EP3153210 - REDUCING DISCOMFORT CAUSED BY ELECTRICAL STIMULATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.09.2021 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.03.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.10.2017 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 10.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.09.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.10.2021 [2021/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Neuronetics, Inc. 3222 Phoenixville Pike Malvern, PA 19355 / US | [2017/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RIEHL, Mark Edward 82 Chapman Road Doylestown, PA 18901 / US | 02 /
MILLER, Stanford W. 2101 Lakeside Drive Kennesaw, GA 30144 / US | [2017/15] | Representative(s) | AWA Denmark A/S Strandgade 56 1401 Copenhagen K / DK | [N/P] |
Former [2017/15] | Awapatent A/S Strandgade 56 1401 Copenhagen K / DK | Application number, filing date | 16189296.3 | 05.03.2004 | [2017/15] | Priority number, date | US20030452477P | 07.03.2003 Original published format: US 452477 P | [2017/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3153210 | Date: | 12.04.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.02.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A61N1/34, A61N2/00 | [2017/15] | CPC: |
A61N2/008 (EP,US);
A61N2/006 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2017/47] |
Former [2017/15] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERRINGERUNG VON DURCH ELEKTRISCHE STIMULATION VERURSACHTEN BESCHWERDEN | [2017/15] | English: | REDUCING DISCOMFORT CAUSED BY ELECTRICAL STIMULATION | [2017/15] | French: | RÉDUCTION DE L'INCONFORT CAUSÉ PAR STIMULATION ÉLECTRIQUE | [2017/15] | Examination procedure | 16.09.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.10.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.10.2017 | Examination requested [2017/47] | 16.03.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 27.05.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/42] | 17.06.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2021/42] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP04717988.2 / EP1606013 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 30.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 30.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 30.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 30.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 12.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 13.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 13.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | 12.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 17 | 12.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 18 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2017 | 14   M06   Fee paid on   12.09.2017 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US6497648 (REY OMAR VICENTE [AR]) [X] 1-15 * figures 1-5 *; | [A]US6389318 (ZARINETCHI FARHAD [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | by applicant | US5725471 | US6132361 | US6086525 | US6425852 |