EP3141267 - POLYMETHYLMETHACRYLATE BONE CEMENT WITH ADJUSTABLE INITIAL VISCOSITY AND A METHOD FOR PRODUCING A BONE CEMENT PASTE WITH VARIABLE INITIAL VISCOSITY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.09.2020 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 18.10.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.08.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.06.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Heraeus Medical GmbH Philipp-Reis-Strasse 8/13 61273 Wehrheim / DE | [2017/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Vogt, Sebastian Heraeus Medical GmbH Gamstädter Weg 11 99092 Erfurt / DE | 02 /
Kluge, Thomas Heraeus Medical GmbH Josef-Görres Str. 14 56179 Vallendar / DE | [2017/11] | Representative(s) | Heraeus IP Heraeus Business Solutions GmbH Intellectual Property Heraeusstraße 12-14 63450 Hanau / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/47] | Heraeus IP Heraeus Holding GmbH Intellectual Property Heraeusstraße 12-14 63450 Hanau / DE | ||
Former [2017/11] | Heraeus IP Heraeus Holding GmbH Schutzrechte Heraeusstraße 12-14 63450 Hanau / DE | Application number, filing date | 16187651.1 | 07.09.2016 | [2017/11] | Priority number, date | DE201510217315 | 10.09.2015 Original published format: DE102015217315 | [2017/11] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3141267 | Date: | 15.03.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3141267 | Date: | 20.11.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.02.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A61L24/04 | [2017/11] | CPC: |
A61L24/043 (EP,US);
A61L27/18 (CN);
A61L24/06 (US);
A61L24/001 (US);
A61L27/04 (CN);
A61L27/50 (CN);
A61P19/08 (EP);
A61P19/10 (EP);
A61P31/00 (EP);
| C-Set: |
A61L24/043, C08L33/12 (EP,US);
A61L27/18, C08L51/003 (CN);
C08F265/06, C08F2/44 (CN);
C08F265/06, C08F220/14 (CN) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/11] | Title | German: | POLYMETHYLMETHACRYLAT-KNOCHENZEMENT MIT EINSTELLBARER INITIALER VISKOSITÄT UND EIN VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES KNOCHENZEMENTTEIGS MIT VARIABLER INITIALER VISKOSITÄT | [2017/11] | English: | POLYMETHYLMETHACRYLATE BONE CEMENT WITH ADJUSTABLE INITIAL VISCOSITY AND A METHOD FOR PRODUCING A BONE CEMENT PASTE WITH VARIABLE INITIAL VISCOSITY | [2017/11] | French: | CIMENT OSSEUX EN POLYMÉTHACRYLATE DE MÉTHYLE AYANT UNE VISCOSITÉ INITIALE MODIFIABLE ET PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION D'UNE PÂTE DE CIMENT OSSEUX AYANT UNE VISCOSITÉ INITIALE VARIABLE | [2019/38] |
Former [2017/11] | CIMENT OSSEUX EN POLYMETHACRYLATE DE METHYLE AYANT UNE VISCOSITE INITIALE MODIFIABLE ET PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION D'UNE PATE DE CIMENT OSSEUX AYANT UNE VISCOSITE INITIALE VARIABLE | Examination procedure | 07.09.2016 | Examination requested [2017/11] | 07.09.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 24.10.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 06.12.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.06.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.12.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.08.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.10.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 07.10.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.10.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 21.08.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/44] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to indicate the wish to proceed further with the application | 06.12.2017 | Request for further processing filed | 06.12.2017 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 21.12.2017 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 06.12.2017 | Request for further processing filed | 06.12.2017 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 21.12.2017 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 07.09.2016 | AL | 20.11.2019 | CY | 20.11.2019 | CZ | 20.11.2019 | DK | 20.11.2019 | EE | 20.11.2019 | ES | 20.11.2019 | FI | 20.11.2019 | HR | 20.11.2019 | IT | 20.11.2019 | LT | 20.11.2019 | LV | 20.11.2019 | MC | 20.11.2019 | MK | 20.11.2019 | MT | 20.11.2019 | NL | 20.11.2019 | PL | 20.11.2019 | RO | 20.11.2019 | RS | 20.11.2019 | SE | 20.11.2019 | SI | 20.11.2019 | SK | 20.11.2019 | SM | 20.11.2019 | TR | 20.11.2019 | BG | 20.02.2020 | NO | 20.02.2020 | GR | 21.02.2020 | IS | 20.03.2020 | PT | 12.04.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 07.09.2016 | |
AL | 20.11.2019 | ||
CY | 20.11.2019 | ||
CZ | 20.11.2019 | ||
DK | 20.11.2019 | ||
EE | 20.11.2019 | ||
ES | 20.11.2019 | ||
FI | 20.11.2019 | ||
HR | 20.11.2019 | ||
IT | 20.11.2019 | ||
LT | 20.11.2019 | ||
LV | 20.11.2019 | ||
MC | 20.11.2019 | ||
MT | 20.11.2019 | ||
NL | 20.11.2019 | ||
PL | 20.11.2019 | ||
RO | 20.11.2019 | ||
RS | 20.11.2019 | ||
SE | 20.11.2019 | ||
SI | 20.11.2019 | ||
SK | 20.11.2019 | ||
SM | 20.11.2019 | ||
TR | 20.11.2019 | ||
BG | 20.02.2020 | ||
NO | 20.02.2020 | ||
GR | 21.02.2020 | ||
IS | 20.03.2020 | ||
PT | 12.04.2020 | ||
Former [2021/23] | AL | 20.11.2019 | |
CZ | 20.11.2019 | ||
DK | 20.11.2019 | ||
EE | 20.11.2019 | ||
ES | 20.11.2019 | ||
FI | 20.11.2019 | ||
HR | 20.11.2019 | ||
IT | 20.11.2019 | ||
LT | 20.11.2019 | ||
LV | 20.11.2019 | ||
MC | 20.11.2019 | ||
NL | 20.11.2019 | ||
PL | 20.11.2019 | ||
RO | 20.11.2019 | ||
RS | 20.11.2019 | ||
SE | 20.11.2019 | ||
SI | 20.11.2019 | ||
SK | 20.11.2019 | ||
SM | 20.11.2019 | ||
BG | 20.02.2020 | ||
NO | 20.02.2020 | ||
GR | 21.02.2020 | ||
IS | 20.03.2020 | ||
PT | 12.04.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AL | 20.11.2019 | |
CZ | 20.11.2019 | ||
DK | 20.11.2019 | ||
EE | 20.11.2019 | ||
ES | 20.11.2019 | ||
FI | 20.11.2019 | ||
HR | 20.11.2019 | ||
IT | 20.11.2019 | ||
LT | 20.11.2019 | ||
LV | 20.11.2019 | ||
NL | 20.11.2019 | ||
PL | 20.11.2019 | ||
RO | 20.11.2019 | ||
RS | 20.11.2019 | ||
SE | 20.11.2019 | ||
SI | 20.11.2019 | ||
SK | 20.11.2019 | ||
SM | 20.11.2019 | ||
BG | 20.02.2020 | ||
NO | 20.02.2020 | ||
GR | 21.02.2020 | ||
IS | 20.03.2020 | ||
PT | 12.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | AL | 20.11.2019 | |
CZ | 20.11.2019 | ||
DK | 20.11.2019 | ||
EE | 20.11.2019 | ||
ES | 20.11.2019 | ||
FI | 20.11.2019 | ||
HR | 20.11.2019 | ||
LT | 20.11.2019 | ||
LV | 20.11.2019 | ||
NL | 20.11.2019 | ||
PL | 20.11.2019 | ||
RO | 20.11.2019 | ||
RS | 20.11.2019 | ||
SE | 20.11.2019 | ||
SI | 20.11.2019 | ||
SK | 20.11.2019 | ||
SM | 20.11.2019 | ||
BG | 20.02.2020 | ||
NO | 20.02.2020 | ||
GR | 21.02.2020 | ||
IS | 20.03.2020 | ||
PT | 12.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 20.11.2019 | |
CZ | 20.11.2019 | ||
DK | 20.11.2019 | ||
EE | 20.11.2019 | ||
ES | 20.11.2019 | ||
FI | 20.11.2019 | ||
HR | 20.11.2019 | ||
LT | 20.11.2019 | ||
LV | 20.11.2019 | ||
NL | 20.11.2019 | ||
RO | 20.11.2019 | ||
RS | 20.11.2019 | ||
SE | 20.11.2019 | ||
SK | 20.11.2019 | ||
SM | 20.11.2019 | ||
BG | 20.02.2020 | ||
NO | 20.02.2020 | ||
GR | 21.02.2020 | ||
IS | 20.03.2020 | ||
PT | 12.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 20.11.2019 | |
CZ | 20.11.2019 | ||
DK | 20.11.2019 | ||
EE | 20.11.2019 | ||
ES | 20.11.2019 | ||
FI | 20.11.2019 | ||
HR | 20.11.2019 | ||
LT | 20.11.2019 | ||
LV | 20.11.2019 | ||
NL | 20.11.2019 | ||
RO | 20.11.2019 | ||
RS | 20.11.2019 | ||
SE | 20.11.2019 | ||
BG | 20.02.2020 | ||
NO | 20.02.2020 | ||
GR | 21.02.2020 | ||
IS | 20.03.2020 | ||
PT | 12.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | AL | 20.11.2019 | |
CZ | 20.11.2019 | ||
ES | 20.11.2019 | ||
FI | 20.11.2019 | ||
HR | 20.11.2019 | ||
LT | 20.11.2019 | ||
LV | 20.11.2019 | ||
NL | 20.11.2019 | ||
RO | 20.11.2019 | ||
RS | 20.11.2019 | ||
SE | 20.11.2019 | ||
BG | 20.02.2020 | ||
NO | 20.02.2020 | ||
GR | 21.02.2020 | ||
IS | 20.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/34] | AL | 20.11.2019 | |
ES | 20.11.2019 | ||
FI | 20.11.2019 | ||
HR | 20.11.2019 | ||
LT | 20.11.2019 | ||
LV | 20.11.2019 | ||
NL | 20.11.2019 | ||
RS | 20.11.2019 | ||
SE | 20.11.2019 | ||
BG | 20.02.2020 | ||
NO | 20.02.2020 | ||
GR | 21.02.2020 | ||
IS | 20.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/32] | AL | 20.11.2019 | |
FI | 20.11.2019 | ||
HR | 20.11.2019 | ||
LT | 20.11.2019 | ||
LV | 20.11.2019 | ||
NL | 20.11.2019 | ||
RS | 20.11.2019 | ||
SE | 20.11.2019 | ||
BG | 20.02.2020 | ||
NO | 20.02.2020 | ||
GR | 21.02.2020 | ||
IS | 20.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/26] | FI | 20.11.2019 | |
HR | 20.11.2019 | ||
LT | 20.11.2019 | ||
LV | 20.11.2019 | ||
NL | 20.11.2019 | ||
RS | 20.11.2019 | ||
SE | 20.11.2019 | ||
BG | 20.02.2020 | ||
NO | 20.02.2020 | ||
GR | 21.02.2020 | ||
IS | 20.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | FI | 20.11.2019 | |
LT | 20.11.2019 | ||
LV | 20.11.2019 | ||
NL | 20.11.2019 | ||
SE | 20.11.2019 | ||
BG | 20.02.2020 | ||
NO | 20.02.2020 | ||
GR | 21.02.2020 | ||
IS | 20.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | FI | 20.11.2019 | |
LT | 20.11.2019 | ||
LV | 20.11.2019 | ||
NL | 20.11.2019 | ||
SE | 20.11.2019 | ||
BG | 20.02.2020 | ||
NO | 20.02.2020 | ||
GR | 21.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | FI | 20.11.2019 | |
LT | 20.11.2019 | ||
SE | 20.11.2019 | ||
BG | 20.02.2020 | ||
NO | 20.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/21] | NO | 20.02.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US2004157954 (IMAI YOHJI [JP], et al) [X] 1-6,8-10,18-21 * paragraphs [0002] , [0006] , [0008] , [0011] - [0016] - [0018] - [0021] - [0023] - [0025] - [0027] , [0030] * * example 10 * [Y] 1-21; | [A]EP2052747 (HERAEUS MEDICAL GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-21* example 5 *; | [XY]EP2055324 (HERAEUS MEDICAL GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,2,4,5,10,18-21 * paragraphs [0001] , [0008] , [0 19] , [0 43] * [Y] 1-21; | [Y]US2010228358 (LEONARD ALAIN [FR], et al) [Y] 1,5,8,10,12,20 * paragraphs [0001] , [0053] , [0054] *; | [Y]EP2269718 (HERAEUS MEDICAL GMBH [DE]) [Y] 11-17 * paragraphs [0006] , [0009] , [0014] , [0015] , [0018] , [0 20] , [0 21] , [0022] , [0026]; figure 1 * | Examination | EP3093067 | by applicant | - CHARNLEY, J., "Anchorage of the femoral head prothesis of the shaft of the femur", J. BONE JOINT SURG, (1960), vol. 42, pages 28 - 30 | - KÜHN, K.-D., Knochenzemente für die Endoprothetik, SPRINGER VERLAG, (2001), pages 18 - 19 |