke, Richard Elkington and Fife LLP Patents Department 3-4 Holborn Circus London EC1N 2HA / GB Opponent's representative Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | 02
22.05.2019
28.05.2019
ADMISSIBLE Sandoz AG Lichtstrasse 35 4056 Basel / CH Opponent's representative Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Nymphenburger Straße 4 80335 München / DE | 03
22.05.2019
28.05.2019
ADMISSIBLE Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd 124 Dvora HaNevi'a St. 6944020 Tel Aviv / IL Opponent's representative D Young & Co LLP 3 Noble Street London EC2V 7BQ / GB | 04
22.05.2019
28.05.2019
ADMISSIBLE STADA Arzneimittel AG Stadastrasse 2-18 61118 Bad Vilbel / DE Opponent's representative Hamm&Wittkopp Patentanwälte PartmbB Jungfernstieg 38 20354 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2021/47] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
20.05.2019
23.05.2019
ADMISSIBLE Cooke, Richard Elkington and Fife LLP Patents Department 3-4 Holborn Circus London EC1N 2HA / GB Opponent's representative Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | ||
02
22.05.2019
28.05.2019
ADMISSIBLE Sandoz AG Lichtstrasse 35 4056 Basel / CH Opponent's representative Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Nymphenburger Straße 4 80335 München / DE | |||
03
22.05.2019
28.05.2019
ADMISSIBLE Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd 124 Dvora HaNevi'a St. 6944020 Tel Aviv / IL Opponent's representative D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | |||
04
22.05.2019
28.05.2019
ADMISSIBLE STADA Arzneimittel AG Stadastrasse 2-18 61118 Bad Vilbel / DE Opponent's representative Hamm&Wittkopp Patentanwälte PartmbB Jungfernstieg 38 20354 Hamburg / DE | |||
Former [2019/27] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
20.05.2019
23.05.2019
ADMISSIBLE Cooke, Richard Elkington and Fife LLP Patents Department 3-4 Holborn Circus London EC1N 2HA / GB Opponent's representative Elkington & Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | ||
02
22.05.2019
28.05.2019
ADMISSIBLE Sandoz AG Lichtstrasse 35 4056 Basel / CH Opponent's representative Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Nymphenburger Straße 4 80335 München / DE | |||
03
22.05.2019
28.05.2019
ADMISSIBLE Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd 5 Basel Street P.O. Box 3190 49131 Petah Tiqva / IL Opponent's representative D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | |||
04
22.05.2019
28.05.2019
ADMISSIBLE STADA Arzneimittel AG Stadastrasse 2-18 61118 Bad Vilbel / DE Opponent's representative Hamm&Wittkopp Patentanwälte PartmbB Jungfernstieg 38 20354 Hamburg / DE | |||
Former [2019/26] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
20.05.2019
23.05.2019
ADMISSIBLE Cooke, Richard Elkington and Fife LLP Patents Department 3-4 Holborn Circus London EC1N 2HA / GB Opponent's representative Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | ||
02
22.05.2019
ADMISSIBLE Sandoz AG Lichtstrasse 35 4056 Basel / CH Opponent's representative Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Nymphenburger Straße 4 80335 München / DE | |||
03
22.05.2019
ADMISSIBLE Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd 5 Basel Street P.O. Box 3190 49131 Petah Tiqva / IL Opponent's representative D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | deleted | Deletion: Legal effect of rejection of opposition [ N /P ] | 07.06.2019 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 28.11.2019 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 01.09.2020 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 05.11.2020 | 05.11.2020 | Date of oral proceedings | 07.06.2021 | Date of oral proceedings | 21.07.2021 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 22.07.2021 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | Appeal following opposition | 27.09.2021 | Appeal received No. T1698/21 | 27.09.2021 | Payment of appeal fee | 30.11.2021 | Statement of grounds filed | 15.09.2021 | Appeal received No. T1698/21 | 15.09.2021 | Payment of appeal fee | 30.11.2021 | Statement of grounds filed | 22.09.2021 | Appeal received No. T1698/21 | 22.09.2021 | Payment of appeal fee | 25.11.2021 | Statement of grounds filed | 28.09.2021 | Appeal received No. T1698/21 | 28.09.2021 | Payment of appeal fee | 17.11.2021 | Statement of grounds filed | 02.10.2024 | Date of oral proceedings | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 09.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 08.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2006084627 (MARDH GORAN [SE]); | [A]WO2009148600 (CONCERT PHARMACEUTICALS INC [US], et al); | [A]US2009318421 (JOHNS BRIAN ALVIN [US], et al); | [AP]WO2010011812 (SMITHKLINE BEECHAM CORP [US], et al); | by applicant | US5034394 | US5047407 | US5089500 | US5519021 | US5641889 | US5663320 | US5663169 | US5693787 | US5696254 | US5808147 | US5811423 | US5840990 | US5849911 | US5905082 | US5914332 | US5917041 | US5917042 | US5919941 | US5922695 | US5935946 | US5977089 | US6043230 | US6051709 | US6069249 | US6087501 | US6087383 | US6281367 | US6294540 | US6329522 | US6340587 | US6392085 | US6436989 | US6448403 | US6514953 | US6552193 | US6555687 | US6555133 | US6639071 | US6646125 | US6870053 | US6939964 | US7109228 | US7119202 | US7534809 | Opposition | EP1874117 | WO2006116764 | US7511037 |