EP3127916 - ISOLATION OF PLASMA OR SERUM PROTEINS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 30.04.2021 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 01.09.2017 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.08.2017 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 06.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.04.2021 | Refusal of application | published on 02.06.2021 [2021/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Evolve Biologics Inc. 420 Ambassador Drive Mississauga, ON L5T 2J3 / CA | [2020/52] |
Former [2017/06] | For all designated states Therapure Biopharma Inc. 2585 Meadowpine Blvd Mississauga ON L5N 8H9 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIHME, Allan Otto Fog Furesöbakken 13 DK-3460 Birkeröd / DK | [2017/06] | Representative(s) | Beck Greener LLP Fulwood House 12 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2017/06] | Beck Greener Fulwood House 12 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HR / GB | Application number, filing date | 16190233.3 | 07.06.2005 | [2017/06] | Priority number, date | DK20040000891 | 07.06.2004 Original published format: DK 200400891 | DK20040001062 | 05.07.2004 Original published format: DK 200401062 | [2017/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3127916 | Date: | 08.02.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.11.2016 | Classification | IPC: | C07K14/81, C07K14/76, C07K14/75, C07K14/755, C07K14/47, C07K1/16, B01D15/08, B01D15/20, B01D15/42 | [2017/06] | CPC: |
B01D15/08 (EP,US);
B01D15/206 (EP,US);
B01D15/424 (EP,US);
C07K1/16 (EP,US);
C07K14/47 (EP,US);
C07K14/75 (EP,US);
C07K14/755 (EP,US);
C07K14/76 (EP,US);
C07K14/79 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2017/37] |
Former [2017/06] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | ISOLIERUNG VON PLASMA- ODER SERUMPROTEINEN | [2017/06] | English: | ISOLATION OF PLASMA OR SERUM PROTEINS | [2017/06] | French: | ISOLATION DE PROTÉINES SÉRIQUES OU PLASMATIQUES | [2017/06] | Examination procedure | 22.09.2016 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 07.08.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.08.2017 | Examination requested [2017/37] | 04.09.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.03.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.03.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 23.05.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.06.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 08.08.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.01.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.05.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.12.2020 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 26.01.2021 | 18.01.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2021/22] | 26.01.2021 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 28.01.2021 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2021/22] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP05746285.5 / EP1765866 | EP10184552.7 / EP2277912 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 22.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 22.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 22.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 22.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 29.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 28.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 19.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 30.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 16 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4416783 (NOGUCHI KOHJI [JP], et al) [A] 1-14 * columns 3,10; example 3; claim 18 *; | [A]WO9717132 (PHARMACIA BIOTECH AB [SE], et al) [A] 1-14 * page 7; claims 1-8 *; | [Y]WO9961475 (OCTAPHARMA AG [CH], et al) [Y] 1-14 * page 3 - page 5; example 1; claims 1-14 *; | [Y]WO9965586 (UPFRONT CHROMATOGRAPHY AS [DK], et al) [Y] 1-14 * page 11 - page 13; examples 1-4 *; | [A]US2002104801 (VOUTE NICOLAS [FR], et al) [A] 1-14 * example 23; claims 6,23-28 *; | [Y]WO02096215 (UPFRONT CHROMATOGRAPHY AS [DK], et al) [Y] 1-14 * page 12 - page 22; figures 1,3,9; claims 1,19,20 *; | [XP]WO2004082397 (UPFRONT CHROMATOGRAPHY AS [DK], et al) [XP] 1-3,8,14 * examples 1-13; claims 1,9-12 *; | [Y] - BURNOUF T, "Chromatography in plasma fractionation: benefits and future trends", JOURNAL OF CHROMATOGRAPHY B: BIOMEDICAL SCIENCES AND APPLICATIONS, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, NL, (19950203), vol. 664, no. 1, doi:10.1016/0378-4347(94)00532-A, ISSN 0378-4347, pages 3 - 15, XP004043701 [Y] 1-14 * abstract * * page 13 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0378-4347(94)00532-A | [A] - KARAU A ET AL., "Influence of particle size distribution and operating conditions on the adsorption performance in fluidized beds", BIOTECHNOLOGY AND BIOENGINEERING, (19970705), vol. 55, no. 1, ISSN 0006-3592, pages 54 - 64, XP002345865 [A] 1-14 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/(SICI)1097-0290(19970705)55:1<54::AID-BIT7>3.0.CO;2-W | [A] - AKINORI S ET AL., "Purification of recombinant human serum albumin. Efficient purification using STREAMLINE", BIOSEPARATION, (1999), vol. 8, no. 1, ISSN 0923-179X, pages 195 - 200, XP002345866 [A] 1-14 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1023/A:1008081314112 | [T] - LIHME A ET AL, "A novel core fractionation process of human plasma by expanded bed adsorption chromatography", ANALYTICAL BIOCHEMISTRY, ACADEMIC PRESS INC, NEW YORK, vol. 399, no. 1, doi:10.1016/J.AB.2009.12.002, ISSN 0003-2697, (20100401), pages 102 - 109, (20091206), XP026896792 [T] * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ab.2009.12.002 | by applicant | US2390074 | US2469193 | US4481189 | WO9200799 | WO9216292 | WO9218237 | EP0722771 | WO9951316 | WO9965586 | US6036861 | WO0025884 | WO0057982 | WO0185329 | WO0205923 | US6610630 | US6617133 | - FINETTE G.M.S ET AL., BIOTECHNOL. PROG., (1998), vol. 14, pages 286 - 293 | - COHN ET AL., "Separation into Fractions of Protein and Lipoprotein Components", J. AM. CHEM. SOC, (1946), vol. 68, pages 459 - 475 | - E, 3. COHN ET AL., "Preparation and Properties of Serum and Plasma Proteins, IV, A System for the Separation into Fractions of the Protein and Lipoprotein Components of Biological Tissues and Fluids", THE JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, (194601), vol. LXVIII, pages 459 - 475 | - E. J. COHN ET AL., "Preparation and Properties of Serum and Plasma Proteins, IV, A System for the Separation into Fractions of the Protein and Lipoprotein Components of Biological Tissues and Fluids", THE JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, (194601), vol. LXVIII, pages 459 - 475 | - SCAND. J. IMMUNOL., (1983), vol. 17, no. 10, pages 41 - 56 | - SCAND. J. IMMUNOL, (1983), vol. 17, no. 10, pages 41 - 56 |