EP3133286 - COMPRESSOR SENSOR MODULE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.10.2020 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 15.11.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 17.07.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.08.2017 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 20.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.06.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, HU, MT, TR | published on 27.07.2022 [2022/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Emerson Climate Technologies, Inc. 1675 W. Campbell Road Sidney, OH 45365-0669 / US | [2017/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JAYANTH, Nagaraj 1256 E. Parkwood Street Sidney, OH Ohio 45365 / US | 02 /
RENKEN, Troy W. 3711 Fountain Street Camarillo, CA California 93012 / US | [2017/08] | Representative(s) | J A Kemp LLP 80 Turnmill Street London EC1M 5QU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2019/51] | J A Kemp LLP 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | ||
Former [2017/08] | Roberts, Mark Peter J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 16187893.9 | 31.10.2008 | [2017/08] | Priority number, date | US20070984902P | 02.11.2007 Original published format: US 984902 P | US20080261643 | 30.10.2008 Original published format: US 261643 | [2017/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3133286 | Date: | 22.02.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3133286 | Date: | 18.12.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.01.2017 | Classification | IPC: | F04B49/00, F04B49/06, F04B35/04, F04B39/12, F04D27/00, F04D27/02, H02H7/08, F04B51/00, G01R21/00, G01R21/133 | [2017/08] | CPC: |
F04B49/065 (EP,US);
F04B51/00 (US);
F04B35/04 (EP,US);
F04B39/121 (EP,US);
F04D27/00 (US);
F04D27/001 (EP,US);
F04D27/02 (EP,US);
G01R21/00 (EP,US);
G01R21/133 (US);
H02H7/0822 (EP,US);
F04B2203/0201 (EP,US);
F04B2203/0202 (EP,US);
F04B2203/0208 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2017/39] |
Former [2017/08] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | VERDICHTERSENSORMODUL | [2017/08] | English: | COMPRESSOR SENSOR MODULE | [2017/08] | French: | MODULE DE CAPTEUR DE COMPRESSEUR | [2017/08] | Examination procedure | 08.09.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 22.08.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.08.2017 | Examination requested [2017/39] | 18.07.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.11.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 08.11.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.11.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP08848538.8 / EP2220372 | Opposition(s) | 21.09.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 08.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 08.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 29.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 28.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 31.10.2008 | AT | 18.12.2019 | CY | 18.12.2019 | CZ | 18.12.2019 | DK | 18.12.2019 | EE | 18.12.2019 | FI | 18.12.2019 | HR | 18.12.2019 | LT | 18.12.2019 | LV | 18.12.2019 | MC | 18.12.2019 | MT | 18.12.2019 | NL | 18.12.2019 | PL | 18.12.2019 | RO | 18.12.2019 | SE | 18.12.2019 | SI | 18.12.2019 | SK | 18.12.2019 | TR | 18.12.2019 | BG | 18.03.2020 | NO | 18.03.2020 | GR | 19.03.2020 | IS | 18.04.2020 | PT | 13.05.2020 | [2022/27] |
Former [2021/31] | AT | 18.12.2019 | |
CZ | 18.12.2019 | ||
DK | 18.12.2019 | ||
EE | 18.12.2019 | ||
FI | 18.12.2019 | ||
HR | 18.12.2019 | ||
LT | 18.12.2019 | ||
LV | 18.12.2019 | ||
MC | 18.12.2019 | ||
NL | 18.12.2019 | ||
PL | 18.12.2019 | ||
RO | 18.12.2019 | ||
SE | 18.12.2019 | ||
SI | 18.12.2019 | ||
SK | 18.12.2019 | ||
BG | 18.03.2020 | ||
NO | 18.03.2020 | ||
GR | 19.03.2020 | ||
IS | 18.04.2020 | ||
PT | 13.05.2020 | ||
Former [2021/14] | AT | 18.12.2019 | |
CZ | 18.12.2019 | ||
DK | 18.12.2019 | ||
EE | 18.12.2019 | ||
FI | 18.12.2019 | ||
HR | 18.12.2019 | ||
LT | 18.12.2019 | ||
LV | 18.12.2019 | ||
NL | 18.12.2019 | ||
PL | 18.12.2019 | ||
RO | 18.12.2019 | ||
SE | 18.12.2019 | ||
SI | 18.12.2019 | ||
SK | 18.12.2019 | ||
BG | 18.03.2020 | ||
NO | 18.03.2020 | ||
GR | 19.03.2020 | ||
IS | 18.04.2020 | ||
PT | 13.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | AT | 18.12.2019 | |
CZ | 18.12.2019 | ||
DK | 18.12.2019 | ||
EE | 18.12.2019 | ||
FI | 18.12.2019 | ||
HR | 18.12.2019 | ||
LT | 18.12.2019 | ||
LV | 18.12.2019 | ||
NL | 18.12.2019 | ||
RO | 18.12.2019 | ||
SE | 18.12.2019 | ||
SI | 18.12.2019 | ||
SK | 18.12.2019 | ||
BG | 18.03.2020 | ||
NO | 18.03.2020 | ||
GR | 19.03.2020 | ||
IS | 18.04.2020 | ||
PT | 13.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | CZ | 18.12.2019 | |
DK | 18.12.2019 | ||
EE | 18.12.2019 | ||
FI | 18.12.2019 | ||
HR | 18.12.2019 | ||
LT | 18.12.2019 | ||
LV | 18.12.2019 | ||
NL | 18.12.2019 | ||
RO | 18.12.2019 | ||
SE | 18.12.2019 | ||
SK | 18.12.2019 | ||
BG | 18.03.2020 | ||
NO | 18.03.2020 | ||
GR | 19.03.2020 | ||
IS | 18.04.2020 | ||
PT | 13.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/40] | CZ | 18.12.2019 | |
EE | 18.12.2019 | ||
FI | 18.12.2019 | ||
HR | 18.12.2019 | ||
LT | 18.12.2019 | ||
LV | 18.12.2019 | ||
NL | 18.12.2019 | ||
RO | 18.12.2019 | ||
SE | 18.12.2019 | ||
SK | 18.12.2019 | ||
BG | 18.03.2020 | ||
NO | 18.03.2020 | ||
GR | 19.03.2020 | ||
IS | 18.04.2020 | ||
PT | 13.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | CZ | 18.12.2019 | |
EE | 18.12.2019 | ||
FI | 18.12.2019 | ||
HR | 18.12.2019 | ||
LT | 18.12.2019 | ||
LV | 18.12.2019 | ||
NL | 18.12.2019 | ||
RO | 18.12.2019 | ||
SE | 18.12.2019 | ||
SK | 18.12.2019 | ||
BG | 18.03.2020 | ||
NO | 18.03.2020 | ||
GR | 19.03.2020 | ||
PT | 13.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | CZ | 18.12.2019 | |
EE | 18.12.2019 | ||
FI | 18.12.2019 | ||
HR | 18.12.2019 | ||
LT | 18.12.2019 | ||
LV | 18.12.2019 | ||
NL | 18.12.2019 | ||
RO | 18.12.2019 | ||
SE | 18.12.2019 | ||
BG | 18.03.2020 | ||
NO | 18.03.2020 | ||
GR | 19.03.2020 | ||
PT | 13.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | CZ | 18.12.2019 | |
FI | 18.12.2019 | ||
HR | 18.12.2019 | ||
LT | 18.12.2019 | ||
LV | 18.12.2019 | ||
NL | 18.12.2019 | ||
RO | 18.12.2019 | ||
SE | 18.12.2019 | ||
BG | 18.03.2020 | ||
NO | 18.03.2020 | ||
GR | 19.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/33] | FI | 18.12.2019 | |
HR | 18.12.2019 | ||
LT | 18.12.2019 | ||
LV | 18.12.2019 | ||
NL | 18.12.2019 | ||
SE | 18.12.2019 | ||
BG | 18.03.2020 | ||
NO | 18.03.2020 | ||
GR | 19.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/25] | FI | 18.12.2019 | |
HR | 18.12.2019 | ||
LT | 18.12.2019 | ||
LV | 18.12.2019 | ||
SE | 18.12.2019 | ||
BG | 18.03.2020 | ||
NO | 18.03.2020 | ||
GR | 19.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | FI | 18.12.2019 | |
LT | 18.12.2019 | ||
LV | 18.12.2019 | ||
SE | 18.12.2019 | ||
BG | 18.03.2020 | ||
NO | 18.03.2020 | ||
GR | 19.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | FI | 18.12.2019 | |
LT | 18.12.2019 | ||
SE | 18.12.2019 | ||
BG | 18.03.2020 | ||
NO | 18.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/21] | NO | 18.03.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2004016253 (STREET NORMAN E [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * claim 1 * * paragraph [0151] * * paragraph [0035] - paragraph [0061] *; | [A]EP1541869 (DAIKIN IND LTD [JP]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0085] - paragraph [0101] * * paragraph [0126] - paragraph [0156] * * figure 1 *; | [A]US2005235660 (PHAM HUNG M [US]) [A] 1-15 * figures 2-4 * * paragraph [0003] - paragraph [0006] * * paragraph [0051] - paragraph [0055] ** paragraph [0083] - paragraph [0103] *; | [A]US2006222507 (JAYANTH NAGARAJ [US]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0039] - paragraph [0063] * * figure 2 * | by applicant | US2005235660 | US20060405021 | US20060474865 | US20060474821 | US20060474798 |