EP3182261 - TOUCH OPERATION PROCESSING METHOD AND TERMINAL DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 30.11.2018 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 13.07.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.01.2018 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 19.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.2018 | Withdrawal of application | published on 02.01.2019 [2019/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Device (Dongguan) Co., Ltd. B2-5 of Nanfang Factory No.2 of Xincheng Road Songshan Lake Science and Technology Industrial Zone Dongguan, Guangdong 523808 / CN | [2017/50] |
Former [2017/25] | For all designated states Huawei Device Co., Ltd. Building B2 Huawei Industrial Base Bantian Longgang Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WEI, Huan Huawei Device Co.,Ltd., Intellectual Property Department Building B2, Huawei Industrial Base Shenzhen, Guangdong / CN | 02 /
ZHANG, Xuenan Huawei Device Co.,Ltd., Intellectual Property Department Building B2, Huawei Industrial Base Shenzhen, Guangdong / CN | [2017/25] | Representative(s) | Kreuz, Georg Maria Huawei Technologies Duesseldorf GmbH Riesstraße 25 80992 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/25] | Kreuz, Georg Maria Huawei Technologies Duesseldorf GmbH Riesstrasse 8 80992 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 16188683.3 | 17.09.2012 | [2017/25] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3182261 | Date: | 21.06.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.03.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/048, G06F3/0484, G06F3/0488, G06F3/0481 | [2017/25] | CPC: |
G06F3/0416 (EP,CN,US);
G06F3/01 (KR);
G06F3/0488 (CN,US);
G06F3/017 (US);
G06F3/048 (KR);
G06F3/0481 (CN);
G06F3/04817 (US);
G06F3/04842 (EP,US);
G06F3/04847 (CN);
G06F3/04886 (EP,US);
G06T3/40 (US);
G06F1/1692 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/06] |
Former [2017/25] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | BERÜHRUNGSOPERATIONSVERARBEITUNGSVERFAHREN UND ENDGERÄTEVORRICHTUNG | [2017/25] | English: | TOUCH OPERATION PROCESSING METHOD AND TERMINAL DEVICE | [2017/25] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT À PAVÉ TACTILE ET DISPOSITIF DE TERMINAL | [2017/25] | Examination procedure | 14.09.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 21.12.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.12.2017 | Examination requested [2018/06] | 17.07.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.11.2018 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2019/01] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP12878211.7 / EP2730999 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 01.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2010241985 (KIM SEUNG BEOM [KR], et al) [A] 1-8 * paragraph [0092] - paragraph [0094]; figure 15 *; | [I]US2011169749 (GANEY HARRISS C [US], et al) [I] 1-8 * paragraph [0010] - paragraph [0013] * * paragraph [0061] - paragraph [0062]; figures 1,5 *; | [A]US2011205163 (HINCKLEY KENNETH P [US], et al) [A] 1-8* paragraph [0041] - paragraph [0043]; figure 1 *; | [A]US2011242138 (TRIBBLE GUY L [US]) [A] 1-8 * paragraph [0180]; figure 5L *; | [A]US2012206363 (KYPRIANOU NIKOS [CA], et al) [A] 1-8 * paragraph [0041] - paragraph [0045]; figure 5 * |