EP3168737 - DISTRIBUTED MULTIMODE STORAGE MANAGEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 28.07.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.04.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.09.2017 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 18.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.07.2023 | Refusal of application | published on 30.08.2023 [2023/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | [2017/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TOMLIN, Andrew 2824 Monte Cresta Way San Jose, CA California 95132 / US | 02 /
WEBER, Fred 1137 Settle Ave San Jose, CA California 95125 / US | [2017/20] | Representative(s) | Kuhnen & Wacker Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsbüro PartG mbB Prinz-Ludwig-Straße 40A 85354 Freising / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/20] | Kuhnen & Wacker Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsbüro Prinz-Ludwig-Straße 40A 85354 Freising / DE | Application number, filing date | 16187726.1 | 08.09.2016 | [2017/20] | Priority number, date | US201514941512 | 13.11.2015 Original published format: US201514941512 | US201514941517 | 13.11.2015 Original published format: US201514941517 | US201514941525 | 13.11.2015 Original published format: US201514941525 | US201514947931 | 20.11.2015 Original published format: US201514947931 | [2017/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3168737 | Date: | 17.05.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/20] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP3168737 | Date: | 02.08.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.07.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/06 | [2017/20] | CPC: |
G06F3/0604 (EP,US);
G06F16/27 (KR);
G06F3/067 (EP,CN,US);
G06F12/0246 (US);
G06F11/2069 (US);
G06F12/1009 (US);
G06F16/182 (KR);
G06F3/061 (EP,US);
G06F3/0611 (US);
G06F3/0626 (CN,US);
G06F3/0643 (EP,US);
G06F3/0644 (EP,US);
G06F3/0652 (EP,US);
G06F3/0659 (EP,US);
G06F3/0664 (EP,US);
G06F3/0688 (EP,US);
G06F3/0689 (CN);
H04L67/1097 (US);
G06F2201/805 (US);
G06F2212/1024 (US);
G06F2212/1044 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/42] |
Former [2017/20] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERWALTUNG VON VERTEILTEM MULTIMODALEM SPEICHER | [2017/20] | English: | DISTRIBUTED MULTIMODE STORAGE MANAGEMENT | [2017/20] | French: | SYSTEME DE MEMOIRE MULTIMODE DISTRIBUEE | [2017/20] | Examination procedure | 08.09.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 07.09.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.09.2017 | Examination requested [2017/42] | 15.04.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.08.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.11.2020 | Date of oral proceedings | 12.11.2020 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 17.11.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2023/35] | 15.05.2023 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2023/35] | Appeal following examination | 25.01.2021 | Appeal received No. T0384/21 | 25.01.2021 | Payment of appeal fee | 09.03.2021 | Statement of grounds filed | 15.05.2023 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant was rejected | 21.07.2023 | Despatch of the decision of the Board of Appeal | 15.05.2023 | Date of oral proceedings | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US8639669 (DOUGLIS FREDERICK [US], et al) [X] 1,17 * column 3, line 9 - column 5, line 23 * * figures 1,3 * [I] 2-9,18-20; | [A]US2012297122 (GOROBETS SERGEY ANATOLIEVICH [GB], et al) [A] 1-9,17-20 * paragraph [0106] - paragraph [0107] * |