EP3144536 - ROTARY COMPRESSOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.09.2019 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.10.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.06.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.09.2017 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 17.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fujitsu General Limited 3-3-17, Suenaga Takatsu-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 213-8502 / JP | [2017/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KATAYAMA, Hiroki c/o FUJITSU GENERAL LIMITED 3-3-17, Suenaga Takatsu-ku KAWASAKI-SHI, KANAGAWA, 213-8502 / JP | 02 /
MORISHITA, Taku c/o FUJITSU GENERAL LIMITED 3-3-17, Suenaga Takatsu-ku KAWASAKI-SHI, KANAGAWA, 213-8502 / JP | 03 /
FURUKAWA, Motonobu c/o FUJITSU GENERAL LIMITED 3-3-17, Suenaga Takatsu-ku KAWASAKI-SHI, KANAGAWA, 213-8502 / JP | 04 /
MOROZUMI, Naoya c/o FUJITSU GENERAL LIMITED 3-3-17, Suenaga Takatsu-ku KAWASAKI-SHI, KANAGAWA, 213-8502 / JP | [2017/12] | Representative(s) | Kreutzer, Ulrich Cabinet Beau de Loménie Lessingstrasse 6 80336 München / DE | [2017/12] | Application number, filing date | 16187919.2 | 08.09.2016 | [2017/12] | Priority number, date | JP20150179641 | 11.09.2015 Original published format: JP 2015179641 | JP20160137898 | 12.07.2016 Original published format: JP 2016137898 | [2017/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3144536 | Date: | 22.03.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3144536 | Date: | 07.11.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.02.2017 | Classification | IPC: | F04C23/00, F04C29/06, F04C18/356, F04C29/00 | [2018/24] | CPC: |
F04C29/0057 (EP,US);
F04C29/06 (CN);
F04C29/066 (US);
F04C18/3562 (CN,US);
F04C18/3564 (EP,US);
F04C23/001 (EP,US);
F04C29/0085 (EP,US);
F04C29/065 (EP,CN,US);
F04C29/068 (EP,US);
F04C29/12 (US);
F04C2210/26 (US);
F04C2240/10 (US);
F04C2240/20 (US);
F04C2240/40 (US);
F04C2250/102 (US);
|
Former IPC [2017/12] | F04C23/00, F04C29/06, F04C18/356 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/44] |
Former [2017/12] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | ROTATIONSVERDICHTER | [2017/12] | English: | ROTARY COMPRESSOR | [2017/12] | French: | COMPRESSEUR ROTATIF | [2017/12] | Examination procedure | 08.09.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 20.09.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.09.2017 | Examination requested [2017/44] | 15.06.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.09.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 20.09.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.09.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 08.08.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 08.09.2016 | AL | 07.11.2018 | AT | 07.11.2018 | CY | 07.11.2018 | CZ | 07.11.2018 | DK | 07.11.2018 | EE | 07.11.2018 | ES | 07.11.2018 | FI | 07.11.2018 | HR | 07.11.2018 | IT | 07.11.2018 | LT | 07.11.2018 | LV | 07.11.2018 | MC | 07.11.2018 | MK | 07.11.2018 | MT | 07.11.2018 | NL | 07.11.2018 | PL | 07.11.2018 | RO | 07.11.2018 | RS | 07.11.2018 | SE | 07.11.2018 | SI | 07.11.2018 | SK | 07.11.2018 | SM | 07.11.2018 | TR | 07.11.2018 | BG | 07.02.2019 | NO | 07.02.2019 | GR | 08.02.2019 | IS | 07.03.2019 | PT | 07.03.2019 | [2022/32] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 08.09.2016 | |
AL | 07.11.2018 | ||
AT | 07.11.2018 | ||
CY | 07.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 07.11.2018 | ||
DK | 07.11.2018 | ||
EE | 07.11.2018 | ||
ES | 07.11.2018 | ||
FI | 07.11.2018 | ||
HR | 07.11.2018 | ||
IT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LV | 07.11.2018 | ||
MC | 07.11.2018 | ||
MT | 07.11.2018 | ||
NL | 07.11.2018 | ||
PL | 07.11.2018 | ||
RO | 07.11.2018 | ||
RS | 07.11.2018 | ||
SE | 07.11.2018 | ||
SI | 07.11.2018 | ||
SK | 07.11.2018 | ||
SM | 07.11.2018 | ||
TR | 07.11.2018 | ||
BG | 07.02.2019 | ||
NO | 07.02.2019 | ||
GR | 08.02.2019 | ||
IS | 07.03.2019 | ||
PT | 07.03.2019 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 08.09.2016 | |
AL | 07.11.2018 | ||
AT | 07.11.2018 | ||
CY | 07.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 07.11.2018 | ||
DK | 07.11.2018 | ||
EE | 07.11.2018 | ||
ES | 07.11.2018 | ||
FI | 07.11.2018 | ||
HR | 07.11.2018 | ||
IT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LV | 07.11.2018 | ||
MC | 07.11.2018 | ||
NL | 07.11.2018 | ||
PL | 07.11.2018 | ||
RO | 07.11.2018 | ||
RS | 07.11.2018 | ||
SE | 07.11.2018 | ||
SI | 07.11.2018 | ||
SK | 07.11.2018 | ||
SM | 07.11.2018 | ||
TR | 07.11.2018 | ||
BG | 07.02.2019 | ||
NO | 07.02.2019 | ||
GR | 08.02.2019 | ||
IS | 07.03.2019 | ||
PT | 07.03.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 07.11.2018 | |
AT | 07.11.2018 | ||
CY | 07.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 07.11.2018 | ||
DK | 07.11.2018 | ||
EE | 07.11.2018 | ||
ES | 07.11.2018 | ||
FI | 07.11.2018 | ||
HR | 07.11.2018 | ||
IT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LV | 07.11.2018 | ||
MC | 07.11.2018 | ||
NL | 07.11.2018 | ||
PL | 07.11.2018 | ||
RO | 07.11.2018 | ||
RS | 07.11.2018 | ||
SE | 07.11.2018 | ||
SI | 07.11.2018 | ||
SK | 07.11.2018 | ||
SM | 07.11.2018 | ||
TR | 07.11.2018 | ||
BG | 07.02.2019 | ||
NO | 07.02.2019 | ||
GR | 08.02.2019 | ||
IS | 07.03.2019 | ||
PT | 07.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AL | 07.11.2018 | |
AT | 07.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 07.11.2018 | ||
DK | 07.11.2018 | ||
EE | 07.11.2018 | ||
ES | 07.11.2018 | ||
FI | 07.11.2018 | ||
HR | 07.11.2018 | ||
IT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LV | 07.11.2018 | ||
MC | 07.11.2018 | ||
NL | 07.11.2018 | ||
PL | 07.11.2018 | ||
RO | 07.11.2018 | ||
RS | 07.11.2018 | ||
SE | 07.11.2018 | ||
SI | 07.11.2018 | ||
SK | 07.11.2018 | ||
SM | 07.11.2018 | ||
TR | 07.11.2018 | ||
BG | 07.02.2019 | ||
NO | 07.02.2019 | ||
GR | 08.02.2019 | ||
IS | 07.03.2019 | ||
PT | 07.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 07.11.2018 | |
AT | 07.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 07.11.2018 | ||
DK | 07.11.2018 | ||
EE | 07.11.2018 | ||
ES | 07.11.2018 | ||
FI | 07.11.2018 | ||
HR | 07.11.2018 | ||
IT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LV | 07.11.2018 | ||
NL | 07.11.2018 | ||
PL | 07.11.2018 | ||
RO | 07.11.2018 | ||
RS | 07.11.2018 | ||
SE | 07.11.2018 | ||
SI | 07.11.2018 | ||
SK | 07.11.2018 | ||
SM | 07.11.2018 | ||
TR | 07.11.2018 | ||
BG | 07.02.2019 | ||
NO | 07.02.2019 | ||
GR | 08.02.2019 | ||
IS | 07.03.2019 | ||
PT | 07.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AL | 07.11.2018 | |
AT | 07.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 07.11.2018 | ||
DK | 07.11.2018 | ||
EE | 07.11.2018 | ||
ES | 07.11.2018 | ||
FI | 07.11.2018 | ||
HR | 07.11.2018 | ||
IT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LV | 07.11.2018 | ||
NL | 07.11.2018 | ||
PL | 07.11.2018 | ||
RO | 07.11.2018 | ||
RS | 07.11.2018 | ||
SE | 07.11.2018 | ||
SI | 07.11.2018 | ||
SK | 07.11.2018 | ||
SM | 07.11.2018 | ||
BG | 07.02.2019 | ||
NO | 07.02.2019 | ||
GR | 08.02.2019 | ||
IS | 07.03.2019 | ||
PT | 07.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AL | 07.11.2018 | |
AT | 07.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 07.11.2018 | ||
DK | 07.11.2018 | ||
EE | 07.11.2018 | ||
ES | 07.11.2018 | ||
FI | 07.11.2018 | ||
HR | 07.11.2018 | ||
IT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LV | 07.11.2018 | ||
NL | 07.11.2018 | ||
PL | 07.11.2018 | ||
RO | 07.11.2018 | ||
RS | 07.11.2018 | ||
SE | 07.11.2018 | ||
SK | 07.11.2018 | ||
SM | 07.11.2018 | ||
BG | 07.02.2019 | ||
NO | 07.02.2019 | ||
GR | 08.02.2019 | ||
IS | 07.03.2019 | ||
PT | 07.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AL | 07.11.2018 | |
AT | 07.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 07.11.2018 | ||
DK | 07.11.2018 | ||
EE | 07.11.2018 | ||
ES | 07.11.2018 | ||
FI | 07.11.2018 | ||
HR | 07.11.2018 | ||
IT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LV | 07.11.2018 | ||
NL | 07.11.2018 | ||
PL | 07.11.2018 | ||
RO | 07.11.2018 | ||
RS | 07.11.2018 | ||
SE | 07.11.2018 | ||
SM | 07.11.2018 | ||
BG | 07.02.2019 | ||
NO | 07.02.2019 | ||
GR | 08.02.2019 | ||
IS | 07.03.2019 | ||
PT | 07.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/35] | AL | 07.11.2018 | |
AT | 07.11.2018 | ||
CZ | 07.11.2018 | ||
DK | 07.11.2018 | ||
ES | 07.11.2018 | ||
FI | 07.11.2018 | ||
HR | 07.11.2018 | ||
IT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LV | 07.11.2018 | ||
NL | 07.11.2018 | ||
PL | 07.11.2018 | ||
RS | 07.11.2018 | ||
SE | 07.11.2018 | ||
BG | 07.02.2019 | ||
NO | 07.02.2019 | ||
GR | 08.02.2019 | ||
IS | 07.03.2019 | ||
PT | 07.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | AL | 07.11.2018 | |
AT | 07.11.2018 | ||
DK | 07.11.2018 | ||
ES | 07.11.2018 | ||
FI | 07.11.2018 | ||
HR | 07.11.2018 | ||
IT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LV | 07.11.2018 | ||
NL | 07.11.2018 | ||
RS | 07.11.2018 | ||
SE | 07.11.2018 | ||
BG | 07.02.2019 | ||
NO | 07.02.2019 | ||
GR | 08.02.2019 | ||
IS | 07.03.2019 | ||
PT | 07.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 07.11.2018 | |
AT | 07.11.2018 | ||
ES | 07.11.2018 | ||
FI | 07.11.2018 | ||
HR | 07.11.2018 | ||
LT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LV | 07.11.2018 | ||
NL | 07.11.2018 | ||
RS | 07.11.2018 | ||
SE | 07.11.2018 | ||
BG | 07.02.2019 | ||
NO | 07.02.2019 | ||
GR | 08.02.2019 | ||
IS | 07.03.2019 | ||
PT | 07.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/25] | AT | 07.11.2018 | |
ES | 07.11.2018 | ||
FI | 07.11.2018 | ||
HR | 07.11.2018 | ||
LT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LV | 07.11.2018 | ||
NL | 07.11.2018 | ||
RS | 07.11.2018 | ||
SE | 07.11.2018 | ||
BG | 07.02.2019 | ||
NO | 07.02.2019 | ||
GR | 08.02.2019 | ||
IS | 07.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/24] | AT | 07.11.2018 | |
ES | 07.11.2018 | ||
FI | 07.11.2018 | ||
HR | 07.11.2018 | ||
LT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LV | 07.11.2018 | ||
NL | 07.11.2018 | ||
SE | 07.11.2018 | ||
BG | 07.02.2019 | ||
NO | 07.02.2019 | ||
GR | 08.02.2019 | ||
IS | 07.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/23] | AT | 07.11.2018 | |
ES | 07.11.2018 | ||
FI | 07.11.2018 | ||
HR | 07.11.2018 | ||
LT | 07.11.2018 | ||
LV | 07.11.2018 | ||
NL | 07.11.2018 | ||
BG | 07.02.2019 | ||
NO | 07.02.2019 | ||
IS | 07.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/22] | FI | 07.11.2018 | |
LT | 07.11.2018 | ||
BG | 07.02.2019 | ||
NO | 07.02.2019 | ||
IS | 07.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/21] | FI | 07.11.2018 | |
LT | 07.11.2018 | ||
NO | 07.02.2019 | ||
IS | 07.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/20] | LT | 07.11.2018 | |
NO | 07.02.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2000320479 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [A] 1-3 * abstract *; | [A]JP2001280241 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [A] 1-3 * abstract *; | [A]US2006171835 (DREIMAN NELIK I [US], et al) [A] 1-3 * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0032] * * paragraph [0035]; figures 1,3,4 *; | [A]EP1908958 (FUJITSU GENERAL LTD [JP]) [A] 1-3 * paragraph [0067] - paragraph [0074] ** figures 2,3; claim 1 *; | [A]EP2372083 (FUJITSU GENERAL LTD [JP]) [A] 1-3 * paragraph [0006] * * paragraph [0010] - paragraph [0024] * * figure -; claim 1 *; | [A]WO2013168194 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP], et al) [A] 1-3 * abstract * |