EP3125131 - SYSTEM AND METHOD OF CACHING INFORMATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.05.2021 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 12.06.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.02.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.12.2017 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 30.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Google LLC 1600 Amphitheatre Parkway Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | [2017/45] |
Former [2017/05] | For all designated states Google Inc. 1600 Amphitheatre Parkway Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BURKARD, Timo c/o GOOGLE INC 1600 Amphitheatre Parkway Mountain View, California 94043 / US | 02 /
PRESOTTO, David c/o GOOGLE INC 1600 Amphitheatre Parkway Mountain View, California 94043 / US | [2017/05] | Representative(s) | Betten & Resch Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Maximiliansplatz 14 80333 München / DE | [2020/29] |
Former [2017/05] | Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | Application number, filing date | 16188263.4 | 20.08.2010 | [2017/05] | Priority number, date | US20090545225 | 21.08.2009 Original published format: US 545225 | [2017/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3125131 | Date: | 01.02.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/05] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP3125131 | Date: | 31.05.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3125131 | Date: | 15.07.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.05.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G06F15/16, G06F9/06, G06F12/12, // G06F12/08 | [2017/05] | CPC: |
G06F12/123 (EP,US);
G06F12/00 (US);
G06F12/0246 (US);
G06F12/0842 (US);
G06F12/0888 (EP,US);
G06F12/121 (US);
G06F12/122 (US);
H04L67/5683 (US);
G06F12/0871 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/02] |
Former [2017/05] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR CACHE-SPEICHERUNG VON INFORMATIONEN | [2017/05] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD OF CACHING INFORMATION | [2017/05] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE MISE EN ANTÉMÉMOIRE D'INFORMATIONS | [2017/05] | Examination procedure | 12.09.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 30.11.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.11.2017 | Examination requested [2018/02] | 04.02.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.06.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 04.06.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 04.06.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP10810295.5 / EP2467784 | Divisional application(s) | EP20178341.2 / EP3722962 | Opposition(s) | 16.04.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 20.08.2010 | AL | 15.07.2020 | AT | 15.07.2020 | CY | 15.07.2020 | CZ | 15.07.2020 | EE | 15.07.2020 | ES | 15.07.2020 | HR | 15.07.2020 | IT | 15.07.2020 | LT | 15.07.2020 | LV | 15.07.2020 | MC | 15.07.2020 | MK | 15.07.2020 | MT | 15.07.2020 | PL | 15.07.2020 | RO | 15.07.2020 | SI | 15.07.2020 | SK | 15.07.2020 | SM | 15.07.2020 | TR | 15.07.2020 | LU | 20.08.2020 | BG | 15.10.2020 | NO | 15.10.2020 | GR | 16.10.2020 | IS | 15.11.2020 | PT | 16.11.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 20.08.2010 | |
AL | 15.07.2020 | ||
AT | 15.07.2020 | ||
CY | 15.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 15.07.2020 | ||
EE | 15.07.2020 | ||
ES | 15.07.2020 | ||
HR | 15.07.2020 | ||
IT | 15.07.2020 | ||
LT | 15.07.2020 | ||
LV | 15.07.2020 | ||
MC | 15.07.2020 | ||
MT | 15.07.2020 | ||
PL | 15.07.2020 | ||
RO | 15.07.2020 | ||
SI | 15.07.2020 | ||
SK | 15.07.2020 | ||
SM | 15.07.2020 | ||
TR | 15.07.2020 | ||
LU | 20.08.2020 | ||
BG | 15.10.2020 | ||
NO | 15.10.2020 | ||
GR | 16.10.2020 | ||
IS | 15.11.2020 | ||
PT | 16.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AL | 15.07.2020 | |
AT | 15.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 15.07.2020 | ||
EE | 15.07.2020 | ||
ES | 15.07.2020 | ||
HR | 15.07.2020 | ||
IT | 15.07.2020 | ||
LT | 15.07.2020 | ||
LV | 15.07.2020 | ||
MC | 15.07.2020 | ||
PL | 15.07.2020 | ||
RO | 15.07.2020 | ||
SI | 15.07.2020 | ||
SK | 15.07.2020 | ||
SM | 15.07.2020 | ||
LU | 20.08.2020 | ||
BG | 15.10.2020 | ||
NO | 15.10.2020 | ||
GR | 16.10.2020 | ||
IS | 15.11.2020 | ||
PT | 16.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/28] | AL | 15.07.2020 | |
AT | 15.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 15.07.2020 | ||
EE | 15.07.2020 | ||
ES | 15.07.2020 | ||
HR | 15.07.2020 | ||
IT | 15.07.2020 | ||
LT | 15.07.2020 | ||
LV | 15.07.2020 | ||
MC | 15.07.2020 | ||
PL | 15.07.2020 | ||
RO | 15.07.2020 | ||
SK | 15.07.2020 | ||
SM | 15.07.2020 | ||
LU | 20.08.2020 | ||
BG | 15.10.2020 | ||
NO | 15.10.2020 | ||
GR | 16.10.2020 | ||
IS | 15.11.2020 | ||
PT | 16.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/25] | AL | 15.07.2020 | |
AT | 15.07.2020 | ||
CZ | 15.07.2020 | ||
EE | 15.07.2020 | ||
ES | 15.07.2020 | ||
HR | 15.07.2020 | ||
IT | 15.07.2020 | ||
LT | 15.07.2020 | ||
LV | 15.07.2020 | ||
MC | 15.07.2020 | ||
PL | 15.07.2020 | ||
RO | 15.07.2020 | ||
SM | 15.07.2020 | ||
LU | 20.08.2020 | ||
BG | 15.10.2020 | ||
NO | 15.10.2020 | ||
GR | 16.10.2020 | ||
IS | 15.11.2020 | ||
PT | 16.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/23] | AT | 15.07.2020 | |
CZ | 15.07.2020 | ||
EE | 15.07.2020 | ||
ES | 15.07.2020 | ||
HR | 15.07.2020 | ||
IT | 15.07.2020 | ||
LT | 15.07.2020 | ||
LV | 15.07.2020 | ||
MC | 15.07.2020 | ||
PL | 15.07.2020 | ||
RO | 15.07.2020 | ||
SM | 15.07.2020 | ||
LU | 20.08.2020 | ||
BG | 15.10.2020 | ||
NO | 15.10.2020 | ||
GR | 16.10.2020 | ||
IS | 15.11.2020 | ||
PT | 16.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/22] | AT | 15.07.2020 | |
CZ | 15.07.2020 | ||
EE | 15.07.2020 | ||
ES | 15.07.2020 | ||
HR | 15.07.2020 | ||
IT | 15.07.2020 | ||
LT | 15.07.2020 | ||
LV | 15.07.2020 | ||
PL | 15.07.2020 | ||
RO | 15.07.2020 | ||
SM | 15.07.2020 | ||
LU | 20.08.2020 | ||
BG | 15.10.2020 | ||
NO | 15.10.2020 | ||
GR | 16.10.2020 | ||
IS | 15.11.2020 | ||
PT | 16.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | AT | 15.07.2020 | |
ES | 15.07.2020 | ||
HR | 15.07.2020 | ||
IT | 15.07.2020 | ||
LT | 15.07.2020 | ||
LV | 15.07.2020 | ||
PL | 15.07.2020 | ||
LU | 20.08.2020 | ||
BG | 15.10.2020 | ||
NO | 15.10.2020 | ||
GR | 16.10.2020 | ||
IS | 15.11.2020 | ||
PT | 16.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AT | 15.07.2020 | |
ES | 15.07.2020 | ||
HR | 15.07.2020 | ||
LT | 15.07.2020 | ||
LV | 15.07.2020 | ||
PL | 15.07.2020 | ||
BG | 15.10.2020 | ||
NO | 15.10.2020 | ||
GR | 16.10.2020 | ||
IS | 15.11.2020 | ||
PT | 16.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AT | 15.07.2020 | |
ES | 15.07.2020 | ||
LT | 15.07.2020 | ||
BG | 15.10.2020 | ||
NO | 15.10.2020 | ||
GR | 16.10.2020 | ||
PT | 16.11.2020 | ||
Former [2021/07] | LT | 15.07.2020 | |
NO | 15.10.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2007094450 (VANDERWIEL STEVEN P [US]) [A] 1-5 * abstract * * paragraphs [0006] , [0007] , [0033] , [0034] *; | [A]US2007168617 (BORKENHAGEN JOHN M [US], et al) [A] 1-5 * abstract ** paragraphs [0004] - [0006] * |