EP3144633 - FIBER BRAGG GRATING INTERROGATOR ASSEMBLY AND METHOD FOR THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.02.2019 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 09.03.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.10.2017 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.09.2017 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 17.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Technobis Group B.V. Pyrietstraat 2 1812 SC Alkmaar / NL | [2017/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Docter, Vincent Johannes c/o Pyrietstraat 2 1812 SC Alkmaar / NL | 02 /
Tahvili, Mohammad Saeed c/o Pyrietstraat 2 1812 SC Alkmaar / NL | [2017/12] | Representative(s) | V.O. P.O. Box 87930 Carnegieplein 5 2508 DH Den Haag / NL | [2017/12] | Application number, filing date | 16188939.9 | 15.09.2016 | [2017/12] | Priority number, date | NL20152015448 | 16.09.2015 Original published format: NL 2015448 | [2017/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3144633 | Date: | 22.03.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3144633 | Date: | 11.04.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.01.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G01B11/16, G01D5/353 | [2017/12] | CPC: |
G01D5/35316 (EP,US);
G02B6/12023 (US);
G01B11/165 (US);
G01B11/168 (US);
G01B11/18 (EP,US);
G02B6/02195 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/41] |
Former [2017/12] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | FASER-BRAGG-GITTER-ABFRAGEANORDNUNG UND VERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2017/12] | English: | FIBER BRAGG GRATING INTERROGATOR ASSEMBLY AND METHOD FOR THE SAME | [2017/12] | French: | ENSEMBLE INTERROGATEUR À RÉSEAU DE BRAGG SUR FIBRE ET PROCÉDÉ POUR CELUI-CI | [2017/12] | Examination procedure | 15.09.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 01.09.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.09.2017 | Examination requested [2017/41] | 26.10.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.02.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 21.02.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.02.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 14.01.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/12] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 15.09.2016 | AL | 11.04.2018 | CY | 11.04.2018 | EE | 11.04.2018 | HR | 11.04.2018 | LT | 11.04.2018 | LV | 11.04.2018 | MK | 11.04.2018 | RO | 11.04.2018 | RS | 11.04.2018 | SI | 11.04.2018 | SK | 11.04.2018 | SM | 11.04.2018 | BG | 11.07.2018 | GR | 12.07.2018 | IS | 11.08.2018 | LU | 15.09.2018 | MT | 15.09.2018 | [2020/32] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 15.09.2016 | |
AL | 11.04.2018 | ||
CY | 11.04.2018 | ||
EE | 11.04.2018 | ||
HR | 11.04.2018 | ||
LT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LV | 11.04.2018 | ||
MK | 11.04.2018 | ||
RO | 11.04.2018 | ||
RS | 11.04.2018 | ||
SI | 11.04.2018 | ||
SK | 11.04.2018 | ||
SM | 11.04.2018 | ||
BG | 11.07.2018 | ||
GR | 12.07.2018 | ||
LU | 15.09.2018 | ||
MT | 15.09.2018 | ||
Former [2020/30] | HU | 15.09.2016 | |
AL | 11.04.2018 | ||
EE | 11.04.2018 | ||
HR | 11.04.2018 | ||
LT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LV | 11.04.2018 | ||
RO | 11.04.2018 | ||
RS | 11.04.2018 | ||
SI | 11.04.2018 | ||
SK | 11.04.2018 | ||
SM | 11.04.2018 | ||
BG | 11.07.2018 | ||
GR | 12.07.2018 | ||
LU | 15.09.2018 | ||
MT | 15.09.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AL | 11.04.2018 | |
EE | 11.04.2018 | ||
HR | 11.04.2018 | ||
LT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LV | 11.04.2018 | ||
RO | 11.04.2018 | ||
RS | 11.04.2018 | ||
SI | 11.04.2018 | ||
SK | 11.04.2018 | ||
SM | 11.04.2018 | ||
BG | 11.07.2018 | ||
GR | 12.07.2018 | ||
LU | 15.09.2018 | ||
MT | 15.09.2018 | ||
Former [2019/30] | AL | 11.04.2018 | |
EE | 11.04.2018 | ||
HR | 11.04.2018 | ||
LT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LV | 11.04.2018 | ||
RO | 11.04.2018 | ||
RS | 11.04.2018 | ||
SI | 11.04.2018 | ||
SK | 11.04.2018 | ||
SM | 11.04.2018 | ||
BG | 11.07.2018 | ||
GR | 12.07.2018 | ||
LU | 15.09.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 11.04.2018 | |
EE | 11.04.2018 | ||
HR | 11.04.2018 | ||
LT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LV | 11.04.2018 | ||
RO | 11.04.2018 | ||
RS | 11.04.2018 | ||
SI | 11.04.2018 | ||
SK | 11.04.2018 | ||
SM | 11.04.2018 | ||
BG | 11.07.2018 | ||
GR | 12.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | AL | 11.04.2018 | |
EE | 11.04.2018 | ||
HR | 11.04.2018 | ||
LT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LV | 11.04.2018 | ||
RO | 11.04.2018 | ||
RS | 11.04.2018 | ||
SK | 11.04.2018 | ||
SM | 11.04.2018 | ||
BG | 11.07.2018 | ||
GR | 12.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | AL | 11.04.2018 | |
EE | 11.04.2018 | ||
HR | 11.04.2018 | ||
LT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LV | 11.04.2018 | ||
RO | 11.04.2018 | ||
RS | 11.04.2018 | ||
SK | 11.04.2018 | ||
BG | 11.07.2018 | ||
GR | 12.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | AL | 11.04.2018 | |
EE | 11.04.2018 | ||
HR | 11.04.2018 | ||
LT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LV | 11.04.2018 | ||
RS | 11.04.2018 | ||
BG | 11.07.2018 | ||
GR | 12.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AL | 11.04.2018 | |
HR | 11.04.2018 | ||
LT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LV | 11.04.2018 | ||
RS | 11.04.2018 | ||
BG | 11.07.2018 | ||
GR | 12.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | AL | 11.04.2018 | |
HR | 11.04.2018 | ||
LT | 11.04.2018 | ||
LV | 11.04.2018 | ||
RS | 11.04.2018 | ||
BG | 11.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | AL | 11.04.2018 | |
HR | 11.04.2018 | ||
LT | 11.04.2018 | ||
BG | 11.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/46] | AL | 11.04.2018 | |
LT | 11.04.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5319435 (MELLE SERGE M [CA], et al) [X] 1-14 * figures 1,8 * * column 3, lines 1-59 * * column 5, lines 50-61 * * column 7, lines 46-50 *; | [Y]US2004096151 (SVILANS MIKELIS NILS [CA], et al) [Y] 1,10* paragraphs [0006] , [0031] , [0035]; figure 2 *; | [Y]US2006045412 (XIAO GAOZHI [CA], et al) [Y] 1,10 * figures 1-3,5,6 *; | [YD]EP2811257 (TECHNOBIS GROUP B V [NL]) [YD] 1,10 * the whole document *; | [Y]US9110259 (BLACK RICHARD J [US], et al) [Y] 1,10 * figures 12,14 * * column 10, lines 30-50 * | by applicant | NL2010940C | - ARJEN R. VELLEKOOP, "A Small-Size Polarization Splitter Based On A Planar Optical Phased Array", JOURNAL OF LIGHTWAVE TECHNOLOGY, (199001), vol. 8, no. 1 |